United States v. Bahnasawy

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cr-00376
District Judge Richard M. Berman, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard M. Berman
Last Updated October 13, 2022 at 3:26 PM EDT (2.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy, Defendant (1)

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Clay Hubbard Kaminsky +1 212 417 8749 +1 212 571 0392 Clay_Kaminsky@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/13/2022, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/11/2022, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 11/15/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Hearing held on 11/15/18 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Khdiga Metwally and Osama Elbahnasawy dated 11/7/2018 re: Abdulrahman Elbahnasawy, case 16 cr. 376 (RMB) (clt) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Sentencing Submission
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Kaminsky, Clay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Remark
Court Exhibit A. as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (ap)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. In light of all counsels' and the Court's schedules, the Court hereby adjourns the sentence in this case to November 15, 2018 at 12:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/25/2018)(ft)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Having considered the Defense letter dated September 20, 2018 and the Government letter dated September 20, 2018, the sentencing is adjourned to Monday, October 1, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/21/2018)(bw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Negar Tekeei and George D. Turner dated September 20, 2018 re: Defense Request to Adjourn Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Turner, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy on re: 117 LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs George D. Turner and Negar Tekeei dated June 21, 2018 re: Sentencing Schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Sentence is scheduled for 9/25/18 at 10:00 am. (Sentencing set for 9/25/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/25/2018) (ap) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs George D. Turner and Negar Tekeei dated June 21, 2018 re: Sentencing Schedule Document filed by USA. (Turner, George) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. The Court is adjourning the sentencing scheduled for June 27, 2018. Counsel are directed to meet and confer forthwith and to suggest (jointly) to the Court, in writing, proposed sentencing dates in late July, 2018 or late September, 2018. Counsel should also suggest dates they are available prior to sentencing for a status conference. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/15/18)(jw) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/5/18)(jw) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs George D. Turner and Negar Tekeei dated June 4, 2018 re: Protective Order Pertaining to Classified Information . Document filed by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, George) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) granting 111 CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Clay H. Kaminsky dated March 23, 2018 re: Adjournment of Sentencing. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Sentence is adjourned to June 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/26/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. New Address: The Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch, One Penn Plaza, 53rd Floor, New York, New York, US 10119, 212-285-8000. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Clay H. Kaminsky dated March 23, 2018 re: Adjournment of Sentencing . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Sentencing Letter by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 22, 2018 re: Designation Recommendation to BOP. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 108 LETTER MOTION as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1). Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/16/2018) (ft) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 15, 2018 re: Extension of time within which to respond to the Court's order related to BOP facilities . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy on TRANSCRIPT of Proceeding held on 10/6/2018 before the Hon. Richard M. Berman. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Negar Tekeei, dated 8/11/2016, re: The Government writes: In accordance with the direction of the Court at yesterday's status conference, the Government respectfully submits this letter to provide the Court with additional information in connection with its request, with the defendant's consent, for continued sealing and delayed docketing in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/9/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Turner, George) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Letter as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018) (THIS LETTER SHOULD BE DOCKETED PUBLICLY AS PER CHAMBERS REQUEST.) (ft) Modified on 3/8/2018 (ft). (Entered: 03/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Negar Tekeei dated 8/11/2016 re: In accordance with the direction of the Court at yesterday's status conference, the Government respectfully subinits this letter to provide the Court with additional information in connection with its request, with the defendant's consent, for continued sealing and delayed docketing in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018) (THIS LETTER SHOULD BE DOCKETED PUBLICLY AS PER CHAMBERS REQUEST.)(ft) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018)(ft) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018)(ft) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. The Court directs the Defense team (including, without limitation, mental health advisors) and the Government forthwith to meet and confer and jointly develop a descriptive list of up to three BOP facilities (in order of preference and in addition to FCI Butner-Medium suggested by Todd A. Bussert, in Mr. Frisch's March 5, 2018 submission which the Court may also consider) which are believed to be feasible facilities at which the Court may recommend the Defendant be placed following sentencing. In compiling this list, counsel are directed to consult the BOP Inmate Security Designation and Custody Classification Manual and also to advise the Court as to any criteria, including, e.g., length of sentence and services required, that need to be met in order for the Defendant to qualify for placement in each institution. The list shall be submitted to the Court on or before March 15, 2018. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 2, 2018 re: permission to redact a matter not included in the District's Privacy Policy . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N, # 10 Exhibit O, # 11 Exhibit P, # 12 Exhibit Q, # 13 Exhibit R, # 14 Exhibit S, # 15 Exhibit T, # 16 Exhibit U, # 17 Exhibit V, # 18 Exhibit W, # 19 Exhibit X)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) granting 89 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 1, 2018 re: one day extension of time to file defense sentencing submissions. ENDORSEMENT: Extension(s) granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/1/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 1, 2018 re: one day extension of time to file defense sentencing submissions . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) granting 87 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 11, 2018 re: One-week adjustment of schedule for sentencing submissions and sentencing. ENDORSEMENT: Sentencing adjourned for reasons set forth in defense counsel's letter. New sentencing date is 4/9/18 at 11:30. Defense submission is due by 3/1/18. Govt submission is due by 3/8/18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/12/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 11, 2018 re: One-week adjustment of schedule for sentencing submissions and sentencing . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 12/12/17 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 83 LETTER MOTION as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1). ENDORSEMENT: In person conference will be held at 1:00 p.m. My ruling re: co-counsel is firm. No need to write. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/28/2017) (ft) Modified on 11/28/2017 (ft). (Entered: 11/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 28, 2017 re: To keep date of December 12, 2017, for defense to propose new sentencing date in person or by letter . Document filed by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 11/28/2017 (ft). (Entered: 11/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/21/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 11/21/17 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Oral argument is rescheduled to September 5, 2017 at 3:00 pm. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/7/2017). ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Sabrina Shroff/Daniel Habib, dated August 5, 2017 re: I write to request an adjournment of the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2017, at 12:00 p.m., in the above-referenced matter. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. The Court requests simultaneous submissions of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law regarding the Government's application to unseal this case, as follows: 1- Written submissions on or before Monday, July 31, 2017 (noon). 2- Brief oral argument is tentatively scheduled for Tuesday, August 15, 2017 (noon). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/19/2017). ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017). (bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Sabrina Shroff dated July 18, 2017 re: We write to request a brief adjournment of the hearing scheduled to continue on July 19, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Hearing adjourned to 1:30 P.M. on 7/19/17. The Court will set aside 1 hour for direct and cross-examination (total). SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/18/2017). ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Sabrina Shroff dated July 18, 2017 re: We write to request a brief adjournment of the hearing scheduled to continue on July 19, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to Docket and File. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Negar Tekeei / George D. Turner, dated July 10, 2017 re: The Government respectfully writes in advance of tomorrow's hearing to address certain assertions discussed in the defendant's July 10, 2017 letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Negar Tekeei / George D. Turner, dated July 5, 2017 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter in connection with the Court's June 19, 2017 Order, which provided defense counsel with an additional 30 days to "identify its witnesses [and] provide their qualifications and a summary of their actual testimony" in support of the defendant's request for continued sealing of certain portions of the record, and which ordered that such witnesses "must be available in person on or before July 19, 2017 at 11 :30 a.m." The Government writes to respectfully request the Court to set a deadline of three business days in advance of any hearing by which defense counsel must comply with the Court's order to "identify its witnesses [and] provide their qualifications and a summary of their actual testimony." Such a deadline would be consistent with the Court's June 13, 2017 Order, which directed disclosure of a witness list and proposed testimony to the Court by 12 p.m. on June 19, three business days before the hearing previously scheduled for June 22, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Negar Tekeei dated April 25, 2017 re: The Government respectfully writes, on behalf of the parties, to submit the enclosed proposed order for continued sealing and delayed docketing. The enclosed order modifies the Court's September 19, 2016 Order to permit the defendant to communicate regarding this case with attorneys Jason Wright and Dennis Edney. The defendant's counsel of record, Ms. Shroff and Mr. Kaminsky, have reviewed the proposed order and conveyed that they have no objections. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Federal Defenders of New York dated November 21, 2017 (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 11/7/17 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/20/2018. AUSA George Turner; AUSA Negar Tekeei; Also present is Joshua Champagne, DOJ attorney; Defense attorneys Shroff, Kaminsky and Frisch present; Defendant not present; Defendant's appearance is waived; defense counsel requests that the sentence be adjourned; see transcript of proceedings held for a complete record; sentence is adjourned to 12/19/18 at 10:00 am.(Sentencing set for 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/15/2018 ( Sentencing set for 11/20/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) AUSA Negar Tekeei present; AUSA George Turner present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Frisch, Shroff and Kaminsky; Court Reporter Rebecca Forman present; Court begins sentencing proceeding; evidence is introduced; sentence to continue on 11/20/18 at 11:00 am. (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy: Sentencing set for 11/15/2018 at 12:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (ft)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Hearings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy: Sentencing set for 6/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy: Sentencing set for 4/9/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 12/12/2017 (Defense due by 2/15/2018., Government due by 2/22/2018, Sentencing set for 3/1/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) AUSA Negar Tekeei present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Frisch, Wright and Shroff; Court Reporter Rebecca Forman present; conference held re: sentence; sentence is scheduled for 3/1/18 at 10:00 am; Defense submission is due: 2/15/18 at noon; Government submission is due: 2/22/18 at noon. (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 85 MEMO ENDORSEMENT, as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/21/2017. AUSAs Negar Tekeei and George Turner present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Andrew Frisch and Sabrina Shroff; Court Reporter Pamela Utter present; Court issues ruling on Curcio hearing; Federal Defenders are not relieved; See transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Curcio Hearing as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/7/2017. AUSA Negar Tekeei present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Andrew Frisch and Sabrina Shroff; Court Reporter Martha Martin present; Also present is Dennis Edney, Esq.; Defendant is sworn; Curcio hearing held; next conference is scheduled for 11/21/17 at 12:30 pm. (Status Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 12:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman) (lnl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Initial Appearance as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/2/2017. (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 11/2/2017 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy( Status Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) AUSAs Tekeei and Turner present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Sabrina Shroff, Jason Wright and Andrew Frisch; Court Reporter Sonya Moore present; conference held re: attorneys; next conference/hearing is scheduled for 11/7/17 at 1:30 pm; parties to submit proposed questions to the Court by 11/6/17 by 3:00 pm; see transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (jw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Richard M. Berman. Judge Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: As to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Unassigned. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: AUSA Tekeei and Turner are present. Defendant is present with attorney Sabrina Shroff. Defendant waives public reading. Arraignment as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Count 1,2,3,4-5,6-7 Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Count 1,2,3,4-5,6-7 held on 10/6/2017., Plea entered by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Count 1,2,3,4-5,6-7Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Count 1,2,3,4-5,6-7 Not Guilty. BOP counsel Adam Johnson is to be present at the next conference. Speedy Trial Time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 6/16/16 to 6/23/16. (Held under seal/delayed docketing on 6/16/16) (Court Reporter Ellen Simone) (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 10/6/2017. AUSA Tekeei and Turner and BOP attorney Adam Johnson are present. Defendant is present with attorneys Shroff and Kaminsky. Next conference is scheduled for 6/29/16 at 10:30 AM. Speedy Trial Time until 6/29/16 is excluded. (Held under seal/delayed docketing on 6/23/16) (Court Reporter Martha Martin) (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman:Status Conference as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy held on 10/6/2017. AUSAs Tekeei and Turner and Supervisory BOP attorney Adam Johnson are present. Defendant is present with attorneys Shroff and Kaminsky. Next conference is scheduled for 7/12/16 at 11:30 AM Speedy Trial Time is excluded until 7/12/16. (Held under seal/delayed docketing on 6/29/16) (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: AUSAs Tekeei and Turner are present. Defendant is present with attorneys Shroff and Kaminsky. Defendant is sworn. The Court receives signed Notice of Intent to File an Information and signed waiver of indictment. S 1 information is filed. The Court receives a signed advise of rights form. Arraignment as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-5s,6s-7s held on 10/6/2017. Plea entered by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) Guilty as to Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-5s,6s-7s. The Court accepts the plea. (Held under seal/delayed docketing on 10/13/16) (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Attorney update in case as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Attorney Negar Tekeei,George D. Turner for USA added. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Designated ECF as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/2/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 11/2/17 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs George D. Turner and Negar Tekeei dated November 6, 2017 re: Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Turner, George) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 65 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 6, 2017 re: Substitution of Counsel (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to David Patton from Jason D. Wright dated 5/2/2017 re: Based on my discussions with him and in light of the information provided to me, I wish to inform you that, if so requested by your client, I would respectfully decline to represent him. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to Docket and File. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/2/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew James Frisch appearing for Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. Appearance Type: Retained. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT of September 6, 2017 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT of October 11, 2016 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT of August 10, 2016 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT of July 12, 2016 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TRANSCRIPT of May 4, 2017 as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2017)(ft) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Negar Tekeei and George D. Turner dated 8/29/17 re: For the foregoing reasons, the Government respectfully submits that the defense's request for a six-month adjournment of sentencing is unwarranted and should be denied....ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket and file. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Letter from Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to Docket this letter. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/12/2017)(clt) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
LREF
Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. ENDORSEMENT: The Court suggests that Mr. Frisch (i) review the docket which was unsealed on Oct. 6-7, 2017; and (ii) meet and confer with current defense counsel (Federal Defenders), Govt counsel, and the Defendant. A conference has been scheduled for Nov. 2, 2017 @ 9:30 in courtroom 17B (500 Pearl St). (Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/10/2017)(clt) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER (Redacted) by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 8/25/17 re: Request to adjourn sentencing. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 8/25/17) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER (REDACTED) by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Lauren Lively dated 6/30/17 re: Suspension of Defendant's visitation. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/30/17) (jm) Modified on 10/6/2017 (jm). (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy Government and Defense Counsel are directed to (forthwith) coopemte with the Department of Probation in the preparation of the Presentence Report ("PSR") in this case.The Protective Order is hereby modified to permit disclosure of materials needed in connection with the PSR to the Probation Officer assigned to this case, Nicolo DiMaria. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/28/17). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/28/17)(jm) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/23/17 re: Request for visitation from family of defendant..ENDORSEMENT: The government is to respond by 6/30/17 with input from BOP. Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/26/17). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/26/17)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER (COPY) by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/23/17 re: Request for order requiring BOP to permit visitation with family. (Filed under seal on 6/23/17) (jm) Modified on 10/6/2017 (jm). (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy maintaining this matter under seal except for Consulate General and certain medical professionals. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 5/5/17). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/5/17)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy maintaining matter under seal except for Consulate General and certain medical professionals. (Filed under seal on 4/26/17). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/16/17)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
(COPY) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Plea held on 10/13/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Advice of Rights Form. as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Filed under seal on 10/13/16) (jm) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 10/13/16) (jm) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(S1) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-5s, 6s-7s. (jm)(Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 10/13/16) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 10/13/16) (jm) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy maintaining this matter under seal with exceptions as to Consulate General and Dr Grassian. (Filed under seal on 9/19/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/19/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 9/13/16 re: Informing the Court of defendant's intention to retain counsel and for permission to provide incoming counsel with copy of the sealing order. ENDORSEMENT: Discussion shall be held along these lines at 9/19/16 conference at 12:30 PM. SO ORDERED. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 9/13/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/14/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 8/26/16 re: Advising the Court that defendant consents to meet with attorneys Dennis Edney and Barry Coburn. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 8/26/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy for the continued delayed docketing/sealing of this matter except as regards representatives of the Consulate General of Canada in NY as well as Dr Stuart Grassian in connection with his work as a medical professional. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 8/10/16. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/10/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER (COPY) as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy for the continued sealing of this matter except that defendant may communicate with the Consulate General of Canada in NY. The next conference shall be 8/10/16 at 10:00 AM. The 8/11/16 date is vacated. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 7/13/16) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/13/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy for the continuation of teh sealing/delayed docketing of this matter. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 7/5/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/5/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSATekeei dated 7/5/16 re: Request for continued sealing of this matter. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 7/5/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 6/29/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300, (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy continuing the filing status of this matter under seal/delayed docketing). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/27/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/27/16 re: Update to the Court on the need to maintain this matter under seal. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/27/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER (COPY) as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/23/16 re: The limited unsealing of documents to be provided to Staff Attorney of the BOP..ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: Executive staff must abide by the provisions of the Court's Judge 20, 2016 Order. Executive staff are prohibited from disclosing, in any way, any documents or information relating to this case including, without limitation, the Materials to any third party absent an order of this Court. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/24/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/24/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/23/16 re: Clarification of Defense's position on unsealing of documents. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/23/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/23/16 re: Request for Order to provide BOP Executive staff with certain MATERIALS. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/23/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Conference held on 6/23/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300, (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER (COPY) as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing ion 6/22/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/22/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/21/16 re: Request for Limited Unsealing..ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: on condition that Mr Johnson adheres to confidentiality order. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/21/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/21/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/21/16 re: Request for limited unsealing. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/21/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER (COPY) as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy for the continued delayed docketing of this matter. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on6/20/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/20/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Tekeei dated 6/20/16 re: Request by the Government for the Court to enter an enclosed Stipulated Protective Order. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/20/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/20/16 re: Request to modify the sealing order to permit defense to share arraignment minutes with the BOP. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/20/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/20/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/20/16 re: Concern for circumstances surrounding defendant's incarceration. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/20/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/20/16 re: Government response to defense's 6/19/16 letter opposing application for continued sealing. Document filed by USA.(Filed under seal on 6/20/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/19/16 re: Opposition to the Government's application for continued sealing. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/19/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER (REDACTED) by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Turner dated 6/17/16 re: Request for continued sealing/delayed docketing. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal on 6/17/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT (COPY) of Proceedings as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy re: Arraignment held on 6/16/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300, (jm) (jm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2017: # 1 document) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Defense Counsel dated 6/13/16 re: Request for scheduling a conference..ENDORSEMENT: June 16, 2016 at 2:30 PM: SO ORDERED. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/13/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/13/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
(Redacted) LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/13/16 re: Interim update to the Court on need to maintain this matter under seal. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/13/16) (jm) (jm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2017: # 1 document) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Tekeei and Turner dated 6/8/16 re: Response to Defendant's June 7, 2016 letter. Document filed by USA. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/8/16) (jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy on letter (COPY) from defense counsel which opposes the government's application for continued sealing and delayed arraignment and asking the Court to amend its order. Judge Berman supplements his earlier order dated 6/7/16 to require the Government to respond to defense counsel's letter dated 6/7/16. Judge Berman writes that the Government should respond by 6/8/16 ar 2:00 PM and include defendant's mental and physical well-being. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/7/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/7/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER (COPY) as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy placing this matter under seal/delayed docketing and setting a conference for June 23, 2016 at 2:00. (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/7/16). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/7/16)(jm) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
(REDACTED) LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA George Turner dated 6/6/16 re: Request for sealing & delayed docketing Document filed by USA. (jm) Modified on 10/6/2017 (jm). (Filed under seal/delayed docketing on 6/6/16) (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy and to schedule a status conference, open to the public, for November 2, 2017 at 9:30 AM. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/6/17)(jm) Modified on 10/6/2017 (jm). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-5, 6-7. (jm) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/6/2016)(dif) [1:16-mj-03302-UA] (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Negar Tekeei in Support by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy (dif) [1:16-mj-03302-UA] (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from AUSA George Turner dated 5/31/2016 re: USA v Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy, 16 Mag 3302 Document filed by USA. (dif) [1:16-mj-03302-UA] (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Sabrina Shroff, Esq dated 5/28/2016 re: USA v Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy, 16 Mag 3302. Ms. Shroff respectfully request that the documents associated with the arrest and presentment are to be remain sealed until June 6, 2016. Application Granted, So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/31/2016)(dif) [1:16-mj-03302-UA] (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Abdulrahman El Bahnasawy.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/23/2017)(dif) [1:16-mj-03302-UA] (Entered: 10/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 17 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?