USA v. Burrell et al

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00095
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alison J. Nathan
Last Updated September 27, 2023 at 3:51 PM EDT (1.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Carletto Allen, Defendant (52)

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment OLUBUKOLA O. ADETULA +1 973 416 1000 adetulaesq@aol.com

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Helene Rachel Hechtkopf +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 hhechtkopf@hnrklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment John Joseph Kenney +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jkenney@hrklaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (234) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3505 Filed: 9/27/2023, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3163 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3113 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2980 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2960 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2957 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2933 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2921 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated November 9, 2017 re: Associate Payment (Kenney, John) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1888 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1887 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: Attached is a draft of the jury charge, incorporating the changes discussed at the charging conference. In addition, the charge includes the following changes: 1. The second sentence of the Government's proposed redaction instruction, see Dkt. No. 1871, has been changed to read: "'Redacted' means that part of the document was taken out." 2. Given Defense Counsel's representations that the only witness he would call, if any, would be the Defendant, the instruction titled "Opinion of Defendant's Character" has been removed. 3. The hard copy of the instructions circulated by the Court at the charging conference unintentionally omitted the Government's requested change to Instruction No. 22. That change - as described in the Government's letter dated November 7, 2017, see Dkt. No. 1871 - is now incorporated in the charge. Also attached is a redline comparison between the charge circulated by the Court on November 7, 2017, and the version attached here. The parties shall be prepared to make any final objections that could not have been made earlier to the attached jury charge by 9 a.m. on November 9, 2017. The Court also attaches a final version of the verdict form, which incorporates the changes discussed at the charging conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/8/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1881 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/9/17 re: Cross-Examination Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MOTION for Acquittal Motion for a Judgement of Acquittal. Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Kenney, John) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Carletto Allen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/26/17 CORRECTED CONFERENCE has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Carletto Allen re: Conference held on 10/26/17 CORRECTED CONFERENCE before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Carletto Allen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/26/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Carletto Allen re: Conference held on 10/26/17 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1874 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: Upon reflection, before proceeding to conduct any voir dire of the Cooperating Witness, the Court will require the Government to proffer to the Court (1) how the Defendant and the Cooperating Witness came to be in the hall at the same time; and (2) a full account of what the Cooperating Witness would testify to regarding that interaction if he were permitted to so testify. The Government shall be prepared to make such a proffer by 9:15 a.m. on November 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/7/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: Attached is a draft of the jury charge for discussion at the charging conference. The parties should be prepared to discuss this draft by 9: 15 a.m. on November 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/7/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/7/17 re: Cross-Examination . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/7/17 re: Jury Charge . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/6/17 re: Defendant's Testimony . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: At the final pre-trial conference in this case, the Court preliminarily ruled that statements made by Mr. Allen during two state court guilty plea allocutions were admissible. Raising new arguments, Mr. Allen now seeks to preclude introduction of one of those sets of statements-the one arising from a January 9, 2015 arrest, which resulted in a plea to the charge of attempted criminal possession of a weapon in the second degree. See Dkt. No. 1841. Mr. Allen contends that the Government should be precluded from introducing evidence of the statements from his guilty plea allocution because shortly after entering the plea, Mr. Allen filed a motion to withdraw the plea on the grounds of ineffective assistance of counsel. The Government responds that Mr. Allen is now effectively seeking reconsideration of the Court's in limine ruling. See Dkt. No. 1850. In addition, the Government has submitted a redacted version of the plea allocution that it intends to offer into evidence, and the parties have agreed to a stipulation regarding the authenticity of the transcript of the allocution. See Dkt. No. 1853. The Court agrees with the Government that Mr. Allen's motion now is effectively a motion for reconsideration and a belated effort to relitigate an issue that the Court already decided. Accordingly, the Court denies it. See United States v. Yannotti, 457 F. Supp. 2d 385, 389 (S.D.N.Y. 2006) (noting that a motion for reconsideration "will generally be denied unless the moving party can point to controlling decisions or data that the court overlooked" (internal quotation marks omitted)). In any event, were the Court to consider the motion on the merits, it would not lead the Court to change its prior ruling. Mr. Allen's statements during his guilty plea are admissible as admissions by an opposing patty and thus are not hearsay. See Fed. R. Evid. 80l(d)(2)(A). The fact that that the defendant in a pro se capacity is seeking to withdraw his plea does not alter admissibility conclusion. Of course, as with any admissible out of court statement, Mr. Allen is free to demonstrate why the jury should not give much or any weight to Mr. Allen's statements. Moreover, Mr. Allen may propose a limiting instruction regarding his statements from his guilty plea allocution. Any proposed limiting instruction shall be submitted no later than 5 p.m. on November 4, 2017.The Court thus denies Mr. Allen's supplemental motion in limine. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1856 Filed: 11/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/5/17 re: Limiting Instruction Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/05/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 11/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated November 5, 2017 re: Proposed limiting instruction (Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 11/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. As the Court considers the arguments made by the Defendant in his supplemental motion in limine, see Dkt. No. 1841, and those made by the Government in its response, see Dkt. No. 1850, the Court directs the Government to submit by 4 p.m. on November 3, 2017, answers to the following: Assuming the Court permits it, how does the Government intend to move Mr. Allen's state court guilty plea allocutions into evidence? Specifically, will the accuracy of each transcript be stipulated to, or will a witness be called to authenticate them? What exact portion of each transcript does the Government intend to introduce into evidence? What limiting instruction would be appropriate? SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/3/17 re: Guilty Plea Allocution Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Government Exhibit)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated November 3, 2017 re: Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Guilty Plea . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. The Court orders that Docket Number 1826 be stricken from the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 1840 LETTER MOTION as to Carletto Allen (52). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Carletto Allen. MCC Inmate #77444-054 may receive four changes of clothes for his trial. The four changes of clothes will be delivered by Ms. Jessica Kaplove to the Metropolitan Correctional Center for Mr. Allen's use during the trial. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017) (ft) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated November 1, 2017 re: Redacted Limiting Instructions (Kenney, John) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/3/17 re: Voir Dire Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. The Court directs the Government to submit any response to the Defendant's supplemental motion in limine regarding Mr. Allen's 2015 guilty plea, see Dkt. No. 1841, by noon on November 3, 2017. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Carletto Allen. Accordingly, the Government's request for the UC to testify at trial without providing his true name is also GRANTED. The Government is directed to arrange all accommodations and logistics indicated in its motion. The Government may contact the Court's Courtroom Deputy for a courtroom to set upthe audio. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/3/17 re: Witnesses Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated November 2, 2017 re: Individuals to sit at defense table during voir dire (Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine and Opposition to Government's Motion in Limine (Docket No. 1817). Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated November 2, 2017 re: Trial Clothing . Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenney, John) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/2/17 re: Voir Dire Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/2/17 re: Entry of Proposed Order . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order re: Undercover Officer)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. The parties are directed to submit by noon on November 3, 2017, a joint proposed description of the case for use at voir dire.In addition, each party shall submit a list of anyone who will be present at its counsel table during voir dire. These submissions are also due at noon on November 3, 2017. Likewise, the Court directs the Defendant to submit any response to the Government's supplemental motion in limine regarding the identity of a confidential informant, see Dkt. No. 1831, by noon on November 3, 2017. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/2/17)(jw) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: The trial in this matter is scheduled to begin at 9 a.m. on November 6, 2017. The Court is in receipt of the Government's motion for limited courtroom closure, to which the Defendant does not object. See Dkt. No. 1828. The motion is under consideration. Given that the Court may grant the motion, the Government is directed to submit a proposed order to the Court by the end of the day today, November 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/2/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1835 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1834 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated November 2, 2017 re: Supplemental Motion in Limine (Identity of Informant) . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Carletto Allen re 1828 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/1/17 re: Limited Courtroom Closure (On Consent) .. (Maimin, Rachel) Modified on 11/2/2017 (ka). (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1829 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/1/17 re: Proposed Documents and Language . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Names and Places, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/1/17 re: Limited Courtroom Closure (On Consent). Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) Modified on 11/2/2017 (ka). (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. At the pre-trial conference on October 26, 2017, the Court instructed the parties to submit on or before October 31, 2017, a joint proposal-or, in the alternative, an explanation of the parties' dispute regarding the proposal-for a limiting instruction to inform the jury that Mr. Allen's incarceration at the time of a particular statement is not proof of criminal propensity or guilt. See Dkt. No. 1808. The Court is not in receipt of such a proposal. The parties are ordered to submit any proposal for such a limiting instruction on or before November 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/1/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen: The Court is in receipt of a request from the Government to seal exhibits to its supplemental motion in limine, submitted on October 31, 2017. The Court grants the request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/1/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on 1817 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica K. Feinstein dated October 31, 2017 re: Supplemental Motions in Limine regarding Certain Disciplinary Proceedings of Testifying Witnesses. ENDORSEMENT: The Court directs the Defendant to submit any response to this motion on or before November 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 11/2/2017) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/1/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1819 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica K. Feinstein dated October 31, 2017 re: Supplemental Motions in Limine regarding Certain Disciplinary Proceedings of Testifying Witnesses . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Carletto Allen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on CORRECTED CONFERNCE has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1808 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Carletto Allen re: Conference held on 10/26/17 CORRECTED CONFERNCE before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on 1799 LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated October 26, 2017 re: Reply to the Government's motions in limine. ENDORSEMENT: In an order filed September 6, 2017, the Court set October 23, 2017, as the deadline to file any oppositions to motions in limine. See Dkt. No. 1694. Defendant Carletto Allen did not file any opposition on or before that date. Out of an abundance of caution, Chambers contacted counsel for Mr. Allen on October 25, 2017, who confirmed that Defendant had not filed and did not intend to file any opposition. The Court will likely rule on the motions in limine at the final pre-trial conference scheduled for today, October 26, 2017. The request is thus denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/26/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1799 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated October 26, 2017 re: Reply to the Government's motions in limine (Kenney, John) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Steven DeMarco appearing for Donque Tyrell. (DeMarco, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1795 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1794 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER 1790 LETTER MOTION it is hereby ORDERED that (1) counsel for defendant Carletto Allen must destroy or return to the Government all 3500 and Giglio material and any copies thereof for all Government witnesses (the "3500 Material") at the conclusion of the trial of this matter or when any appeal has become final; (2) the defense is precluded from disseminating any of the 3500 Material and any copies thereof to anyone beyond the defendant, defense counsel, and any paralegal or staff employed by the defense; and (3) the defendant himself is precluded from taking any 3500 Material and any copies thereof (except for the 3500 Material of law enforcement agents) with him into any jail facility, or possessing any of the 3500 Material and any copies thereof (except for the 3500 Material of law enforcement agents) in any jail facility, either before, during, or after trial, except that the defendant may review the 3500 Material in the possession of defense counsel or any paralegal or staff employed by the defense when in the presence of defense counsel or any paralegal or staff employed by the defense as to Carletto Allen (52) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/24/17) (jw) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Carletto Allen re: 1780 MOTION in Limine .. and Supplemental Motion in Limine (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 10/23/17 re: Entry of Revised Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maimin and Feinstein dated 10/20/17 re: Entry of Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(S8) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Carletto Allen (52) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss. (jm) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Donque Tyrell, Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated October 17, 2017 re: Update on Tyrell and Allen Superseding Indictments Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Marked Indictment)(Kenney, John) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proposed Jury Instructions by Carletto Allen. (Kenney, John) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1776 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on 1766 LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Helene R. Hechtkopf dated October 6, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Allen's trial commencing on November 6, 2017, shall proceed on the S7 indictment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/11/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request To Charge by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1767 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Helene R. Hechtkopf dated October 6, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment (Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(S7) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Carletto Allen (52) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s. (jm) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Donque Tyrell, Domnick Sherland, Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica K. Feinstein dated October 4, 2017 re: Conference on October 5, 2017 Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on 1754 LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated October 2, 2017 re: Conference on October 5, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/3/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated October 2, 2017 re: Conference on October 5, 2017 (Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Donque Tyrell, Domnick Sherland, Carletto Allen: The Court is in receipt of the September 26, 2017 letter of the Government. Dkt. No. 1734. In that letter, the Government requests that the Court sever the trial of Defendant Allen from that of Defendants Sherland and Tyrell and delay trial for the latter two. The Government also represents that it intends to file Superseding Indictments against Defendants Allen and Tyrell. See id. The Court hereby schedules a conference for October 5, 2017, at 3:00p.m., to address the Government's request and representations. At that conference, counsel should be prepared to address two questions. First, why the Court should permit the Government to go to trial now on superseding indictments against Allen or Tyrell given the schedule in this case, which listed January 6, 2017, as the superseder deadline for all defendants. See Dkt. Nos. 220, 736, 961. Second, counsel should be prepared to address why severance at this time is necessary, particularly given that the Government initially grouped all three Defendants together in Group B. Dkt. No. 684. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/26/17 re: Severance and Scheduling . Document filed by USA as to Donque Tyrell, Domnick Sherland, Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1730 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1711 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Donque Tyrell, Domnick Sherland, Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/13/17 re: Hearing Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Donque Tyrell (5), Domnick Sherland (7), Carletto Allen (52), on re: 1687 LETTER by USA addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Jessica Feinstein dated August 31, 2017 re: Proposed Pretrial Schedule. October 9, 2017: Motions in limine, voir dire, and requests to charge due; Government provides notice of evidence it seeks to admit under Rule 404(b) of the Federal Rules of Evidence; Government submits revised letter listing racketeering acts it may prove at trial. October 23, 2017: Response to motions in limine due; Parties to give expert notice. October 27, 2017: Government turns over 18 U.S.C. § 3500 and Giglio material. November 3, 2017: Exhibits due. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule is approved. The Court hereby schedules a final pre-trial conference for October 26, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/5/2017)(bw) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Donque Tyrell, Domnick Sherland, Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated August 31, 2017 re: Proposed Pretrial Schedule Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. For the reasons set forth on the record at the conference held on August 28, 2017, the Court appointed CJA counsel Mr. Olubukola O. Adetulato to represent the defendant. The Court has not relieved Mr. John Kenney, who continues to represent Mr. Allen. As the Court explained on the record, Mr. Adetulato is a member of the New Jersey CJA panel, but not the SDNY CJA panel. Given the number of defendants in this case and in a related criminal case before Judge Kaplan, United States v. Parrish, No. 16- cr-212, it was necessary to appoint an attorney from the New Jersey CJA panel because many of the attorneys on the SDNY CJA panel have already been appointed to this case or Parrish or have a conflict that prevents them from being appointed. In light of those facts, and consistent with section VII(D) of the SDNY CJA Plan, the Court finds that there is good cause which renders it in the interests of justice that Mr. Adetulato, who is not employed by the Federal Defenders of New York or a member of the SDNY CJA Panel, be assigned to represent Mr. Allen. The Court obtained Mr. Allen's consent to the appointment of Mr. Adetulato at the August 28 conference (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2017)(jw) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1681 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess on 1666 LETTER by USA as to Domnick Sherland addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica K. Feinstein dated August 28, 2017 re: Correction to Minute Entries. The Government writes regard ing two recent minute entries on the docket in the Burrell case. On January 12, 2017, the Court set the trial for Group B defendants to begin on November 6, 2017. Minute entries for conferences on June 27, 2017, and August 18, 2017 incorrectly list the trial date as November 16, 2017. The Government respectfully requests that the Court direct the Clerk's Office to correct the minute entries to reflect the November 6, 2017 start date. ENDORSEMENT SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/2017)(bw) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1675 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1674 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1664 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1657 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on re: 1644 Letter, filed by Carletto Allen. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby schedules a conference to address the Defendant's request for substitute counsel for Monday, August 28th, 2017, at 11:15 a.m. (Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 8/28/2015 at 11:15 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated August 21, 2017 re: Substitution of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 August 16, 2017 Letter Containing the Order of the Court, # 2 October 20, 2016 Transcript)(Kenney, John) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1642 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1641 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1627 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Carletto Allen on re: 1611 Letter filed by Carletto Allen. ENDORSEMENT: The Court directs counsel to the transcript of the Oct. 20, 2017 conference, in which this Court addressed its policy as to change of counsel requests going forward. See Dkt. No. 809, at 18-22. In light of the Court's instructions at that conference, counsel for Mr. Allen is hereby ORDERED to meet with his client and discuss the contents of the Court's previous statement as to change of counsel requests. After such a discussion, should the request persist, counsel or Mr. Allen may resubmit the request in a letter. Defense counsel shall update the Court on or before August 22, 2017. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/16/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney dated August 16, 2017 re: Substitution of Counsel (Kenney, John) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1602 LETTER MOTION Adjournment of Deadlines as to Nico Burrell (2), Douglas McLarty (3), Martin Mitchell (4), Donque Tyrell (5), Gerard Bass (6), Domnick Sherland (7), Barffour Abeberse (8), Mashud Yoda (9), Anderson Ross (10), Anthony King (11), Mark Williams (12), Quaysean Cannonier (13), Tayquan Tucker (14), William Reid (15), Marlon Roberts (16), Abdullah Yoda (17), Kenneth Ruggs (18), Calvin Ruggs (19), Fabian Morrison (20), Shaquille Dewar (21), Desean Bennett (22), Jafar Borden (23), Jose Rodriguez (24), Shavon Wright (25), Rasheid Butler (26), Brian Richards (27), Devante Joseph (28), Stephan Clarke (29), James Pilgrim (30), Michelle Jemison (31), Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32), Robert Haughton (33), Jamal Blair (34), Oneil Dasilva (35), Durell Guy (36), Hakeem Campbell (37), Richard Phillips (38), Rushaun Brown (39), Michael Francis (40), Tyrone Gray (41), Lamar Francis (42), Shane Bennett (43), David Jones (44), Ricardo Stewart (45), Dante Plummer (46), Joel Hargrove (47), Shawn Reid (48), Bradley Wilson (49), Robert Feliciano (50), Dante Stephens (51), Carletto Allen (52), Shaquille John (53), Okeifa John (54), Daquan Reid (55), Michael Redley (56), Albert Amponsah (57), Richard Montague (58), Anthony Letterio (59), Rai Thomas (60), Javone Pearce (61), Shanice John (62), Dominique Bass (63), Ricardo Burgess (64). ENDORSEMENT: The extension is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/11/2017) (ft) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 8/11/17 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1586 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1577 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1576 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. In an October 25, 2016 order, the Court initially scheduled a "hearing if necessary, and, in any event, a conference on August 4, 2017." Dkt. No. 736. In subsequent orders, the Courtre scheduled the hearing, if any, to September 18, 2017. Dkt. No. 1524. The Court hereby clarifies that no conference is scheduled for August 4, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1551 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess on re: 1519 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 7/11/17 re: Adjournment of Deadlines. The Government respectfully submits this letter jointly with the defendants to request a second adjournment of the motions response deadline for Group B defendants until August 18, 2017 and a corresponding adjournment of any evidentiary hearing to a date at the Court's convenience in September. ENDORSEMENT: The motions response deadline is hereby adjourned to August 18, 2017. Any evidentiary hearing (currently scheduled for August 8, 2017) is adjourned to September 18, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/11/2017)(bw) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1523 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 7/11/17 re: Adjournment of Deadlines . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Mark Williams as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from J. Bruce Maffeo dated July 11, 2017 re: Mark Williams' Request to The Court Document filed by Mark Williams. (Maffeo, J) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf appearing for Carletto Allen. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. (Hechtkopf, Helene) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1504 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1503 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1470 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess on re: 1461 LETTER by USA addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 6/26/17 re: Confirmation of No Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby confirms that Dkt. No. 961, in which the Court ordered that "the schedule laid out in the October 25, 2016 order as to Group B-1 defendants will govern going forward," canceled the June 27, 2017 conference previously scheduled just for B-2 defendants to "discuss a motion schedule for Group B-2 defendants," Dkt. No. 736. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/26/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 6/26/17 re: Confirmation of No Conference Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1445 LETTER MOTION Accordingly, upon consent of these defendants, in order to facilitate these discussions, the Government proposes the following revised schedule: (1) Government Response: July 19, 2017; (2) Any Defendant Replies: July 26, 2017; and (3) Any Evidentiary Hearing: August 4, 2017, as previously scheduled. as to Nico Burrell (2), Douglas McLarty (3), Martin Mitchell (4), Donque Tyrell (5), Gerard Bass (6), Domnick Sherland (7), Barffour Abeberse (8), Mashud Yoda (9), Anderson Ross (10), Anthony King (11), Mark Williams (12), Quaysean Cannonier (13), Tayquan Tucker (14), William Reid (15), Marlon Roberts (16), Abdullah Yoda (17), Kenneth Ruggs (18), Calvin Ruggs (19), Fabian Morrison (20), Shaquille Dewar (21), Desean Bennett (22), Jafar Borden (23), Jose Rodriguez (24), Shavon Wright (25), Rasheid Butler (26), Brian Richards (27), Devante Joseph (28), Stephan Clarke (29), James Pilgrim (30), Michelle Jemison (31), Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32), Robert Haughton (33), Jamal Blair (34), Oneil Dasilva (35), Durell Guy (36), Hakeem Campbell (37), Richard Phillips (38), Rushaun Brown (39), Michael Francis (40), Tyrone Gray (41), Lamar Francis (42), Shane Bennett (43), David Jones (44), Ricardo Stewart (45), Dante Plummer (46), Joel Hargrove (47), Shawn Reid (48), Bradley Wilson (49), Robert Feliciano (50), Dante Stephens (51), Carletto Allen (52), Shaquille John (53), Okeifa John (54), Daquan Reid (55), Michael Redley (56), Albert Amponsah (57), Richard Montague (58), Anthony Letterio (59), Rai Thomas (60), Javone Pearce (61), Shanice John (62), Dominique Bass (63), Ricardo Burgess (64)...ENDORSEMENT...The Court grants the requested extensions. Additionally, the Court reschedules the date for an evidentiary hearing, if any, from August 4 to August 8, 2017 at 10:00am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/21/17) (jw) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 6/21/17 re: Adjournment of Motions Response Deadline . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1444 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1443 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1428 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1407 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1406 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1397 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1372 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1371 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Shaquille Dewar as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1360 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1347 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1337 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1336 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER 1321 LETTER MOTION The United States Marshals Service (the "Marshals' Service") and the Bureau of Prisons ("BOP") are requested to produce CARLETTO ALLEN, the defendant in the above-captioned proceeding and in People of the State of New York v. Carletta Allen, Indt. No. 234/2015, to an agent of the New York County District Attorney's Office Detective Squad on June 14, 2017. In the event that the defendant refuses to leave the facility where he is held, or refuses to comply with any rules or procedures of the Marshals' Service or the BOP regarding his transportation to court, the Marshals Service and the BOP may use such force as is reasonably necessary (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/15/17) (jw) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1326 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 5/12/17 re: Entry of Force Order . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Force Order)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1316 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1276 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1257 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1236 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1235 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1200 LETTER MOTION Adjournment of Sentencing as to Nico Burrell (2), Douglas McLarty (3), Martin Mitchell (4), Donque Tyrell (5), Gerard Bass (6), Domnick Sherland (7), Barffour Abeberse (8), Mashud Yoda (9), Anderson Ross (10), Anthony King (11), Mark Williams (12), Quaysean Cannonier (13), Tayquan Tucker (14), William Reid (15), Marlon Roberts (16), Abdullah Yoda (17), Kenneth Ruggs (18), Calvin Ruggs (19), Fabian Morrison (20), Shaquille Dewar (21), Desean Bennett (22), Jafar Borden (23), Jose Rodriguez (24), Shavon Wright (25), Rasheid Butler (26), Brian Richards (27), Devante Joseph (28), Stephan Clarke (29), James Pilgrim (30), Michelle Jemison (31), Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32), Robert Haughton (33), Jamal Blair (34), Oneil Dasilva (35), Durell Guy (36), Hakeem Campbell (37), Richard Phillips (38), Rushaun Brown (39), Michael Francis (40), Tyrone Gray (41), Lamar Francis (42), Shane Bennett (43), David Jones (44), Ricardo Stewart (45), Dante Plummer (46), Joel Hargrove (47), Shawn Reid (48), Bradley Wilson (49), Robert Feliciano (50), Dante Stephens (51), Carletto Allen (52), Shaquille John (53), Okeifa John (54), Daquan Reid (55), Michael Redley (56), Albert Amponsah (57), Richard Montague (58), Anthony Letterio (59), Rai Thomas (60), Javone Pearce (61), Shanice John (62), Dominique Bass (63), Ricardo Burgess (64). ENDORSEMENT: The May 1, 2017 trial is hereby removed from the Court's calendar, and the conference scheduled for tomorrow (April 6, 2017) is adjourned, SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/5/2017) (ft) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 4/5/17 re: Conference and Trial . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Mark Williams as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from J. Bruce Maffeo dated March 30, 2017 re: Adjournment of April 13th Court Date Document filed by Mark Williams. (Maffeo, J) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1156 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1155 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. ORDER: The Court issues the following Order to, first, remind Defendants in Group A currently scheduled to commence trial on May 1, 2017, of the schedule endorsed by the Court on March 2, 2017, see Dkt. No. 1077, and, second, to adjourn the conference currently scheduled for March 31, 2017, for those Defendants. First, the Court reminds Defendants in Group A currently scheduled to commence trial on May 1, 2017 of the following schedule: -Motions in limine, Requests to Charge, and Voir Dire are due on or before April 3, 2017. -Responses to motions in limine are due on or before April 17, 2017. -The Government will produce 3500 and Giglio material for cooperating witnesses on or before April 24, 2017, and for all other witnesses on or before April 28, 2017. -The Government will produce exhibits on or before April 28, 2017. Second, the Court hereby adjourns the March 31, 2017 conference currently scheduled for all Group A Defendants who are scheduled to commence trial on May 1, 2017, to April 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. See Dkt. Nos. 1077; 736. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/21/2017)(bw) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1075 LETTER MOTION as to Nico Burrell (2), Douglas McLarty (3), Martin Mitchell (4), Donque Tyrell (5), Gerard Bass (6), Domnick Sherland (7), Barffour Abeberse (8), Mashud Yoda (9), Anderson Ross (10), Anthony King (11), Mark Williams (12), Tayquan Tucker (14), William Reid (15), Marlon Roberts (16), Abdullah Yoda (17), Kenneth Ruggs (18), Calvin Ruggs (19), Fabian Morrison (20), Shaquille Dewar (21), Desean Bennett (22), Jafar Borden (23), Jose Rodriguez (24), Shavon Wright (25), Brian Richards (27), Devante Joseph (28), Stephan Clarke (29), James Pilgrim (30), Michelle Jemison (31), Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32), Robert Haughton (33), Jamal Blair (34), Oneil Dasilva (35), Durell Guy (36), Hakeem Campbell (37), Richard Phillips (38), Rushaun Brown (39), Michael Francis (40), Tyrone Gray (41), Lamar Francis (42), Shane Bennett (43), David Jones (44), Ricardo Stewart (45), Dante Plummer (46), Joel Hargrove (47), Shawn Reid (48), Bradley Wilson (49), Robert Feliciano (50), Dante Stephens (51), Carletto Allen (52), Shaquille John (53), Okeifa John (54), Daquan Reid (55), Michael Redley (56), Albert Amponsah (57), Richard Montague (58), Anthony Letterio (59), Rai Thomas (60), Javone Pearce (61), Shanice John (62), Dominique Bass (63), Ricardo Burgess (64); rescinding 1075 LETTER MOTION as to Quaysean Cannonier (13); granting in part and denying in part 1075 LETTER MOTION as to Rasheid Butler (26). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Though the description of the Court's October 25, 2016, Order on the docket indeed refers to a March 3, 2017, conference, that description is erroneous: the Order itself schedules a conference for March 31st, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. See Dkt. No. 736at1. Thus, no conference is presently scheduled for March 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/2/2017) (ft) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated March 1, 2017 re: Trial Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Johnson-Skinner, Drew) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1029 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1028 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1027 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1010 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 999 LETTER MOTION as to Nico Burrell (2), Douglas McLarty (3), Martin Mitchell (4), Donque Tyrell (5), Gerard Bass (6), Domnick Sherland (7), Barffour Abeberse (8), Mashud Yoda (9), Anderson Ross (10), Anthony King (11), Mark Williams (12), Quaysean Cannonier (13), Tayquan Tucker (14), William Reid (15), Marlon Roberts (16), Abdullah Yoda (17), Kenneth Ruggs (18), Calvin Ruggs (19), Fabian Morrison (20), Shaquille Dewar (21), Desean Bennett (22), Jafar Borden (23), Jose Rodriguez (24), Shavon Wright (25), Rasheid Butler (26), Brian Richards (27), Devante Joseph (28), Stephan Clarke (29), James Pilgrim (30), Michelle Jemison (31), Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32), Robert Haughton (33), Jamal Blair (34), Oneil Dasilva (35), Durell Guy (36), Hakeem Campbell (37), Richard Phillips (38), Rushaun Brown (39), Michael Francis (40), Tyrone Gray (41), Lamar Francis (42), Shane Bennett (43), David Jones (44), Ricardo Stewart (45), Dante Plummer (46), Joel Hargrove (47), Shawn Reid (48), Bradley Wilson (49), Robert Feliciano (50), Dante Stephens (51), Carletto Allen (52), Shaquille John (53), Okeifa John (54), Daquan Reid (55), Michael Redley (56), Albert Amponsah (57), Richard Montague (58), Anthony Letterio (59), Rai Thomas (60), Javone Pearce (61), Shanice John (62), Dominique Bass (63), Ricardo Burgess (64). ENDORSEMENT: The Court will exclude time from today until November 6, 2017. I find that the ends of justice served by excluding such time outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial - for all of the reasons the Government provides in this letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/30/2017) (ft) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 1/27/17 re: Exclusion of Time . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 997 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 972 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 971 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 970 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. The Court hereby ORDERS that the January 27, 2017 conference the Court previously scheduled for an arraignment on any Superseding Indictment and discussion of related scheduling issues, Dkt. No. 736, is hereby CANCELLED. Additionally, in light of the number of defendants who have pled guilty or who the Government represents in its letter are presently engaged in plea negotiations, the Court issues the following orders concerning dates for all remaining defendants:First, any trial of Group A defendants will begin on May 1, 2017, the first trial date set by the Court in its October 25, 2016 order. Dkt. No. 736. The Court no longer anticipates needing multiple trial dates for Group A trials. Thus counsel for all remaining Group A defendants shall be prepared to commence trial on May 1, 2017. Second, the Court hereby orders that any trial of Group B defendants (including both Group B-1 and B-2) will begin on November 6, 2017 (unless the Court grants any timely motion for an earlier trial date). 1 See id. As to all Group B defendants (those previously designated Group B-1 and B-2), the schedule laid out in the October 25, 2016 order as to Group B-1 defendants will govern going forward. See Dkt. No. 736, at 2-3. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/12/2017)(ft) Modified on 1/12/2017 (ft). (Entered: 01/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 1/6/17 re: Case Status Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 929 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 928 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 911 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT 901 LETTER MOTION The Government respectfully submits this letter on behalf of both parties to request that the Court cancel today's conference scheduled for the defendant Carletto Allen...ENDORSEMENT...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/22/2016) (jw) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 12/22/16 re: Today's Conference . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 890 LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Carletto Allen (52), addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Drew Johnson-Skinner dated December 20, 2016 re: Adjournment of Plea. The Government respectfully submits this letter on behalf of both parties to request that the Court adjourn the plea hearing scheduled for defendant Carletto Allen from today at 4:00 p.m. to December 22, 2016 at 4:30 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/20/2016) (bw) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Drew Johnson-Skinner dated December 20, 2016 re: Adjournment of Plea . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Johnson-Skinner, Drew) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 862 LETTER MOTION as to Carletto Allen (52). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/9/2016) (ft) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 12/12/16 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. The Court hereby ORDERS that the transcripts of the October 20, 2016 conferences, Dkt. Nos. 805, 807, and 809, be opened. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/7/2016)(ft) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 829 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 828 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 827 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 826 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 825 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 798 LETTER MOTION Conference as to Carletto Allen (52). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/30/2016) (ft) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 11/30/16 re: Conference . Document filed by USA as to Carletto Allen. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 783 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 782 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 781 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 780 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 779 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 778 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 777 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 748 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 747 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 746 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. On October 20, 2016, the Court held three conferences in the above matter. This order memorializes the Court's scheduling orders from the three conferences. In light of the multiple conferences held, all counsel are instructed to carefully review this order to ensure knowledge of all relevant deadlines and scheduling. Group A consists of those defendants against whom the Government does not intend to supersede. As to these Defendants, the Court ORDERS that Defense motions, if any, are due on or before January 17, 2017 1; Government responses are due on or before February 13, 2017; and Defense replies are due February 27, 2017. The Court will hold a hearing if necessary, and, in any event, a conference, on March 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The first Group A trial will commence on May 1, 2017; the second on June 5, 2017; and, if necessary, a third on June 19, 2017. Counsel shall hold themselves available for trial on these dates. On or before March 1st, 2017, the Government will propose, after consulting with Defense counsel, groups of no more than five defendants to be tried together. The Government will identify any evidence it seeks to introduce pursuant to Rule 404(b) of the Federal Rules of Evidence in its motions in limine. On or before March 1, 2017, the parties will propose to the Court an agreed-upon schedule for: (a) such motions in limine; (b) disclosures pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3500 and Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 26.2; (c) disclosure of Government trial exhibits; and (d) the submission to the Court of requests to charge and proposed voir dire. Group B refers to those defendants against whom the Government intends to supersede. Group B-1 refers to those defendants against whom the Government does not ultimately file capital-eligible charges. Group B-2 refers to those defendants against whom the Government ultimately files capital-eligible charges. As to all defendants in Group B, any superseding indictment must be filed on or before January 6, 2017. The Court will arraign all Group B defendants on any superseding indictment on January 27, 2017, at 11:00 a.m, as well as hold a scheduling conference at that time to discuss a motions schedule for the Group B-2 defendants. No motion schedule is presently set as to these defendants. On or before January 17, 2017, counsel will submit a joint letter proposing a motion schedule for B-2 defendants. As noted above, on June 27, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., following arraignment on any superseding indictment, the Court will hold a scheduling conference to discuss a motion schedule for Group B-2 defendants. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/25/2016)(jw) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 10/19/16 re: Scheduling Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. ORDER: On September 27, 2016, the Government submitted its motion to sever the defendants in the above-captioned case into groups, Group A (defendants against whom the Government does not intend to file a superseding indictment), and Group B (defendants against whom the Government expects to file additional charges). Docket No. 647. Defendants had until October 11, 2016, to file any opposition to the Government's motion. Docket No. 244. Having received no opposition, the Court GRANTS the Government's motion to sever. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/19/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S2-15-Cr-95-) Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Jessica K. Feinstein, Rachel Maimin, Micah W.J. Smith, Hagan Scotten, Drew Johnson-Skinner dated October 17, 2016 re: The Government writes in response to the Court's Order, dated October 17, 2016 (the "Order"), directing the Government to resubmit the three proposed groupings of defendants for the conferences scheduled on October 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m,, 12:00 p.m., and 2:00 p.m. The Government hereby submits the following revised groups for the conferences. In line with the Court's directions, all members of Proposed Group A are included in the first conference, and each conference includes exclusively members of either Group A or Group B. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby ORDERS that the groupings provided in this letter shall be the groupings for the Court's three conferences on Thursday, October 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Barffour Abeberse (8), Ricardo Stewart (45), Carletto Allen (52). This order resolves Defendant Carleto Allen's motion to dismiss the Second Superseding Indictment, Dkt. 422, in which Defendants Barffour Abeberse and Ricardo Stewart join, Dkt. 584; Dkt. 594....[See this Order]... V. Conclusion: In conclusion, and in light of the "high standard" a defendant faces "in seeking to dismiss an indictment," the Court DENIES the Defendants' motion to dismiss. Post, 950 F. Supp. 2d at 527 (internal quotation marks omitted). SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SECOND LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated October 17, 2016 re: October 20, 2016 Conferences Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess on re: 695 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The Court directs the Government to resubmit, per the following instructions: First, all members of Group A should be included in the first conference; second, each conference should include exclusively members of either Group A or B. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/17/2016)(ft) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Feinstein dated October 17, 2016 re: October 20, 2016 Conferences Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. The Court will hold three pre-trial conferences on October 20, 2016, in the above matter, at 10:00 a.m., 12:00 p.m., and 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. On or before Monday, October 17, 2016, the Government shall submit three proposed groupings of defendants (one grouping for each of the above conferences), with each containing no more than 17 defendants. The Court further notes that it has confirmed with the United States Marshal Service that such groupings are not infeasible for staffing and safety purposes. In advance of the October 20 conference, the Government is ORDERED to consult with defense counsel and agree to joint proposed schedules for pre-trial motions as well as joint proposed trial dates. SO ORDERED. (Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan, Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan, Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/14/2016)(ft) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 10/13/16 re: Pretrial Conference Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney, Esq. dated October 11, 2016 re: 637 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/27/16 re: Severance and Scheduling . re: Further Opposition to Prosecution Plan . Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Kenney, John) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. On September 27, 2016, the Government submitted its motion to sever the defendants in the above-captioned case into groups, Group A (defendants against whom the Government does not intend to file a superseding indictment), and Group B (defendants against whom the Government expects to file additional charges). Docket No. 647. As a reminder, per the schedule announced at the Court's May 2, 2016 conference, Defendants have until October 11, 2016, to file any opposition to the Government's motion. Docket No. 244. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/4/2016)(jw) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/27/16 re: Severance and Scheduling . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. With respect to the Initial Enterprise Letter to be disclosed by the Government on September 27, 2016 and any Supplemental Enterprise Letters (together, the "Enterprise Letters"), the Enterprise Letters. The defendant and his counsel of record shall provide a copy of this Order to any Designated Persons to whom theydisclose the Enterprise Letters pursuant to paragraph l(c) Prior to disclosure of the Enterprise Letters to any Designated Person, pursuant to paragraph l(c), any such Designated Person shall agree to be subject to the terms of this Order. The provisions of this Order shall not be construed as preventing Emma M. Greenwood, Esq., the Court-appointed Coordinating Discovery Attorney in this case, or her employees from reviewing the Enterprise Letters or discussing them with defense counsel. Ms. Greenwood shall instruct her employees that they are bound by this Order. Nothing in this Order alters the parties' obligation to comply with this Court's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases regarding requests for redaction or sealing. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/27/2016)(ft) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/22/16 re: Entry of Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/8/16 re: Discovery at the Jail Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 9/8/16 re: Change of Counsel Requests Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 561 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Carletto Allen. On August 23, 2016, the Court received via regular mail a letter from Defendant Carletto Allen. A copy of Mr. Allen's letter has been forwarded to his counsel and the letter has been filed under seal. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/24/2016)(jw) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney, Esq. dated August 5, 2016 re: Permission for Reply Letter (Kenney, John) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from John J. Kenney, Esq. dated August 5, 2016 re: Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Indictment (Kenney, John) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY by Carletto Allen re: 504 Letter filed by USA Permission for Reply Brief. (Kenney, John) Modified on 8/8/2016 (ka). (Entered: 08/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Carletto Allen addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Hagan Scotten dated August 1, 2016 re: Carleto Allen Motion to Dismiss Document filed by USA. (Scotten, Hagan) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Carletto Allen re: 422 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment.. (Scotten, Hagan) Modified on 8/2/2016 (ka). (Entered: 08/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Marilyn S. Reader dated July 20, 2016 re: to be relieved as counsel and for new counsel to be appointed for defendant Shaquille Dewar. Document filed by Shaquille Dewar as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Reader, Marilyn) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Marilyn S. Reader to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant Shaquille Dewar. Document filed by Shaquille Dewar as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Reader, Marilyn) Modified on 7/21/2016 (ka). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Indictment. Document filed by Carletto Allen. (Kenney, John) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery shall be used by the defendants solely for purposes of defending this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that nothing in this Order shall preclude Emma M. Greenwood, Esq., the Court-appointed Coordinating Discovery Attorney in this case, from copying the Discovery or disclosing the Discovery to: (a) any defense counsel in this matter or their staff; (b) her employees assisting in the preparation and dissemination of the Discovery; or (c) third-party vendors she deems necessary. Ms. Greenwood shall instruct her employees and any such third party vendors that they are bound by this Order. Nothing in this order alters the parties' obligation to comply with the Court's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases regarding requests for redaction or sealing. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/1/2016)(ft) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 5/31/16 re: Entry of Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Quaysean Cannonier, Shaquille Dewar, Robert Haughton, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 4/27/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Quaysean Cannonier, Shaquille Dewar, Robert Haughton, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John re: Arraignment held on 4/27/16 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPOINTING COORDINATING DISCOVERY ATTORNEY: as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. It is hereby ORDERED that Emma M. Greenwood is appointed as Coordinating Discovery Attorney ("CDA") to facilitate the orderly production and dissemination of voluminous common discovery, typically in electronic form, by the Government to all court-appointed counsel for indigent Defendants. It is further ORDERED that the CDA shall perform the following tasks:...[See this Order]... Unless otherwise agreed, the Government shall provide global discovery to the CDA, who shall duplicate and distribute the discovery to all court-appointed counsel. To avoid delay in providing global discovery to court-appointed counsel, any additional global discovery not already produced shall be provided directly to the CDA. The CDA may petition this Court ex parte for funds for outside services and shall monitor all vendor invoices for these services, including confirming that the work contracted for was performed and provided. All petitions for outside services will include a basis for the requested funds, and a determination that the proposed costs are reasonable and that the services are necessary. Retained counsel may obtain a copy of voluminous common discovery from the CDA, if retained counsel provides the CDA with any hard drive, flash drive, or other media necessary to receive said discovery materials. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/16/2016)(bw) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. On May 9, 2016, the Government responded to this Court's request for the Government's views on "when learned counsel may be appointed for defendants who may face the addition of death-eligible charges" in this case, Dkt. No. 220. See Dkt. No. 260. The Government filed a similar letter in United States v. Parrish, No. 16-cr-212, a case before Judge Kaplan. After receiving the Government's submission in Parrish, however, Judge Kaplan instructed the Government to file another letter addressing the specific question of whether the Court has legal authority to approve the expenditure of CJA or other public funds for the appointment of learned counsel for any defendant in advance of the return of an indictment charging that defendant with a capital offense. See No. 16-cr-212, Dkt. No. 216. The Government is hereby ORDERED to file any letter responding to Judge Kaplan's inquiry in this case as well, and to do so by the May 16, 2016 deadline set by Judge Kaplan. To the extent defense counsel also wish to address this issue, any submission is due by the same date. The Court is not likely to approve the appointment of learned counsel until it has resolved the question of when it has the authority to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/10/2016)(ft) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maimin, Smith, Scotten, Feinstein, and Johnson-Skinner dated 5/9/16 re: Questions Posed by the Court Document filed by USA. (Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess re: Arraignment held on 5/2/16 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 5/2/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess re: Arraignment held on 5/2/16 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 5/2/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess re: Arraignment held on 5/2/16 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. This Court conducted initial conferences with defendants and counsel in this matterearlier today, May 2, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., 12:00 p.m., and 2:00 p.m. After hearing from the Government and defense counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed according to the following schedule: 1. The Government shall produce all Rule 16 discovery material currently in its possession by June 1, 2016. Additional discovery shall be produced on a rolling basis. 2. The Government shall confer with defense counsel and file a letter addressing the following issues by May 12, 2016: (a) the means by which incarcerated defendants will be afforded an opportunity to review discovery; (b) the means of providing defense counsel access to geo-location discovery, including whether it would be feasible to provide a copy of that information on a hard drive or through a secure form of remote access; and (c) the Government's understanding of when learned counsel may be appointed for defendants who may face the addition of death-eligible charges. 3. On or before September 2 7, 2016, the Government shall file a motion to sever the defendants into two groups-first, those defendants as to whom the Government does not intend to file a superseding indictment (beyond the second superseding indictment, see Dkt. No. 97) to add charges or defendants; second, those defendants as to whom the Government does intend to file a superseding indictment to add charges or defendants. Any opposition to the Government's severance motion shall be due by October 11, 2016, and any replies shall be due by October 17, 2016. 4. On or before September 27, 2016, the Government will undertake to provide each defendant with an informal notification as to whether the Government is then considering adding any death-eligible count against that defendant. 5. The Government shall file its enterprise letters on or before September 27, 2016. 6. The Court will conduct its next scheduling conference, or conferences, on October 20, 2016. The first conference will be held at 10:00 a.m., and additional conferences (if necessary) will be held at noon and 2:00 p.m. The Court will issue an order closer to that conference date outlining the agenda for the conference(s). 7. Any motion that can be brought on the face of the second superseding indictment, including motions pursuant to Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 12(b )(3)(B)(i), (ii), (iii), and (v), shall be filed no later than July 1, 2016. Any opposition shall be filed by August 1, 2016, and any replies shall be filed by September 1, 2016. Any objections to the schedule for briefing such motions shall be filed by May 9, 2016. 8. Absent leave of the Court, no superseding indictment adding charges or defendants shall be filed after January 6, 2017. Finally, the Court finds the ends of justice served by granting an exclusion from speedy trial computations for the period from May 2, 2016, through October 20, 2016, outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial in order to provide adequate time for the production of discovery, for Defendants to review discovery, for Defendants to consider and prepare any motions, for preparation for trial, and for the parties to negotiate a disposition of this case. The Court also finds, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 316 l(h)(7), that this case is so unusual and complex, due to the number of defendants, the nature and scope of the prosecution, and the volume of discovery, that it would be unreasonable to expect adequate preparation for pre-trial procedures or for trial within the time limits established by the Speedy Trial Act. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/2/2016)(ft) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated 4/29/16 re: Initial Pretrial Conferences Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maimin, Rachel) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. ORDER: Initial conferences are scheduled in this case for May 2, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., 12:00 p.m., and 2:00 p.m. in Comiroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Government will file a list of the Defendants who will be present at each conference on ECF by the end of the day today, April 29, 2016. The Court will address the following items at the conferences: 1. The Court will ask the Government to provide a summary of the charges in the case and an overview of the discovery that the Government intends to produce. 2. The Court will ask defense counsel to address the possibility of appointing a coordinating discovery attorney. 3. The Court will invite the parties to discuss the schedule in the case. The parties will be afforded an opportunity to voice any concerns regarding the overall scheduling approach proposed by the Government on page 5 of its April 27, 2016 letter, see Dkt. No. 185, as well as the specific schedule adopted by Judge Kaplan in United States v. Parrish, No. 16-cr-212, Dkt. No. 161. If defense counsel at each conference would prefer to address issues of common concern through one spokesperson, they should be prepared to designate that attorney at the start of the conference. Either way, the Court will invite all counsel to raise any issues that require the Court's attention, but the Court advises that these initial conferences will not be the appropriate forum in which to contest a bail determination by the Magistrate Judge. Counsel are instructed to contact the Court, in the manner specified in the Court's Individual Practices in Criminal Cases (available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan), for any defendant-specific bail appeals. In advance of any conference addressing a contested bail determination, the Court asks the party who has brought the bail appeal to furnish the Court with the pretrial services report as to the defendant in question and a transcript of the hearing before the Magistrate Judge at which the bail determination was made. All initial bail applications should be directed to the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/29/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Rachel Maimin dated April 27, 2016 re: Discovery and Scheduling Proposal Document filed by USA. (Scotten, Hagan) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Initial Appearance as to Carletto Allen held on 4/27/2016. Defendant Carletto Allen present with CJA Attorney John Kenny, AUSA Hagan Scotten present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. Defendant detained on consent without prejudice. (ft) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
S(2) INDICTMENT FILED as to Nico Burrell (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Douglas McLarty (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Martin Mitchell (4) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Donque Tyrell (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Gerard Bass (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Domnick Sherland (7) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Barffour Abeberse (8) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Mashud Yoda (9) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Anderson Ross (10) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Anthony King (11) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Mark Williams (12) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Quaysean Cannonier (13) count(s) 1, 4, Tayquan Tucker (14) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, William Reid (15) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Marlon Roberts (16) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Abdullah Yoda (17) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Kenneth Ruggs (18) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Calvin Ruggs (19) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Fabian Morrison (20) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Shaquille Dewar (21) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Desean Bennett (22) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Jafar Borden (23) count(s) 1, 4, Jose Rodriguez (24) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Shavon Wright (25) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Rasheid Butler (26) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Brian Richards (27) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Devante Joseph (28) count(s) 1, 4, Stephan Clarke (29) count(s) 1, 4, James Pilgrim (30) count(s) 1, 4, Michelle Jemison (31) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Ivanjoel Aryeetey (32) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Robert Haughton (33) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Jamal Blair (34) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Oneil Dasilva (35) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Durell Guy (36) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Hakeem Campbell (37) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Richard Phillips (38) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Rushaun Brown (39) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Michael Francis (40) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Tyrone Gray (41) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Lamar Francis (42) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Shane Bennett (43) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, David Jones (44) count(s) 1, 4, Ricardo Stewart (45) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Dante Plummer (46) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Joel Hargrove (47) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Shawn Reid (48) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Bradley Wilson (49) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Robert Feliciano (50) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Dante Stephens (51) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Carletto Allen (52) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Shaquille John (53) count(s) 2, 3, Okeifa John (54) count(s) 2, 3, 4, Daquan Reid (55) count(s) 2, 3, Michael Redley (56) count(s) 2, 3, Albert Amponsah (57) count(s) 2, 3, Richard Montague (58) count(s) 2, 3, Anthony Letterio (59) count(s) 2, Rai Thomas (60) count(s) 2, Javone Pearce (61) count(s) 2, 3, Shanice John (62) count(s) 2, 3, Dominique Bass (63) count(s) 2, 3, Ricardo Burgess (64) count(s) 2, 3, 4. (jm) Modified on 4/27/2016 (jm).(Original filing under seal on 4/12/16) Modified on 4/27/2016 (jm). (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Carletto Allen. CJA Attorney John Kenny. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman) (ft) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
S(2) INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess. (jm) (jm). Modified on 4/28/2016 (jm). (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order to Unseal S(2)Indictment as to Nico Burrell, Douglas McLarty, Martin Mitchell, Donque Tyrell, Gerard Bass, Domnick Sherland, Barffour Abeberse, Mashud Yoda, Anderson Ross, Anthony King, Mark Williams, Quaysean Cannonier, Tayquan Tucker, William Reid, Marlon Roberts, Abdullah Yoda, Kenneth Ruggs, Calvin Ruggs, Fabian Morrison, Shaquille Dewar, Desean Bennett, Jafar Borden, Jose Rodriguez, Shavon Wright, Rasheid Butler, Brian Richards, Devante Joseph, Stephan Clarke, James Pilgrim, Michelle Jemison, Ivanjoel Aryeetey, Robert Haughton, Jamal Blair, Oneil Dasilva, Durell Guy, Hakeem Campbell, Richard Phillips, Rushaun Brown, Michael Francis, Tyrone Gray, Lamar Francis, Shane Bennett, David Jones, Ricardo Stewart, Dante Plummer, Joel Hargrove, Shawn Reid, Bradley Wilson, Robert Feliciano, Dante Stephens, Carletto Allen, Shaquille John, Okeifa John, Daquan Reid, Michael Redley, Albert Amponsah, Richard Montague, Anthony Letterio, Rai Thomas, Javone Pearce, Shanice John, Dominique Bass, Ricardo Burgess.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/25/16)(jm) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 172 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?