Yvonne Marie Soltero v. Los Angeles Dodger LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC661158

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2017 at 9:43 PM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1 To 100, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

No Logo Los Angeles Dodger Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

No Logo Soltero Yvonne Marie, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee Lisa W. - Deputy City Atty.
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Answer to amended complaint
    Blank 10 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 First Amended Complaint
      Blank 9 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Order
      Authorizing Electronic Service Case Anywhere**
        Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Order: Case Management
          Blank 7 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Stip & Order-use CSR
          Brenda Sanches CSR# 13019 661 513-6100 bsanchescsr@gmail.com
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Report - Status
            JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT
              Blank 5 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice
              DEFT LOS ANGELES DODGERS, LLC NT OF APPEARANCE
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Proof-Service/Summons
                SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL COVER SHEET;ADDENDUM;NT OF CASE ASSIGNMENT
                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Amendment to Complaint
                  Incorrect Name: Los Angeles Dodger, LLC True Name: Los Angeles Dodgers, LLC
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order
                    Initial Status Conference Order
                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Complaint

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 132 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?