Gunning v. National City Corporation et al
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-nc-70009
District Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2017 at 2:09 AM EDT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles C. Gunning, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas James McKenna +1 212 983 1300 +1 212 983 0383 tjmlaw2001@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Daniel R. Karon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Karon +1 216 622 1851 +1 216 241 8175 dkaron@karonllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyrus B Mehri +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 cmehri@findjustice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Major Khan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Major Khan +1 646 546 5664 +1 646 546 5755 mk@mk-llc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janelle M. Carter +1 202 822 5100 +1 202 822 4997 jcarter@findjustice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
Space Mark Carl Rifkin +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 rifkin@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Allen H. Koranda, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Bernadine P. Healy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Christopher M. Connor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo David A. Daberko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Gerald L. Shaheen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo James S. Broadhurst, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Jeffrey D. Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Jerry Sue Thornton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo John Does 1-30, Defendant
No Logo Jon E. Barfield, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Michael B. McCallister, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Morry Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo National City Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Paul A. Ormond, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
No Logo Peter E. Raskind, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne F. Mueller +1 216 586 7370 +1 216 579 0212 afmueller@jonesday.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order and Final Judgment Case is dismissed with Prejudice. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/30/10.(S,R) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Order granting EFC # 108 in case 1:08nc70000 and scheduling a Telephone Conference for 12/18/2009 at 3:00 PM before Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 10/8/2009. (D,M) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Transfer Order by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. This action is transferred to the MDL 2003 docket pursuant to 28:1407, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (S,R) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Order reassigning case to Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan no longer assigned to case. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/29/08. (Case consolidated with 1:08cv61)(S,R) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Amended complaint against all defendants, filed by James Elsinghorst, Barbara Grosick, Ella R. Whitlow, Sharon A. Deucher, Robert Steinberg, Loretta D. Rogers, Rodolfo Rannallo, Jr, Rita Klabensch, Robert Huenefeld, Charles C. Gunning, George Rithianos and Deborah Douglas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit B Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 4, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F) Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00061-PAG et al. (S,R) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Cyrus Mehri (Related Doc # 9 ). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/6/08.(S,R) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Janelle M. Carter (Related Doc # 8 ). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/6/08.(S,R) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Thomas J. McKenna. (Related Doc # 7 ). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/6/08.(S,R) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Appearance and Motion for attorney Cyrus Mehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 14660019053, filed by Plaintiff Charles C. Gunning. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(C,B) Modified text on 5/2/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Appearance and Motion for attorney Janelle M. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 14660019053, filed by Plaintiff Charles C. Gunning. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(C,B) Modified text on 5/2/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Notice of Appearance and Motion for attorney Thomas J. McKenna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 14660019051, filed by Plaintiff Charles C. Gunning. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(C,B) Modified text on 5/2/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Order of Consolidation. In re Erisa Cases. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/7/08. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-00061-PAG et al.(S,R) Modified text on 4/9/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Order reassigning case to Judge Patricia A. Gaughan for all further proceedings. Judge John R. Adams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judges John R. Adams, Patricia A. Gaughan and James G. Carr on 4/3/08. (K,C) Modified text on 4/3/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by National City Corporation filed by National City Corporation. (Ferraro, Adrienne) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Notice of Related Cases filed by Michael B. McCallister, Paul A. Ormond, Peter E. Raskind, Gerald L. Shaheen, Jerry Sue Thornton, Morry Weiss, National City Corporation, Jon E. Barfield, James S. Broadhurst, Christopher M. Connor, David A. Daberko, Bernadine P. Healy, Jeffrey D. Kelly, Allen H. Koranda. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Elsinghorst Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B: Grosick Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C: Whitlow Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D: Ranallo Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E: Judge Gaughan's April 1, 2008 Order)(Ferraro, Adrienne) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Order reassigning case to Judge John R. Adams for all further proceedings. Judge David D. Dowd, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David D. Dowd, Jr on 3/27/08. (M,De) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Complaint with jury demand against Michael B. McCallister, Paul A. Ormond, Peter E. Raskind, Gerald L. Shaheen, Jerry Sue Thornton, Morry Weiss, John Does 1-30, National City Corporation, Jon E. Barfield, James S. Broadhurst, Christopher M. Connor, David A. Daberko, Bernadine P. Healy, Jeffrey D. Kelly & Allen H. Koranda. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 14660017956, filed by Charles C. Gunning. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (C,BA) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?