Katherine Evans v. Portfolio Recovery Associates,
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 17-1773

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2017 at 12:43 AM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed Non-Party ACA International's Motion for Leave to File an Amicus-Curiae Brief by ACA International. [6879792] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (Melendez, Brian)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian Melendez for ACA International. [25] [6879789] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (Melendez, Brian)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in 17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756. Paper copies due on 10/30/2017. Electronically Transmitted. [24] [6878244] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (DSL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Submitted appellant brief by Stephen Swofford for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in 17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756. [23] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6878157] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (Swofford, Stephen)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [21] Appellant's consolidated brief due on or before 10/20/2017 for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Appellee's single, consolidated brief due on or before 11/20/2017 for Katherine Evans, Lusvina Paz, Peter Bowse and Evelyn Gomez. Appellant's consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/04/2017 for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. CMD [22] [6875001] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (ER)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion filed by Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756 to extend time to file appellant brief. [21] [6874821] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (Swofford, Stephen)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's consolidated brief. [19] Appellant's consolidated brief due on or before 10/13/2017 for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Appellees' consolidated brief due on or before 11/13/2017 for Katherine Evans, Lusvina Paz, Peter Bowse and Evelyn Gomez. Appellant's consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/27/2017 for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. JKL [20] [6872234] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (MM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion filed by Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in 17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756 to extend time to file appellant brief. [19] [6872174] [17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622, 17-2756] (Swofford, Stephen)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen R. Swofford for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC in 17-2756. [18] [6869225] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [17-2756, 17-1773, 17-1860, 17-1866, 17-2622] [Edited 09/14/2017 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Swofford, Stephen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER: Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. JR. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by 09/27/2017. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 70160340000113344218. [17] [6868647] [17-2756] (CR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?