Porsche Leasing Ltd. Vs. Walter Thurmond, Iii
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC127294

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2017 at 11:25 PM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
No Logo Porsche Leasing Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Stacey A.
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Thurmond Walter Iii, Defendant
Type Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)
Status Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 08/02/2017
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Miscellaneous-Other
STATEMENT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
    Blank 11 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Declaration
    OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
      Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Declaration
      OF PLAINTIFF REQUESTING COPY BE USED AS ORIGINAL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA FULES OF COURT, RULES 3.1806
        Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Order
        ACCEPTING COPY AS ORIGINAL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1806
          Blank 8 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Partial Dismissal
          w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY
            Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Default -Judgment
            TOTAL AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT $51,107.37 PLUS POSSESSION OF THE VEHICLE
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Statement-Case Management
                Blank 5 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Default Entered
                AS TO: WALTER THURMOND, III AN INDIVIDUAL - ENTERED
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Request for Entry of Default
                  AS TO: WALTER THURMOND,III; an IND
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Proof of Service
                    SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: WALTER THURMOND, III BY SERVING: PERSONAL DELIVERY ON 4/9/17 AT 10:00AM
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Complaint filed
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Summons Filed

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?