Crush v. Pepsi-Cola Oprt. Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-02669-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judith A. Crush, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stock & Leader

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C Gierasch, Jr +1 717 846 9800 +1 717 843 6134
v.
No Logo Pepsi-Cola Operating Company of Chesapeake and Indianapolis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Adams +1 864 298 8417 +1 864 298 8520
Space Patricia K. Gilmore +1 202 965 6100 +1 202 625 3150

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/16/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Howard
Terminated 2/28/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/1992, Entered: 3/3/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "DISMISSING" Civil Action with Each Party to Bear its Own Costs Unless Otherwise Agreed, Without Prejudice to the Right of a Party to Move for Good Cause within 90 Days to Reopen this Action if Settlement is not Consummated ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/27/92 ). (c/m 2/27/92-dc) (Microfilmed 2/28/92) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/1992, Entered: 3/3/1992 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 2/25/1992, Entered: 3/6/1992 OrderCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM ORDER informing Counsel the pretrial conference set for 7/10/92 is cancelled and the trial date of 9/8/92 is cancelled as therein set forth.( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 1/28/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SUBSTITUTE SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 12/30/91 ). (c/m 1/3/92-dc) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/1991, Entered: 12/8/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 11/14/91 ). (c/m 11/18/91-dc) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/25/1991, Entered: 11/3/1991 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Patricia K. Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. 10/24/91 ). (c/m 10/25/91-cl) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: 11/3/1991, Terminated: 10/25/1991 motion to appear pro hac vice
              MOTION by Pepsi-Cola Oprt. Co. for Patricia K. Gilmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Statement of Points and Authorities and Affidavit. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1991, Entered: 11/3/1991 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by Pepsi-Cola Oprt. Co. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/1991, Entered: 11/3/1991 Remark
                  Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Defendant. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/1991, Entered: 9/26/1991 Remark
                    Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Plaintiff. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/1991, Entered: 9/17/1991 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for Pepsi-Cola Oprt. Co. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/1991, Entered: 9/17/1991 Jury Demand
                        DEMAND for jury trial by Judith A. Crush. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/1991, Entered: 9/17/1991 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 089938 (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 47 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?