USA v. MANAFORT et al
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00201-ABJ

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated February 23, 2019 at 2:32 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Greg Donald Andres +1 202 616 3812
Space Kyle R. Freeney +1 202 616 0800
Space Andrew Weissmann +1 202 514 1746

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
v.
Manafort, Paul J., Jr. Manafort, Paul J., Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Zehnle +1 202 626 5800 tezehnle@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kevin Downing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M. Downing +1 202 626 5831 kevindowning@kdowninglaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/27/2017
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371; CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES; Conspiracy Against the United States.
Count 10
Citation Section 22 U.S.C. § 612.F
Offense Level 4
22612 and 618(a)(1); 182; REGISTRATION STATEMENT FILING OF OR CONTENTS OF; Unregistered Agent of a Foreign Principal.
Count 11
Citation Section 22 U.S.C. § 612.F
Offense Level 4
22612, 618(a)(2); 182; REGISTRATION STATEMENT FILING OF OR CONTENTS OF; False and Misleading FARA Statements.
Count 12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
182, 1001(a); STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY; False Statements.
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h); MONEY LAUNDERING - FRAUD, OTHER; Conspiracy to Launder Money.
Count 3-6
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5314.F
Offense Level 4
315314 and 5322(b); 182; RECORDS AND REPORTS ON FOREIGN FINANCIAL AGENCY TRANSACTIONS - DEFINITION; Failure to File Reports of Foreign Bank and Financial Accounts for Calendar Years 2011-2014.
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag CAT B
  Entries (643) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 525 Filed: 2/23/2019, Entered: 2/23/2019 sentencing memorandum
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Attachments A-F (REDACTED), # (2) Attachment G (REDACTED))(Weissmann, Andrew)
LREF
Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
MINUTE ORDER granting [524] government's February 22, 2019 motion for leave to file document under seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the unredacted version of the governments sentencing memorandum including its exhibits [524-1] and [524-2] (Attachment A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file a redacted version of the memorandum and exhibits [524-3] and [524-4] (Attachment B) on the public docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/23/19. (DMK)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 Motion to Travel
    Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
      MINUTE ORDER granting [519] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release [519-2] and Exhibit 1 to his Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release [519-3]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/19. (DMK)
        LREF
        Blank  set/reset hearings
        Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): Sentencing set for 3/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019, Terminated: 2/20/2019 motion for extension of time to file
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File his Sentencing Memorandum by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard) (Main Document 518 replaced on 2/20/2019 to reflect that this is an unopposed motion) (jth).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
            MINUTE ORDER granting [518] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sentencing Memorandum as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that defendant's sentencing memorandum is due on February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/19. (DMK)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 13, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-68. Date of Issuance:February 15, 2019. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 511 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Response to Document
                RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Set/Reset Deadlines Joint Response (Weissmann, Andrew)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Order
                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1). The Office of Special Counsel need not file a response to [513] defendant Manafort's Motion to Unredact until the Court transmits its proposed revisions to the pages in question to the parties. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2019. (lcabj3)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [513] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket under seal defendant's Motion to Unredact Certain Additional Material in the Proposed Redacted Transcript [513-1] and the attached exhibit [513-2]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2019. (lcabj3)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [512] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket under seal attachment A, [512-1], the unredacted transcript of the February 13, 2019 hearing that reflects that parties' proposed redactions. The Court reporter is directed to make available to the public attachment B, [512-2], the redacted transcript of the February 13, 2019 hearing. The Court will take the parties' dispute concerning the unsealing of additional material under advisement, and it will schedule a hearing if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/15/2019. (lcabj3)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 510 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT (1) on the redactions to the February 4, 2019 hearing transcript. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/14/2019. (lcabj3)
                          LREF
                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The parties must inform the Court of any redactions that must be made to the sealed transcript of the hearing held on 2/13/2019 by 11:00 AM on 2/15/2019. (jth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 509 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1) on the government's breach determination. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/13/19. (DMK)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 505 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, REDACTED Post-Hearing Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) REDACTED - Exhibits to Memorandum)(Westling, Richard)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                MINUTE ORDER granting [504] Government's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [504-1] Attachment A, the government's supplement to the record in response to defendant's post-hearing memorandum; [504-2] Attachment B, and [504-3] Attachment C. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/19. (DMK)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [503] Defendant's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [503-1] defendant's memorandum in opposition to the government's position on redactions to the Feb. 4, 2019 hearing transcript and [503-2] exhibits to the memorandum. It is ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall confer in an effort to agree on redactions to the public version of defendant's submission to be filed on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/19. (DMK)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The SEALED Hearing in this case presently set for 2/13/2019 at 9:30 AM is reset for 2/13/2019 (same day) at 1:30 PM (new start time) in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, held on 1/25/19. Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance: 2/8/19. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, Telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2019.(Wick, Sara)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [501] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [501-1] defendant's post-hearing memorandum and [501-2] Exhibit A to defendant's post-hearing memorandum. It is ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall confer in an effort to agree on redactions to the public version of defendant's submission to be filed on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/8/19. (DMK)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 4, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-143. Date of Issuance: February 7, 2019. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Response to Document
                                            RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order,,, Attachment A (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Order
                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [496] sealed motion for leave to file document under seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [496-2] Attachment B to the motion and [496-4] Attachment D to the motion. It is ORDERED that the government shall file on the public docket [496-1], Attachment A to the motion, which is the parties' joint response to the Court's February 4, 2019 order. The court reporter is directed to make available to the public the partially redacted transcript of the February 4, 2019 hearing. Any argument concerning the few redactions that remain in dispute will be heard as part of the sealed hearing set for February 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/19. (DMK)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The minute order issued by the Court this date was entered in error and a corrected minute order will be issued by the Court. (jth)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER granting [496] sealed motion for leave to file document under seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [496-2] Attachment B to the motion and [496-4] Attachment D to the motion. It is ORDERED that the government shall file on the public docket [496-1] and [496-3], Attachments A and C to the motion, which are the parties' joint response to the Court's February 4, 2019 order and a partially redacted transcript of the February 4, 2019 hearing. Any argument concerning the few redactions that remain in dispute will be heard as part of the sealed hearing set for February 13, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/19. (DMK) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jth).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [490] Unopposed Motion to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). It is ORDERED that defendant is permitted to travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order issued this date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/6/19. (DMK)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [491] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2).The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [491-1] attachment 1 to defendant's motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/6/19. (DMK)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [487] Unopposed Motion to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). It is ORDERED that defendant is permitted to travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order issued this date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/6/19. (DMK)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [488] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2).The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [488-1] attachment 1 to defendant's motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/6/19. (DMK)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019, Terminated: 2/6/2019 Motion to Travel
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019, Terminated: 2/6/2019 Motion to Travel
                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). As noted by the Court on the record at the Sealed Hearing held this date, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file by the Close of Business on Wednesday, February 6, 2019, their proposed redactions to the transcript of today's Sealed Hearing, it is further ORDERED that any supplemental submissions from the parties are due by 12:00 PM (noon) on Friday, February 8, 2019, an additional Sealed Hearing has been set for Wednesday, February 13, 2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, it is further ORDERED that Sentencing in this case is reset for Wednesday, March 13, 2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Sentencing Memoranda from the parties remain due by February 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/4/2019. (jth)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 1/25/2019. Another Hearing that will be SEALED is set for 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: Sara Wick; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann and Greg Donald Andres. (jth)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 485 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Upon consideration of defendant's [484] Motion for an Order Permitting him to wear a suit at Court appearances, it is ORDERED that the [484] Motion is GRANTED. Defendant is permitted to wear a suit at the January 25, 2019 hearing and any future court appearances in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/24/2019. (jth)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019, Terminated: 1/24/2019 Motion for order
                                                                      MOTION for Order Granting Permission to Wear a Suit at Court Appearances by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019, Terminated: 1/23/2019 Motion for order
                                                                        MOTION for Order That Defendant Not Be Transported and Notice of Waiver of Appearance by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 482 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, REDACTED Reply to the Government's Declaration in Support of Its Breach Determination (Westling, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 480 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019, Terminated: 1/23/2019 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Defendant's Reply - Sealed, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for order
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [483] Motion for Order as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) that defendant not be transported to the hearing set for 9:30 a.m. on January 25, 2019. Given the number of court appearances defendant has been permitted to waive, the significance of the issues at stake, and the fact that his being available to consult with counsel may reduce the likelihood that the defense position with respect to the issues discussed will change after the hearing, defendant's motion is denied without prejudice to future motions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/23/19. (DMK)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [480] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [480-1] Attachment 1, the unredacted version of defendant's reply to the Special Counsel's declaration and exhibits in support of its breach determination. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [480], the motion itself. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall file on the public docket a redacted version of the reply. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/23/19. (DMK)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 479 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,, (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [478] defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Any reply to the government's declaration -- which should be narrowly focused on responding to specific factual allegations set forth in the submission and need not repeat any of the background or arguments contained in defendant's response [470] to the Special Counsel's Submission in Support of its Breach Determination -- must be filed by 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, January 23, 2019. The January 25 hearing date will not be re-scheduled at this time; at a minimum, given the parties' shifting positions on what issues need to be resolved by the Court and at what point in the proceedings, the Court wishes to hear from them in person again to establish a plan for moving forward. But the parties should also come prepared to discuss the question of whether the material that has been submitted shows that the defendant intentionally provided false information in connection with any of the five subject matter areas that have been identified, in the event the Court decides to hear argument at that time on the merits of that dispute -- either in open court or at a sealed proceeding. If either party is of the view that such a determination would require the testimony of any witness, it should inform the Court by Friday, January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/17/19. (DMK)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019, Terminated: 1/17/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Office of Special Counsel's Declaration in Support of Its Breach Determination by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 3/15/2019. (jth)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 476 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, REDACTED Declaration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 475 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Status report
                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by USA as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 474 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019, Terminated: 1/15/2019 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Attachment A, # (2) Exhibit Attachment A Exhibits, # (3) Declaration CORRECTED Attachment B, # (4) Exhibit Attachment B Exhibits, # (5) Text of Proposed Order, # (6) Certificate of Service)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document number 473 submitted by the government was entered in error and government counsel refiled a corrected version of the pleading as Document number 474. (jth)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [474] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [474-1] Attachment A, the unredacted version of the government's submission in support of its breach determination, and [474-2] Attachment A Exhibits, the unredacted accompanying exhibits. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [474], the motion itself. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file on the public docket [474-3] Attachment B, the redacted version of the submission, and [474-4] Attachment B Exhibits, the redacted exhibits. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/15/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. In light of the joint status report [475], it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/15/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 472 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, CORRECTED - REDACTED Response to the Government's Breach Submission (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 470 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT (Response to the Special Counsel's Submission in Support of Its Breach Determination) as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zvt)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The government shall submit to the Court by 1/14/2019 the factual and evidentiary basis of the five alleged breaches; any reply by defendant is due by 1/18/2019; If the Court determines that a hearing remains necessary after reviewing the parties' submissions, the hearing will be held on 1/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3. (jth)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. At the hearing of December 11, 2018, it was ORDERED that the defendant would advise the Court by January 7, 2019 whether he disputes any of the five breaches of the plea agreement alleged by the government. If he did not dispute the allegations, defendant would advise the Court that there was no need for an evidentiary hearing on the breach issue. If he did dispute any of them, defendant would advise the Court which of the allegations are disputed, the government would provide the Court the evidence supporting the disputed allegations by January 14, the defense could reply by January 18, and a hearing was scheduled for January 25. On January 7, defendant filed a submission stating that he does not believe a hearing on the breach issue is necessary but that he nonetheless disputes all five alleged breaches. In light of this, it is ORDERED that the government shall submit to the Court by January 14, 2019 the factual and evidentiary basis of the five alleged breaches, and any reply by defendant is due by January 18, 2019. If the Court determines that a hearing remains necessary after reviewing the parties' submissions, the hearing will be held on January 25, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/8/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [469] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [469-1] Attachment A to the motion, the unredacted version of defendant's response to the government's submission in support of its breach determination. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [469] the motion itself. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall file on the public docket [469-2] Attachment B to the motion, the redacted version of his response. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/8/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 469 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019, Terminated: 1/8/2019 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A - SEALED Response, # (2) Exhibit Attachment B - REDACTED Response, # (3) Exhibit Attachment C - Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate of Service)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) granting [465] Unopposed Motion for Permission to Travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order issued this date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/17/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [466] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [466-1] exhibit 1 to defendant's motion for leave to file under seal, and is also directed to unseal [466] the motion itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/17/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 30, 2018 - Unsealed per order at 12-11-18 hearing; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance: December 11, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 11, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: December 11, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Scheduling Conference as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 12/11/2018. Defendant's Submission re: alleged breach matter is due by 1/7/2019. Government submission, if any, is due by 1/14/2019; Defendant's Reply, if any, is due by 1/18/2019. A Hearing, if needed, is set for 1/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant's presence was waived, but he remains committed; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann and Greg Donald Andres. (jth)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 462 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Set/Reset Hearings, (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): At the request of the Defense and with the consent of the Government. The Scheduling Conference presently set for 12/12/2018 at 10:00 AM is reset 12/11/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In lieu of the defense submission that is due on December 12, 2018, it is ORDERED that a scheduling conference is set for Wednesday, December 12 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3. If defendant wishes to waive his appearance, he must do so by filing a waiver signed by defendant expressly waiving his right to appear at that proceeding. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 460 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, REDACTED Submission in Support of Breach Determination (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 459 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018, Terminated: 12/7/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A - UNREDACTED, SEALED Government's Submission in Support of Its Breach Determination, # (2) Attachment B - REDACTED Government's Submission in Support of Its Breach Determination, # (3) Text of Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate of Service)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [459] Government's Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [459-1] Attachment A to the motion, the unredacted version of the government's submission in support of its breach determination. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [459] the motion itself. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file on the public docket [459-2] Attachment B to the motion, the redacted version of its submission. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/7/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [459] Government's Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [459-1] Attachment A to the motion, the unredacted version of the government's submission in support of its breach determination. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [459] the motion itself. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file on the public docket [459-2] Attachment B to the motion, the redacted version of its submission. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/7/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 458 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018, Terminated: 12/4/2018 Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Permit Permission to Obtain Transcript by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III, KONSTANTIN KILIMNIK. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 30, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance: December 4, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [458] Motion to Obtain Sealed Portions of November 30, 2018 Transcript. The Court reporter may provide the government with a copy of the transcript from the hearing of November 30, 2018, including all sealed portions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/4/18.(DMK)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2018 as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Submission from the government regarding the alleged breach of the plea agreement is due by 12/7/2018; Defendant's proposed schedule for the filing of a response to the government's submission is due by 12/12/2018. REFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE for Presentence Investigation. Sentencing is set for 3/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Sentencing Memoranda from the parties are due by 2/22/2019. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant's Presence was waived for this hearing, but he remains committed; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M.Downing and Thomas Edward Zehnle; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Jeannie S. Rhee. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 456 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): A Scheduling Conference in this case is set for 11/30/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 455 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [454] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that the Joint Status Report is due by November 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 454 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018, Terminated: 11/16/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Status Report by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 1/15/2019. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. In light of the joint status report [453], it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by January 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/15/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by USA as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 452 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. The Clerk of Court is requested to open a miscellaneous action entitled "In re Petitions for Relief Concerning Consent Order of Forfeiture." It is ORDERED that all further filings that relate solely to any petitions for relief from the Consent Order of Forfeiture [443] shall be made in the miscellaneous action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/13/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The government's response to [450] [451] the Petition and Request for Ancillary Hearing and Related Relief Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 853(n) is due by 11/21/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. The government is ORDERED to file a response by November 21, 2018 to [450] [451] the Petition and Request for Ancillary Hearing and Related Relief Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 853(n). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/8/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III, KONSTANTIN KILIMNIK re [447] Amicus Curiae Appearance was entered in error and Clerk's Office will refile said pleading. Document linked to wrong defendants and wrong event used. (hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Amicus Brief in Defense as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. "Leave to file denied. Third parties may not advance defenses on the defendant's behalf" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 11/06/2018. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/06/2018. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 451 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION and REQUEST Related Relief to amend the [443] Preliminary Order of Forfeiture of 10/10/2018 by UBS BANK USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (See Docket Entry [450] to View Document). (hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 450 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION and REQUEST for Ancillary Hearing and Related Relief Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 853(n) by UBS BANK USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Corporate Disclosure for UBS Bank USA, # (4) Exhibit Notice of Appearance)(hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 449 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie Lauren Brooker appearing for UBS BANK USA. (hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....Response to Consent Order of Forfeiture re [443] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to UBS Bank USA's Petition and Request for Ancillary Hearing Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. s. 853(n), # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Corporate Disclosure for UBS Bank USA, # (4) Exhibit Entry of Appearance)(Brooker, Stephanie) Modified docket text on 11/6/2018 (zvt). Modified on 11/8/2018 (hsj).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 446 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III, KONSTANTIN KILIMNIK (Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [444] Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/15/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 444 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018, Terminated: 10/15/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 443 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/09/18. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 442 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The Court dockets this order filed in case number 18-mc-0041, In the Matter of the Application of the Associated Press; Cable News Network, Inc.; The New York Times Co.; Politico LLC; and WP Co., LLC, d/b/a/ The Washington Post for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records, to facilitate the unsealing of [166-2] in this case consistent with this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal [166-2] exhibit 2 attached to defendant Richard W. Gates III's motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018, Terminated: 10/10/2018 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order of Forfeiture by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 440 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by RICHARD W. GATES, III To The Court's October 2, 2018 Minute Order (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION To Obtain A Document by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [439] motion as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) for access to [166-2], the sealed document attached as Exhibit 2 to Dkt. 166, in complete and unredacted form. The Clerk of Court is direct to provide a copy of the document to counsel for defendant Gates. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/3/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). GRANTING [435] Unopposed Motion for Permission to Travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order issued this date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/2/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [436] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [436-1] exhibit 1 to defendant's motion for leave to file under seal, and is also directed to unseal [436] the motion itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/2/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 436 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1). USCA Case Number 18-3037. (Attachment: # (1) judgment filed July 31, 2018)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on September 14, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-50. Date of Issuance: September 14, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 423 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Statement of Offense
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF THE OFFENSES AND OTHER ACTS by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 422 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 plea agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 421 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Approved by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 420 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 419 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1) count(s) 1ssss, 2ssss. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson:Arraignment/Plea Agreement Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) held on 9/14/2018. Plea of Guilty entered as to Counts: 1ssss, 2ssss. DEFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE of Presentence Investigation Report. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 11/16/2018. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres, Jeannie S. Rhee and Kyle Renee Freeny. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The continuation of the Pretrial Conference presently set for 9/14/2018 at 11:00 AM is converted to an Arraignment and Plea Agreement Hearing before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT (Travel Itinerary) as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2).(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). GRANTING [414] Unopposed Motion for Permission to Travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order issued this date. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The continuation of the Pretrial Conference presently set for 9/14/2018 at 9:30 AM is reset for 9/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [415] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [415-1] exhibit 1 to defendant's motion for leave to file under seal, and is also directed to unseal [415] the motion itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 415 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018, Terminated: 9/13/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018, Terminated: 9/13/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 413 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): Any response by the government to [408] defendant's supplemental memorandum is due by 9/13/2018.(jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). The continuation of the Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 9:30 AM is reset for 9/14/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/11/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). If the government intends to file any response to [408] defendant's supplemental memorandum, it must do so by September 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/11/18. (DMK) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add the defendant's number to the docket entry (jth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 409 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Supplement to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [372] SEALED MOTION filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 408 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Supplement to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [341] MOTION in Limine (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 407 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 406 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Defendant's Objections to the Government's Proposed Jury Instructions by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order,,,,,,,,, (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 405 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 403 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER on trial logistics as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/6/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 402 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER reflecting rulings made on the record at the Pretrial Conference held on this date as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) on the government's motion in limine [341] and motions to supplement [366] [381] [382], and on defendant's motion in limine [343]. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/5/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on September 5, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-77. Date of Issuance: September 5, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 400 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (DMK) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Pretrial Conference as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 9/5/2018. (Written Order to be Issued. Pretrial Conference continued to 9/12/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant not present but Remains Committed; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Jeannie S. Rhee. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Final Set of Objections by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Final Set of Objections)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Voir Dire (Jury Questionnaire) held on 9/4/2018 as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant not present but Remains Committed; Court Reporter: Scott Wallace; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing and Thomas Edward Zehnle; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Jeannie S. Rhee. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): Defendant has already informed the Court of his position on the media coalition's petition, but if he has anything to add in light of the trial in the Eastern District of Virginia or the government's submission [378], he must notify the Court by 9/7/2018. If he wishes, defendant may supplement [386] his opposition to [372] the government's Motion Seeking Authorization to Review Communications, based on materials the defense acknowledged in court it now has, by 9/10/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 398 Filed: 9/2/2018, Entered: 9/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance at Completion of Jury Questionnaires by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Second Submission of Objections to Exhibits by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Second Submission of Objections)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 396 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [393] MOTION to Change Venue (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Objections to Exhibits by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit First Submission of Objections)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. If he wishes, defendant may supplement [386] his opposition to [372] the government's Motion Seeking Authorization to Review Communications, based on materials the defense acknowledged in court it now has, by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/30/2018. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of defendant's notice [390] that pursuant to his waiver of appearance for pretrial proceedings [387], he does not wish to appear on the date that the jury questionnaires are to be completed, the Court advises that it will enter an order waiving his appearance upon receipt of a waiver signed by the defendant expressly waiving his right to appear at that proceeding. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/30/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. For reasons stated more fully on the record at the hearing held on August 28, 2018, the Court entered the following rulings in connection with the government's notice of intent to introduce evidence pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) [327], its motion to supplement its notice [350], defendant's objections [354], and the government's response to defendant's objections [358]. The government's request to introduce evidence concerning procurement law in the Ukraine, including any evidence that alleged payments to Law Firm A were structured to avoid limits imposed by Ukrainian law, has been withdrawn, and therefore the request is DENIED as moot. The request to introduce evidence concerning alleged false statements made to the IRS concerning a New York city apartment is DENIED on the grounds that the evidence has little relevance to the charges in the indictment, it would be collateral to the matters to be tried and confusing to the jury, and the prejudicial impact outweighs any probative value. With respect to evidence related to the designation of transfers between Cypriot accounts as loans, the government clarified that it is not seeking to introduce evidence of the fact that an audit of the accounts was conducted in Cyprus or the results of the audit, so that issue is also moot, and the request is DENIED on that basis. Finally, the Court ruled that the government could introduce -- through a stipulation or redacted exhibits -- evidence showing that the defendant was subject to FARA requirements in the past and that he received specific instructions from the Department of Justice concerning the types of activities that must be disclosed for the limited purpose of establishing his knowledge of the law, but that evidence concerning the results of any inspections, any specific omissions in filings in 1986 and 1987, or the identity of the foreign clients and the nature of the work performed on their behalf is excluded on the grounds that it is irrelevant and unduly prejudicial. Thus the request in the supplemental notice [350] is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. If during the course of the trial, the government is of the view that argument or evidence introduced by the defendant has opened the door to the admissibility of any excluded material, it may raise the matter with the Court again at that time, but the evidence may not be mentioned to the jury until the Court has ruled. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/30/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 394 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [390] Notice (Other) Regarding Appearance on Date that Jury Questionnaires Are Completed (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 393 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 motion to change venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Change Venue by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. On August 10, 2018, the Court entered an order in 18-mc-41, a miscellaneous matter filed by a coalition of media outlets, ordering the Office of Special Counsel and defendant Manafort to inform the Court whether of portions certain search warrant applications could be unsealed in light of proceedings in the Eastern District of Virginia. The order was also docketed in this case at [369]. Defendant has already informed the Court of his position on the media coalition's petition, but if he has anything to add in light of the trial in the Eastern District of Virginia or the government's submission [378], he must notify the Court by September 7, 2018. Further, the government is ORDERED to docket its submission in the miscellaneous case as well. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/29/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue is due by 5:00 PM on 8/29/2018; the Opposition is due by 12:00 PM (noon) on 9/4/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, (1): The government's submission to chambers for in camera review is due by 8/29/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on August 28, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-80. Date of Issuance: August 28, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018.(Dickman, Janice) (Main Document 391 replaced on 10/1/2018) (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 390 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Regarding Appearance on Date that Jury Questionnaires are Completed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joint Pretrial Statement by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Granting [380] Unopposed Motion for Permission to travel in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that the government shall deliver to chambers on August 29, 2018 for in camera review in connection with the Court's consideration of the government's August 15, 2018 motion [372] copies of the transcripts of the hearing before Chief Judge Howell and the witness's grand jury testimony. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. As stated in the hearing held on this date, the schedule of proceedings in this case has been revised. The Court will conduct the pretrial conference over two days, beginning on September 5, 2018 at 9:30 am, at which time, the Court will address motions in limine and any other matters ripe for determination, and continuing on September 12 at 9:30 am, when the Court will rule on objections to exhibits. Jury selection will commence on September 17, and opening statements and the presentation of evidence will begin on September 24. It is ORDERED that the defense must docket any objections to the government's proposed exhibits (and the basis for those objections) on a rolling basis, with the first set of objections to be submitted on August 30, a second set on August 31, and the remainder by 5:00 pm on September 4. The defense shall annotate the government's exhibit list to state its objections. A separate column will need to be added to state the basis for the objections. For each round of objections, the defense shall list further objections in the same columns so that all the objections will appear in its final September 4 filing. Defendant's motion for change of venue is due by 5:00 pm on August 29, and the opposition is due by 12:00 noon on September 4. The government must produce Jencks material to the defense by September 4, and the defendant must identify any expert witnesses it intends to call and provide a written summary of the experts' testimony by September 4. Defendant's objections to the proposed jury instructions are due by September 6. Further, the defense shall respond to the government's draft stipulations by September 6, and any stipulations must be supplied to the Court by September 11. The government shall provide the defense with the final version of its summary exhibits by 10:00 am on September 11. Each party may file a sealed list of those jurors (identified by number) it maintains should be struck for cause based on the written jury questionnaire by 10:00 am on September 11. Finally, for the reasons stated on the record at today's hearing, the courtroom will be closed to the public when the potential jurors are completing the jury questionnaire and for the limited period of time on September 17 and any successive days when the jurors will be responding to follow up questions on an individual basis. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Defendant's Appearance was waived. Status Conference/Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 8/28/2018 re: [327] Government's Notice of Intent to Introduce Other Acts Evidence that is Intrinsic to Charged Crimes or Admissible Under Federal Rule of Evidence 404(b). A further scheduling Order will be issued. The Pretrial Conference remains set for 9/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, and will continue on 9/12/2018 at 9:30 AM. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant's appearance was waived, but he remains committed; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Jeannie S. Rhee. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 387 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Supplement to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [385] MOTION for Order that Defendant Not be Transported and Waiver of Appearance with Signed Waiver Attached (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT (Reply in Support of USA Motion Seeking Authorization to Review Communications Between Paul J. Manafort and a Witness) filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) re [372] SEALED MOTION Seeking Authorization to Review Communications filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(zvt) Modified and unsealed by the court on 8/29/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [385] Motion for Order as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). In light of defendant's motion for an order not to be transported [385] and his signed waiver of his right to appear at all pretrial proceedings [387], it is ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/27/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of defendant's Notice of Waiver of Appearance and Motion for Order that He Not be Transported, the Court advises that it will grant the motion upon receipt of a waiver signed by the defendant. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/27/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 385 Filed: 8/26/2018, Entered: 8/26/2018, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order that Defendant Not be Transported and Waiver of Appearance by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED OPPOSITION regarding THE UNITED STATES MOTION SEEKING AUTHORIZATION TO REVIEW COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. AND A WITNESS by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Downing, Kevin) Modified and unsealed by the court on 8/29/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence the Defendant Failed to Report Foreign Bank Accounts For His Businesses by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Leave to Supplement Its Pending Motion to Exclude Evidence or Argument [341] by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018, Terminated: 8/28/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Permission to Travel (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Green, Thomas) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct Docket Text (zjth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 379 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018, Terminated: 8/23/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [379] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [380-2] exhibit 1 to defendant's motion for permission to travel, and to unseal this motion for leave to file under seal [379]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [369] Order, (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Affidavit, # (5) Affidavit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 377 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jeannie Sclafani Rhee appearing for USA. (Rhee, Jeannie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 14, 2018 - further unsealed per 8-10-18 order; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: August 21, 2018. Court Reporter Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 7, 2018 - further unsealing per 8-10-18 order; Page Numbers: 1-45. Date of Issuance: August 21, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 22, 2018 - further unsealing per 8-10-18 order; Page Numbers: 1-37. Date of Issuance:August 21, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 8/16/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [373] Motion for Extension of Time as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The parties' Joint Pretrial Statement must be submitted by August 24, 2018. The government is encouraged to review the exhibit list closely with an eye towards streamlining the presentation of its case, and it must inform the defendant of any exhibits it intends to withdraw or utilize solely for impeachment purposes by August 21, 2018. The parties should also be prepared to discuss questions related to the jury questionnaire at the hearing scheduled for August 28, 2018 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/16/2018. (lcabj3)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 372 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Seeking Authorization to Review Communications filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zad) Modified and unsealed by the court on 8/29/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 425 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED DOCUMENT (EXHIBIT 1) as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). This is a redacted version of previously filed Dkt. #167, redacting the names and addresses of non-parties pursuant to the Court's Order issued 8/10/2018 at Dkt. #369. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 369 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Court dockets this order filed in case number 18-mc-0041, In the Matter of the Application of the Associated Press; Cable News Network, Inc.; The New York Times Co.; Politico LLC; and WP Co., LLC, d/b/a/ The Washington Post for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records, to facilitate the further unsealing of transcripts and filings on the docket in this case consistent with the order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 368 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas) Modified to remove co-defendants on 8/13/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's Order of July 18, 2018 (Doc. 355) by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 366 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Pending Motion to Exclude Evidence or Argument [341] by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by RICHARD W. GATES, III re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): Defendant's response to the Court's 7/5/2018 Minute Order issued in Application of the Associated Press, et al. for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records, 1:18-mc-00041-ABJ, is due by 8/6/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. It is ORDERED that defendant's response to the Court's July 5, 2018 Minute Order issued in Application of the Associated Press, et al. for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records, 1:18-mc-00041-ABJ, is due August 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 364 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [362] MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Pretrial Statement (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1): Joint Pretrial Statement due by 8/20/2018. (tg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [362] Motion for Extension of Time as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Court in the Eastern District of Virginia has continued the trial date for short periods twice, and now the two trials are scheduled much closer together. So the Court will grant an extension to give the parties additional time, but only to a date that will enable the Court to maintain the current trial and pretrial conference schedule; the Court would be opposed to extending those dates. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties' joint pretrial statement is due August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/31/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 363 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [343] MOTION in Limine (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 362 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Pretrial Statement by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 361 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [341] MOTION in Limine (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 360 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [343] MOTION in Limine (Corrected) (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [343] MOTION in Limine (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The motions hearing on [327] the government's notice of intent to introduce Rule 404(b) evidence and [353] the proposed jury questionnaire is set for 8/28/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The government's submission of the proposed exhibits to chambers for in camera review is due by 7/24/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that the motions hearing on [327] the government's notice of intent to introduce Rule 404(b) evidence and [353] the proposed jury questionnaire is set for August 28, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that the motions hearing currently set for July 24, 2018 at 9:30 AM is vacated and will be reset at a later date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that to assist the Court in ruling on defendant's objections to the proposed Rule 404(b) evidence identified in [350] the government's supplemental notice -- i.e., the FARA inspection reports, the letter to counsel, and any other documents covered by the supplement -- the government is ordered to deliver a copy of the proposed exhibits to chambers for in camera review by July 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 358 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [354] Reply to document (Government's Response to Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Objections to the Government's Notice of Intent to Introduce Other Acts Evidence (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 357 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE in Response to the Court's Minute Order of July 18, 2018 by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [350] Motion for Leave to File as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Pending before the Court is [350] the government's motion for leave to supplement [327] its notice of intent to introduce other acts evidence under Fed R. Evid. 404(b). In his response to the notice[354], defendant addressed the admissibility of the evidence described in the notice, and he also set forth his grounds for opposing the evidence described in the proposed supplement. Therefore, [350] the motion for leave to supplement is GRANTED, and the government's notice of its intention to introduce 404(b) evidence will be deemed to include the evidence identified in both the notice and the supplement. The Court emphasizes that this ruling does not constitute a ruling on the admissibility of that evidence; it simply grants the request to supplement the original notice. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Upon consideration of the [357] Government's Notice in Response to the Court's Minute Order of July 18, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that Deputy Clerk shall provide to Defendant PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) a copy of the [356] sealed, unredacted version of the Memorandum Opinion and Order issued on July 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 355 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, it is ORDERED that defendant's [264] motion to suppress the evidence obtained from the search of his Alexandria residence is hereby DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government must return to defendant any paper documents or electronic devices that it has determined are irrelevant to the case by August 17, 2018, and that the parties shall confer and file a status report by that date stating whether there are any electronic devices in the government's possession - as opposed to imaged copies of those devices - that remain in dispute. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). The government is to inform the Court by Friday, July 20, 2018, whether, given the number and nature of the limited redactions, there is any reason why the defendant should not receive the sealed, unredacted version of the Memorandum Opinion and Order issued this date. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The Government's Reply to [354] Defendant's Objections to its Notice of Intent to Introduce Rule 404(b) Evidence is due by 7/20/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that the government's reply to [354] defendant's objections to its notice of intent to introduce Rule 404(b) evidence is due by July 20, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will have a hearing on the issue on July 24, 2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3. The parties are advised that the Court may also ask questions about the proposed jury questionnaire at this hearing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/16/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 354 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [327] Notice (Other) of Intent to Use Other Acts Evidence (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Submission of Joint Proposed Jury Questionnaire by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 350 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 7/19/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION re [327] Notice (Other) for Leave to Supplement Its Notice of Proposed Prior-Act Evidence by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [346] Amended Motion to Modify the Court's Previous Order Granting him Permission to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/11/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [347] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [347-1] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [347] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/11/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 347 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2018 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Modify the Court's Previous Order Granting Him Permission to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION To Obtain Documents by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's July 5, 2018 Minute Order by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [344] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). It is ORDERED that defendant's response to the Court's July 5, 2018 Minute Order issued in Application of the Associated Press, et al. for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records, 1:18-mc-00041-ABJ, as amended by the Minute Order issued on this date in the instant case, is due no later than five days after he has received the documents from the Clerk of Court and the court reporter. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. The motion [345] of RICHARD W. GATES III (2) to obtain documents is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide to counsel for defendant Gates a copy of sealed document [167]. Further, the court reporter is directed to provide counsel for defendant Gates (A) a copy of the sealed transcript from the hearing on February 7, 2018 [231] and (B) a copy of sealed transcript from the hearing on February 14, 2018 [280], which was further unsealed at [294], with the exception of sealed portions of the transcript that reflect the sealed portion of the hearing concerning defendant Manafort's bond and to which defendant Gates was not a party. Finally, the Court hereby vacates the portion of its July 5, 2018 Minute Order issued in Application of the Associated Press, Cable News, Newtork, Inc., New York Times Co., Politico LLC, and WP Co., LLC for Access to Certain Sealed Court Records v. United States, 1:18-mc-00041-ABJ, which ordered defendant to inform the Court of his position on unsealing the transcript of the hearing held on January 22, 2018 [251]. Accordingly, defendant's motion to obtain an unsealed copy of [251] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 343 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 342 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Submission Pursuant to the Courts July 5, 2018 Minute Order by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order,, (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 341 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 9/5/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Submission Pursuant to the Courts July 5, 2018 Minute Order by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order,, (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The parties shall confer and by Monday, July 9, 2018, either file the same version of the warrant and application on the docket of this case or notify the Court of any reasons to why a publicly available version should not be part of the record in this case.(jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. Given that a less redacted version of the search warrant and application for the warrant to search defendant's Alexandria residence has been made available on the docket in the Eastern District of Virginia, see USA v. The Premises Located Alexandria, Virginia 22314, 17-sw-0449-TCB-1 [Dkt. ## 13,14], the parties shall confer and by Monday, July 9, 2018, either file the same version of the warrant and application on the docket of this case or notify the Court of any reasons to why a publicly available version should not be part of the record in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/5/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): Defendant MANAFORT (1) must file any opposition to the government's [327] Notice of Intent to Introduce Other Acts Evidence by 7/13/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. As the Court indicated when it established the schedule for pre-trial proceedings in this case, it intends to rule on the admissibility of Rule 404(b) evidence in advance of trial. Indeed, a hearing has already been set for this purpose. This ensures that both parties will be on notice of what the allegations will be before they address the jury. The Court set a date for when objections would be due, the defendant did not request additional time to respond, and the response he filed -- merely reserving the right to object at a later date -- does not comply with the scheduling order. In the event there was some confusion about how the Court intended to proceed, it will grant the defendant additional time, but the defendant must file any opposition to the government's notice [327] by July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/2/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 339 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [327] Notice (Other) of Intent to Introduce Other Acts Evidence (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [330] Unopposed Motion for Permission to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/28/2018. (jth) Modified on 6/28/2018 to reflect granted in part and denied in part (jth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [331] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [331-1] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [331] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/28/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notice as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2), KONSTANTIN KILIMNIK (3). "Leave to file denied, third party cannot file pleadings in a criminal matter or add his own charges" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 6/27/2018. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/27/2018. (zvt) (Main Document 352 replaced on 7/12/2018) (zvt). Modified to add missing pages on 7/12/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [335] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 335 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [328] Order. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5552865. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR 18-3037 for [335] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 334 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by RICHARD W. GATES, III re Order, of June 21, 2018 (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 333 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. denying defendant's motion to dismiss Count Two and to strike the forfeiture allegation [237]. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 332 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR denying [257] defendant's motion to suppress the evidence obtained from the search of the storage unit. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018, Terminated: 6/28/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018, Terminated: 6/28/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. It is ORDERED that defendant advise the Court by June 22, 2018 of the government's position on the additional request set forth in Exhibit 1 [331-1]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In connection with the detention order issued by this Court on June 15, 2018 remanding the defendant to the custody of the Attorney General under 18 U.S.C. section 3148, the Court hereby directs that: 1) the defendant shall be confined in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal; 2) the defendant be afforded reasonable opportunity for private consultation with counsel; and 3) on order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the government, the person in charge of the corrections facility in which the defendant is confined deliver defendant to a United States marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. See 18 USC section 3142(i).Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on June 15, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-53. Date of Issuance: June 15, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 328 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DETENTION ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 327 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Intent To Introduce Other Acts Evidence That Is Intrinsic To Charged Crimes Or Admissible Under Federal Rule Of Evidence 404(b) by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2018: Arraignment as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) as to Counts: 1sss, 2sss, 3sss, 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, 7sss; Plea of Not Guilty Entered as to Counts: 1sss, 2sss, 3sss, 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, 7sss. Motion Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 6/15/2018 re: [292] Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release, and the Government's [315] Motion to Revoke or Revise Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Current Order of Pretrial Release. For the Reasons stated on the Record in open Court, Defendant's [292] Motion is DENIED as MOOT and the Government's [315] Motion is GRANTED. The Defendant shall be detained pending trial as of today. A written order shall be issued by the Court. Oral Motion to Stay pending Appeal was Heard and Denied. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Scott A.C. Meisler; Pretrial Officer: Takeysha Robinson;(jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 326 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE in Response to the Court's Order of June 12, 2018 by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [321] Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response Under Seal by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Pending before the Court is the government's ex parte sealed Motion to Unseal Partially Certain Pleadings [Dkt. #317], which seeks to partially unseal its May 25, 2018 motion [Dkt. #308] for leave to file a supplemental response to defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s motion for reconsideration of his conditions of release. Upon review of the motion, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file on the public docket the government's May 25, 2018 motion [Dkt. #308] and the redacted versions of the exhibits to that motion [Dkt. #317-2 through 317-6]. The Clerk of Court is further directed to unseal government's June 6, 2018 ex parte motion [Dkt. #317] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/12/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [324] MOTION for Leave to File was entered in error by the Clerk's Office and said pleading was refiled. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [315] MOTION to Revoke or Revise Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Current Order of Pretrial Release (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 321 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 order on motion for bill of particularsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot [255] Motion for Bill of Particulars as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) for the reasons stated in the order. It is ORDERED that the government must inform the defense by Friday, June 15, 2018 of the identity of any individuals or entities alleged to be the "others, including former senior foreign politicians" whom Manafort "caused and aided and abetted" to act as foreign agents without registering, and it must file a notice on the docket informing the Court that it has done so. See Order for details.SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/12/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1). Arraignment on the [318] Superseding Indictment as to Defendant PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) is set for 6/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/11/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 319 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [315] MOTION to Revoke or Revise Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Current Order of Pretrial Release (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 318 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1) count(s) 1sss, 2sss, 3sss, 4sss, 5sss, 6sss, 7sss, KONSTANTIN KILIMNIK (3) count(s) 6, 7. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 317 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Unseal Partially Certain Proceedings (Ex Parte) filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B (Redacted), # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D (Redacted)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR: Defendant's response to the government's motion to revoke or revise his current order of pretrial release [315] is due by 6/8/2018. Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/15/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (tg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that defendant's response to the government's motion to revoke or revise his current order of pretrial release [315] is due by Friday, June 8, 2018. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion at 10:00 AM Friday, June 15, 2018 in Courtroom 3. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the agent who signed the declaration in support of the motion [315-2] and any other witnesses the parties wish to call must be present and available testify at the hearing if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/5/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 315 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018, Terminated: 6/15/2018 motion to revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Revoke or Revise Defendant Paul J. Manafort, Jr.'s Current Order of Pretrial Release by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K, # (14) Exhibit L, # (15) Exhibit M, # (16) Exhibit N)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1): The government may file a supplemental response to [291] defendant's renewed motion for reconsideration of conditions of release by 6/4/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. It is ORDERED that the government may file a supplemental response to [291] defendant's renewed motion for reconsideration of conditions of release by June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/31/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 312 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [242] Motion to Compel as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/29/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 310 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR Regarding Special Counsel's Proposal Concerning Pledging Properties (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 309 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR to Court's Minute Order of May 18, 2018 (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION for leave to file a supplemental response to defendants motion for reconsideration of conditions of release within ten days and for leave to file documents under seal (EX PARTE) filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D)(Weissmann, Andrew) Modified to only unseal the motion pursuant to order filed 6/13/2018 on 6/13/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 307 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss One of Two Multiplicitous Counts [236] without prejudice to its being renewed after trial. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/25/18. (DMK) Modified on 5/25/2018 (jth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on May 23, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-102. Date of Issuance: May 24, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motion Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 5/23/2018 re: [242] Motion to Compel Production of Unredacted Affidavits; [255] Motion for Bill of Particulars; [257] Motion to Suppress (Storage Unit); [264] Motion to Suppress (Residence). The Motions [242] [255] [257] [264] were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains in the High Intensity Supervision Program (HISP); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas E. Zehnle and Richard W. Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Andres and Scott Meisler. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of the government's response [304] to defendant's renewed motion to modify his conditions of release, the government is ORDERED to conduct any interviews it deems necessary with property owners agreeing to post bond and file by May 25, 2018 a supplement to its response informing the Court whether it has any objections to the posting of the Washington property. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall file by May 25, 2018 its reply to the government's proposal concerning the pledging of both the New York and Washington properties. Finally, the Court notes that it is inclined to continue the monitoring it put in place prior to the arraignment established in the Eastern District of Virginia; however, it is ORDERED that the Pretrial Services Agency for the District of Columbia must confer with the Pretrial Services Agency for the Eastern District of Virginia and inform the Court by May 25, 2018 of the agencies' joint or individual positions on whether the defendant may be monitored with one device, and if so, which one. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/18/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadline as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): The Government's in camera submission is due by 10:00 a.m. Monday, May 21, 2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of the parties' briefs on defendant's motion to compel production of unredacted affidavits [242], the government is ORDERED to produce the four affidavits that remain in dispute to chambers for in camera review by 10:00 a.m. Monday, May 21, 2018. The government should identify the material it seeks to keep redacted by highlighting or bracketing the redacted portions on the copies provided to the Court. In light of the parties' briefs on defendant's motions to suppress, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the agent who signed the affidavit in support of the search warrant for the storage unit [257-1] must be present and available to testify, if necessary, at the hearing scheduled for May 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/18/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 304 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [291] SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [296] unopposed motion for permission to travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/17/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR denying Motion to Dismiss Superseding Indictment [235], amended to reflect correction in Order [300]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/16/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 300 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR correcting clerical error to revise the phrase "Code of Federal Register" on page 26 of the Memorandum Opinion and Order [298] to: "Code of Federal Regulations." A corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order will be docketed on this date. All other aspects of the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on May 15, 2018 remain unchanged. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/16/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [297] unopposed Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [297-1] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [297] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/16/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 299 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott A.C. Meisler appearing for USA. (Meisler, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 298 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR denying Motion to Dismiss Superseding Indictment [235]. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/15/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 297 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018, Terminated: 5/16/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018, Terminated: 5/17/2018 Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Permit Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 295 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that Defendant Paul J. Manafort's [293] Motion to Temporarily Modify Conditions of Release to Attend his Grandson's Baptism and related family reception on May 19, 2018 from 9:00 a.m. to 5:00 p.m. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/14/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 4/23/2018; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance:2/22/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice E. Dickman, Telephone number (202) 354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2018.(hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [291] sealed motion for leave to file documents under seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [291-2] Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release and [291-3] through [291-5] Exhibits A through C to the Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of Court is further directed to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [291] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 291 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018, Terminated: 5/10/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C)(Zehnle, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadline as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. In light of the Joint Status Report [290], it is ORDERED that the government and RICHARD W. GATES, III shall file another joint status report by August 12, 2018 stating whether the matter should be scheduled for sentencing or whether a deadline should be set for filing another joint status report. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by USA as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 289 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [264] MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Residence (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 288 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [255] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 287 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [257] MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Storage Unit (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [285] Government's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [285-3] the government's memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion to suppress evidence obtained from his residence and [285-4] the attached exhibit. The Clerk of Court is further directed to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [285] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/24/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018, Terminated: 4/24/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service, # (3) Exhibit Memorandum in Opposition, # (4) Affidavit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 284 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [264] MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Residence [Redacted] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [257] MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Storage Unit (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weissmann, Andrew) Modified event title on 4/24/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 282 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [255] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on April 19, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-108. Date of Issuance: April 23, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 14, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: April 18, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 16, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-43. Date of Issuance: April 18, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to dismiss case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motions Hearing as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) held on 4/19/2018 re: Defendant's [235] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment, [236] MOTION to Dismiss Count 4 or 5, [237] MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Superseding Indictment and to Strike the Forfeiture Allegation. The Motions [235] [236] [237] were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains in the High Intensity Supervision Program (HISP); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Kevin M. Downing, Thomas Edward Zehnle and Richard William Westling; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres, Michael Richard Dreeben, Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar and Adam C. Jed. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR and RICHARD W. GATES, III: Defendant's propose redactions in a sealed filing to the Court due by 4/23/2017. (tb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 277 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam C. Jed appearing for USA. (Jed, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 276 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar appearing for USA. (Prelogar, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [222] Government's Motion to Unseal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1), RICHARD W. GATES III (2). In light of [262] [275] defendant Paul Manafort's responses to the government's motion and that fact that defendant Richard Gates submitted no response to the motion, it is ORDERED that the transcripts of sidebar discussions that occurred during the status hearings held on January 16, 2018 and February 14, 2018, including the transcript of an ex parte discussion between the Court and the government on February 14, 2018, shall be unsealed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the transcript of the portion of the February 14, 2018 hearing concerning defendant Manfort's motion to modify his bail conditions shall be unsealed, subject to redaction of defendant's private personal or financial information not already in the public record; and that the defendant shall propose such redactions in a sealed filing to the Court by April 23, 2018. Defendant's sealed filing shall include only the pages from the transcript addressing his bail conditions, underlining the specific text defendant proposes to have remain under seal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/17/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE REGARDING PORTION OF SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF FEBRUARY 14, 2018 HEARING by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re Order,, (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [267] unopposed motion to travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/13/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [242] MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Affidavits (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III re [235] MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of [262] defendant's response to the government's motion to unseal transcripts and the government's reply [263], it is ORDERED that the government provide defendant by April 16, 2018 with the sealed portion of the February 14, 2018 transcript from pages 11 though 14. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall notify the Court by April 17, 2018 whether he has any objections to unsealing that portion of the transcript. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [268] unopposed Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [268-1] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [268] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 270 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [236] MOTION to Dismiss Count (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 269 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [237] MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Superseding Indictment MOTION to Strike the Forfeiture Allegation (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 268 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018, Terminated: 4/12/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018, Terminated: 4/12/2018 Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Permit Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. In light of the government's opposition [253] to defendant's motion to compel [242], defendant is ORDERED to advise in his reply brief whether he agrees that the motion is moot with respect to the three affidavits that the government has provided to defendant in their entirety, and whether defendant has objections to the redactions in the revised versions of the other four affidavits the government has provided. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [265] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [265-1] and exhibit 2 [265-2] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [265] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/10/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 265 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/10/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Residence by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 263 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [222] MOTION to Unseal Transcripts (Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 262 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [222] MOTION to Unseal Transcripts (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 260 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (redacted) as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. Upon consideration of defendant's [230] Renewed Motion for Reconsideration of his Conditions of Release, the [238] Government's Opposition, and the materials previously submitted to the Court on this issue, the motion is hereby DENIED without prejudice. (SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [196] Motion to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [258] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [258-1], exhibit 2 [258-2], and exhibit 3 [258-3] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [258] itself. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [256] Motion for Extension of Time as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that defendant's motion to suppress the fruits of the search of his residence is due by April 9, 2018. The Court notes that the scheduling order [217] in this case provides that any motion to extend a filing date must be filed at least two business days before the date to be extended. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 257 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 6/21/2018 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Search of Storage Unit by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Suppress by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 255 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018, Terminated: 6/12/2018 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Bill of Particulars by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Richard Dreeben appearing for USA. (Dreeben, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [242] MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Affidavits (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. Given that the deadline for defendants' notices of any objections they may have to the government's motion to unseal certain transcripts [222] has passed, if defendants do not file notice by April 9, 2018, the Court will rule on the motion without input from defendants. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/5/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 250 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [237] MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Superseding Indictment MOTION to Strike the Forfeiture Allegation (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 249 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [236] MOTION to Dismiss Count (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 4/4/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [235] MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin) Modified on 4/9/2018 (zjth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [248] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that defendant's reply in support of his motion to dismiss [235] is due by 5:00 p.m. on April 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/4/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LEAVE TO FILE DENIED-Addendum One to Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. "Leave to File Denied" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 4/3/2018. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/3/2018. (hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [245] Government's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The government seeks to file one of the exhibits to its Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment under seal, and the Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [245] the government's motion and the attached material. The Court notes, though, that the government has already filed a public, redacted version of this exhibit to its response at docket entry [244]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/3/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [239] Defendant's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 [239-1] and exhibit 2 [239-2] to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [239] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/3/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 244 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [235] MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition submitted by David Andrew Christenson as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED" and Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/29/2018. (zvt) Modified on 4/4/2018 to reflect that the document was submitted by David Andrew Christenson. (jth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Affidavits by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that any reply by defendant Paul J. Manafort Jr. to his [235] Motion to Dismiss is due by 4/9/2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any replies by defendant Paul J. Manafort Jr. to his [236] [237] Motions to Dismiss are due by 4/11/2018. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/25/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying [241] Motion motion to intervene as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1), RICHARD W. GATES III (2). It is ORDERED that the motion to intervene is DENIED because the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure do not provide for intervention in a criminal case. It is FURTHER ORDERED that no further submissions from movant David Christenson will be docketed in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/23/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 241 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EMEGENCY MOTION to Intervene Filed on Behalf of All Americans by David Andrew Christenson as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on March 22, 2018. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [240] Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to motions of PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that the government's response to defendant's motion [235] is due by April 2, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the government's responses to defendant's motions [236] [237] are due by April 4, 2018. Given the schedule for trial and other pretrial proceedings, the Court will not grant any further extensions of the briefing schedule for defendant's motions to dismiss, nor will it extend the date of the hearing for these motions.. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/22/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018, Terminated: 3/22/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's motions to dismiss by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [232] the government's motion for leave to file document under seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [232-1] the government's response to Manafort's renewed motion for reconsideration of conditions of release and [232-2] exhibit A to the response. The Clerk of Court is further directed to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [232] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/15/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018, Terminated: 6/22/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Superseding Indictment, MOTION to Strike the Forfeiture Allegation by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 236 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018, Terminated: 5/25/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Count by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [214] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/14/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard William Westling appearing for PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Westling, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018, Terminated: 3/15/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [229] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibits 1 through 10, [229-1] through [229-10], to defendant's motion, and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [229] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/13/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [228] Unopposed Motion to Obtain Sealed Transcripts as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Court reporter may provide defendant Manafort with a copy of the transcripts from the hearings of January 16, 2018 and February 14, 2018, with the exception of any sealed portions of the transcripts that reflect the sealed portion of the hearings related to defendant Gates, to which Manafort was not a party. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/12/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [227] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). It is ORDERED that defendant shall file notice of any objections to the government's motion to unseal certain transcripts [222] no later than five days after defendant has received the transcripts. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/12/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1): Any defense Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3)(A) or (B) must be filed by 3/14/2018, the opposition is due by 3/28/2018, the Reply is due by 4/4/2018, A Hearing on the Motion will be held on 4/19/2018 at 9:30 AM; Other pre-trial motions, including any motion for a bill of particulars under FRCP 7(f), motions to suppress statements or evidence under FRCP 12(b)(3)(C), and motions to sever charges under FRCP 12(b)(3)(D) and 14 must be filed by 4/6/2018, oppositions are due by 4/23/2018, replies are due by 5/4/2018, A Hearing on the motions will be held on 5/23/2018 at 9:30 AM; The Government's Notice of its intention to introduce evidence under Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) must be filed by 6/15/2018, the opposition is due by 6/29/2018, any reply is due by 7/9/2018, A hearing on the motion, if necessary, will be held on 7/24/2018 at 9:30 AM; Motions in Limine on behalf of either party must be filed by 7/9/2018, oppositions are due by 7/23/2018, replies are due by 7/30/2018; On 7/16/2018, the parties must jointly file a list of proposed questions to be included in the written jury questionnaire that indicates: i.) the questions on which the parties agree, and ii.) the questions on which the parties disagree, with specific objections noted below each disputed question and supporting legal authority (if any). The Joint Pretrial Statement is due by 8/1/2018. Exhibit List due in chambers by 8/1/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 9:30 AM; Trial will commence on 9/17/2018 at 9:30 AM. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 3/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION To Obtain Sealed Transcript by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 3/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Enlargement of Timeto Object re [222] MOTION to Unseal Transcripts by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR., before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, held on 02/28/2018. Page Numbers: 1-14. Date of Issuance: 03/08/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara A. Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2018.(Wick, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [225] Unopposed Motion to Obtain Sealed Transcripts as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Court reporter may provide defendant Gates with a copy of the transcripts from the hearings of January 16, 2018 and February 14, 2018, with the exception of sealed portions of the transcripts that reflect the sealed portion of the hearings related to defendant Manafort, to which Gates was not a party. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/8/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [224] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). It is ORDERED that defendant shall file notice of any objections to the governments motion to unseal certain transcripts [222] no later than five days after it has received the transcripts. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/8/19. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018, Terminated: 3/8/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Obtain Transcripts by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018, Terminated: 3/8/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Objections by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on February 23, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance: February 24, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendants PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): Defendants shall file notice by 3/9/2018 of any objections to the government's motion to unseal certain transcripts. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR and RICHARD W. GATES, III. Defendants shall file notice by March 9, 2018 of any objections to the government's motion to unseal certain transcripts [222]. The Court notes that the motion does not appear to seek the unsealing of portions of transcripts related to defendant Gates's communications with his counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/5/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018, Terminated: 4/17/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Transcripts by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 219 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 218 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Modify the Court's Previous Order Granting Permission to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 217 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR setting schedule for pretrial motions and other pretrial submissions. A single Joint Pretrial Statement shall be filed by August 1, 2018. The pretrial conference will be held on September 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3. Trial will commence on September 17, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3. See Scheduling Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Upon consideration of defendant's [218] motion to amend, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [219] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 to defendant's motion [219-1], and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [219] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [155] the government's motion to modify the schedule for Rule 404(b) notice and briefing in light of the scheduling order [217] entered on this date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice defendant Gates's sealed motion [216] to modify the Court's 2/27/18 order concerning defendant's travel. The Court has no objection to the proposed revision of the defendant's schedule, and it recognizes that the defendant has legitimate concerns about publicly revealing his family's whereabouts, but this motion and all future similar motions must be filed in accordance with the procedures that have been in place in this case for some time. Since Pretrial Services in the Eastern District of Virginia has requested that the Court's orders detail the specifics of any permissible travel, the Court will not grant a motion to travel subject to the submission of an itinerary at a later date. Any future motions to travel should be comprised of: 1) a motion to travel filed on the public docket, which need not divulge specific locations or travel information, and 2) a sealed motion for leave to file under seal an exhibit to the public motion that sets forth defendant's itinerary in detail, including the dates of any requested travel, the means of travel, and where defendant will be staying. Further questions concerning the docketing of pleadings in this case should be directed to the Deputy Clerk and not to chambers. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [215] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal exhibit 1 to defendant's motion [215-1], and to unseal the motion for leave to file under seal [215] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/1/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 215 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018, Terminated: 3/14/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Arraignment and Status Conference as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1) held on 2/28/2018. Plea of Not Guilty entered by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1) as to Counts 1ss 2ss 3ss 4ss 5ss. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2018 at 9:30 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 9:30 AM. Unless otherwise noted all proceedings will be held in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Pretrial Motions and Hearing dates will be set in a forthcoming Order. Defendant's Conditions of Release are modified to indicate that defendant now only needs drug tested randomly. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains in the High Intensity Supervison Program (HISP); Court Reporter: Sara Wick; Defense Attorney: Kevin M. Downing; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Kyle Renee Freeny; Pretrial Officer: Andre Sidbury. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [210] unopposed motion to travel as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Upon consideration of defendant Gates's unopposed motion to travel, it is ORDERED that the motion [210] is GRANTED in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/27/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting granting [211] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal Exhibit 1 [211-1] to defendant's motion. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/27/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 210 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR., (1): An Arraignment and Status Conference are scheduled for Wednesday, February 28, 2018, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER PAUL J. MANAFORT JR., (1). Upon consideration of Defendant Manafort's [207] Motion to Travel, it is ORDERED that the [[207] Motion is GRANTED in accordance with the itinerary and instructions in the sealed Order. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/25/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/24/2018, Entered: 2/24/2018, Terminated: 2/25/2018 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION To Modify Conditions of Release for February 26 - 27, 2018 by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin) Modified to correct pleading title on 2/28/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 206 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Statement of Offense
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF OFFENSE by USA as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 205 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 plea agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). Approved by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/23/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/23/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 202 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 200 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [199] Sealed Motion to Unseal Superseding Indictment: It is Further Ordered that a redacted copy of this Superseding Indictment shall be placed on the public docket. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons) as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/23/2018. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018, Terminated: 2/23/2018 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Unseal Superseding Indictment filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Superseding Indictment)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 197 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018, Terminated: 2/23/2018 ~~SEALED MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion for Permission to Travel as to RICHARD W. GATES, III(2). "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on February 23, 2018. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Travel by RICHARD W. GATES, III(2). "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on February 23, 2018. (Attachment: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 195 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) count(s) 1s, 2s. (zvt) (Main Document 195 replaced to add signature on 2/23/2018) (zvt). Modified to correct filed date on 2/23/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Arraignment and Plea Agreement Hearing as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2) as to Counts 1s,2s held on 2/23/2018. Plea of Guilty Entered as to Counts 1s,2s. DEFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE of Presentence Investigation Report. Status Report from the parties due by 5/14/2018. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond (PR); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorney: Thomas C. Green; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann, Greg Donald Andres and Kyle Renee Freeny. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [197] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal Exhibit 1 [197-1] to defendant's motion. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [197] motion for leave to file document under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/23/18. (DMK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by RICHARD W. GATES, III re [161] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shanlon Wu, Walter Mack & Annemarie McAvoy. (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2): An Arraignment and Plea Agreement Hearing are scheduled for 2/23/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 192 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas C. Green appearing for RICHARD W. GATES, III (Green, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR as to [185] SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by USA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 190 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Entry of Appearance of New Counsel on behalf of defendant RICHARD W. GATES III (2), and of his submission that he does not oppose the [161] Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, it is hereby ORDERED that the [161] Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel is Granted. The appearances of Shanlon Wu, Walter Mack and Annemarie McAvoy are terminated in this case. It is further ORDERED that the Sealed Hearing in this matter presently scheduled for Friday, February 23, 2018, at 10:30 AM is vacated. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/22/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). It is ORDERED that the SEALED HEARING on the [161] Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record presently scheduled for Friday, February 23, 2018, at 10:00 AM is rescheduled for 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). It is ORDERED by the Court that a SEALED HEARING on the [161] Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is scheduled for Friday, February 23, 2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Permission to Obtain Sealed Portions of February 14, 2018, Transcript by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [185] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the government's [185-1] response to defendant Manafort's second supplemental filing to his motion for reconsideration of conditions of release. The government must file a redacted version of its [185-1] response to defendant's second supplemental memorandum on the public docket, but financial information and addresses may remain under seal. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [185] motion for leave to file document under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REDACTED DOCUMENT Redacted Version of Second Supplemental Memorandum to Motion for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 185 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018, Terminated: 2/21/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [187] Motion to Obtain Transcript. The Court reporter may provide the government with a copy of the transcript from the hearing on February 14, 2018, with the exception of sealed portions of the transcript that reflect the sealed portion of the hearing related to the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by defendant Gates's counsel, to which the government was not a party. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 201 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [179] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal defendant Manafort's [179-1] second supplemental filing to his motion for reconsideration of conditions of release, as well as the attachments to that filing. Defendant Manafort must file a redacted version of his [179-1] second supplemental memorandum on the public docket, but financial information and addresses may remain under seal. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [179] motion for leave to file document under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/19/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR as to [175] SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by USA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 182 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REDACTED DOCUMENT Redacted Version of Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/19/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Supplement, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 178 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      POSITION on the Pending Motion to Withdraw by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (tl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). The Current Briefing and Hearing schedules that were established at the Status Conference held on 1/16/2018, and in the Minute Order issued on 1/17/2018 are suspended pending further Order of the Court. The government's [155] Motion to Modify the Court's Schedule for Rule 404(b) Notice and Briefing remains under advisement. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) held on 2/14/2018. Defendant Manafort (1) is directed to file a redacted version of his [174] Supplemental Filing to his Motion for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release by Friday, 2/16/2018. Defendant Manafort's (1) Sealed Motion [153] for Reconsideration of Conditions of Release remains under advisement. Defendant Manafort (1) must supplement the Motion. The [161] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Gates (2) remains under advisement. Defendant Gates is to advise the Court of his position on the Motion by 5:00 PM on Wednesday, 2/21/2018. Bond Status of Defendants: Defendant Manafort (1) Remains in the High Intensity Supervision Program (HISP); Defendant Gates (2) Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond (PR); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: 1) Kevin Downing and Thomas Edward Zehnle; 2) Shanlon Wu and Walter Mack; US Attorneys: Greg Donald Andres, Andrew Weissmann, Kyle R. Freeny; Pretrial Officers: Shay Holman and Andre Sidbury. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [175] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [175-1] the government's response to defendant Manafort's supplemental filing to his motion for reconsideration of conditions of release. The government must file a redacted version of its [175-1] response on the public docket by February 16, 2018, but financial information and addresses may remain under seal. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [175] motion for leave to file document under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying [176] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file on the public docket defendant Gates's [176] motion for leave to file under seal, as well as Exhibit 1 to that motion [176-1], his position on the pending motion to withdraw. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 ~~SEALED MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Position of Defendant Richard W. Gates on Pending Motion to Withdraw as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. "Leave to file GRANTED, File Under Seal" by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 2/13/2018. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018, Terminated: 2/14/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. The Minute Order from February 12, 2018 ordering the government to inform the Court of its position on defendant Manafort's [173] motion for leave to file document under seal is hereby VACATED. The government is ORDERED to notify the Court if it has any objection to [173-2] defendant Manafort's supplemental memorandum to his motion for reconsideration of conditions of release by February 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [173] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal defendant Manafort's [173-2] supplemental filing to his motion for reconsideration of conditions of release, as well as the attachments to that filing [173-3] [173-4] [173-5] [173-6] [173-7] [173-8]. Defendant Manafort must file a redacted version of his [173-2] supplemental memorandum on the public docket, but financial information and addresses may remain under seal. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [173] motion for leave to file document under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. Defendant Gates must inform the Court of his position on the pending [161] motion to withdraw by 5:00 p.m. on February 13, 2018. The pleading may be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 02/12/18.....MINUTE ORDER. The government must inform the Court of its position on defendant Manafort's [173] motion for leave to file document under seal by February 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/2018. (lcabj2). Modified on 2/13/2018 (jth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Supplement, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Motion to Permit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Permit FOR PERMISSION TO OBTAIN THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE SEALED HEARING ON JANUARY 22, 2018 by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Transcripts for Counsel's Reference by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [170] Motion for Permission to Obtain Transcript. The Court reporter may provide the government with a copy of the transcript from the sealed hearing on January 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/9/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [169] Motion to Receive Transcripts as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Court reporter may provide defendant Gates's counsel with the sealed portions of the January 16, 2018 transcript and the sealed transcript from the February 7, 2018 hearing. The transcripts remain sealed to the public. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/9/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER denying [162] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and granting [166] Sealed Motion for Leave to file Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file on the public docket Exhibit 1 [162-2] attached to defendant's [162] motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal Exhibit 2 [166-2] attached to defendant's [166] motion. And the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal [162] [166] the motions for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motion Hearing as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) held on 2/7/2018 re: [161] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) filed by attorneys Shanlon Wu, Walter Mack & Annemarie McAvoy. The [161] Motion was Heard and Taken Under Advisement. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: Shanlon Wu, Walter Mack and Annemarie McAvoy; US Attorneys: Andrew Weissmann and Greg Donald Andres; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/7/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/6/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service Upon Defendant by RICHARD W. GATES, III (Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [165] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal Exhibit 1 [165-2] attached to the [165] motion. Defendant Gates is ORDERED to file a redacted version of Exhibit 1 [165-2] on the public docket. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [165] the motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/6/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 163 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [155] MOTION to Modify the Court's Schedule for Rule 404(b) Notice and Briefing (Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). A Hearing on [161] the Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Gates is scheduled for Wednesday, February 7, 2018, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The hearing will be sealed in order to preserve the privilege that attaches to attorney-client communications. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/2/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018, Terminated: 2/7/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018, Terminated: 2/22/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shanlon Wu, Walter Mack & Annemarie McAvoy. by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [160] Motion to Amend/Correct as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to remove from the public docket the document attached as [159-1] to defendant's [159] motion for leave to file. The Clerk of Court is then directed to file [160-1] in its place as the proposed order to [159] defendant's motion for leave to file. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/25/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR: Objections to the schedule established in the Order of 1/17/2018, due by 1/29/2018. (tg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Defendant Manafort's [159] motion for leave to file an opposition to the government's motion [155] to modify the schedule for Rule 404(b) notice and briefing is DENIED as moot. Neither the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure nor the Court's Local Rules require a party to file a motion for leave to file an opposition to an opposing party's motion, although the local rules do establish a due date for any opposition. The Court does not intend to rule on the government's motion [155] until that time has elapsed. In addition, in light of any misunderstanding of the terms of the minute order dated January 17, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants may notify the Court of any objections they have to the schedule established in the order by January 29, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/25/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2018) (zvt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 16, 2018 Afternoon; Page Numbers: 1-7. Date of Issuance: January 23, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Court held a sealed hearing this date on defendant's [153] Sealed Motion for reconsideration. The matter remains under advisement pending the supplementation of the motion by the defendant. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 156 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE on Transfer of Civil Complaint to this Court (Joint) by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR (Weissmann, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018, Terminated: 3/1/2018 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify the Court's Schedule for Rule 404(b) Notice and Briefing by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Andres, Greg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 152 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018, Terminated: 1/17/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, held on January 16, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-43. Date of Issuance: January 17, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [152] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [152-2] defendant's motion for reconsideration of conditions of release. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [152] the motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/17/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. In light of the matters discussed at the status conference on January 16, 2018, the Court will defer further communication with counsel concerning a trial date until closer to the next status conference. There is a schedule in place for the filing of motions under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 12(b)(3)(A) and (B), and the Court will establish a schedule for the filing of additional pretrial motions, including any motion for a bill of particulars pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 7(f), motions to suppress statements of evidence pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 12(b)(3)(C), and motions to sever charges or defendants under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 12(b)(3)(D) and 14, at this time. Defendants' motions must be filed by April 6, 2018; oppositions are due on April 23, 2018; and replies are due on May 4, 2018. A hearing on the motions is scheduled for May 23, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (to be carried over until May 24, 2018 if necessary). The government's notice of its intention to introduce any evidence under Federal Rule of Evidence 404(b) is also due on April 6, 2018; oppositions are due on April 23, 2018; and any reply is due on May 4, 2018. The hearing on this issue is also set for May 23, 2018. Motions in limine to exclude evidence at trial pursuant to the Federal Rules of Evidence will be due approximately 6-8 weeks before trial, and the dates for filing and opposing those motions will be set in connection with the scheduling of the trial, the Pretrial Conference, and the filing of the Joint Pretrial Statement. The parties must notify the Court if they have any objections to this schedule as a whole by January 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/17/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to PAUL J. MANAFORT JR. (1). Defendant Manafort's [150] motion for leave to file motion under seal is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Criminal Rule 49(f)(6). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/17/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 157 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/21/2018 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to RICHARD W. GATES, III (2). Defendant Placed on Personal Recognizance Bond. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/16/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018, Terminated: 1/17/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion Under Seal by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference as to RICHARD W. GATES, III held on 1/16/2018. Defendant was sworn to his new conditions of release. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond with conditions; Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorney: Shanlon Wu; US Attorney: Greg Donald Andres; Pretrial Officer: Shay Holman. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (1), RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) held on 1/16/2018. The Court's Order to Show Cause as to Defendant Richard W. Gates, III (2) issued on 12/22/2017 is DISCHARGED. The parties shall file a Notice with the Court by 1/19/2018 informing the Court of their position(s) as to whether Defendant MANAFORT'S (1) civil complaint should be transferred to this Court. The Court makes a finding that it is in the Interests of Justice that the time between 1/16/2018 and 2/14/2018 shall be excluded from the Speedy Trial Act calculation (START XT). Defense Motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 12(b)(3)(A) or (B) shall be filed by 2/23/2018; Government Responses are due by 3/16/2018; Any Replies are due by 3/30/2018; A Motions Hearing is set for 4/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. A further Status Conference is set for 2/14/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Defendant Gates (2) shall return to Court at 2:00 PM this date to be sworn to his Conditions of Release. Bond Status of Defendants: Defendant Manafort (1) Remains in the High Intensity Supervision Program (HISP); Defendant Gates (2) Remains on Personal Recognizance Bond (PR); Court Reporter: Janice Dickman; Defense Attorneys: 1) Kevin Downing and Thomas Edward Zehnle; 2) Shanlon Wu and Walter Mack; US Attorneys: Greg Donald Andres, Andrew Weissmann, Kyle R. Freeny; Pretrial Officer: Andre Sidbury. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/13/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT by RICHARD W. GATES, III of Notice of Filing (Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III (Freeny, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 1/12/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Notice of Filing, # (3) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [145] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the Notice of Filing [145-2], and Exhibit 1 [145-3] attached to the motion. Defendant Gates is ORDERED to file a redacted version of the Notice of Filing [145-2] on the public docket. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [145] the motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/12/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. The government is ORDERED to notify the Court by January 16, 2018 if in its view, the [145-3] materials defendant Gates submitted to the Court pursuant to the Court's [132] [138] Order of January 4, 2018 are deficient or fail to comply with the Order in any way. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/12/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Reconsider Court's January 4, 2018, Order by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachment: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Defendant's [144] Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 4, 2018 Order is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court notes at the outset that the word "of" was mistakenly omitted in the January 4 Order, and that the third condition of release that will be contained in the order to be issued after defendant has posted all of the necessary documentation will state: "Defendant must remain within the geographic area of Richmond, Virginia." No modification of that requirement is necessary because the geographic restriction was not intended to and does not constrain defendant to the Richmond city limits; defendant's current supervisor within the Eastern District of Virginia has informed the Court that a restriction to the Richmond "geographic area" typically includes the City of Richmond and Henrico, Hanover, and Chesterfield Counties, and that the athletic events defendant has asked to attend throughout this case have generally fallen within those boundaries. In order to ensure that this is entirely clear, though, the order to be issued after the security and surety obligations have been satisfied will include that clarification. It will also permit defendant to travel to his parents' or in-laws' residences if they are located in other counties without seeking Court permission as long as he provides notice to Pretrial Services. Second, the Court is not inclined to eliminate the restrictions on travel, including domestic travel to Washington, D.C. and New York, or to remove the requirement of prior notification before such travel. The Court found that the set of conditions it announced it would impose in lieu of home confinement was sufficient but not greater than necessary to ensure defendant's appearance after careful review of all of the bond submissions, and defendant's vague references to his unspecified "livelihood" and "business meetings" do not supply reasons why the order should be modified before it has even been implemented. The Court notes that it alleviated the home confinement condition even though the assets proffered fell somewhat short of the bond amount, that the restrictions on travel are identical to those imposed on the co-defendant in this case, and that the restrictions and notice requirements have not been shown to interfere with defendant's ability to perform remunerative work. While the discussion of the burdens imposed by the modest notice requirements to be included in the order struck the Court as much ado about nothing, the Court will modify the order it ultimately enters to require defendant to notify the Pretrial Services Agency of travel to the District of Columbia within two, instead of three, business days since defendant has been operating on a two-day schedule to date. The Court will also clarify its order to specify that defendant may, upon prior notification to the Pretrial Services Agency, attend business meetings (or other appointments such as medical appointments) within the District of Columbia during any of the trips described in paragraph 4, that is, trips to the District to meet with counsel that do not require Court approval. Paragraph 5 will stand as originally drafted; a shorter notice period imposes undue burdens on the Court. Any future requests to modify the conditions of release must be based on actual problems experienced operating under their terms rather than mere "concerns" about the need for additional flexibility. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Defendant Gates's [137] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is hereby DENIED since the January 4 Order [132] that it seeks to modify is now public [138], and the motion does not include any specific information concerning defendant's or anyone else's finances, nor does it include family members' addresses or the addresses of activities defendant wishes to attend. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to file on the public docket defendant's [137-2] Motion to Reconsider the Court's January 4 Order, and the [137] motion for leave to file it under seal itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [140] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for Limited Purposes to Attend Children's Sporting Events as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). Defendant Gates will be permitted to attend specific events at times and locations to be identified in a sealed order. Given the Court's January 4, 2018 ruling, it does not intend to entertain future motions of this nature barring extraordinary circumstances. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [141] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the attachment, Exhibit 1 [141-2] to defendant Gates's motion, and is also directed to unseal the motion for leave to file document under seal [141] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 141 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Limited Purposes to Attend Children's Sporting Events by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT by RICHARD W. GATES, III (2) re Minute Order filed 1/09/2018. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit 1)(zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Motion to Reconsider Court's January 4, 2018 Order, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). On January 4, 2018, the Court issued a sealed order [132] granting Defendant Gates's [98] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release in part and denying it in part. At that time, the Court issued a minute order indicating that it intended to unseal the order in its entirety unless either party objected and provided a justification for redacting any information contained in the order. On January 5, 2018, defendant Gates responded to the Court's order [135-2], and he asked that certain information be redacted from the sealed order before it was published. He also moved [135] for leave to file his response under seal. Defendant Gates's [135] motion for leave to file his response to the minute order under seal is DENIED; the response itself does not include any of the information the defendant urged the Court to keep private. With respect to the Court's order [132] concerning the conditions of Defendant Gates's release, the Court will adopt some of defendant Gates's proposed redactions but not all of them. Some of the facts proposed to be redacted are already a matter of public record, and as to the other matters, the Court has balanced the need to protect the identity of third parties and defendant's interest in keeping the particular details of his finances private against the public interest in the proceeding. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to file on the public docket defendant's response to the order of the Court [135-2], its attachment Exhibit 1 [135-3], and the motion [135] for leave to file it under seal itself. The Court will issue a redacted version of the [132] sealed order separately. Defendant Gates or his counsel may reveal the terms of the sealed order to any individual named in the order for purposes of compliance with its terms. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/9/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Response to Order of the Court, # (3) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 138 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER (Redacted Version of [132] sealed order) as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/03/2018. (zvt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [130] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the attachment, Exhibit 1 [130-2] to defendant Gates's motion, and is also directed to unseal the motion for leave to file document under seal [130] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. The Court intends to unseal the [132] Order granting in part and denying in part defendant Gates's motion to modify conditions of release in its entirety unless either party objects by noon tomorrow, January 5th and provides a justification for redacting any of the information it contains. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Inform Court of Government's Position by RICHARD W. GATES, III re [129] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Limited Purposes to Attend Children's Sporting Events (Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018, Terminated: 1/4/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Limited Purposes to Attend Children's Sporting Events by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR re [122] Response to [79] Reply to opposition to Motion, and [38] Order was entered in error by the Clerk's Office. Docket entry [84] is the correct entry. (hsj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [121] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the attachment, Exhibit 1 [121-2] to defendant Gates's motion, and is also directed to unseal the motion for leave to file document under seal [121] itself. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/2/2018. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying [120] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to RICHARD W. GATES III. On December 18, 2017, in connection with its ruling on defendant Gatess request [100] to attend his childs Christmas concert, the Court issued the following order: "Any and all additional Christmas-related requests must be filed in one pleading by December 20, 2017 so that the Court can rule on them at one time by Friday, December 22, 2017." In response to that order, defendant Gates submitted his December 19 motion to modify conditions of release for limited purposes to attend holiday events [104], which proposed a series of activities covering the period from December 21 through January 1, 2018. The motion was granted in part and denied in part on December 20, and the Court's order [107] included this admonition: "There will be no additions or changes to this schedule." On December 22, defendant Gates sought reconsideration of that ruling [110] [119] in one respect: "Mr. Gates... respectfully asks this Court to make an exception from its sealed order of December 20, 2017 regarding his Christmas holiday events." He emphasized the singular importance to his family of a particular event on December 26, and on December 22, the Court accommodated his request, modifying its order of December 20 [111]. After all of that, on December 28, 2017, defendant Gates filed yet another motion [120], with a new plan for New Year's celebrations. But the Court's original order was designed to ensure that any requests would be filed at a time when they could be reviewed and processed in accordance with all of the arcane procedures involved in the docketing and transmittal of sealed orders, which cannot be handled electronically. Given the untimely filing of the current motion, it will be denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/29/2017. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 1/2/2018 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 12/29/2017 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Limited Purposes to Attend New Year's Events by RICHARD W. GATES, III. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED DOCUMENT by RICHARD W. GATES, III of Reply to Government's Response to Defendant Gates's Motion to Modify Conditions of Release, And Limited Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Sealed Order of December 20, 2017 Regarding Defendant Gates's Motion to Modify Release Conditions for Limited Purposes to Attend Holiday Events (Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED DOCUMENT by RICHARD W. GATES, III of Response to Court's December 21, 2017 Order (Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 117 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by RICHARD W. GATES, III re Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [114] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal defendant's [114-2] Response to the Court's Order. Defendant Gates is ORDERED to file a redacted version of his Response on the public docket. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [114] motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/26/2017. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 12/26/2017 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Response to Court's December 21, 2017 Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LEAVE TO FILE DENIED "since movant is not a party, movant is hereby deemed to have timely filed a Notice of Appeal of the Courts denial of leave to file his 39 Motion to Intervene and 40 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Amy B. Jackson on December 22, 2017 - Supplemental or Second Notice of Appeal - December 15th, 2017 as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/22/2017. (zvt) Modified on 12/22/2017 (tb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR, RICHARD W. GATES, III before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 11, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-49. Date of Issuance: December 20, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Reply to Government's Response to Motion to Modify Conditions of Release and Limited Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Sealed Order of December 20, 2017 regarding Defendant Gates's Motion to Modify Release Conditions for Limited Purposes to Attend Holiday Events, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Proposed Order)(Wu, Shanlon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [110] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal defendant's [110-2] Reply to the government's response to motion to modify conditions of release as well as [110-3] Exhibit 1 attached thereto. Defendant Gates is ORDERED to file a redacted version of his Reply on the public docket since only limited portions of the motion refer to private financial information. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal the [110] motion for leave to file under seal. As to defendant Gates's request for the Court to reconsider its order regarding Christmas holiday events, defendant will be permitted to substitute the requested event for the event he was permitted to attend in the Court's previous order. The times and locations of the events will be identified in a sealed order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/22/2017. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ENTRY FILED 01/16/18.....MINUTE ORDER as to RICHARD W. GATES, III. Defendant Gates is ORDERED to show cause by December 27, 2017 why the Court should not find that his reported personal participation in the creation of a fundraising video to be shown to journalists and disseminated on social media, in which, according to multiple press accounts, defendant makes reference to "the cause" and the goal of "ensuring that our supporters from across the United States hear our message and stand with us," would not violate this Court's order [38] of November 8, 2017. Defendant must also explain the nature of his relationship, if any, with Jack Burkman, who reportedly publicly characterized the prosecution as " very unfair" at a December 19, 2017 fundraising event to which journalists were invited, and indicate whether Burkman's comments are being made at his direction or the direction of his counsel. The Court emphasizes that it is not intimating that the creation of a legal defense fund or the expression of personal views by third parties not acting at the behest of the defense would violate its order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/22/2017. (lcabj2) Modified on 1/16/2018 (zjth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [108] Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal as to RICHARD W. GATES III (2). The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [108-1] the government's response to defendant Gates's motion to modify conditions of release. The Clerk of Court is also directed to unseal [108] the motion for leave to file under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,050 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?