Ion v. Pizza Hut, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-00788

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 7:58 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Kristen Ion, Plaintiff

Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Y. Brandt +1 618 307 6116 +1 618 307 6161 dyb@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele Marie Vercoski +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 mmv@mccunewright.com

Represented by Steckler Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Kirstine Rogers +1 972 387 4040 +1 972 387 4041 krogers@stecklerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce W. Steckler +1 972 387 4040 +1 972 387 4041 bruce@stecklerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Pizza Hut, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel S. Brass +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 986 5309 rbrass@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Russell H Falconer +1 214 698 3170 +1 214 571 2958 rfalconer@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY M Sean Royall +1 214 698 3256 sroyall@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Rene' Barnes +1 214 387 9100 +1 214 387 9125 stephaniebarnes@siebman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Siebman Forrest +1 214 387 9100 elizabethforrest@siebman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER. The Court hereby WITHDRAWS its Order dated May 14, 2018 (Dkt. 41 ),striking Plaintiff Kristen Ion's Second Amended Class Action Complaint. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 39 ) is deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/13/2018. (rpc, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
          ***WITHDRAWN PER 42 . PLEASE DISREGARD.*** ORDER. Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 39 ) is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/14/2018. (rpc, ) Modified on 6/13/2018 (rpc, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Reply to Response to motion
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Robison, Brian)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Amended Complaint
              AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Location Franchise Agreement)(Brandt, Derek) Modified on 5/14/2018 (rpc, ). Modified on 6/13/2018 (rpc, ).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Derek)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/19/2018. (rpc, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ***WITHDRAWN PER DIRECTION OF CHAMBERS*** SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/19/2018. (rpc, ) Modified on 4/19/2018 (rpc, ).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kristen Ion for proceedings held on 4-17-18; Rule 16 Management Conference before Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson. (Vercoski, Michele)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pizza Hut, LLC for proceedings held on April 17, 2018, Rule 16 Management Conference before Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Additional attachment - main document replaced with flattened image) (To be transcribed by official court reporter, Chris Bickham). Modified on 4/17/2018 (dlc, ).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Rule 16 Managemet Conference held on 4/17/2018. (Court Reporter Digital Recording - Plano 108.) (ttm, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/17/2018. (rpc, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Electronic Discovery Order by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robison, Brian)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robison, Brian)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rogers, Laura)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Pizza Hut, LLC (Service of Initial Disclosures) (Barnes, Stephanie)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE by Kristen Ion Notice of Service of Disclosure Information (Vercoski, Michele)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/15/2018. (rpc, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Robison, Brian)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion (Dkt. 23 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 3/9/2018. (rpc, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint MOTION For A Briefing Schedule On Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Forrest, Elizabeth)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pizza Hut, LLC, filed by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Location Franchise Agreement)(Steckler, Bruce)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Pizza Hut, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16) or alternatively file an amended complaint is hereby extended to and including March 1, 2018. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, Defendant may file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16) on or by March 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 2/13/2018. (rpc, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/20/2018. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/17/2018 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 1/26/2018. (rpc, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Pizza Hut, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 16 ) is hereby extended to and including February 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 1/23/2018. (rpc, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steckler, Bruce)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Pizza Hut, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robison, Brian)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6617139. (Brass, Rachel)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pizza Hut, LLC.( Siebman, Clyde)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Pizza Hut, LLC served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (daj, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Siebman Forrest on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC (Forrest, Elizabeth)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Rene' Barnes on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC (Barnes, Stephanie)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by M Sean Royall on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6567688. (Royall, M)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell H Falconer on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC (Falconer, Russell)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Edward Robison on behalf of Pizza Hut, LLC (Robison, Brian)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pizza Hut, LLC.( Siebman, Clyde)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. McCune on behalf of Kristen Ion. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6549320. (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michele M. Vercoski on behalf of Kristen Ion. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6549222. (Vercoski, Michele)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Derek Y. Brandt on behalf of Kristen Ion. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6549101. (Brandt, Derek)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Pizza Hut, LLC. (cm, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint.. (Steckler, Bruce)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Pizza Hut, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6539000.), filed by Kristen Ion. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steckler, Bruce)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE ***TIME CHANGED ONLY*** for Hearing: Rule 16 Management Conference set Tuesday, 4/17/2018 ***TIME CHANGED TO 10:00 AM*** in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (ttm, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted, pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pizza Hut, LLC, to 1/11/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( cm, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pizza Hut, LLC to 12/27/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (cm, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (cm, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kristen Ion. (cm, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?