Terribile v. Jones, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-03236-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Philip Terribile, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Pretl +1 443 323 3060 +1 410 689 3833 mikepretl@aol.com

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elissa Doe Levan +1 410 576 6388 +1 410 576 6393 elevan@oag.state.md.us
v.
No Logo Stephen C. Jones, Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
No Logo Yolanda Jones, Defendant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/14/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 1/5/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 2/1/1993, Entered: 2/4/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Approval [11-1] stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 2/1/1993, Entered: 2/4/1993 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by parties. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 1/12/1993 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER "DISMISSING" this case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed, without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson January 5, 1993). (c/m 1/5/93-ph) (MICROFILMED 1/12/93) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 1/15/1993 Terminated Case
        Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: 10/16/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 10/14/92 (c/m-10/14/92) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/20/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/15/92 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 10/15/92 ; ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m 5/13/92 chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/11/1992 Motion to Amend/Correct
              JOINT MOTION by Philip Terribile, Yolanda Jones, Stephen C. Jones to Amend [5-1] Scheduling order (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992, Terminated: 4/21/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER dated 4/21/92, granting [6-1] joint motion to Amend [5-1] Scheduling order to extend the discovery deadline, reset Discovery deadline to 5/15/92 ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz )(c/m 4/24/92 gb) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992, Terminated: 4/21/1992 Motion to Amend/Correct
                  JOINT MOTION by Philip Terribile, Yolanda Jones, Stephen C. Jones to Amend [5-1] Scheduling order to extend the discovery deadline (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/26/1991, Entered: 1/8/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/24/92 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 5/26/92 ; ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m 12/24/91 chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/1991, Entered: 1/8/1992 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by Yolanda Jones, Stephen C. Jones (Attorney George C. Davis), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 12/23/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Yolanda Jones, Stephen C. Jones 11/25/91 Answer due on 12/16/91 for Stephen C. Jones, for Yolanda Jones (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/18/1991, Entered: 11/22/1991 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS(ES) issued (20 days) for Yolanda Jones, Stephen C. Jones (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/1991, Entered: 11/22/1991 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 098165 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 51 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?