NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD v. SAMPSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-08134

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 12:36 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT E. MULLIGAN, JR. +1 862 229 7034 robert.mulligan@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo ALLAN RAMCHARAN, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY REY, Defendant
No Logo ARMONDO NAZARIO, Defendant
No Logo BENSLEY BLAIN, Defendant
No Logo EDWIN RIOS, Defendant
No Logo ERIC SLACK, Defendant
No Logo FAHNEIR REYNOLDS, Defendant
No Logo HIRAM CRAWFORD, Defendant
No Logo JINGHUA SHEN, Defendant
No Logo JOSHUA MENDELSOHN, Defendant
No Logo KERWIN DE LEON, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW MILLER, Defendant
No Logo QUI NGUYEN, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD SAMPSON, Defendant
No Logo STEVE TRIMBLE, Defendant
No Logo VINCENT HARNEY, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2018. (mmh)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD Order Compelling Compliance to Invesigative Subpoenas ad testificandum (MULLIGAN, ROBERT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER that the Respondents shall obey and and comply with the investigative subpoenas that we issued to them by the board by meeting with an agent of the Regional Direct Region on a date and time to be determined; that is Respondents fail to comply the Court reserves the right to impose sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/12/2017. (mmh)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SUMMONS ISSUED as to BENSLEY BLAIN, HIRAM CRAWFORD, KERWIN DE LEON, VINCENT HARNEY, JOSHUA MENDELSOHN, MATTHEW MILLER, ARMONDO NAZARIO, QUI NGUYEN, ALLAN RAMCHARAN, ANTHONY REY, FAHNEIR REYNOLDS, EDWIN RIOS, RICHARD SAMPSON, JINGHUA SHEN, ERIC SLACK, STEVE TRIMBLE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD Order to Show Cause (MULLIGAN, ROBERT)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why an order of this Court should not issue directing Respondents to appear before an agent of the Regional Director for Region 22 and give testimony in connection with the investigation of Board Case 22-CA-191253. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2017 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/14/2017. (mmh)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 2:17-cv-8134. Case reallocated to Trenton and reassigned to Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert for all further proceedings. Judge Kevin McNulty, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/17/2017. (jjc) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PETITION to quash/compel/enforce Subpoenas Ad Testificandum, filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP Application of the National Labor Relations Board for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum, # 2 Exhibit Application of the National Labor Relations Board for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibits A through D, # 3 Exhibit Application of the National Labor Relations Board for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit E (1), # 4 Exhibit Application of the National Labor Relations Board for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit E (2), # 5 Exhibit Application of the National Labor Relations Board for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit F, # 6 Brief Memorandum of the National Labor Relations Board in Support of its Application for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum, # 7 Exhibit Memorandum of the National Labor Relations Board in Support of its Application for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit A (1), # 8 Exhibit Memorandum of the National Labor Relations Board in Support of its Application for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit A (2), # 9 Exhibit Memorandum of the National Labor Relations Board in Support of its Application for an Order Requiring Obedience to Investigative Subpoenas Ad Testificandum. Exhibit B, # 10 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard Fox, Regional Attorney for Region 22 of the National Labor Relations Board, # 11 Summons Order to Show Cause, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 13 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(MULLIGAN, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Summons Issued attached to docket entry 5 filed by the Clerk's office on 12/4/2017 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (km)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1 MOTION to Quash. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Opposition due 10/23/2017. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 12 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?