Henry v. Rock Creek Founda., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-00039-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ricardo F. Henry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thatcher Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abbey Gail Hairston +1 301 441 1400 +1 301 441 9602 agh@thatcherlaw.com
v.
No Logo Gary Donaldson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving Greenberg +1 301 251 4010 +1 301 217 0409
No Logo Jo Ann Hutchinson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving Greenberg +1 301 251 4010 +1 301 217 0409
No Logo The Rock Creek Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving Greenberg +1 301 251 4010 +1 301 217 0409
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/7/1992
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $350000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 2/1/1996
Origin 3
Reopened 10/2/1992
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Terminated Case
Case closed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 65 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER "DISMISSING" this case with prejudice ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel February 23, 1995) (c/m 2/23/95-cc) (MICROFILMED 2/27/95) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 64 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice against all defendants. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 63 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "SETTING" a settlement conference on January 30, 1995 at 2:00pm ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel January 3, 1995) (c/m 1/4/95-cc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 62 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/13/1994 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER "SETTING" a settlement conference on January 4, 1994 ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel December 9, 1994) (c/m 12/9/94-cc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 61 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER "SETTING" a settlement conference for January 5, 1995 at 1:00 p.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel November 22, 1994) (c/m 11/22/94-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 60 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson in opposition to [58-1] motion of plaintiff for Sanctions pusuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 and attachment. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 59 Filed: 9/16/1994, Entered: 9/19/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [49-1] motion of defendant to exclude testimony of plaintiff for incompetency with leave granted to renew the motion at trial; "DIRECTING" that the motion for sanctions is held under advisement pending further order of the court; "DENYING" the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, as therein set forth; "GRANTING" the joint oral motion to continue the trial date; and "DIRECTING" that the trial shall commmence on January 24, 1995 at 10:00 a.m., as therein set forth ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel September 15, 1994) (c/m 9/15/94-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 58 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Motion for Sanctions
                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Ricardo F. Henry for Sanctions pusuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 . (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 57 Filed: 9/6/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "RESCHEDULING" the hearing for September 12, 1994 at 11:00 a.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel August 25, 1994) (c/m 8/25/94) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/26/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson to response of plaintiff to [46-1] motion of defendants for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 55 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Response in Opposition
                        RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [49-1] motion of defendant to exclude testimony of plaintiff for incompetency. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/8/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Response in Opposition
                          RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [46-1] motion of defendant for Summary Judgment, plaintiff's statement of material facts in dispute, memorandum in support, and exhibits 1 thru 13. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994 MemorandumCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM "SETTING" a hearing for August 22, 1994 at 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel July 28, 1994) (c/m 7/28/94-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [51-1] motion of plantiffs to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings to the defendants' motion for summary judgment and to exclude testimony of plaintiff for incompetency; and "SETTING" a hearing on defendants' motion on August 22, 1994 at 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel July 28, 1994) (c/m 7/28/94-chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/25/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994, Terminated: 8/1/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION by Ricardo F. Henry to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings to the defendants' motion for summary judgment and to exclude testimony of plaintiff for incompetency . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/25/1994, Entered: 7/27/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Ricardo F. Henry by Abbey G. Hairston. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 49 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994, Terminated: 9/16/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    MOTION by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson to exclude testimony of plaintiff for incompetency and exhibit 1. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson to response of plaintiff to [45-1] motion of defendants for Sanctions under F.R.C.P. 30 and exhibit A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 47 Filed: 7/6/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Response in Opposition
                                        RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [45-1] motion of defendant for Sanctions under F.R.C.P. 30. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 46 Filed: 7/5/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson for Summary Judgment and exhibits 1-24 and A - C. (c/s) (filed seperately) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 45 Filed: 6/20/1994, Entered: 6/21/1994 Motion for Sanctions
                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Rock Creek Founda. for Sanctions under F.R.C.P. 30 . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Motion for Protective Order
                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeanett P. Henry for Protective Order . (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 43 Filed: 4/26/1994, Entered: 4/26/1994 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel for all further proceedings in this case, including trial and order the entry of a final judgment (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg April 22, 1994) (c/m 4/26/94-jh) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [40-1] motion of defendant for Protective Order; granting in part, denying in part [38-1] motion of plaintiff for Protective Order; "GRANTING" the defendant's oral motion to further depose plaintiff and plaintiff's wife; and "REVISING" scheduling order, as therein set forth ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel April 20, 1994) (c/m 4/20/94-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "SETTING" all pending discovery disputes on April 18, 1994 aat 1:00 p.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel April 12, 1994) (c/m 4/12/94-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994, Terminated: 4/25/1994 Motion for Protective Order
                                                      MOTION by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson for Protective Order and attachments. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/28/1994 Response in Opposition
                                                        RESPONSE by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson in opposition to [38-1] motion of plaintiff for Protective Order. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 3/16/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994 Motion for Protective Order
                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Ricardo F. Henry for Protective Order . (c/s to Mag. Kenkel and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 12/20/1993, Entered: 12/20/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [31-1] motion of defendant for Sanctions against plaintiff for failure to provide discovery; granting in part, denying in part [31-2] motion of defendant to Compel, as therein set forth; and "DENYING" motion of defendant for sanctions ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel December 17, 1993). (c/m 12/17/93-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/6/1993, Entered: 12/6/1993, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Motion for Protective Order
                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Ricardo F. Henry for Protective Order and exhibits A thru D. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 11/29/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "RESCHEDULING" the motions hearing until December 9, 1993 at 2:00 p.m., as therien set forth ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel November 23, 1993) (c/m 11/23/93-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/19/1994
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/16/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "SETTING" a hearing on December 1, 1993 at 1:00 p.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel November 12, 1993). (c/m 11/12/93-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/28/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson to response of plaintiff to [31-1] motion of defendant for Sanctions against plaintiff for failure to provide discovery, [31-2] motion to Compel and exhibits A thru B. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/19/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Response in Opposition
                                                                      RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [31-1] motion of Rock Creek Foundation and Gary Donaldson for Sanctions against plaintiff for failure to provide discovery and [31-2] motion to Compel. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993, Terminated: 12/20/1993 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                        MOTION by Rock Creek Founda. and Gary Donaldson for Sanctions against plaintiff for failure to provide discovery , or in the alternative to Compel and exhibits A thru G. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          ANSWER by Gary Donaldson and Jo Ann Hutchinson to second amended complaint for relief from discrimination in employment. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/11/1993, Terminated: 2/1/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            ANSWER by Rock Creek Founda. (Attorney David Keith Felsen) to amended complaint. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993 Amended Complaint
                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ricardo F. Henry , (Answer due 6/7/93 for Jo Ann Hutchinson, for Gary Donaldson and for Rock Creek Founda. ) amending [22-1] amended complaint. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/19/1993, Entered: 5/19/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting as to defendants Marie Assir and Leslie Kent and denying as to all other defendants; "GRANTING" plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file a second amended complaint to be filed no later than May 28, 1993, as therein set forth; and "DENYING" [21-1] motion of defendant for Attorney Fees ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel May 18, 1993). (c/m 5/18/93-chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: 4/5/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "SETTING" a motions hearing on May 3, 1993 at 2:00 p.m. (signed Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel on March 30, 1993) (c/m 3/30/93) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/5/1992, Entered: 11/6/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                    RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [24-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss amended complaint and for other relief. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/26/1992, Terminated: 5/19/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent and Marie Assir to Dismiss amended complaint and for other relief and attachment. (c/s to Mag. Kenkel and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/2/1992, Entered: 10/5/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                        RESPONSE by Ricardo F. Henry in opposition to [21-1] motion of Defendants for Attorney Fees and memorandum and request for hearing. (c/s to Mag Kenkel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/14/1992
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/2/1992, Entered: 10/5/1992 Amended Complaint
                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ricardo F. Henry , (Answer due 10/12/92 for Marie Assir, for Leslie Kent, for Jo Ann Hutchinson, for Gary Donaldson and for Rock Creek Founda. ) amending [1-1] complaint. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/2/1992, Entered: 10/14/1992 Case Reopened
                                                                                            Case reopened. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: 9/24/1992, Terminated: 5/19/1993 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                              MOTION by defendants with memorandum in support for Attorney Fees and Exhibit A. (c/s to Mag Kenkel and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/24/1992
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: 9/4/1992 Judgment*
                                                                                                CLERKS JUDGMENT "ORDERED AND ADJUDGED" that the Defendants motion to strike is denied, the defendants motion to dismiss is granted and that plaintiffs complaint is dismissed without prejudice with leave granted to file an amended complaint within thirty day s of the date of this order (signed by deputy clerk). (c/m 9/4/92-bj) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/19/1994
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: 9/4/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [16-1] motion of Defendant to Strike [14-1] motion response; granting [11-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss complaint without prejudice with leave granted to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this order ( signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel 9/2/92). (c/m 9/2/92-chambers) (MICROFILMED 9/4/92) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/04/1992
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: 9/10/1992 Terminated Case
                                                                                                    Case closed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/3/1992, Entered: 8/5/1992 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      REPLY by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent, Marie Assir to response of Plaintiff to [11-1] motion of Defendants to Dismiss complaint. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/3/1992, Entered: 8/5/1992 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James E. Kenkel for Trial signed by Judge Benson E. Legg July 24, 1992 ) (c/m 8/45/92-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/30/1992, Terminated: 9/4/1992 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                          MOTION by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent and Marie Assir to Strike [14-1] motion response and Exhibit A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/24/1992, Entered: 7/31/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Memorandum informing parties that case is assignued to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Magistrate Judge will be in touch with counsel. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 7/28/1992 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition by Ricardo F. Henry to [11-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss complaint. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 7/28/1992 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Ricardo F. Henry. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 7/28/1992 Status Report
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent, Marie Assir. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/1992, Entered: 7/9/1992 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendants with memorandum in support to Dismiss complaint and Request for hearing. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/1/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 03/20/92 "granting" [9-1] motion to Withdraw [6-1] motion for Default Judgment against Rock Creek Founda. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 03/20/92 pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/1992, Entered: 3/12/1992, Terminated: 3/20/1992 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Ricardo F. Henry to Withdraw [6-1] motion for Default Judgment against Rock Creek Founda. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: 3/4/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER dated 02/21/92 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 02/24/92 pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/21/1992, Entered: 3/4/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Rock Creek Founda. in opposition to [6-1] motion for Default Judgment against Rock Creek Founda., Memorandum, and Exhibit A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 3/4/1992 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Ricardo F. Henry for Default Judgment against Rock Creek Founda. , and Attachment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 2/12/1992 Remark
                                                                                                                                Local Rule 103.3 statement of defendants. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 2/12/1992 Answer
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent, Marie Assir (Attorney Irving Greenberg), (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 2/12/1992 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent, Marie Assir by Irving Greenberg (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/7/1992, Entered: 1/20/1992 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for Rock Creek Founda., Gary Donaldson, Jo Ann Hutchinson, Leslie Kent, Marie Assir (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/03/1992
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/1992, Entered: 1/20/1992 Complaint
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 099017 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?