City of Seattle v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01577
District Judge Thomas S. Zilly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2017 at 12:06 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Seattle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seattle City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Holmes +1 206 684 8200 peter.holmes@seattle.gov
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Nash LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Michael Fandel +1 206 777 7472 +1 206 340 9599 michael.fandel@millernash.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Rubin +1 503 224 5858 +1 503 224 0155 bruce.rubin@millernash.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Nash LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Michael Fandel +1 206 777 7472 +1 206 340 9599 michael.fandel@millernash.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Rubin +1 503 224 5858 +1 503 224 0155 bruce.rubin@millernash.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Robbs Bilanko +1 206 332 1380 +1 206 624 7317 cbilanko@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Roy Hineline +1 206 332 1380 +1 206 624 7317 chineline@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Roy Hineline +1 206 332 1380 +1 206 624 7317 chineline@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Robbs Bilanko +1 206 332 1380 +1 206 624 7317 cbilanko@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Frank D. Li, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Dean Adams +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 tadams@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew W. Durland +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 adurland@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Friedman +1 206 224 8009 rfriedman@karrtuttle.com
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Dean Adams +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 tadams@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew W. Durland +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 adurland@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Friedman +1 206 224 8009 rfriedman@karrtuttle.com
No Logo Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Dean Adams +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 tadams@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew W. Durland +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 adurland@karrtuttle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Friedman +1 206 224 8009 rfriedman@karrtuttle.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Andrx Corp
Officer/Director, Columbia Laboratories, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Nash LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Michael Fandel +1 206 777 7472 +1 206 340 9599 michael.fandel@millernash.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Rubin +1 503 224 5858 +1 503 224 0155 bruce.rubin@millernash.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/24/2017, (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC, Other Affiliate Allergan Finance LLC for Allergan PLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allergan PLC (Fandel, Kent) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kent Michael Fandel on behalf of Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Fandel, Kent) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Dispositive Motions; Any responsive pleading or motion shall be filed ninety (90) days of the date of this Minute Order, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Robbs Bilanko on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bilanko, Carolyn) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Dispositive Motions, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Adams, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Adams, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hineline, Curt) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 17-2-25504-1; (Receipt # 0981-5064619), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Part 2)(Hineline, Curt) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 57 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?