United States v. SEILLER WATERMAN LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-00209
District Judge Sarah Evans Barker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 3:04 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Sklarew +1 202 307 6571 +1 202 514 5238 Peter.A.Sklarew@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Seiller Waterman LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seiller Waterman LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SEILLER WATERMAN LLC
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Sklarew on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sklarew, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued as to SEILLER WATERMAN LLC. (MAT) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against SEILLER WATERMAN LLC, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(Sklarew, Peter) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 65 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?