Onwuazornbe v. Commissioner, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-03300-JCH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 2:53 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Onwuazornbe, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randolph O Gregory, Sr +1 410 727 7654 +1 410 528 9741 randolphgregory@aol.com
v.
No Logo Baltimore City Detention Center, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Space Maureen O'Ferrall Gardner +1 410 576 6300
No Logo Commissioner, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Space Maureen O'Ferrall Gardner +1 410 576 6300
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/20/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 10/14/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: 10/14/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [1-1] petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m 10/14/92-gs) (MICROFILMED 10/14/92) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: 10/14/1992 MemorandumCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m 10/14/92-gs) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: 10/16/1992 Terminated Case
      Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/1992, Entered: 3/13/1992 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: dated 03/04/92 "DIRECTING" respondents to show cause on or before 04/01/92 why writ of habeas corpus should not be issued and "DIRECTING" them to furnish with their answer copies of all relevant materials. ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 03/10/92 lkc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 2/7/1992, Entered: 2/12/1992 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER dated 02/06/92 "striking" [11-1] motion to Strike Interrogatories; and "striking" [11-2] motion for Production of Documents ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 02/07/92 vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: 2/12/1992 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER dated 02/05/92 "denying" [9-1] motion to Strike [8-1] order ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 02/05/92 vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: 2/11/1992 Motion to Strike
              MOTION by Balto. City Det. to Strike Interrogatories , and for Production of Documents and Exhibits 1 thru 3 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: 2/11/1992 Answer
                ANSWER to Petition for Habeas Corpus and Order to show Cause by Balto. City Det. (Attorney J. Joseph Curran, Jr. and Maureen O.F. Gardner ), (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/21/1992, Entered: 1/30/1992, Terminated: 2/5/1992 Motion to Strike
                  MOTION by Charles Onwuazornbe to Strike [8-1] order , or in the Alternative to Amend or Revise [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings to Show Cause Order (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/1992, Entered: 1/27/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER dated 01/15/92 "granting" [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings to Show Cause Order to 02/24/92. ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 01/15/92 vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/1992, Entered: 1/20/1992, Terminated: 1/15/1992 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION by Balto. City Det., Commissioner to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings to Show Cause Order (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/1992, Entered: 1/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER dated 01/02/92 "granting" [4-1] motion for Leave to File Interrogatories ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 01/03/92 vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/24/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by Charles Onwuazornbe for an Order mandating that prisoner be allowed to file Interrogatories (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992, Terminated: 1/3/1992 Motion for Leave to File
                            MOTION by Charles Onwuazornbe for Leave to File Interrogatories (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                              AMENDED (APPLICATION) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus; (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/1991, Entered: 12/12/1991 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: dated 11/27/91 "DIRECTING" respondents to show cause on or before 01/09/92 why writ of habeas corpus should not be issued; and "DIRECTING" that they furnish copies of all relevant materials. ( signed by Judge Joseph C. Howard ) (c/m 12/03/91 vab) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 10/14/1992 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                  PETITION for writ of habeas corpus; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 098287 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?