United States v. Tuzman
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00536
District Judge Paul G. Gardephe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 12:53 PM EDT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Michelle Griswold +1 212 637 1205 +1 212 637 2443 andrea.griswold@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Young Kyu Kim +1 212 637 2401 +1 212 637 2527 edward.kim@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
No Logo Alston & Bird LLP, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Perry Corley , +1 404 881 7000 jessica.corley@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Kaeding +1 919 862 2208 +1 919 862 2260 mkaeding@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Gary V. Mauney, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis & Roberts PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary Vance Mauney +1 704 347 8990 +1 704 347 8929 gvm@lewis-roberts.com
No Logo Jessica Corley, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Perry Corley , +1 404 881 7000 jessica.corley@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Kaeding +1 919 862 2208 +1 919 862 2260 mkaeding@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Jones Day, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2018 Harold Keith Gordon +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 hkgordon@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 01/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Mahar Klotz +1 212 326 3796 mklotz@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 01/29/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY James Patrick Loonam +1 212 326 3808 +1 212 755 7306 jloonam@jonesday.com
No Logo Maiden Capital Opportunity Fund, LP, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis & Roberts PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gary Vance Mauney +1 704 347 8990 +1 704 347 8929 gvm@lewis-roberts.com
No Logo Michael Kaeding, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Perry Corley , +1 404 881 7000 jessica.corley@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Kaeding +1 919 862 2208 +1 919 862 2260 mkaeding@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Piksel, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fishkin Lucks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Miles Lucks +1 973 536 2800 +1 973 679 4435 slucks@fishkinlucks.com
No Logo Ryan Ethridge, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Perry Corley , +1 404 881 7000 jessica.corley@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Kaeding +1 919 862 2208 +1 919 862 2260 mkaeding@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Omar Amanat, Defendant (4)

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Randall Wade Jackson +1 212 446 2300 +1 212 446 2350 rjackson@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Wright +1 212 446 2359 jwright@bsfllp.com
Space Joanna Wright +1 212 446 2359 jwright@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Creizman Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2017, Designation: Retained Amanda Shoffel +1 212 972 0200 ashoffel@creizmanllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Creizman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Retained Eric M. Creizman +1 212 972 0200 +1 646 200 5022 ecreiz@creizmanllc.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2017, Designation: Retained Melissa Madrigal +1 212 972 0200 +1 646 200 5022 mmadrigal@creizmanllc.com
TERMINATED: 05/26/2017, Designation: Retained Caroline Johnston Polisi +1 212 972 0200 +1 646 200 5022 cpolisi@creizmanllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kostelanetz & Fink, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Christopher Michael Ferguson +1 212 473 8260 +1 212 808 8108 cferguson@kflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Henry Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Lamar Henry +1 646 820 0224 brad@henrylawny.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (611) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None USCA Appeal Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 9/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 9/4/2021, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None New Trial
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 3/29/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 3/15/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 12/15/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 12/15/2018, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated May 18, 2018 re: request for leave to travel . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from USA dated 5/11/18 re: Response to Amanat's 5/10/18 Ltr. (Dkt. 784) Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated May 10, 2018 re: Alerting the Court of new relevant Second Circuit authority Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 782 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that the sentencing of Defendant Omar Amanat will take place on July 9, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Any submission on behalf of the Defendant is due June 18, 2018, and any response by the Government is due June 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Sentencing set for 7/9/2018 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2018)(ft) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from USA dated 5/1/18 re: Defendants' Request to Adjourn Sentencings Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated May 1, 2018 re: extension of sentencing submission due dates . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing Letter by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to The Honorable Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated April 24, 2018 re: Production of written explanation of its loss amount calculations in anticipation of sentencing. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROBATION FORM PETITION as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4). On "Request for Adjournment" addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michelle Millan, U.S. Probation Officer, dated 4/20/2018 re: We are requesting an extension of the second disclosure of the presentence report for thefollowing reasons. We would suggest a second-disclosure date of April 27, 2018, which will provide sufficient time to review the information as supplied by the Government and make the appropriate changes to the presentence report. THE COURT ORDERS: AN EXTENSION IS GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/23/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROBATION FORM PETITION as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: An Extension is Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/11/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Omar Amanat ( Replies due by 5/4/2018., Responses due by 5/11/2018, Sentencing set for 5/25/2018 at 12:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe)It is hereby ORDERED that the sentencing of Defendant Omar Amanat will take place on May 25, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Any submission on behalf of the Defendant is due May 4, 2018, and any response by the Government is due May 11, 2018. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/18)(jw) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated March 28, 2018 re: Adjournment of Sentencings Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROBATION FORM PETITION as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. The Court Orders: An extension is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/28/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated March 21, 2018 re: Reply to Government's Opposition to Omar Amanat's Post Trial Motions (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Omar Amanat re 737 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 3/22/2018 (ka). (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from USA dated 3/15/18 re: Ex. A to Gov't Opposition to Defs' Rule 29 and 33 Motions (Dkt. 750) Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (email from Tuzman's counsel to Gov't))(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: 737 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial ., 735 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial . . (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #748) - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicole Renee Lloret appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Pro Bono. (Lloret, Nicole) Modified on 3/13/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat (4) denying 736 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Bradley L. Henry dated February 12, 2018 re: Extension of Time for Rule 33 Motion. ENDORSEMENT: The application is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/15/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 737 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Acquittal ., MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Bradley L. Henry dated February 12, 2018 re: Extension of Time for Rule 33 Motion . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Henry, Bradley) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Acquittal ., MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley Lamar Henry appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Henry, Bradley) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 15, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 13, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 11, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Attachments: # 1 Amanat Hearing Exhibits, # 2 Rosen Demonstratives)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 9, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 4, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 1, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 29, 2017 re: Email Evidentiary Issue (previously filed under seal) (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 718 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 714 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 713 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Harold K. Gordon, James P. Loonam, Michael M. Klotz dated January 17, 2018 re: Withdrawal as counsel and removal from the electronic notice list. Document filed by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Gordon, Harold) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Harold K. Gordon, James P. Loonam, Michael M. Klotz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Gordon, Harold) Modified on 1/17/2018 (ka). (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/26/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/26/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/22/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/22/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/21/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/21/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/20/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/20/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/19/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/19/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/18/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/18/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/15/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/15/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/14/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/13/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/12/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/11/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/11/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/8/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/7/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/6/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/5/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/4/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 12/4/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/29/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/29/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/28/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/28/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/27/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/27/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/20/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/20/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/17/17 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/17/17 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/17/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/17/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/15/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/15/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/14/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/13/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/10/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/10/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/9/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/9/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/8/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/7/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/6/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/3/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/3/17 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/2/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/2/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/1/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 11/1/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/31/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 10/31/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/30/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 10/30/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/27/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 10/27/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/24/17 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Trial held on 10/24/17 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendants' post-trial motions: 1. Defendants' motions are due on February 9, 2018; and 2. The Government's oppositions are due on March 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 2/9/2018. Responses due by 3/12/2018) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the sentencing of Defendant Omar Amanat will take place on April 25, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Any submission on behalf of the Defendant is due April 4, 2018, and any response by the Government is due April 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Sentencing set for 4/25/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/26/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VERDICT FORM as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1) Guilty on Count 4sss,5sss,6sss and Omar Amanat (4) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,3ss,4ss. (lnl) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/21/2017 re: Native Documents During Jury Deliberations Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 21, 2017 re: Strike The Testimony of Special Agent DeCapua . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 20, 2017 re: Response to Government's letter opposing Rule 29 and seeking to reopen case Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from USA dated 12/19/17 re: Response to Court's Questions re: Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 19, 2017 re: Wire Fraud Proof and Rule 29 . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 19, 2017 re: Verdict Form Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 12-16-17 re: Allegations of Email Fabrication Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 12-14-17 re: Allegations of Email Fabrication Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 12-13-17 re: Allegations of Email Fabrication Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 12-10-17 re: Letter re Allegations of Email Fabrication Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 12-3-17 re: Letter re Hearing on Allegations of Fabrication Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 11-28-17 re: Strike Alleged Fabricated Emails . Document filed by USA as to Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Amato Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 18, 2017 re: Venue Instructions in Anticipation of Charge Conference Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 18, 2017 re: Isaza Tuzman Rule 29 Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 12/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 17, 2017 re: Testimony re Thumb Drives . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A -- Touhy Letter, # 2 Ex. B -- Proposed Stipulation)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 12/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 17, 2017 re: GTL exhibits Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 12/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from randall W. Jackson dated December 16, 2017 re: Updates to the Court in Anticipation of Charge Conference and final week Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 15, 2017 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 14, 2017 re: Omar Amanat's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 598 MOTION for Acquittal .. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Acquittal . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 14, 2017 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 12/14/2017 (ka). (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 13, 2017 re: Aiding and Abetting Investment Adviser Fraud Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 12, 2017 re: Amanat Exhibits 80, 81, 2008, and 2011 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 11, 2017 re: government failure to produce evidence Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-3-17 re: Ellington Testimony Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-6-17 re: Dkt Nos. 582, 584 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 6, 2017 re: joining Dkt. 590, application for ongoing Maiden discovery Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 6, 2017 re: Maiden Letter to DOJ employee Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-3-17 re: Letter response to DKT 569 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/3/2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 3, 2017 re 579 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B .. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 3, 2017 re: testimony of Mr. Jess Ellington Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 3, 2017 re: Objections to Additional Emails to be Introduced Through Diana Chau . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 12/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/2/2017 re: 579 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (GX 2188-A), # 2 Exhibit B (GX 2188-B), # 3 Exhibit C (Transcript Excerpts))(Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 12/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 2, 2017 re: Objections to Emails to Be Introduced Through Witness Diana Chau . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-1-17 re: Response to DKT 574, 575 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 1, 2017 re: testimony of Mr. Peter Carpi Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 29, 2017 re: Chau Charts Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Omar Amanat. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Amanat is authorized to spend from 12:00 noon to 9:00 p.m. on Saturdays with his children at his ex-wife's home at 308 West 78th Street in Manhattan. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 570 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 28, 2017 re: Government's Giglio obligations re False Information in Indictment Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Defendant Kaleil Tuzman -- the former chief executive officer of KIT digital, Inc. -- is charged with conspiracy to commit securities fraud and wire fraud. (88 Indictment (Dkt. No.198)) A jury has been empaneled, and opening statements and the presentation of evidence began on October 30, 2017. Robin Smyth is the former chief financial officer of KIT digital. (Id. Paragraph 7) The Government claims, inter alia, that Tuzman, Smyth, and others conspired to inflate KIT digital's stock price and to hide its true financial condition from shareholders. Smyth pleaded guilty to conspiracy to commit securities fraud, securities fraud, and three counts of making false statements in KIT digital's SEC filings. (Diet. No. 47) Smyth entered into a cooperation agreement with the Government. His direct testimony has been taken (see Nov. 17, 2017 Trial Tr. at 2625), and he is presently in the middle of cross-examination. (See Nov. 27, 2017 Trial Tr. at 3227) In a November 21, 2017 letter -- submitted after Defendant Tuzman's cross-examination of Smyth had begun -- Tuzman seeks permission to cross-examine Smyth regarding his prior invocations of his Fifth Amendment privilege during a deposition in a state court civil action. (Nov. 21, 2017 Tuzman Ltr.) The Government argues that such questions should not be permitted because they have "little probative value and [a] great risk of unfair prejudice,"(See Footnote 1 on this Memorandum Opinion & Order] (Nov. 24, 2017 Gov't Ltr. at 1) For the reasons stated below, Tuzman will not be permitted to cross-examine Smyth about his invocations of his Fifth Amendment privilege at the civil deposition.... CONCLUSION: For the reasons stated above, Tuzman's application to cross-examine Smyth regarding his invocation of his Fifth Amendment right at a civil deposition is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/27/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: 565 Letter, filed by Omar Amana to visit with his children on Saturdays, per the Court's prior order...ENDORSEMENT... This matter will be addressed after the trial day on November 27, 2017. The Pretrial Services Officer has identified numerous instances of apparent non compliance. In the meantime, the Pretrial Services Officer's supervision of weekend leave remain in effect. Officer is directed to attend the November 27, 2017 bail review proceeding (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/21/17)(jw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11.21.17 re: Letter in Response to DKT 565 Letter Motion re Amanat Weekend Request Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pretrial Memorandum)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 21, 2017 re: Mr. Amanat's Visits to His Children in Manhattan Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 16, 2017 re: Potential Suppression Motion re Chris Peavy Identification Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying 236 Motion for Discovery as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated above, Defendant Tuzman's application for discovery and an evidentiary hearing concerning the Government's alleged outrageous conduct is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2017) (ft) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 561 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 560 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/13/2017 re: Inadmissibility of Statements in Smyth Notebooks Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # 1 GX 2188-A, # 2 GX 2189-A, # 3 GX 2189-C, # 4 GX 2190-A)(Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 13, 2017 re: Admissibility of Smyth Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/13/2017 re: Admissibility of Travel Reimbursement Practices Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 13, 2017 re: Smyth exhibits Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11-12-17 re: Letter Motion Dkt. 549 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 11/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 10, 2017 re: Request to Call Inspector Atkin Out of Order. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 11/9/17 re: Maiden-Tuzman Texts and Uncharged Co-Conspirator Issue Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 9, 2017 re: Response to the Government's Motion to Preclude AX 907 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/9/2017 re: Admissibility of Mr. Isaza Tuzmans Statements In Maiden Text Messages Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11-8-17 re: Motion to Preclude Amanat Exhibit 907 . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 538 Motion for Gary V. Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Gary V. Mauney, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear as an interested party and as counsel for a third party group of former investors in the Maiden Capital Opportunity Fund, LP". Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bar of the State of North Carolina. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/3/17) (jw) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Omar Amanat. For the reasons set forth in the Court's November 2, 2017 sealed ex parte order, the motions to quash by non-parties Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, and Jessica Corley and Gary V. Mauney are granted. (Dkt. Nos. 525, 525). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/2/2017)(ft) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ft). (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Gary V. Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauney, Gary) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 1, 2017 re: 533 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/1/2017 re: Request to Strike Answers to Hypothetical Questions in Mullin Testimony .. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/1/2017 re: Request to Strike Answers to Hypothetical Questions in Mullin Testimony . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 31, 2017 re: Response to October 31, 2017 Letter from Attorney Gary Mauney Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gary V. Mauney dated 10/31/2017 re: 524 MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Mauney, Gary) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 30, 2017 re: Motion to Quash of Gary Mauney Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 524 MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit Amended Complaint (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit Subpoena, # 5 Exhibit Jackson Email, # 6 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order, # 7 Exhibit Jackson Letter)(Mauney, Gary) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 524 MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Mauney, Gary) Modified on 10/31/2017 (ka). (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jessica P. Corley dated 10/30/2017 re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued by Amanat to Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, Jessica Corley . Document filed by Ryan Ethridge, Michael Kaeding, Jessica Corley, Alston & Bird LLP as to Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Issued to Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, Jessica Corley)(Corley, Jessica) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Mauney, Gary) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Omar Amanat. Non-party Gary V. Mauney is directed to respond to the October 24, 2017 subpoena served on him by Omar Amanat by October 30, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/30/17)(jw) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jessica Corley dated 10/27/2017 re: Adding of interested parties. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/27/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gary Vance Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14294303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauney, Gary) Modified on 10/27/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gary V. Mauney dated 10/26/2017 re: Added as an interested party. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/26/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 25, 2017 re: Reply to Government's October 25, 2017 Letter Re Bernard Madoff (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: as to (S8-15-Cr-536-) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. The motion of Christopher Brett Leach, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bars of the State of New York and of the District of Columbia; and that his contact information is as follows:...[See this Order]... Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman in the above captioned action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the action captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2017)(bw) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-24-17 re: O. Amanat MIL re Madoff References Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 515 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: 509 Letter filed by Omar Amanat. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/24/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 22, 2017 re 465 MOTION in Limine .. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 10/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 20, 2017 re: Modification in Bail Conditions Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Defendants Kaleil Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat are charged with conspiracy to commit wire fraud, wire fraud, investment advisor fraud, and conspiracy to commit securities fraud. The Government claims that Tuzman - the former chief executive officer of KIT digital, Inc. - and Omar Amanat of Enable Invest Ltd., conspired with others, including Stephen Maiden, to have Maiden's hedge fund purchase and hold KIT digitali's stock to artificially inflate its price and trading volume, and to hide losses Maiden's hedge fund had sustained in Enable. Tuzinan is also charged with making false statements to the public and to auditors about these transactions and KIT digital's finances. Tuzman has moved for a bill of particulars and an order dismissing the S8 Indictment as violating the rule against specialty. (Dkt. No. 262) Omar Amanat has moved to dismiss Count Four as duplicitous and to strike certain language in the S8 Indictment as surplusage. (Dkt. No. 269) Both Defendants have also moved for a severance. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' pretrial motions are denied (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/19/17)(jw) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 10/19/2017 re: Opposition to Smyth Letter-Motion to Quash Subpoena Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-19-17 re: Isaza Tuzman Rule 17(c) Subpoena on BOP (Dkt Nos. 458, 478, 479) Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-19-17 re: Response to Letter Motion re Various Allegations (Dkt. 489) Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Steven M. Lucks dated October 18, 2017 re: 487 Response in Opposition to Motion, re: Request to File Unredacted Version of Opposition under Seal . Document filed by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Lucks, Steven) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.)It is hereby ORDERED that the final pretrial conference in this action previously scheduled for October 18, 2017 will be held on October 20, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/17/17)(jw) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 17, 2017 re: Personal Electronic Devices for Trial . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: 467 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Peter J. Melley. . (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 476 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA.. (Lucks, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 16, 2017 re: 472 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 5, 2017 re: Preclusion of Argument that Mr. Amanat is an Unindicted Coconspirator .. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Piksel, Inc.'s Opposition to Tuzman's Motion to Compel as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 476 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA., 477 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Lucks, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2017 (ka). (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE of of Appearance of Non-Party Piksel, Inc. as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat (Lucks, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2017 (db). As per ecf_error email correspondence received on 10/16/17 @ 12:55pm. (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 13, 2017 re: Diplomatic Note Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Diplomatic Note)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 390 MOTION in Limine . . (Williams, A.) Modified on 10/12/2017 (ka). (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/5/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 5, 2017 re: Preclusion of Argument that Mr. Amanat is an Unindicted Coconspirator . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/6/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Young Disclosure, # 2 Exhibit Bennett Disclosure, # 3 Exhibit Ferrell Disclosure, # 4 Exhibit Klein Disclosure)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/19/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/19/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the application of Eric Creizman and Melissa Madrigal of Creizman PLLC to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Omar Amanat is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the trial in this matter previously scheduled for October 10, 2017 will begin on October 23, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 110 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that the final pre-trial conference in this action previously scheduled for September 28, 2017 will be held on October 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Quash BOP Subpoena. Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 9-25-17 re: Agreement to Moot Motion to Quash Harvard/Goldman Subpoenas Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: 427 MOTION to Quash - DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO QUASH THE GOVERNMENT'S IMPROPER RULE 17(C) SUBPOENAS.. Agreement to Moot Motion (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ka). (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 9-25-17 re: 452 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 24, 2017 re: Friday Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits for the Following Week .. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 25, 2017 re: Reciprocal Rule 16 Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 24, 2017 re: Friday Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits for the Following Week . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanna Christine Wright appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Wright, Joanna) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 21, 2017 re: Peremptory Challenges Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 19, 2017 re: Requests to Charge of the Government and Defendant Isaza Tuzman Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 390 MOTION in Limine ., 398 MOTION in Limine .. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 399 MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motions., 398 MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1/8/17 Letter), # 2 Exhibit B (Lumiere Transcript))(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Omar Amanat re 409 MOTION in Limine No. 2., 407 MOTION in Limine No. 1., 411 MOTION in Limine No. 3.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Robin Smyth (2), Stephen E Maiden (3), Omar Amanat (4), Rima Jameel (5), Gavin Campion (6), Irfan Amanat (7) granting 437 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated September 15, 2017 re: Request for Melissa Madrigal to appear in my place at the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 17, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 424 MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Williams Declaration, # 2 Exhibit July 20, 2016 Cover Letter, # 3 Exhibit July 5, 2017 Email Chain, # 4 Exhibit September 12, 2017 Email Chain, # 5 Exhibit Transcript)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated September 15, 2017 re: Request for Melissa Madrigal to appear in my place at the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 17, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 15, 2017 re: Modification of Pre-Trial Release Conditions . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 14, 2017 re: Update on Trial Procedures Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 13, 2017 re: Trial Procedures Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 19, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/13/2017)(ft) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 12, 2017 re: Trial Procedures . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re 411 MOTION in Limine No. 3.. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine No. 3. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re 409 MOTION in Limine No. 2.. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 2. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re 407 MOTION in Limine No. 1.. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 1. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine No. 3. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine No. 2. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine No. 1. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka). (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request To Charge by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 6, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courthouse 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Government and all Defendants are directed to attend. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Omar Amanat ( Status Conference set for 9/5/2017 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 5, 2017 at 11:45am in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall US Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, NY, NY. The Government and other Defendants need not appear. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall Wade Jackson appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP dated August 24, 2017 re: cc of Letter to Justice Kornreich Regarding Public Filing of Smyth Deposition Transcript as directed in Order Dated August 17, 2017 Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Jaroslaw, Ilene) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL as to Omar Amanat. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 8/18/17 re: Response to Tuzman's Aug. 14, 2017 Letter Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 340 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal. . (Jaroslaw, Ilene) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that any materials produced in response to any Government-issued trial subpoena and any accompanying cover letter in this matter that requests production prior to trial on October 2, 2017 shall be provided to the Court without review by the Government pending the Courts ruling on this issue. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/17)(jw) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated August 14. 2017 re: joining in Tuzman's motion opposing the government's improper use of Rule 17(c) subpoenas and reiterating previous request for the adjournment of trial proceedings on Jewish holidays. . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Trial in this matter is scheduled to begin on October 2, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. The following schedule will apply to expert witness disclosures and pretrial submissions: 1. The Government's expert disclosures are due August 21, 2017. 2. Defense expert disclosures are due September 11, 2017, except that disclosure for any expert intended to off er testimony on ink or authenticity issues is due August 21, 201 7. 3. In the event that any Defendant designates an expert on ink or authenticity issues on August 21, 2017, the Government shall make any expert disclosures on that issue by September 11, 2017. It is further ORDERED that pre-trial submissions in this matter - motions in limine, proposed voir dire, and proposed requests to charge - are due on September 5, 2017, with responsive papers due on September 19, 2017. It is further ORDERED that there shall be a final pre-trial conference in this action on September 28, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Motions due by 9/5/2017, Responses due by 9/19/2017, Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/10/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of John G. Moon, Esq. on behalf of non-party Alvarez & Marsal as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat (Moon, John) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Status Conference set for 8/9/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on August 9, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/2/17)(jw) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated July 31, 2017 re: Isaza Tuzman Adjournment Request Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Response to Irfan Amanat's 7/26/17 Letter and USAs 7/27/17 Letter regarding Motion to Sever, Adjourn Trial, and Schedule Status Conference Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jones Day Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Alvarez & Marsal Subpoena, # 3 Exhibit Isaza Tuzman Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit Jones Day Response to MTC, # 5 Exhibit SEC Subpoena to Piksel)(Jaroslaw, Ilene) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 7/27/17 re: Rule 16 Expert Witness Disclosure Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 5, 2017 re: 313 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.5.17 re: Limiting Scope of Today's Bail Hearing .. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 4, 2017 re: supplemental submission in further support of severance (Refiling of Docket Entry 312) (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 3, 2017 re: 311 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to eliminate condition of home detention. re: Modify Conditions of Release to Eliminate Condition of Home Detention . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Transcript of 7-13-16 Bail Hearing, # 2 Exhibit B-Judge Gropper Jan. 2005 Opinion, # 3 Exhibit C-Judge Gropper Oct. 2007 Opinion, # 4 Exhibit D-Judge Gropper March 2009 Opinion, # 5 Exhibit E-Judge Gropper March 2010, # 6 Exhibit F-UK Opinion, # 7 Exhibit G-Ronald Minkoff Aff. - Peak Venture Partners)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/6/2017 (ka). (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.5.17 re: Limiting Scope of Today's Bail Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. Supplemental Submission in support of a severance. (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/5/2017 (ka). (Entered: 06/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to eliminate condition of home detention. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Transcript of 7-13-2016 Bail Hearing, # 2 Exhibit B-Judge Gropper Jan. 2005, # 3 Exhibit C-Judge Gropper Oct. 2007 Opinion, # 4 Exhibit D-Judge Gropper March 2009 Opinion, # 5 Exhibit E-Judge Gropper March 2010, # 6 Exhibit F-UK Opinion, # 7 Exhibit G-Ronald Minkoff Aff.-Peak Venture Partners)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/5/2017 (ka). (Entered: 06/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Shoffel appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Shoffel, Amanda) (Entered: 06/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Omar Amanat( Bail Hearing set for 6/5/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that the bail review hearing in this matter currently scheduled for June 2, 2017 will take place on Monday, June 5, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: 288 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017...ENDORSEMENT...The application is granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Griswold, Williams, Naftalis dated 5.30.17 re: Date of Bail Review Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that a bail review hearing in this matter will take place on Friday, June 2, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/30/2017)(bw) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat. Upon the motion by counsel for Defendant Omar Amanat, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion by Creizman PLLC to withdraw the appearance of Caroline Johnston Polisi in the above-referenced action is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/26/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated May 25, 2017 re: October 2, 2017 Trial Date Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Caroline Johnston Polisi to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 15, 2017 re: 288 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017. re: temporary modification of Omar Amanat's bail conditions to permit him to attend his son's high school graduation on June 7, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 15, 2017 re: Response to Pretrial Services' submission regarding Omar Amanat, dated May 11, 2017 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 23, 2017 re: (1) joining in Kaleil Isaza Tuzman's motion for an adjournment of the trial to November 2017; (2) in the alternative, that no pretrial or trial proceedings in the case be held on certain dates; (3) that any hearing on Pretrial Services' memorandum concerning Mr. Amanat's bail not be held on May 31 or June 1, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2017 (ka). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat to Memorandum, dated May 11, 2017, submitted by Pretrial Services alleging violations of bail conditions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Text Messages between Amanat and Pretrial Services dated May 7, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B-Proof of O. Amanat Call to Pretrial Services on May 6, 2017, # 3 Exhibit C-Email from E. Creizman to AUSAs on May 10, 2017, # 4 Exhibit D-Email from AUSAs to E. Creizman on May 10, 2017)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2017 (ka). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Eric M. Creizman in Support as to Omar Amanat re: 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Memorandum and Order of Judge Matsumoto in United States v. Martin Shkreli, 15-CR-627 (KAM) (EDNY Apr. 24, 2017))(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Omar Amanat re: 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count Four. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: 262 MOTION Miscellaneous Pretrial Relief. . (Serpe, Silvia) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count . (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO STRIKE DOCKET ENTRIES 272 Motion to Strike Document No. [266, 267 and 268] as to Omar Amanat. Respectfully move to strike docket entries 266, 267, and 268, in which we inadvertently filed incorrect documents. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/10/2017) (jw) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joshua Arditi Naftalis appearing for USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Document No. [266, 267, and 268] because those documents were inadvertently filed in support of Omar Amanat's pretrial motions. Docket Entries 269, 270, and 271 represent the motion papers we intended to file. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eric M. Creizman in Support as to Omar Amanat re: 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-9/19/2016 Letter requesting bill of particulars regarding Indictment S-7, # 2 Exhibit B-3/15/2017 Letter requesting bill of particulars regarding Indictment S-8, # 3 Exhibit C-7/13/2016 Transcript of O. Amanat Bail Hearing)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re 269 MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 4/3/2017 (ka). (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count 4ss for duplicity. MOTION to Strike Document No. [Portions of the Indictment] . MOTION to Compel . MOTION for Discovery . MOTION for Release of Brady Materials . MOTION Exhibit List and Witness List . . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 3, 2017 re: Maiden documents Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat on re: 234 LETTER MOTION filed by Omar Amanat, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Eric M. Creizman dated 1/31/17 re: Motion to Modify Conditions of Release. ENDORSEMENT: The application for split residences is denied. Permitting a defendant to reside in two districts presents significant logistical and practical difficulties for the Pretrial Services Office. Acknowledging the parents' medical condition, the Defendant's brother lives with them, and can attend to their needs. Accordingly, it is not necessary fro the Defendant to maintain two residences in order to address his parents' medical needs. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/2/2017)(bw) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: as to (S8-15-Cr-536-) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4), Irfan Amanat (7). WHEREAS, on February 14, 2017, Kaleil Isaza Tuzman filed a motion for discovery and a hearing on the government's conduct (Dkt. #236); WHEREAS, on February 14, 2017, Mr. Isaza Tuzman publicly filed on ECF, among other supporting documents, a redacted version of the Declaration of Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, dated February 14, 2017 ("Isaza Tuzman Declaration")(Dkt. #239), which redacted highly personal and sensitive facts; WHEREAS, an additional word, referencing a highly personal and sensitive fact, should have been redacted from the redacted version of the Isaza Tuzman Declaration publicly filed on ECF as Dkt. #239; WHEREAS, by letter dated February 16, 2017, Mr. Isaza Tuzman, through counsel, requests that the Court order that the previously filed Declaration of Mr. Isaza Tuzman (Dkt. #239) be sealed in its entirety and Mr. Isaza Tuzman will re-file a corrected redacted version of the declaration; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The defendant's application is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall expeditiously place under seal Dkt. #239 (the Declaration of Mr. Isaza Tuzman) in the above-captioned action. Defendant will file a properly redacted version of the declaration by Feb. 21, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/17/2017)(bw) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 2.10.17 re: Joint Update Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric Creizman dated 1/31/17 re: Motion to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Polisi, Caroline) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Damian Williams and Andrea M. Griswold dated 1/28/2016 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter jointly with counsel for defendants to update the Court on the status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden ("Maiden"). The parties respectfully propose to jointly update the Court by February 10, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/30/2017)(jw) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 1.28.17 re: Update re Maiden Documents Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold re: 1.28.17 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 1/30/2017 (ka). (Entered: 01/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/10/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat re: Conference held on 1/10/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Caroline Johnston Polisi appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Polisi, Caroline) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat( Motions due by 3/31/2017., Replies due by 5/5/2017., Responses due by 4/21/2017) It is hereby ORDERED that the following amended schedule will apply to Defendants' pretrial and discovery-related motions in this matter: Defendants' motions are due on March 31, 2017. The Government's opposition is due on April 21, 2017. Defendants' replies, if any, are due on May 5, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Irfan Amanat may - within thirty days of receipt of discovery - request additional time to prepare pretrial and discovery-related motions, in the event that additional time proves necessary (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2017)(jw) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 1.18.17 re: Motion Schedule Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Damian Williams and Andrea M. Griswold dated 1/13/2016 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter jointly with counsel for defendants to update the Court on the status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden ("Maiden"). The parties respectfully propose to update the Court in two weeks, on January 27, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017)(jw) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Motions due by 2/14/2017., Replies due by 3/17/2017., Responses due by 3/7/2017) It is ORDERED that Defendant Isaza Tuzman's motion to dismiss the indictment based on outrageous government conduct will proceed separately from Defendants' other pretrial motions, and will be briefed on the following schedule: Defendant's motion is due February 14, 2017. The Government's opposition is due March 7, 2017. Defendant's reply, if any, is due on March 17, 2017 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017)(jw) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 01/16/2017 re: Motions Schedule . Document filed by Irfan Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric Creizman dated 1/16/17 re: Motion Schedule Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 01/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated Jan. 13, 2017 re: Update re Maiden Privilege Issue Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference currently scheduled for January 6, 2017 at 11 :00 a.m. is adjourned to January 10, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/6/2017)(ft) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat (Status Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on January 6, 2017 at 11 :00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017)(jw) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Silvia L. Serpe appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Serpe, Silvia) (Entered: 01/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 30, 2016 re: Maiden Computer Update Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat on re: 196 Letter, filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/23/2016)(ft) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (S8) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1) count(s) 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, Omar Amanat (4) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, Irfan Amanat (7) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6. (jm) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams & Andrea Griswold dated 12.16.16 re: Update on SEC forensic analysis Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/21/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 11/21/16 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat on Letter addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Eric M. Creizman dated December 5, 2016 re: I am writing to withdraw Omar Amanat's motion to modify his restrictions of home detention with electronic monitoring, without prejudice to renew the motion at a later date. Accordingly, I respectfully request that Mr. Amanat and his counsel be excused from appearing at the status conference scheduled this Friday, December 9, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/7/2016)(bw) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated December 5, 2016 re: Withdrawing Omar Amanat's bail motion. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Omar Amanat re 174 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated November 18, 2016 re: Motion to Remove Conditions of Home Detention and Electronic Monitoring . filed by Omar Amanat. without prejudice to renew. (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 12/6/2016 (ka). (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4). It is hereby ORDERED that the bail review hearing scheduled for December 9, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. will take place on December 9, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/2/2016)(bw) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4). It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to supplemental briefing on Defendants' motion to compel production of Rule 16, Brady, Giglio, and Jencks Act material: 1. Defendants' briefing is due on December 12, 2016. 2. The Government's opposition is due on December 20, 2016. 3. Defendants' reply, if any, is due on December 23, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties submit to this Court a joint status report by December 7, 2016 explaining the results of the forensic comparison analysis conducted by the SEC with respect to the Stephen Maiden computers. In the event that privilege issues remain as to documents or electronically stored information relating to Stephen Maiden, the parties will address, inter alia, whether those issues should be resolved by this Court or by Judge Nathan in connection with the SEC civil enforcement action pending before Judge Nathan (No. 15 Civ. 7057 (AJN)). SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/29/2016)(bw) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 28, 2016 re: Discovery Update Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Defendants' pretrial motions in this matter: 1. Defendants' motions are due on January 31, 2017. 2. The Government's opposition is due on February 21, 2017. 3. Defendants' replies, if any, are due on February 28, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties will confer and submit to this Court a joint letter by November 28, 2016 identifying any remaining discovery issues. If discovery issues remain for resolution, the parties will propose how those issues should be briefed and on what schedule. In the event that privilege issues remain as to documents or electronically stored information relating to Stephen Maiden, the parties will address, inter alia whether those issues should be resolved by this Court or by Judge Nathan in connection with the SEC civil enforcement action pending before Judge Nathan (No. 15 Civ. 7057 (AJN)). It is further ORDERED that the Government will submit a response to Defendants' applications for bail modifications (Dkt. Ncs. 174, 175) by December 6, 2016. A bail review hearing will be conducted on December 9, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Motions due by 1/31/2017, Replies due by 2/28/2017, Responses due by 2/21/2017, Bond Hearing set for 12/9/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2016)(ft) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Eric C. Creizman dated November 16, 2016 re: On November 10, 2016, the Court granted my application on behalf of Omar Amanat, dated October 28, 2016 to modify his bail conditions so that the security for Mr. Amanat's $2.5 million personal recognizance bond be changed from the $250,000 cash deposit made by his uncle to pledging of the house in Verona, New Jersey owned by Mr. Amanat's ex-wife, and where their three young children reside. Per the Court's order, I am now providing proof that the attached confession of judgment has been filed in the New Jersey Superior Court, at Newark. Accordingly, I respectfully request that the Court order that the Clerk's Office release to Mr. Amanat's uncle the $250,000 he deposited as security for Mr. Amanat's personal recognizance bond. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/22/2016)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated November 18, 2016 re: Motion to Remove Conditions of Home Detention and Electronic Monitoring . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated November 18, 2016 re: 153 Order on Letter Motion,,,,,, re: Requesting Release of Funds . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proof of Lien Filing, # 2 Exhibit B-Court's Order)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 11/21/2016 (ka). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 17, 2016 re: Response to Motion to Compel Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Maiden Counsel, # 2 Exhibit Judge Nathan Order)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: 132 MOTION to Compel Production of Rule 16 Discovery, Brady, Giglio and Jencks Act Materials, and for a Declaration That the Produced Maiden Documents Are Not Privileged., 142 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated October 30, 2016 re: joining in Kaleil Isaza Tuzman's motion to compel and motion to compel the production of certain communications contained on electronic storag. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Maiden Counsel, # 2 Exhibit Judge Nathan Order)(Williams, A.) Modified on 11/18/2016 (ka). (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Release of Funds . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Lien Filing, # 2 Exhibit Order dated November 10, 2016)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 11/17/2016 (ka). (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated November 14, 2016 re: status of defense review of discovery and anticipated pretrial motions (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 149 CONSENT LETTER MOTION filed by Omar Amanat (4), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Eric M. Creizman dated October 28, 2016 re: Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error, 140 CONSENT MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to substitute security for personal recognizance bond. re: Consent Motion to Substitute Security for Personal Recognizance Bond -REFILED TO CORRECT EARLIER FILING ERROR. We represent Omar Amanat in the above-referenced action. I write to respectfully request a modification of Mr. Amanat's bail conditions. Although Mr. Amanat's uncle will remain a co-signer on the bond, he requires the $250,000 in cash that he contributed to secure the bond. Accordingly, on consent of the government, we have offered to substitute as security for the bond the house owned by his ex-wife, Helena Houdova, in Verona, New Jersey. We have provided documentation to the government demonstrating that the property is appraised at $950,000, and that Ms. Houdova has approximately $400,000 in equity in the house. Accordingly, pledging the house provides additional security. If the Court grants this motion, we will file the attached confession of judgment with the Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, and upon proof of filing, we respectfully request that the Court release the $250,000 security to either Mr. Amanat's uncle, or to my firm's escrow account for payment to Mr. Amanat's uncle. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/10/2016) (bw) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated October 28, 2016 re: Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error, 140 CONSENT MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to substitute security for personal recognizance bond. re: Consent Motion to Substitute Security for Personal Recognizance Bond -REFILED TO CORRECT EARLIER FILING ERROR. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Confession of Judgment)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 143 LETTER MOTION to respectfully request a modification to Mr. Amanat's conditions of bail in connection with the care of his five-year old son, D.A., who recently suffered a brain injury as to Omar Amanat. We request that for the period that D.A. is under rehabilitation, the Court modify Mr. Amanat's conditions of release to enable him to: (i) visit D.A. at his home in Verona, New Jersey; and (ii) take D.A. to, and accompany D.A. during rehabilitation treatments at the Kessler Institute..ENDORSEMENT...The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/3/2016) (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Melissa Madrigal dated October 31, 2016 re: Motion for Temporary Bail Modification Regarding Care of Mr. Amanat's 5 year old child . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Madrigal, Melissa) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated October 30, 2016 re: joining in Kaleil Isaza Tuzman's motion to compel and motion to compel the production of certain communications contained on electronic storage devices produced by Stephen Maiden to the SEC . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 10/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 423 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?