USA v. Wertkin
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cr-00557-MMC

Tags
Last Updated November 19, 2020 at 4:08 PM EST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin L. Harris +1 415 436 7016 +1 415 436 7234 Robin.Harris2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jeffrey Wertkin, Defendant (1)

Represented by Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina C. Arguedas +1 510 845 3000 +1 510 845 3003 arguedas@achlaw.com
Space Raphael M. Goldman +1 510 845 3000 +1 510 845 3003 goldman@achlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Jeffrey Wertkin (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/1/2017
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1505.F
Offense Level 4
181505 - Obstruction of Justice
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2314.F
Offense Level 4
182314 - Interstate Transportation of Stolen Goods
Defendant Custody Status Not in Custody
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Transfer Out/Probationer
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Payment Record Card
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Status Conference Re: Supervised Release/Probation Violation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None PS8
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Payment Record Card
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Response
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Sealing Order - General Order 54
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Sentencing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2017, Entered: 12/9/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Jeffrey Wertkin held on 11/29/17, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER RESCHEDULING SENTENCING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/08/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Jeffrey Wertkin re [9] Order, Terminate Motions Sentencing set for 3/7/2018 02:15 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017, Terminated: 12/8/2017 stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Jeffrey Wertkin Rescheduling Sentencing Hearing. (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raphael M. Goldman appearing for Jeffrey Wertkin (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 plea agreement
                                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jeffrey Wertkin (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Change of Plea Hearing as to Jeffrey Wertkin held on 11/29/2017, Plea entered by Jeffrey Wertkin (1) Guilty Count 1-2,3. Sentencing set for 3/14/2018 02:15 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Total Time in Court 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Robin Harris; William Frentzen. Defendant Attorney: Cris Arguedas; Raphael Goldman. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. Attachment Criminal Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Waiver of Indictment
                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jeffrey Wertkin (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Arraignment as to Jeffrey Wertkin (1) Count 1-2,3 held on 11/29/2017; Added attorney Cristina C. Arguedas for Jeffrey Wertkin. Plea entered by Jeffrey Wertkin (1): Not Guilty on counts 1-2,3. Change of Plea Hearing previously set for 11/29/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. FTR Time 9:38-9:43. Pretrial Officer: Denise Mancia. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                              Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Jeffrey Wertkin re [1] Information - Felony. Arraignment set for 11/29/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE as to Jeffrey Wertkin Change of Plea Hearing set for 11/29/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 information - felony
                                                                  INFORMATION as to Jeffrey Wertkin (1) count(s) 1-2, 3. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?