anastasiou v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02244

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2018 at 2:38 PM ST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Heather anastasiou, Plaintiff
United States of America United States of America, 2255
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5181954), CIVIL COVER SHEET by Heather Anastasiou, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by Heather Anastasiou. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Feigenbaum, Mark)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 11 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?