Toy-Duckwall, et al v. Durkee

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-02303-WEB
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robin Toy-Duckwall, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Scott +1 301 776 8400 +1 301 776 7666

Represented by Donohue Patrick, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra C. Aldrich +1 302 998 0100
Space Arthur M. Krawitz +1 302 998 0100 artkrawitz@dplaw.com
Space Robert Pasquale +1 302 998 0100

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
v.
No Logo Elizabeth Laura Durkee, Defendant

Represented by hyatt.hpwsb.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Joseph Weber +1 410 266 0626 +1 410 841 5065 pweber@hyatt.hpwsb.com
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/16/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 11/19/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of plaintiff Robin Toy-Duckwall and defendant Elizabeth Laura Durkee of dismissal of the above-captioned matter with prejudice and "APPROVAL" ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black, Jr. ) dated December 2, 1993. (c/m 12/3/93 cmh) (microfilmed 12/16/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, "DISMISSING" this action as to all counterclaims, cross-claims, and third-party claims, if any, with each party to bear its own costs, without prejudice as set forth. ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr., dated 11/15/93 ) (c/m 11/19/93, bmh) Microfilmed 11/22/93 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993, Terminated: 11/10/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated November 9, 1993 granting [14-1] motion by Robin Toy-Duckwall for Robert Pasquale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m & c/s Augie Cage 11/10/93 ems) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993, Terminated: 11/10/1993 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION by Robin Toy-Duckwall for Robert Pasquale to Appear Pro Hac Vice (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated March 3, 1993 "DIRECTING" that the plaintiff Robin Toy-Duckwall appear for the taking of her deposition at the offices of Rollins, Smalkin, Richards & Mackie, 401 N. Charles Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201 at 10:00 a.m. on March 10, 1993 or be subject to sanctions to be determined by this Court. (c/m 3/4/93 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993 Motion to Compel
Certificate of Compliance With Federal Rule 37 and MOTION by Elizabeth Laura Durkee for Order Compelling Discovery (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 12/23/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER dated December 22, 1992 setting Jury trial set for 10:00 11/29/93 in Courtroom 7A ; Pretrial conference will be held in Chambers for 4:30 11/18/93 ; Pretrial order to be submitted in Chambers on or before 11/12/93 ; If the case is to be settled, it shall be settled on or before 11/26/93 as therein set forth ; Proposed voir dire questions, proposed instructions, motions in limine, objections to de bene esse depositions, proposed special interrogatories to the jury, etc. should be submitted in Chambers by 11/26/93 at 2:00 ; Discovery cutoff 4/30/93 . ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 Status Conference
Status conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/10/1992 Status Report
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Robin Toy-Duckwall, Elizabeth Laura Durkee. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992, Terminated: 8/28/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [9-1] motion of Plaintiff for Arthur M. Krawitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 8/28/92, cr, cc Augie) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992, Terminated: 8/28/1992 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION with memorandum in support by Robin Toy-Duckwall for Arthur M. Krawitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992, Terminated: 8/28/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [8-1] motion of Plaintiff for Debra C. Aldrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 8/28/92, cr, cc Augie) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992, Terminated: 8/28/1992 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION with memorandum in support by Robin Toy-Duckwall for Debra C. Aldrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/17/1992, Entered: 6/18/1992 Status Conference
Status conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/26/1992, Terminated: 5/22/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [7-1] motion for William J. Klumpp,Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney William H. Klumpp for Elizabeth Laura Durkee granting [7-2] motion to Substitute Attorney terminated attorney William H. Klumpp for Elizabeth Laura Durkee Added Paul J. Weber ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. 5/22/92) (c/m 5/22/92-vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/26/1992, Terminated: 5/22/1992 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION by Elizabeth Laura Durkee for William J. Klumpp,Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney , and to Substitute Attorney . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Robin Toy-Duckwall. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/6/1992, Entered: 5/11/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER (letter) ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated May 4, 1992 "DIRECTING" counsel should file a joint status report pursuant to Section III of the Scheduling Order on or before May 14, 1992. (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER dated October 25, 1991 setting Discovery cutoff 4/27/92 ; Joining of parties,amending of pleadings on 4/27/92 ; Deadline for filing a joint status report in Chambers by 4/27/92 ; Deadline for filing of all motions for summary judgment by 5/27/92 ; ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 10/24/1991 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Elizabeth Laura Durkee (Attorney William H. Klumpp Jr.), (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/1991, Entered: 8/23/1991 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Elizabeth Laura Durkee (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: 8/23/1991 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Robin Toy-Duckwall (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: 8/23/1991 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 089432 (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 48 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?