V. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01684

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 1:54 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo C. V., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lincoln C Beauregard +1 253 593 5100 +1 253 593 0380 lincolnb@connelly-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Law Center, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashton Keith Dennis +1 253 476 2653 ashton@washingtonlawcenter.com
No Logo M. H., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lincoln C Beauregard +1 253 593 5100 +1 253 593 0380 lincolnb@connelly-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Law Center, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashton Keith Dennis +1 253 476 2653 ashton@washingtonlawcenter.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rosenberger +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mrosenberger@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 14 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Receipt # 0981-5085564), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service)(Rosenberger, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 15 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?