J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Jaku
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-13550

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 12:05 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Request - other
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Appear
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2018, Entered: None Appear
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/23/2018, Entered: None Appear
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Appear*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Consent and Reference to a Magistrate Judge to Conduct All Proceedings
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Answer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER Requiring Defendant Kuvendi Cafe to Retain Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?