Zen Magnets, LLC v. Consumer Product Safety Commission
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02645

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2021 at 11:23 AM ST (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zen Magnets, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Zen Magnets, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zen Magnets, LLC
v.
No Logo Consumer Product Safety Commission, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Alter Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
              ORDER finding as moot 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final decision is reversed and remanded. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/12/18. (jdyne, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?