Valdovinos v. E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:11-cv-06170
District Judge Michael H. Simon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 11:20 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Abel Valdovinos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin M. Pettigrew +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 epettigrew@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brophy Schmor Brophy Paradis Maddox & Weaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic M. Campanella +1 541 772 7123 +1 541 772 7249 dcampanella@brophylegal.com
No Logo Israel Figueroa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brophy Schmor Brophy Paradis Maddox & Weaver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic M. Campanella +1 541 772 7123 +1 541 772 7249 dcampanella@brophylegal.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0216
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Default Judgment. Signed on 5/1/2013 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Proposed Form of Order Submitted in Support of Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER - Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment 28 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Default Judgment, # 2 Plaintiff's Declaration In Support of Default Judgment, # 3 Jonasson Declaration In Support of Default Judgment, # 4 Exhibit A to Jonasson Decl ISO, # 5 Exhibit B to Jonasson Decl ISO) (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion to Reopen Case . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Declaration In Support) (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Appearance of Erin M. Pettigrew appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pettigrew, Erin) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Judgment of Default. Signed on 4/5/2013 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER - Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default 23 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Motion for Default. Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Related document(s): Motion for default 23 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 08/05/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 08/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MINUTES of Telephone Rule 16 Conference: Order - Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 19 is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to RENEW. Defendant's oral motion for extension of time to answer is GRANTED. Answer due by 6/4/2012. Discovery is to be completed by 7/31/2012. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/31/2012. Pretrial Order is due by 8/31/2012. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Dominic Campanella present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - The Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2012 will take place by phone. The Court will initiate the call to the parties. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Affidavit of Dominic M. Campanella in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney 19 .) (Campanella, Dominic) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney . Filed by All Defendants. (Campanella, Dominic) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Order - The Court will discuss Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 16 at the Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2012. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Declaration of Dominic M. Campanella . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 16 .) (Campanella, Dominic) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Campanella, Dominic) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Plaintiffs (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER - Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 11 as follows: Discovery is to be completed by 4/20/2012. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2012. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2012. Setting a Rule 16 Conference for 5/4/2012 at 09:30AM in Portland, Chambers 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (mja) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Stipulated Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration of D. Michael Dale . Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 11 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Certificate of Service by Abel Valdovinos (Declaration of D. Michael Dale) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Summons Returned Executed. as to Israel Figueroa served on 9/14/2011, answer due on 10/5/2011 Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Returned Executed. as to E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC served on 9/12/2011, answer due on 10/3/2011 Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Appearance of Dominic M. Campanella appearing on behalf of E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC, Israel Figueroa Filed by on behalf of E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC, Israel Figueroa (Campanella, Dominic) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER - Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 4 as follows: Service of papers due 11/29/2011. Discovery is to be completed by 12/29/2011. Joint Status Report is due by 1/18/2012 Pretrial Order is due by 1/18/2012 Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Declaration of D. Michael Dale ISO Motion for Extension of Discovery and PTO Deadlines. Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 4 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Abel Valdovinos. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ann L. Aiken to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. Discovery is to be completed by 9/19/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/17/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 10/17/2011. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (sln) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Complaint. Summons issued as to defendant. Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Abel Valdovinos against E-Z's Landscape & Construction LLC, Israel Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (sln) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?