United States v. $69,194.00 in United States Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:17-cv-00432

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2019 at 12:16 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo $69,194.00 in United States Currency, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Paul Huffer, Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), Plaintiff's cause of action against the Defendant/Claimant is hereby dismissed in its entirety. The parties are responsible for their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER - The parties' Settlement Stipulation pertaining to resolution of this case (Filing No. 27 ) is approved. As directed by Court order (Filing No. 6 ), the United States published notice of its intent to dispose of Defendant property. A De claration of Publication was filed on January 10, 2018 (Filing No. 8 ). The parties have advised that no other Claim or Answer has been filed in this case, other than by Paul Huffer. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, two thousand five hundre d dollars ($2,500.00) of Defendant property shall be returned to Claimant, Paul Huffer. Payment shall be tendered to the trust account of the Claimant's attorney, Thomas M. Petersen. The remaining Defendant property ($66,694.00), shall be forfeited to the United States, with all right, title and interest in or to such property held by any person or entity forever barred and foreclosed. The U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall dispose of said $66,694.00 in accordance with the law. Plaintiff and Claimant shall pay their own costs and attorney's fees associated with this lawsuit. On or before November 19, 2018, Claimant's counsel shall file a Receipt indicating receipt of the funds. Thereafter, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Entry of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Index
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    Verified CLAIM by Paul Huffer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A") (Petersen, Thomas)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      CLAIM by $69,194.00 in United States Currency (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A") (Petersen, Thomas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas M. Petersen on behalf of Defendant $69,194.00 in United States Currency (Petersen, Thomas)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, Warrant on 1/16/2018 upon Ernest Garrett by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant on 1/9/2018 upon Paul Huffer by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Advertisement Certification Report)(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant on 11/13/2017 upon $69,194.00 in US Currency by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Publication (Filing No. 5 ). The Motion is granted. The United States shall publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      WARRANT IN REM Issued. (E-mailed to USA) (KLF)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Svoboda, Nancy)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (KLF) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $69,194.00 in United States Currency, by Attorney Nancy A. Svoboda on behalf of United States of America(Svoboda, Nancy)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?