Laterza v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:17-cv-81221

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 30, 2019 at 3:48 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Laterza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Laterza
v.
No Logo Office of the Florida Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "Attorney General of the State of Florida"

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2255 US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2255 US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Expedite
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE on or before November 27, 2017, the movant shall file a Notice with the Court in which he either: (A) agrees to the recharacterization of his pro se pleading as a Section 2255 motion, or (B) withdraws the criminal motion rather than have the Court re-characterize it as a Section 2255 motion to vacate, ( Amended Complaint due by 12/11/2017 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/6/2017. (fbn)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. §2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/6/2017. (fbn)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/6/2017. (fbn)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 11/29/2017. Motions due by 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Form) (fbn)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPENDIX to 1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Anthony Laterza (jua) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM of State Remedies Exhausted re 1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Anthony Laterza. (jua) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (FEE NOT PAID/NO IFP), filed by Anthony Laterza.(jua) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?