Sarah Kary Vs. The City Of Pasadena
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. GC014354

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 8, 2017 at 11:32 PM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kary Sarah, Plaintiff

Represented by Pierson Daniel T. Law Offices Of

v.
No Logo Dodge Sean, Defendant

Represented by Pasadena City Attorney Of

No Logo Pasadena City Of, Defendant

Represented by Pasadena City Attorney Of

No Logo Hosp F. Phillip - Mediator, Mediator
Type PI Other -DO NOT USE (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/04/1997
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Request For Entry Of Dismissal
W/P. ENTIRE ACTION
    Blank 21 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997 Refund of Jury Fees
      Blank 20 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Notice of Continuance
        Blank 19 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Order
        GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJ & DENYING MTN FOR SUMMARY JDMT.
          Blank 18 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996 Miscellaneous-Other
          OBJ TO PROPOSED ORDER RE MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJ.
            Blank 17 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996 Miscellaneous-Other
            OBJ TO PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUMM. JUDGMENT
              Blank 16 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/2/1996 Substitution of Attorney
                Blank 15 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Reply to Motion
                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Opposition Points & Authorities
                  Amended Memo of P's & A's in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Reply to Motion
                    Reply to opposition to motion for Summary Judgment
                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Opposition Points & Authorities
                      Memo of P's & A's in opposition to motion for Summary Judgment
                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Miscellaneous-Other
                        Separate statement of disputed/ undisputed material facts
                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Notice
                          LIEN FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES & COSTS
                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Miscellaneous-Other
                            Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Declaration
                              Declaration of Lawrence S. Newberry in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Motion for summary judgment
                                NO FEES PER GC6103
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Supporting Points & Authorities
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Notice
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 Notice
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Amendment to Complaint
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Answer
                                          CITY OF PASADENA
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Complaint filed

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?