Rockport Company v. U.S. Shoe Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-01931-NPR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 1:48 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo The Rockport Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joan L. Dillon +1 404 572 4600
v.
No Logo U.S. SHOE Corporation, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/10/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 9/9/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: 9/11/1991 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of dismissal and Approval (Ramsey, J.) "DISMISSING" case without prejudice. (c/m 9/9/91ph) MICROFILMED 9/11/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: 10/1/1991 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/1991, Entered: 8/1/1991 Remark
      Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Defendant, United States Shoe Corporation. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/18/1991, Entered: 7/18/1991 Remark
        Patent Letter mailed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/17/1991 Summons Returned Executed
          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Shoe Corp. 7/12/91 Answer due on 9/12/91 for U.S. Shoe Corp. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/27/1991
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 7/11/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS(ES) issued for U.S. Shoe Corp. (60) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991 Jury Demand
              DEMAND for jury trial by Rockport Company (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991 Complaint
                COMPLAINT and Exh.A-C filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 088703 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 44 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?