Brewer v. Mosbacher
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-02563-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo John N. Brewer, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 ikator@katorparks.com
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo Robert A. Mosbacher, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Bennett +1 901 861 4660

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/5/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 633 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Frederick
Terminated 11/17/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/17/1992, Entered: 11/18/1992 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal and "APPROVAL" "DISMISSING" Civil Action with Prejudice pursuant to the attached Settlement Agreement. (Signed J. Frederick Motz 11/17/92) (c/m 11/17/92-gs) (MICROFILMED 11/18/92) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1992, Entered: 11/18/1992 Terminated Case
    Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/25/1992 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [12-1] motion of defendant to Extend Time, "extending" discovery and status report deadline to 7/31/92, motions deadline to 8/28/92. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m 5/22/92 jt) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/19/1992, Entered: 5/25/1992, Terminated: 5/22/1992 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        MOTION by Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. to Extend Time (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/1992, Entered: 3/3/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m by chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/10/1992
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 3/3/1992 Response in Opposition
            RESPONSE by Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. in opposition to [7-1] Letter order dated 1/30/92 (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/10/1992
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/13/1992, Entered: 2/16/1992 Remark
              Memorandum of plaintiff regarding a continuing violation theory and evidence of time barred discrimination. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/1992, Entered: 2/4/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                LETTER ORDER denying [5-1] motion to Dismiss case, informing plaintiff to file a further memorandum by 2/13/92, defendant may then file a responsive memorandum by 2/27/92. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/10/1992
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1992, Entered: 1/30/1992 Remark
                  Reassignment letter mailed to counsel. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 1/30/1992 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    CASE reassigned to Judge J. F. Motz (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 Response in Support of Motion
                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. in support of [5-1] motion to Dismiss case. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/10/1992
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 1/20/1992 Response in Opposition
                        RESPONSE by John N. Brewer Jr. in opposition to [5-1] motion to Dismiss case and Exhibit 1 and 2. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/27/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992, Terminated: 1/30/1992 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. to Dismiss case (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 12/9/1991 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by John N. Brewer Jr. , (Answer due 12/2/91 for Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. ) amending [1-1] complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: 11/10/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert A. Mosbacher Sr.(USA office) 10/28/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/6/1991, Entered: 9/11/1991 Summons Issued
                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Robert A. Mosbacher Sr. (60 days) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/1991, Entered: 9/11/1991 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 089768 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?