Ortiz-Garcia et al v. Cam
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-06267
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 1, 2017 at 12:47 AM EDT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Pettigrew +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 epettigrew@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Pettigrew +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 epettigrew@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Pettigrew +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 epettigrew@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Pettigrew +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 epettigrew@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo Prakopiy Cam, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Prakopiy Cam

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Prakopiy Cam
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1801
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Amended Judgment 98 . (ljb) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Amended Judgment: In accordance with the Opinion and Order signed 3/13/13, an amended judgment is hereby entered for plaintiffs and against defendant Prakopiy Cam in the following amounts: Ramiro Martinez-Lopez: $8,600.17; Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $104,202.40 and costs in the amount of $7,807.59; Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez $11,429.82; Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $104,202.40 and costs in the amount of $7,807.59; Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia: $11,251.60; Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $104,202.40 and costs in the amount of $7,807.59; Rafael Ortiz-Garcia: $20,425.15; Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $104,202.40 and costs in the amount of $7,807.59. Signed on 5/1/13 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ljb) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Second Proposed Form of Order Submitted In Support of Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Proposed Form of Order Submitted in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment 93 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Clerk's Notice of Mailing copy of Order #92 and Judgment #93 mailed to Prakopiy Cam. (lg) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Judgment for Plaintiffs. Signed on 3/20/2013 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lg) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                OPINION and ORDER: ; Granting Plaintiffs' First Motion for Judgment 86 ; Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Judgment 89 . Denying Defendant's Motion to Vacate 88 . Finding as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine 59 ; Finding as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine 60 . Signed on 3/13/2013 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lg) Modified for clarity of the record to add 'opinion' on 3/21/2013 (ljb). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  "Reply Memoranda in Support of Motion of Defendant to Vacate Arbitration Award" 84 88 . Filed by Prakopiy Cam. (ljb) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    First Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Scheduling, 84 88 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Affidavit of Arbitrator, # 2 Attachment Declaration ISO Response, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Pettigrew Decl ISO) (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Amended Motion for Judgment with Corrected Certificate of Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award 84 . Filed by Prakopiy Cam. (ljb) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for judgment 86 .) (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            First Motion for Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Clerk's Notice of Mailing copy of order #84 to Prakopiy Cam. (lg) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Scheduling Order by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. Pursuant to the Joint Status Report filed on 1/18/2013, Plaintiff's shall file a motion to confirm the Amended Arbitration Award no later than 1/29/2013 and Defendant must file any motion to vacate, amend or otherwise challenge the arbitration award, if any, no later than January 29, 2013. Responses to those motions are due by 2/8/2013. Memoranda in Reply are due by 2/19/2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lg) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Stipulated Status Report and Joint Stipulation to Scheduling Order Signed by Defendant Cam and by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    First Notice of Change of Address. Change of Address for Pettigrew, E. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Clerk's Notice of Mailing copy of Order #80 to Prakopiy Cam. (lg) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. Defendant reports he has not retained counsel, but is still considering it. If counsel is retained, defense counsel shall be in contact with plaintiff's counsel immediately and a joint status report shall be submitted to the Court by 1/22/2013. Erin Pettigrew present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Pro se present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Kristi Anderson. Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken presiding. (lg) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing copy of Order #78 to. (lg) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. Defendant informed the court that he will be retaining counsel and will be filing an objection to the Arbitrator's decision. Next Status Conference is set for 12/20/2012 at 09:00AM by Telephone before Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. the Court will initiate the phone call. D. Michael Dale and Erin Pettigrew present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Pro se present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Kristi Anderson. Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken presiding. (lg) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Appearance of Erin M. Pettigrew appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakipiy Cam regarding Case Reassignment Notice # 75 . (eo) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael R. Hogan to Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (eo) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Scheduling Order by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. ***TIME AND JUDGE CHANGE*** Status Conference is set for 11/20/2012 at 09:00AM by Telephone before Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. The Court will initiate the phone call. Status conference will be stricken if final paperwork is submitted prior to hearing date. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lg) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: Granting Joint Motion to refer to arbitration 72 . Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (sln) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Joint Motion to Refer to Arbitration. Filed by All Parties. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Minutes of Status Conference 70 . (sln) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held. Counsel indicates parties will be participating in binding arbitration. Order further Status Conference is set for 11/20/2012 at 09:30AM by Telephone before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Status conference will be stricken if final paperwork is submitted prior to hearing date. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Prakopiy Cam pro se defendant(s). Court Reporter: Deb Wilhelm. U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan presiding. (sln) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held 7/10/2012. Counsel indicates parties will be participating in mediation. Further Status Conference is set for 8/28/2012 at 09:30AM by Telephone before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. The court will initiate the call. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Prakopia Cam, Pro se defendant(s). Court Reporter: Deb Wilhelm. U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan presiding. A copy of this order is mailed to defendant on this date. (cw) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Scheduling Order 67 . (jw) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Scheduling Order by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Jury trial set for 5/30/2012 is hereby vacated, to be reset, if necessary, at a later date. Status Conference is set for 7/10/2012 at 09:30AM by Telephone before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Pretrial Conference 65 . (jw) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTES of Proceedings: Pretrial Conference held. Defendant fails to appear. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to advise the Court as to how plaintiffs wish to proceed no later than Monday, 5/14/2012. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiffs. Court Reporter: Deb Wilhelm. U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan presiding. (jw) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Proposed Jury Verdict Form. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Trial Brief . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Motion in limine - Unproduced exhibits. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Motion in limine - Immigration status. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Witness List . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Exhibit List . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Plaintiffs (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Scheduling Order 54 . (jw) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Scheduling Order by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Pretrial Documents are due by 4/16/2012, 4/23/2012, and 4/27/2012. Pretrial Conference is set for 5/8/2012 at 11:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. 3-4 Day Jury Trial is set for 5/30/2012 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Joint Status Report . Filed by All Parties. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Lodged . Filed by All Parties. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Order 50 . (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 48 . Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/28/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 11/28/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 11/28/2011. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/28/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Declaration of Meg Heaton In Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 48 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Order 46 . (jw) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 44 . Dispositive Motions are due by 9/23/2011. Discovery is to be completed by 9/23/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/21/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 10/21/2011. Joint Status Report is again due by 9/23/2011, and should provide all information required pursuant to Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order 2 . Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 44 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Joint Status Report. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Prakopiy Cam regarding Status Conference 41 . (plb) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference. Deposition of Defendant may continue until 4:00 PM today. Meg Heaton present as counsel for plaintiffs. Prakopiy Cam present as pro se defendant. Court Reporter: Gwen Dickson. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin presiding. (plb) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 38 . Dispositive Motions are due by 6/24/2011. Discovery is to be completed by 6/24/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 6/24/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/25/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 7/25/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 38 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 36 . Dispositive Motions are due by 5/5/2011. Discovery is to be completed by 5/5/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 5/5/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/6/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 6/6/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Meg Heaton) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Denying Motion for Summary Judgment 24 . Signed on 3/10/2011 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Response to Order to Show Cause. Filed by Prakopiy Cam. (ljb) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Order Advising Parties of Federal Summary Standards and Ordering Defendant to Show Cause. Defendant Prakopiy Cam is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by 3/7/2011 why plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 24 should not be granted. Failure by defendant to timely respond to this order will result in plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment being granted. Signed on 2/12/2011 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 23 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/14/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 3/14/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/14/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 4/14/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 23 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 1 of 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, part 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, part 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, part 3 of 3) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 3 of 3) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Rafael Ortiz-Garcia. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, part 3 of 3) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 24 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion to Compel 17 . Signed on 12/13/2010 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 to the extent that Dispositive Motions are due by 12/20/2010. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 12/20/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/20/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 1/20/2011. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel 17 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Compel Discovery. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 15 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 11/19/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/20/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 12/20/2010. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/19/2010. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Fourth Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Meg Heaton) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 13 . Discovery is to be completed by 10/19/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 10/19/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/19/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 11/19/2010. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/19/2010. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (sln) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Third Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Meg Heaton) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/21/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 7/21/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/21/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 8/23/2010. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (jw) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/22/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 4/22/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/22/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 5/24/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (cw) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order regarding Declaration 6 filed by Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Rafael Ortiz-Garcia for Administrative Correction of the Record. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The document attached to declaration 6 is incomplete. Clerk directed to make a note on the docket entry to this effect. Plaintiff's counsel has refiled a complete declaration. (sln) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 5 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT ATTACHED see entry #7 for complete Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 5 .) (Heaton, Meg) Modified on 1/26/2010 (sln). (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Complaint. Filed by Prakopiy Cam. (sln) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Returned Executed. as to Prakopiy Cam served on 10/17/2009, answer due on 11/6/2009 Filed by all plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. Discovery is to be completed by 1/22/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 1/22/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2010. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (sln) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 600004673 issued; Summons issued as to Prakopiy Cam. Jury Trial Requested: yes.Filed by Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia, Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez against Prakopiy Cam. (sln) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?