ME2 Productions Inc v. Doe 1
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00099
District Judge Robert S. Lasnik, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 2:52 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ME2 Productions Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 701 Fifth Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com
Space David A. Lowe +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 Lowe@lowegrahamjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch Van Sickle Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Matthew Van Sickle +1 919 469 5685 rmv@lynchvansickle.com
v.
No Logo Aziza Hemed, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Carlos Hernandez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Edward Krueger +1 305 255 6901 kruegera@bellsouth.net
Space Benjamin Laurence Pavone +1 619 224 8885 +1 619 224 8886 bpavone@cox.net

Toggle Switch Represented by a2xlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Austin W Anderson +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 austin@a2xlaw.com
Space Lauren Elizabeth Braddy +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 lauren@a2xlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Clifton Alexander +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284

Toggle Switch Represented by bhglaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shane D Buntrock +1 480 664 7728 +1 480 668 3110 shane@bhglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlos Hernandez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos Hernandez

Toggle Switch Represented by Feldman, Fox & Morgado, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis A. Creed, III +1 813 261 7800 +1 813 261 7899 dcreed@ffmlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lackie, Dammeier & McGill APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A McGill +1 909 985 4003 +1 909 985 3299 mcgill@policeattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of George F Schaefer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer K Gilman +1 619 533 5853 +1 619 533 5856 jgilman@sandiego.gov
Space Stacy Jo Plotkin-Wolff +1 619 236 6486 +1 619 533 5856 sjpwolff@sandiego.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard, Carder, Nathan, Zuckerman, Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron D. Kaufmann +1 510 272 0169 +1 510 272 0174 akaufmann@leonardcarder.com
Space Giselle Olmedo +1 510 272 0169 +1 510 272 0174 golmedo@leonardcarder.com
Space David P. Pogrel +1 510 272 0169 dpogrel@leonardcarder.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lorance & Thompson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. Smith, Jr. +1 713 868 5560

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell D. Gliner, Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell David Gliner +1 702 870 8700 +1 702 870 0034 mgliner@glinerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Monteiro & Fishman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus Monteiro +1 516 280 9600 +1 516 280 4530 mmonteiro@mflawny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cullen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T Cullen +1 626 744 9125 +1 626 744 9436 paul@cullenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by wagesdue.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia Marie Gonzalez +1 727 831 0009 +1 866 593 6771 cynthia@wagesdue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis A. Cabassa +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 lcabassa@wfclaw.com
Space Brandon J. Hill +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 bhill@wfclaw.com
No Logo D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh, Defendant
No Logo Dara Chamroeun, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Zappalo, Defendant
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cigel Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Rick Alan Cigel +1 424 901 8513 +1 424 901 8514 rick.cigel@cigellawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 1

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric J. Menhart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Eric J. Menhart

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ansel Jay Halliburton +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 ansel@krinternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of DAVID H MADDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David Hamlin Madden +1 503 679 1671 +1 503 512 6113 ecf@mersenne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Kelley Marie Blasa Fox +1 213 281 5280 +1 213 250 7900 kelley.fox@lewisbrisbois.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NEELEMAN LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jennifer L Neeleman +1 425 212 4800 jneeleman@expresslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Novation Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin R. Christison +1 503 390 2044 +1 971 216 4990 erinc@novationlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Wyoming Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jeremy A Gross +1 307 777 6946 +1 307 777 3542 jeremy.gross@wyo.gov
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John H Ridge +1 307 777 7862 +1 307 777 8920 john.ridge@wyo.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Pietz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Doe 10

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY ARMSTRONG & FELTON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Lory R Lybeck +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 4255 lory@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Charles P. LaPolla +1 212 382 0700 +1 212 382 0888 clapolla@ostrolenk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perry, Krumsiek & Jack, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 720 4300 tcornell@pkjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe 11, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Byrd and Byrd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Timothy Patrick Leahy +1 301 464 7448 +1 301 805 5178 tleahy@byrdandbyrd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tishler & Wald, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alexander D. Kerr, Jr. +1 312 876 3800 +1 312 876 3816 akerr@tishlerandwald.com
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAVEZ LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Robert H Chavez +1 206 789 1614 roberthchavez@chavezlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Karl Van Gardner +1 713 626 8900 vgardner@msandz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mestemaker Straub Zumwalt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 David Kent Mestemaker +1 713 626 8900 dkm@mestemakerstraub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHER & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Arnold Richer
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by atlawip.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jeffrey Thomas Breloski +1 404 495 3681 +1 404 365 9532 jbreloski@atlawip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Norman Rocco Cerullo +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6835 ncerullo@rmfpc.com
TERMINATED: 11/17/2016 Jennifer Leigh Hartmann +1 516 663 6600 +1 516 663 6743 jhartmann@rmfpc.com
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 14

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doe 14

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kent L Greenberg PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent L. Greenberg +1 410 363 1020 +1 410 363 1022 kent@klgreenberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean T. Carnathan +1 781 359 9002 +1 781 359 9001 scarnathan@ocmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leslie Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doe 15

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter R. Irvine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter R. Irvine

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of John M G Murphy LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M G Murphy +1 410 244 6700 +1 866 260 1396 jmurphy@johnmgmurphylaw.com
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Godfread Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul A Godfread +1 612 284 7325 +1 612 605 6001 paul@godfreadlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo Doe 18, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 18

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 Doe 18

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com
No Logo Doe 19, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee & Hayes PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarthy Winkelman and Morrow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael John Winkelman +1 301 262 7422 +1 301 262 0562 mike@mcwmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Harbor Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Isabelle Casey Rajwani +1 508 842 9244 +1 508 842 9311 crajwani@harborlaw.com
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel A. Bushnell +1 561 835 9400
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel G. Booth +1 617 250 8602 +1 617 250 8883 dbooth@boothsweet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Craig D. Feiser +1 904 630 1834 +1 904 630 1316 cfeiser@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Manuel J Dominguez - NOT SWORN +1 561 578 6850 +1 202 408 4699 jdominguez@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe #2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 2

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parks Bauer Sime & Winkler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Billy M. Sime +1 503 371 3502 +1 503 371 0429 bsime@pbswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John E Whitaker +1 206 436 8500 john@whitaker.law
No Logo Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo Doe 21, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason E Sweet +1 617 250 8602 +1 617 250 8883 jsweet@boothsweet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonzalez & Mosier Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberto Rondero de Mosier +1 512 394 3564 rc@gonzalezmosier.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaw Morrow and Joseph PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C Morrow +1 443 330 9000 +1 443 330 9009 tmorrow@shaw-morrow.com
No Logo Doe 22, Defendant
No Logo Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo Doe 24, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gohn Hankey & Stichel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
I.P. address  173.78.205.194
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 Jan Ingham Berlage +1 410 752 1261 +1 410 472 2915 JBerlage@GHSLLP.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Doe 24

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
I.P. address  173.78.205.194
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 Doe 24 +1 508 892 4879

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
I.P. address  173.78.205.194
TERMINATED: 01/11/2013 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com
No Logo Doe 25, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net
No Logo Doe 3, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Dale J Montpelier +1 865 673 0330 dalemontpelier@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Stephen K Perry +1 865 673 0330 +1 865 673 0440 stephenkperry@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Ankur V Shah +1 312 724 7807 ashah@alilawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 3

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 3
No Logo Doe 4, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cashman Law Firm, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert Z. Cashman +1 713 364 3476 rzcashman@cashmanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 4

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Crosetto jcrosetto@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scot Sikes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Molari, Edward R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Edward R. Molari +1 617 942 1532 +1 815 642 8351 edward@molarilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo Doe 5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Doe 6

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Doe 6

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John M Kuranty +1 630 322 8548 +1 708 430 1119 jkurantylaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David J. McGuire +1 860 586 8900 dmcguire@acluct.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Daniel Mach +1 202 637 6313 dmach@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Americans United for Sep of Church & State (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Alex J. Luchenitser +1 202 466 3234 luchenitser@au.org
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Robert S.H. Shapiro +1 202 466 3234 shapiro@au.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Public Representation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Sandra J. Staub +1 413 586 6024 +1 413 586 5711 sstaub@cpr-ma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MORSE BRATT ANDREWS & TERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 John Carlson Terry +1 360 213 2040 jterry@mbavancouverlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swider Medeiros & Haver LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Jessica L. McKie +1 503 226 8122 +1 503 295 2737 jmckie@smhllaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder robert@smhllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VRP Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 David N. Oskin +1 312 854 7090 david@caliberip.com
No Logo Doe 8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aguero Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Matthew Bryan Aguero +1 720 325 6787 maguero@aguerolawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2017 Nicholas S. Guerrera +1 978 689 0800 +1 978 794 0890 nguerrera@sgolawoffice.com
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
No Logo Elzie Henderson, Defendant
No Logo Fahad Busbait, Defendant
No Logo Jake Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Jean Yoon, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Mosso, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee & Hayes PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2017

agent ofDoe 7
TERMINATED: 06/06/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com
No Logo Jose Ermilo Medina, Defendant
No Logo Kiranjit Singh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LYBECK PEDREIRA & JUSTUS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R Justus +1 206 230 4255 +1 206 230 7791 ben@lpjustus.com
No Logo Liliana Ramos, Defendant
No Logo Lorin Emtage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LeRoy H Brettin, Jr. +1 206 522 7100 lbrettin@brettinlaw.com
No Logo Merridy Eason, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Crockett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee & Hayes PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2017

agent ofDoe 17
TERMINATED: 06/06/2017 TTAB Attorney Placeholder chris@leehayes.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Judgment by Court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
        ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 79 , 81 , 83 , 85 , 87 , 89 , 91 Motions for Default Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendants for the amount specified in this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Liliana Ramos via USPS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Praecipe-Other
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Motion for Default Judgment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Motion for Default
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/16/2017, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Aziza Hemed by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Kiranjit Singh, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Raymond Crockett and Jeff Mosso, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jean Yoon (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carlos Hernandez (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Elzie Henderson (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Merridy Eason (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dara Chamroeun (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fahad Busbait (KERR) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 53 MOTION for Default against Jean Yoon (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for Default against Jean Yoon, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 51 MOTION for Default against D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Default against D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 49 MOTION for Default against Carlos Hernandez (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Default against Carlos Hernandez, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 47 MOTION for Default against Elzie Henderson (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Default against Elzie Henderson, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 45 MOTION for Default against Merridy Eason (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Default against Merridy Eason, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 43 MOTION for Default against Dara Chamroeun (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Default against Dara Chamroeun, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 41 MOTION for Default against Fahad Busbait (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default against Fahad Busbait, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/31/2017, (Billick, Timothy) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Aziza Hemed. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Christopher Lynch on behalf of Defendant Jeff Mosso. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Christopher Lynch on behalf of Defendant Raymond Crockett. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Merridy Eason on 4/29/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Lorin Emtage mailed on 3/28/2017 (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dara Chamroeun on 5/1/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Liliana Ramos on 4/30/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kiranjit Singh on 4/29/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jean Yoon mailed on 3/28/2017 (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Raymond Crockett on 5/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Carlos Hernandez on 4/29/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh mailed on 3/28/2017 (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Elzie Henderson mailed on 3/28/2017 (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aziza Hemed on 5/1/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Fahad Busbait on 5/6/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jeff Mosso on 5/6/2017, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Debbie Zappalo, Jose Ermilo Medina and Jake Mitchell, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Kiranjit Singh. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LeRoy H Brettin, Jr on behalf of Defendant Lorin Emtage. (Brettin, LeRoy) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Fahad Busbait, Dara Chamroeun, Raymond Crockett, Merridy Eason, Lorin Emtage, Aziza Hemed, Carlos Hernandez, Jose Ermilo Medina (Main Document), Jake Mitchell, Jeff Mosso, Liliana Ramos, Kiranjit Singh, Jean Yoon, Debbie Zappalo. (Attachments: # 1 Issued Summons for Jake Mitchell, # 2 Issued Summons for Jeff Mosso, # 3 Issued Summons for Debbie Zappalo, # 4 Issued Summons for Fahad Busbait, # 5 Issued Summons for Aziza Hemed, # 6 Issued Summons for Carlos Hernandez, # 7 Issued Summons for Raymond Crockett, # 8 Issued Summons for Jean Yoon, # 9 Issued Summons for Kiranjit Singh, # 10 Issued Summons for Liliana Ramos, # 11 Issued Summons for Dara Chamroeun, # 12 Issued Summons for Lorin Emtage, # 13 Issued Summons for Merridy Eason) (SWT) (Sent to Plaintiff's counsel via CM/ECF) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty days to file proofs of waiver as to all defendants or a second motion for extension of time, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 6 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Doe 2 by parties (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of David A. Lowe filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/13/2017, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Jose Ermilo Medina, Jake Mitchell, Jeff Mosso, Debbie Zappalo, Fahad Busbait, Aziza Hemed, Elzie Henderson, D'Anthony Le-Greenhalgh, Carlos Hernandez, Raymond Crockett, Jean Yoon, Kiranjit Singh, Liliana Ramos, Dara Chamroeun, Lorin Emtage, Merridy Eason with JURY DEMAND, filed by ME2 Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Doe 2. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Justus on behalf of Defendant Doe 6. (Justus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Christopher Lynch on behalf of Defendant Doe 19. (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting plaintiff's 5 Motion to Expedite Discovery by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT on the filing of a Copyright by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. (Sent via U.S. Postal Service to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (DJ) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc re 5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/24/2017, (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent A&T IP, Inc. for ME2 Productions, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ME2 Productions, Inc (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. (Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-4744123) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party ME2 Productions, Inc(pty:pla), filed by ME2 Productions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Lowe, David) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?