Miles v. Berryhill
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 7:17-cv-00212

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 16, 2019 at 2:46 PM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Judgment Attorney Fees
        JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/6/2018. (Collins, S.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/6/2018. (Collins, S.)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None judgment
              JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/11/2018. (Tripp, S.)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to AgencyCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 20 Consent Motion to Remand Under Sentence Four to Social Security Administration - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/11/2018. (Tripp, S.)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Remand to Agency
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Transcripts - Social Security Case
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Transcripts - Social Security Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?