Podpeskar v. Dannon Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-08478
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 4:35 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Polly Podpeskar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Halunen Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa S Weiner +1 612 605 4098 weiner@halunenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reese Richman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Volney Granade +1 706 338 6617 +1 212 253 4272 ggranade@reesellp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Robert Reese +1 212 643 0500 +1 212 253 4272 mreese@reeserichman.com
v.
No Logo Dannon Company, Inc.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Featherstun +1 415 653 3729 bafeatherstun@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angel A. Garganta +1 415 653 3735 +1 415 653 3755 AGarganta@Venable.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332pl
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Angel A. Garganta on behalf of Dannon Company, Inc.. New Address: Venable LLP, 101 California Street, Suite 3800, San Francisco, CA, USA 94111, (415) 653-3750. (Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated December 3, 2017, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/04/2017) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay. filed by Dannon Company, Inc. For the reasons stated above, the defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 32 and terminate this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/3/2017) (rj) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 33 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Dannon's Notice of Supp. Authority re Its Motion to Dismiss)(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 33 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendant Dannon's Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Its Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay, # 2 Exhibit B to Defendant Dannon's Notice of Supplemental Authority Re Its Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay)(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. . Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Angel A. Garganta In Support of Defendant The Dannon Company, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For A Stay)(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. Defendant The Dannon Company, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law In Support Of Its Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2017 Return Date set for 6/12/2017 at 11:59 PM.(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Dannon Company, Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay. . Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George V. Granade, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Deadline for plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss extended to 5/19/2017. Defendants' reply due 6/12/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Michael R. Reese dated April 27, 2017. Document filed by Polly Podpeskar.(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss: See Doc. #27. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Dannon Company, Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2017 Return Date set for 6/5/2017 at 11:59 PM.(Garganta, Angel) Modified on 5/24/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Motion Of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Garganta, Angel) Modified on 5/24/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION GRANTING AMENDMENT TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties that, given Plaintiff's amendment of her complaint, the complexity of the issues, and Defendants counsels schedule, subject to the Court's approval, the deadline for Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is extended from Friday, March 10, 2017 to Monday, April 10, 2017. Additionally, for the same reason, the parties agree, subject to the Court's approval, to modify the briefing schedule provided under Local Rule 6.1(b) for responding to Defendant's April 10, 2017 filing as follows: Plaintiff Polly Podpeskars time to respond is extended to May 14, 2017, and Defendant's time to reply is extended to June 5, 2017. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. expressly reserves, any and all defenses. The Clerk is instructed to accept the second amended complaint (Doc. #24 for filing.) So Ordered. (Dannon Company, Inc. answer due 4/10/2017.)(Responses due by 5/14/2017, Replies due by 6/5/2017.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/22/17) (yv) Modified on 3/2/2017 (yv). (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 22 Amended Complaint against Dannon Company, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint filed by Polly Podpeskar.(Wolchansky, Melissa) Modified on 2/22/2017 (vf). Modified on 2/23/2017 (vf). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties that, given the anticipated complexity of the issues and subject to the Court's approval, the deadline for Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended from Thursday February 16, 2017 to Friday March 10, 2017. Additionally, for this same reason, the parties agree, subject to the Court's approval, to modify the briefing schedule provided under Local Rule 6.1(b) for responding to Defendant's March 10, 2017 filing as follows: Plaintiff Polly Podpeskar's time to respond is extended to April 14, 2017, and Defendant's time to reply is extended to May 5, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Dannon Company, Inc. answer due 3/10/2017) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/10/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Dannon Company, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Polly Podpeskar.(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 20 Letter notify the Court of Plaintiff's intent to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Polly Podpeskar. ENDORSEMENT: The amended complaint shall be filed by 2/2/2017. So Ordered., (Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2017.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/19/17) (yv) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Michael R. Reese dated January 19, 2017 re: Plaintiff's Intent to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Polly Podpeskar.(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay, filed by Dannon Company, Inc. Defendant having moved to dismiss the complaint on January 9, 2017 (Doc. #16), the Court sua sponte grants plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than January 19, 2017, plaintiff shall notify the Court by letter, with copies simultaneously delivered to all counsel, whether (i) she intends to file an amended complaint, or (ii) she will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the motion to dismiss will proceed in the regular course and, absent special circumstances, no further opportunities to amend will be granted. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the time to file opposing papers shall remain February 8, 2017, and the time to file reply papers shall remain February 23, 2017, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Doc. #13). If plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, she must file the amended complaint by no later than fourteen days after notifying the Court of her intent to do so. Defendant may then either file an answer to the amended complaint or file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, or defendant may notify the Court by letter, with copies simultaneously delivered to all counsel, that it is relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. If defendant chooses to file an answer to or motion to dismiss the amended complaint, the time to do so shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/10/17) (yv) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Danone S.A. for Dannon Company, Inc.. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc..(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. . Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of The Dannon Company, Inc. To Dismiss Or, In The Altermative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. Responses due by 2/8/2017 Return Date set for 1/23/2017 at 11:59 PM.(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE 16 Motion) - NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For A Stay. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc. (Garganta, Angel) Modified on 1/10/2017 (db). (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fred David Weinstein on behalf of Dannon Company, Inc.. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: The deadline for Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from January 3, 2017 to January 9, 2017. Accordingly, Plaintiff's response will be due on February 8, 2017 and any reply by Defendant will be due on February 23, 2017. Dannon Company, Inc. answer due 1/9/2017. (Motions due by 1/9/2017. Responses due by 2/8/2017. Replies due by 2/23/2017.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/8/2016) (mml) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dannon Company, Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2016, answer due 1/1/2017. Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. (Reese, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Volney Granade on behalf of Polly Podpeskar. (Granade, George) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 7 Motion for Brian A. Featherstun to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/14/2016) (lnl) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 8 Motion for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Dannon Company, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/14/2016) (lnl) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number 0208-12968984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garganta, Angel) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Brian A. Featherstun to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number 0208-12968898. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Featherstun, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12968984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garganta, Angel) Modified on 11/10/2016 (wb). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian A. Featherstun to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12968898. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dannon Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Featherstun, Brian) Modified on 11/10/2016 (wb). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 3 Motion for Melissa W. Wolchansky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/4/2016) (rj) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Melissa W. Wolchansky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12947360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-COGS)(Wolchansky, Melissa) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reese, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Dannon Company, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12934932)Document filed by Polly Podpeskar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 37 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (rj)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (ma)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Angel A. Garganta to RE-FILE Document 26 Notice (Other). Use the event type Dismiss found under the event list Motions. (ldi)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Angel A. Garganta to RE-FILE Document 27 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Dannon Company, Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Melissa W. Wolchansky re: Document No. 24 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Dannon Company, Inc. answer due 4/10/2017. (yv)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Brian A. Featherstun to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number 0208-12968898. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jcu)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number 0208-12968984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jcu)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 6 MOTION for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12968984. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 5 MOTION for Brian A. Featherstun to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12968898. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 3 MOTION for Melissa W. Wolchansky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12947360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael Robert Reese. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Robert Reese. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Polly Podpeskar. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Robert Reese. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 5,000,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 5,000,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (vf)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (vf)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?