Davis v. City of San Francisco
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-06387

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 2:07 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jimmy Lee Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jimmy Lee Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jimmy Lee Davis
v.
No Logo City of San Francisco, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Mail sent to Jimmy Lee Davis returned as undeliverable re 13 Judgment, 12 Order. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Mail sent to Jimmy Lee Davis returned as undeliverable re 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Mail sent to JimmyLee Davis returned as undeliverable re 11 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Objections due by 2/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on January 30, 2018. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on January 25, 2018. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        Mail sent to Jimmy Lee Davis returned as undeliverable re 7 Order to Show Cause. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on January 10, 2018. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing Complaint 1 with leave to amend. Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2018. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2017: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jimmy Lee Davis. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT against City of San Francisco. Filed byJimmy Lee Davis. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?