United States v. Hernandez Camilo
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-10285
District Judge Allison D. Burroughs, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2019 at 4:27 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None statement of reasons
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. Time excluded from October 30, 2017 until December 11, 2017. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: REPORT IN LIEU OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5 (a) as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo; Interim Status Conference set for 12/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING Initial Status Conference as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo based on joint submission filed by counsel. Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (Wichers, Christine) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: SCHEDULING ORDER as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. Time excluded from October 2, 2017 until October 30, 2017. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo; Initial Status Conference set for 10/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Arraignment as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (1) Count 1,2-3,4-5 held on 10/2/2017, Case called, Counsel, Spanish Interpreter & Defendant appear, Defendant notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Not Guilty Plea entered by Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo on counts 1-5, Automatic Disc. to be provided by October 6, 2017, Initial Status Conference scheduled for October 30, 2017 @ 2:00 pm, Time to be excluded through that date in the interest of justice, Orders to issue, Defendant previously detained and remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (Attorneys present: Wichers, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording 11:30. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Gabriel Hadad, Language: Spanish. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo; Arraignment set for 10/2/2017 11:30 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Reason for referral: full pretrial proceedings as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo; Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            INDICTMENT as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4-5. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. Time excluded from September 5, 2017 until October 5, 2017. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (Pursuant to the Allowance of Motion in Case 17mc91303-IT) (DaSilva, Carolina) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo held on 8/8/2017. Case called, Counsel, PO LaValley, Spanish Interpreter & Defendant appear, Defendant waives preliminary hearing and files waiver, Defendant assents to an order of detention, but, reserves his right to a detention hearing in the future, Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals, Order to issue.(Attorneys present: Wichers, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording 1:59. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Rudolf Heller-Ovalle, Language: Spanish. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/3/17 as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. (Jones, Sherry) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Initial Appearance as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo held on 8/3/2017, Case called, Counsel, Spanish Interpreter, PO Miller & Defendant appear, Defendant notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Financial Affidavit filed, The Court Orders FPD Cara McNamara appointed, Government moves for detention, Case continued for Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy, Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals.(Attorneys present: Abely, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording 2:18. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Carrie Lilley, Language: Spanish. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. Initial Appearance set for 8/3/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (1) (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Unseal Case as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  SEALED COMPLAINT as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dana Fiandaca, # 2 JS45)(Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo (1) (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Seal Case as to Willy Antonio Hernandez Camilo by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Willy Antonio Hernand Camilo; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) [1:17-mj-04180-DHH] (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?