Bree Walker Vs. Larocca Inspection Associates
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC107181

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2017 at 4:36 PM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Walker Bree, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Winick Daniel S.
v.
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Huber Craig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Huber Stephanie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Jennifer Jeffers-schwartz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Karen Nation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Larocca Inspection Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Mckernan Inspections Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Mckernaninsp Brokerage Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Nation Karen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Pickford Real Estate Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Prudential Ca Reality, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thrasher, Thomas N +1 714 565 7800
No Logo Ben-zvi Daniel P., Mediator
No Logo Coldwell Brokerage Inc., Defendant Erroneously Sued As
No Logo Prudential California Realty, Defendant's DBA
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Summary Judgment 08/06/2013
  Entries (295) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 295 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Abstract of Judgment issued
ABSTRACT ISSUED AND MAILED IN SASE
    Blank 294 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Substitution of Attorney
      Blank 293 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 stipulation
      TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC REQUESTED BY THE PARTIES PURSUANT TO THE POST COURT OF APPEALS' MEDIATION & THEIR STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT
        Blank 292 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 judgment
        AMENDED JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC
          Blank 291 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Remittitur Filed.
          COURT OF APPEAL BREE WALKER LAMPLEY APPEAL IS DISMISSED.
            Blank 290 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Remittitur Filed.
            COURT OF APPEAL BREE WALKER LAMPLEY APPEAL IS DISMISSED
              Blank 289 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: 5/21/2014 Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
                Blank 288 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Order
                RE: DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND PLAINTIFF WALKER LAMPLEY'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS;
                  Blank 287 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Objection
                  TO DEFENDANT'S (PROPOSED) ORDER RE DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEE AND PLAINTIFF WALKER-LAMPLEY'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
                    Blank 286 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal
                      Blank 285 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Notice of Designation of Record
                      Document sent to the Appellate Division with dummy file at their request.
                        Blank 284 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Notice
                        OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
                          Blank 283 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Notice of Designation of Record
                          ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE
                            Blank 282 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Notice Of Ruling
                              Blank 281 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Notice of appeal
                              $775.00 check #449 attached. forwarded to appellate division 2/27/14 (ro).
                                Blank 280 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                                ROSALIND M. DUDLEY #6505
                                  Blank 279 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Notice
                                  OF CONTINUED HEARINGS PURSUANT TO DTIPULATION AND ORDER, ORDER SIGNED FEBRUARY 4, 2014
                                    Blank 278 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Stipulation and Order
                                    TO CONTINUE BOTH THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS; AND THE MOTION TO TAX COSTS CURRENTLY SET ON 2/6/14 TO 2/20/14
                                      Blank 277 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Proof of Service
                                      RE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF WALKERS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY BRIEF
                                        Blank 276 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Objection
                                        SURI-FILING AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO LAROCCA'S REPLY AS (ERRONEOUSLY) LATE FILED
                                          Blank 275 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Objection
                                          PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO LATE FILING OF DEFENDANTS' LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' REPLY IN SUPPORT FOR ATTORNEY FEES
                                            Blank 274 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Objection
                                            PLAINTIFF'S OJECTION TO UNTIMELY FILING OF DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' INCLUSION OF SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS WITH THE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) IN ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
                                              Blank 273 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Proof of Service
                                              RE REPLY DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS "FILED VIA FAX"
                                                Blank 272 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Declaration
                                                OF GREGORY C. PYFROM SR. IN SUPPORT OF LARODDA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AWARD ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS "FILED VIZ FAX"
                                                  Blank 271 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Reply to Opposition
                                                  TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS "FILED VIA FAX"
                                                    Blank 270 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Declaration
                                                    OF DAVID HAMILTON IN SUPPORT OF LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AWARD ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS "FILED VIA FAX"
                                                      Blank 269 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Opposition
                                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS "FILED VIA FAX"
                                                        Blank 268 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Declaration
                                                        OF DIANE B. WEISSBURG, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
                                                          Blank 267 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Memo points & authorities
                                                          IN OPPOSITION TO LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
                                                            Blank 266 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
                                                              Blank 265 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                Blank 264 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                TO ADVANCE AND SET THE PENDING MOTION;
                                                                  Blank 263 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 notice of motion
                                                                  FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FOLLOWING GRANTING OF A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Blank 262 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                    TOTAL COSTS $3,855.05
                                                                      Blank 261 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Notice of Designation of Record
                                                                        Blank 260 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 judgment
                                                                        RE GRANTING OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Blank 259 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice
                                                                          NTC TO ATTY RE NTC OF APPEAL
                                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Order
                                                                            RE: DEFENDANT LAROCCA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;
                                                                              Blank 257 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Notice of appeal
                                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                    Blank 254 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                                                                                    NANCY K. BRINK #6501
                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 reply
                                                                                      TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAITIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPNOD TO FOR INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO
                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 reply
                                                                                        TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFNEDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OR DEEM THOSE ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR GRANT EVIDENTIARY AND MONETARY SANCITONS
                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                          CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE RE ITS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OR DEEM THOSE ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR GRANT EVIDENTIARY AND
                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                            CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE RE ITS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO
                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                              TO PLFF'S EXHIBITS
                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                TO PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO MSJ OR AJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                  TO MOT TO COMPEL RESPONSES OR FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTER- ROGATORIES SET 2
                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                    DIANE WEISSBURG
                                                                                                      Blank 245 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                      SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAITNIFF TO ANSWER REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OR DEEM THOSE ADMISSIONS ADMITTED OR GRANT EVIDENTIARY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS
                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                        IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
                                                                                                          Blank 243 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                          TO MOT TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS SET 2
                                                                                                            Blank 242 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                            TO MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION GREGORY C. PYFROM
                                                                                                              Blank 241 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                              SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES, INC. TO COMPEL PLAITNIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) WITHOUT
                                                                                                                Blank 240 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                BREE WALKER LAMPLEY
                                                                                                                  Blank 239 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                  OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO
                                                                                                                    Blank 238 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                    OF ERRATA RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (SET TWO)OR DEEM THOSE ADMISSIONS, ADMITTED
                                                                                                                      Blank 237 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Acknow of Satisfaction of Judgment
                                                                                                                        Blank 236 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) WITHOUT OBJECTIONS AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTION AGAINST PLAINTIFF BREE WALKER-LAMPLEY AND HER COUNSEL, DIAN B. WEISSBURG
                                                                                                                          Blank 235 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION OR DEEM THOSE ADMISSIONS ADMITTED
                                                                                                                            Blank 234 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                              Blank 233 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                              SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ
                                                                                                                                Blank 232 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                TO MSJ
                                                                                                                                  Blank 231 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                  DIANE B. WEISSBURG
                                                                                                                                    Blank 230 Filed: 5/5/2013, Entered: 5/5/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                        RE: DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                          OF UNAVAILABILITY
                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                            OF HEARING RE DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                              ON PLAINTIFF, WALKER'S MOTION TO FILE A FIFTH (5TH) AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                  RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                    EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO DISREGARD
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: 4/5/2013 reply
                                                                                                                                                      IN SUPPORT TO FILE A FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIO FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD A CUASE OF ACTION FOR BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                          TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD A CAUSE OF ACTION FOR BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                            OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANT LAROCCA INSPECTION OF ASSOCIATES, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                        AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                            OF ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 209 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                              TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    OF GREOGORY C. PYFROM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EXPARTE MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD BRACH OF ORAL CONTRACT "FILED VIA FAX"
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 205 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Statement-Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                      Partial) (FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION ENDED IN PARTIAL AGREEMENT.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                        TO DEFENDANT, LAROCCA'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL & OPPOSITION TO DECLARATION OF DIANE WEISSBURG
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DATES
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOLLOWING A COURT ORDERED STAY BY JUDGE SEGAL & THE ORDERING OF THIS MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION BETWEEN BUYER & SELLERS
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                              ON DEFENDANT LARODDA'S EX PARTE HEARING OFR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                TO DEFENDANT CRAIG A. HUBER AND STEPHANIE B. HUBER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS DECLARATION OF DIANE B. WEISSBURG IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                  with Prejudice) (COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL, JENNIFER SCHWARTZ, PRUDENTIAL REALTY, PRICFORD REALTY, KAREN NATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE REQUEST
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE: EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME OR HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DUE TO DISCOVERY STAY
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO SHORTEN TIME FOR A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TOTAL COSTS $3,460.00
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AWARD AS PREVAILING PARTY IN PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,700.00 "FAX FILING"
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD "FAX FILING"
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF NEW OFFICE LOCATION GREGORY C. PYFROM NEW ADDRESS 2315 W. BURBANK BLVD BURBANK, CALIFORNIA, 91506 818-422-3666
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLARIFICATION RE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF BREA WALKER FOR ENTERING OF JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              "BY FAX"
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF ERRATUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT DEFENDANT CRAIG HUBER AND STEFANIE HUBER ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLFF'S RENEWED MTN FOR ATTY FEES & COSTS TO BRING 2ND PETN TO DISMISS THE ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND REMAND TO COURT DOCKET; OR PETN TO COMPEL DEFTS' TO PAY ALL ARBITRATION FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF UNAVAILABILITY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IN SUPORT OF PETITION TO DISMISS THE ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND REMAND TO COURT DOCKET, ETC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: 3/27/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LUCIE BARRON OF ADR SERVICES, INC. SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITITON TO DISMISS THE ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND REMAND TO COURT DOCKET
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: 3/26/2012 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO PETITION TO DISMISS THE ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND REMAND TO COURT DOCKET
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO DISMISS THE ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND REMAND TO COURT DOCKET
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 CCP 170.6 Application Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Notice-Case Reassignment and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL GREGORY C. PYFROM ATTY FOR DEFTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: 10/5/2011 Application - misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT AS TO BRE WALKER-LAMPLEY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Writ-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACCURED INTEREST $188.19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Abstract of Judgment issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Writ-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Memo.of Credits,Acrued Int.,&Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACCRUED INTEREST $188.19
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            of unavailability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AWARD TO DEFENDANTS CRAIG A. HUBER AND STEFANIE B. HUBER CONFORMED COPY U.S. MAIL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO PLAINTIFF'S LATE SUBMISSION OF BINDING ARBITRATOR LIST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF PROSPECTIVE LIST OF ARBITRATORS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BINDING ARBITRATION LIST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RE: RULING RE DEFENDANTS HUBER MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES AND PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO REVOKE ARBITRATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF DEREK S. LEMKIN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO PETITION TO REVOKE ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF GREGORY C. PYFROM, SR.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO REVOKE ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF DEF.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              for attorneys' fees pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code 1717; declaration of Derek S. Lemkin in support thereof
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL GREGORY C. PYFROM ATTY FOR DEFT FROM 5-20-11 - 5-31-11 6-21-11 - 6-29-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES TO CRAIG HUBER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF CRAIG A. HUBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING CASE TO BINDING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO MTN TO FILE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR AN ORDER RESETTING THE DATE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FURTHER AMENDING OF HER 3RD AMENDE D COMPLAINT SET FOR APRIL 20, 2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO CONT HRG ON MTN TO FILE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ON AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT LaROCCA INSPECTION ASSOCIATES, INC., TO MODIFY THE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE AND GRANT PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO PETITION OF CRAIG AND STEPHANIE HUBER FOR AN ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF STEPHANIE AND CRAIG HUBER AS WELL AS ALL DEFENDANTS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENIN G TIME
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR EX PARTE RELIEF AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE THIS IS A REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT A DISCOVERY REFEREE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ORDER COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO PLAINTIFFS' UNSPECIFIED EX PARTE APPLICATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO EX PARTE APPLICATION; REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY REFEREE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR ORDER COMPELLING CASE TO BINDING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Answer To Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        VERIFIED - TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONTINUING TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF THOMAS N. THRASHER, JR. IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE AND HEARING OF THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE AND HEARING OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF JILL MORTON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GRANTING DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY AND JENNIFER JEFFERS- SCHWARTZ'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ITS TREBLE DAMAGES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAROCCA'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CRAIG S. HUBER AND STEFANIE HUBER'S DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAIN T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LAROCCA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAIN T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS COLDWELL BANKER, ETC., AND JEENIFER JEFFERS SCHWARTZ TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT McKERNAN INSPECTIONS, INC., ONLY CONFORMED COPY U.S. MAIL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL GREGORY C. PYFROM ATTY FOR DEFT FROM 1-31-11 - 2-12-11 2-7-11 - 2-21-11 3-14-11 - 4-11-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF DISMISSAL CONFORMED COPY US MAIL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Memorandum Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO OPP TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFTS CRAIG AND STEFANIE HUBERS; 1/10/11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO MOTION TO STRIKE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFTS CRAIG AND STEFANIE HUBER; 1/10/11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY SUPPORTING DEMURRER AND MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF TO MTN TERMINATING SANCTIONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            IN OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN OPP TO MTN FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EVIDENTIARY OBJ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF ERRATA RE MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL GREGORY C. PYFROM ATTY FOR DEFT FROM 11-26-10 - 12-3-10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RULING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RE JENNIFER FEFFERS SCHWARTZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Objection Document Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TO REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO EX PARTE BROUGHT BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR ORDERS: 1) CONTINUING DEFENDANT LAROCCA'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND SANCTIONS; 2) PLAINTIFF REQUESTS ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO THE OPP TO COMPEL RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF UNAVAILABILITY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF CRAIG A. HUBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTS NOTICE OF DARK DAY RESCHEDULING OF MOTION TO 10-15-10 9:00 AM DEPT O
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Separate Statement of Und. Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEPARATE STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Amended Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ALL PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF UNAVAILABILITY.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Memo points & authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERRO,AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR DFNT'S IMPROPER MOTION;FAILURE TO FOLLOW CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT;FAILURE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO RESPOND TO SPECIAL INTERROGA- TORIES (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLTFF. AND HER COUNSEL, DIANE B. WEISSBURG; MPA; DECL. OF GREGORY C. PYFROM IN SUPPORT THEREOF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE COLDWELL BANKER BROKERAGE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE KAREN NATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RE PICKFORD REAL ESTATE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RE LAROCCA INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE CRAIG HUBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RE STEPHAIN HUBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE TRIAL SETTING FOR JURY TRIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL GREGORY C. PYFROM FROM 6-1-10, 6-2-10 & 6-3-10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?