Garcia v. Tillerson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00166

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 16, 2019 at 12:50 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gilibaldo Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime M Diez +1 956 544 3565 +1 956 550 0006 jaimemdiez@aol.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Edward Wyatt +1 713 567 9713 +1 713 718 3303 keith.wyatt@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Edward Wyatt +1 713 567 9713 +1 713 718 3303 keith.wyatt@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Witness List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Witness List
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None protective order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 protective order
                            Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Privacy Act Protective Order)(Wyatt, Keith)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss the United States of America as an Improper Party Defendant. The United States of America is dismissed as a defendant. Furthermore, the Clerk of Court is ordered to substitute Michael R. Pompeo, Secretary of State, in place of Rex W. Tillerson, as the remaining proper party defendant.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Dismiss
                                First MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to dismiss the United States as an improper party defendant)(Wyatt, Keith)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2 days. Bench Trial. Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2018 Pltf Expert Witness List and Expert Report due by 4/11/2018. Deft Expert Witness List and Expert Report due by 6/11/2018. Discovery due by 10/8/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/23/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/22/2018. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Objections to exhibit list due by 11/16/2018 Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera Bench Trial set for 12/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion to Cancel the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE Initial Disclosures by Gilibaldo Garcia, filed. (Diez, Jaime)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Cancel the Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Canceling Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference, # 2 Proposed Order Order Permitting Defendants' Attorney to attend by Telephone)(Wyatt, Keith)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          Agreed PROPOSED ORDER for Scheduling Order, filed.(Wyatt, Keith)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed.(Wyatt, Keith)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed.(Wyatt, Keith)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed.(Wyatt, Keith)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 4 Motion to Reschedule the November 7, 2017 initial pretrial and scheduling conference. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Rex W. Tillerson, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Reset the Scheduling Conference)(Wyatt, Keith) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18812992) filed by Gilibaldo Garcia.(Diez, Jaime) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?