Public Service Company of NM v. Barboan
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 16-2050

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 3:45 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2210 - Condemnation
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009876058 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
[10500716] Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States that the application for an extension of time to file a petition for writ of certiorari has been presented to Justice Sotomayor, who on September 15, 2017, extended the time to and including November 20, 2017. Served on 09/15/2017. Manner of Service: US mail. [16-2050] [Entered: 09/25/2017 01:24 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009848671 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    [10486668] Mandate issued. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/31/2017 02:58 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009848529 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      [10486602] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips, and McHugh denying Appellant's Motion to Stay Issuance of Mandate. Served on 07/31/2017. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/31/2017 01:20 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009847864 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        [10486215] Response filed by Leonard Willie, Lorraine J. Barboan, Christine G. Begay, Laura H. Chaco, Glen C. Charleston, Glenda G. Charleston, Jimmy A. Charley, Kalvin Charley, Marla L. Charley, Mary B. Charley, Melvin L. Charley, Jones Dehiya, Bob Grey, Jimmie Grey, Thompson Grey, Benjamin A. House, Dorothy W. House, Mary R. House, Charley J. Johnson, Elouise J. Smith, Annie H. Sorrell, Shawn Stevens and Irene Willie to APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY ISSUANCE OF MANDATE. Served on 07/28/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] MMM [Entered: 07/28/2017 02:58 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009846784 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          [10485585] Motion filed by Appellant Public Service Company of New Mexico to Stay Issuance of Mandate. Served on: 07/26/2017. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] --[Edited 07/27/2017 by AT to reflect counsel filed a motion to stay the mandate.] KRA [Entered: 07/26/2017 05:00 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009844580 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            [10484531] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips and McHugh denying appellant's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Public Service Company of New Mexico. The petition for rehearing en banc was transmitted to all of the judges of the court who are in regular active service. As no member of the panel and no judge in regular active service on the court requested that the court be polled, that petition is also denied. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/21/2017 04:43 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009842267 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              [10483332] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips and McHugh granting Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLCâ??s unopposed motion for an extension of time to file motion for leave to file brief of amicus curiae. Served on 07/18/2017. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:13 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009841914 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                [10483176] Proposed amicus curiae brief received from Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC but not filed. Served on 07/17/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:24 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009841888 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  [10483168] Motion filed by Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 07/17/2017 Manner of service: email.--[Edited 07/17/2017 by SDS to remove proposed brief from entry. Brief has been docketed as received by clerk] [16-2050] DMB [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:14 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009839199 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    [10481803] Motion filed by Amicus Curiae Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC to extend time to file an amicus brief until 07/17/2017.. Served on: 07/11/2017. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] EJK [Entered: 07/11/2017 03:49 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009876058 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      [10500716] Notice from the Supreme Court of the United States that the application for an extension of time to file a petition for writ of certiorari has been presented to Justice Sotomayor, who on September 15, 2017, extended the time to and including November 20, 2017. Served on 09/15/2017. Manner of Service: US mail. [16-2050] [Entered: 09/25/2017 01:24 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009848671 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        [10486668] Mandate issued. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/31/2017 02:58 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009848529 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          [10486602] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips, and McHugh denying Appellant's Motion to Stay Issuance of Mandate. Served on 07/31/2017. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/31/2017 01:20 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009847864 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            [10486215] Response filed by Leonard Willie, Lorraine J. Barboan, Christine G. Begay, Laura H. Chaco, Glen C. Charleston, Glenda G. Charleston, Jimmy A. Charley, Kalvin Charley, Marla L. Charley, Mary B. Charley, Melvin L. Charley, Jones Dehiya, Bob Grey, Jimmie Grey, Thompson Grey, Benjamin A. House, Dorothy W. House, Mary R. House, Charley J. Johnson, Elouise J. Smith, Annie H. Sorrell, Shawn Stevens and Irene Willie to APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY ISSUANCE OF MANDATE. Served on 07/28/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] MMM [Entered: 07/28/2017 02:58 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009846784 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              [10485585] Motion filed by Appellant Public Service Company of New Mexico to Stay Issuance of Mandate. Served on: 07/26/2017. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] --[Edited 07/27/2017 by AT to reflect counsel filed a motion to stay the mandate.] KRA [Entered: 07/26/2017 05:00 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009844580 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                [10484531] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips and McHugh denying appellant's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Public Service Company of New Mexico. The petition for rehearing en banc was transmitted to all of the judges of the court who are in regular active service. As no member of the panel and no judge in regular active service on the court requested that the court be polled, that petition is also denied. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/21/2017 04:43 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009842267 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  [10483332] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Phillips and McHugh granting Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC’s unopposed motion for an extension of time to file motion for leave to file brief of amicus curiae. Served on 07/18/2017. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:13 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009841914 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    [10483176] Proposed amicus curiae brief received from Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC but not filed. Served on 07/17/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-2050] [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:24 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009841888 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      [10483168] Motion filed by Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 07/17/2017 Manner of service: email.--[Edited 07/17/2017 by SDS to remove proposed brief from entry. Brief has been docketed as received by clerk] [16-2050] DMB [Entered: 07/17/2017 04:14 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009839199 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        [10481803] Motion filed by Amicus Curiae Transwestern Pipeline Company, LLC to extend time to file an amicus brief until 07/17/2017.. Served on: 07/11/2017. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-2050] EJK [Entered: 07/11/2017 03:49 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?