Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Thames et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Southern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00318-TSL-RHW
District Judge Tom S. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated November 4, 2017 at 11:30 PM DT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen T. Masley +1 601 960 8400 +1 601 960 8431 smasley@mcglinchey.com
Space Mark Herndon Tyson +1 601 960 8400 +1 601 960 3520 mtyson@mcglinchey.com
v.
No Logo Rosemary Thames, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erich Gregg Jerscheid +1 601 398 9942 +1 601 605 0447 erich.jerscheid@gmail.com
No Logo Walter White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erich Gregg Jerscheid +1 601 398 9942 +1 601 605 0447 erich.jerscheid@gmail.com
Office Northern (Jackson)
Filed 5/1/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Hinds
Terminated 6/26/2017
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,NO_CMC,RHW
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Order on Motion to Set AsideCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [9] Motion to Set Aside [8] Order on Motion for Default Judgment, as set out herein. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 8/3/17 (LWE)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Set Aside [8] Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, [6] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Tyson, Mark)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 response in opposition to motion
      RESPONSE in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Set Aside [8] Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, [6] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - May 22, 2017 email, # (2) Exhibit B - State Court Answer and Defenses, # (3) Exhibit C - Declaration)(Tyson, Mark)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Motion to Set Aside
        MOTION to Set Aside [8] Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, [6] Clerk's Entry of Default by Rosemary Thames, Walter White (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex.1 - Highlighted Documents Contesting Plaintiff's)(Jerscheid, Erich)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
          DEFAULT JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants Rosemary Thames and Walter White be, and hereby are, compelled to arbitrate any claims they intend to assert against Credit Acceptance Corporation in accordance with the terms of the applicable Arbitration Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 3, it is ordered that the underlying state court action is stayed pending arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed as there remains nothing to be litigated in this action. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 6/26/2017 (ND)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017, Terminated: 6/26/2017 Motion for Default Judgment
            MOTION for Default Judgment as to (Compelling Arbitration) by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Tyson, Mark)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Clerks Entry of Default*
              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Rosemary Thames and Walter White (ASJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017, Terminated: 6/14/2017 Motion for Entry of Default
                MOTION for Entry of Default by Credit Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Declaration)(Tyson, Mark)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 summons returned executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Credit Acceptance Corporation Walter White served on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017. (Tyson, Mark)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 summons returned executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Credit Acceptance Corporation Rosemary Thames served on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017. (Tyson, Mark)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Summons issued
                      Summons Issued as to Rosemary Thames and Walter White. (ND)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against Rosemary Thames and Walter White ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34643044720), filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Retail Installment Contract, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration, # (3) Exhibit C - Chancery Court Complaint, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 167 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?