Doe v. Fairfield Public Schools
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00438
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2019 at 12:16 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Fairfield Public Schools, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ford & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@fordharrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FordHarrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda A. Powell +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mpowell@fordharrison.com
No Logo John Honey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wade Cannavino, Jr. +1 203 357 9200 jwcannavino@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine S. Nietzel +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 961 9872 cnietzel@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Zellner +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 jczellner@ryandelucalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FordHarrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda A. Powell +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mpowell@fordharrison.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE The parties have reported that this action has been settled in full. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before August 16, 2014. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the courts file), they may do so on or before August 16, 2014. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/17/2014.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 54 Oral MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/20/14 To File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Oral MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/20/14 To File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools, John Honey. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER re 50 Calendar Entry: The settlement conference scheduled for May 30, 2014 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 5/29/2014.(Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 51 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 13, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/8/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time until June 13, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-up Settlement Conference set for 5/30/2014 10:30 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 48 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2014, to File Dispositive Motion by Fairfield Public Schools. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/14/14. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Settlement Conference held on 2/6/2014. Case not settled. Parties to report back in 10 days. Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 45 Oral Motion for Extension of Time until March 31, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions. The Clerk of the Court will update this deadline. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/6/2014. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Oral MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-Up Settlement Conference set for 2/5/2014 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 42 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 7, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/8/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until February 7, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Docket Entry Correction...Modified to reflect the correct file date on the minutes re 40 Settlement Conference (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: TelephoneSettlement Conference held on 10/30/2013, with plaintiff's counsel to discuss progress of settlement discussions. 10 minutes (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 38 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 10, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/30/2013. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until January 10, 2014 to File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Settlement Conference held on 10/3/2013. Total Time: 3 hours (Jaiman, R.) Modified on 11/5/2013 (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of John Honey (Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 34 MOTION for Extension of Time by Fairfield Public Schools. Dispositive motions are due November 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/22/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 10/1/2013 10:30 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The prior settlement conference instructions remain in effect. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 31 MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend All Outstanding Deadlines re 14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/3/2013. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend All Outstanding Deadlines re 14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2013. Parties are to report back in 30 days. Total Time: 4 hours (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REMINDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 02/22/13 at 10:15AM Pursuant to the Court's Settlement Conference Order, not later than 14 days before the conference, plaintiff's counsel shall contact defendant's counsel to initiate settlement discussions, if they are not already on-going. At least 5 days before the conference, each party shall provide to the Court, in confidence, a concise statement, no longer than 3 pages in length, of the evidence the party expects to produce at trial. The statements shall outline the settlement negotiations to date, and identify where possible the obstacles or impediments which have so far prevented settlement of the matter. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 01/24/2013) (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/4/2013 at 2:00 PM Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2013 at 10:15 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REMINDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 02/04/13 at 02:00PM Pursuant to the Court's Settlement Conference Order, not later than 14 days before the conference, plaintiff's counsel shall contact defendant's counsel to initiate settlement discussions, if they are not already on-going. At least 5 days before the conference, each party shall provide to the Court, in confidence, a concise statement, no longer than 3 pages in length, of the evidence the party expects to produce at trial. The statements shall outline the settlement negotiations to date, and identify where possible the obstacles or impediments which have so far prevented settlement of the matter. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2012 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2013 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2012 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT INSTRUCTIONS. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 11/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/15/2012. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 21 Motion for Conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/15/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        MOTION for Settlement Conference and Referral to Magistrate Judge by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until January 21, 2013 To File Dispositive Motions by Fairfield Public Schools. (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 26, 2012 To Respond To Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests For Production. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/3/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until August 26, 2012 To Respond To Defendant John Honey's Interrogatories and Requests For Production by Jane Doe. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by John Honey.(Cannavino, John) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Fairfield Public Schools.(Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER approving 14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: discovery should be completed by June 1, 2013; dispositive motions are due by July 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/2/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Wade Cannavino, Jr on behalf of John Honey (Cannavino, John) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Nietzel on behalf of John Honey (Nietzel, Catherine) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/5/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/17/2012 respond to plaintiff's complaint by Fairfield Public Schools. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda A. Powell on behalf of Fairfield Public Schools (Powell, Melinda) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rose on behalf of Fairfield Public Schools (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Fairfield Public Schools served on 3/26/2012, answer due 4/16/2012; John Honey served on 3/26/2012, answer due 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Fairfield Public Schools - Summons, # 2 Fairfield Public Schools - Marshal's Return, # 3 John Honey - Summons, # 4 John Honey - Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fairfield Public Schools, John Honey* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Jane Doe, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Jane Doe, 4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/23/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/23/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2012. Discovery due by 9/22/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2012. Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Jane Doe (Williams, John) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2444476.), filed by Jane Doe.(Williams, John) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?