Shiekh v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-06626

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2019 at 2:27 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Muhammad Akhtar Shiekh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Elica S Vafaie +1 415 848 7733 +1 415 896 1702 elicav@advancingjustice-alc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anoop Prasad +1 415 848 7722 +1 415 896 1702 anoopp@asianlawcaucus.org
Space Christina Sinha +1 415 896 1701 +1 415 896 1702 christinas@advancingjustice-alc.org
v.
No Logo Donald Neufeld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Stefanie Notarino Hennes +1 202 532 4175 Stefanie.Hennes@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Walter Manning Evans +1 202 616 2186 +1 202 305 4829 Manning.Evans@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Thomas Pyle +1 408 535 5087 +1 408 535 5081 michael.t.pyle@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel William Bettwy +1 619 557 7119 +1 619 557 7122 Samuel.Bettwy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Shahna M Esber +1 213 894 8308 +1 213 894 7819 shahna.esber@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
No Logo Elaine C. Duke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Contra Costa County Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Abigail Dye +1 925 335 1819 abigail.dye@cc.cccounty.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 718 254 6288 +1 718 254 7489 joseph.marutollo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Raven M Norris +1 619 557 7157 +1 415 436 6570 raven.norris@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron Kollitz +1 213 894 2083 +1 213 894 7819 aaron.kollitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Grace Y Park +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 grace.park@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov
, , , , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Evan Carmichael +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 305 2685 andrew.e.carmichael@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yamileth G. Davila +1 202 305 0137 yamileth.g.davila@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander James Halaska +1 202 307 8704 +1 202 305 7000 alexander.j.halaska@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Genevieve Kelly +1 202 532 4705 genevieve.m.kelly@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Norway +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 514 8624 Robert.M.Norway@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018, TERMINATED: 06/07/2018 Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/21/2017, TERMINATED: 10/21/2017, TERMINATED: 10/21/2017 Sherease Pratt +1 202 307 0895 sherease.pratt@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey S. Robins +1 202 616 1246 +1 202 233 0397 jeffrey.robins@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sairah Gul Saeed +1 202 532 4067 sairah.g.saeed@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Kathleen Schuessler +1 202 305 9698 +1 202 305 7000 danielle.k.schuessler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Brett A. Shumate +1 202 514 2331 brett.a.shumate@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Skurnik +1 202 616 8188 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.skurnik@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , James Walker +1 202 532 4468 +1 202 305 7000 James.Walker3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
, , , Sara Winslow +1 415 436 6925 +1 415 436 6748 sara.winslow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov
No Logo James McCament, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Jeffrey S. Robins +1 202 616 1246 +1 202 233 0397 jeffrey.robins@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James Walker +1 202 532 4468 +1 202 305 7000 James.Walker3@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Grace Y Park +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 grace.park@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Thomas Pyle +1 408 535 5087 +1 408 535 5081 michael.t.pyle@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED Vinita Andrapalliyal +1 202 598 8085 vinita.b.andrapalliyal@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 John Inkeles +1 202 532 4309 john.inkeles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Elianis N. Perez +1 202 616 9124 elianis.perez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jane Rund +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 jane.rund@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , SARAH L VUONG +1 202 532 4281 sarah.l.vuong@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , James Walker +1 202 532 4468 +1 202 305 7000 James.Walker3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , James Walker +1 202 532 4468 +1 202 305 7000 James.Walker3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Sheetul Sheth Wall +1 202 598 2668 +1 706 649 7667 Sheetul.S.Wall2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard Valeika, Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Aram A Gavoor +1 202 305 8014 +1 202 616 8962 aram.gavoor@usdoj.gov
, , , , Kathryne Gray +1 202 305 7386 +1 202 305 7777 kathryne.m.gray@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Geoffrey Forney +1 202 532 4329 +1 202 305 7000 geoff.forney@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
, , , Patil Adinath Chetan +1 202 305 4968 chetan.patil@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by AUSA - Office of the US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Terrence M Jones +1 213 894 7354 +1 213 894 7819 terrence.jones@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, J. Max Weintraub +1 202 305 7551 jacob.weintraub@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
, , , Aram A Gavoor +1 202 305 8014 +1 202 616 8962 aram.gavoor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Division - United States Courthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Mark R. Conrad +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 mark.conrad@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Steven P. Croley +1 313 226 9180 +1 313 226 3271 steven.croley@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Angie L Henson - DOJ +1 214 659 8600 +1 214 659 8807 angie.henson@usdoj.gov
, Kayla Stahman +1 206 553 7970 kayla.stahman@usdoj.gov
, , , Derri T. Thomas +1 313 226 9100 +1 313 226 9153 derri.thomas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016, TERMINATED: 11/28/2016 Craig Andrew Defoe +1 202 532 4114 +1 202 305 7000 craig.defoe@usdoj.gov
, Jason Lee +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Jason.Lee3@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/14/2016, TERMINATED: 03/14/2016, TERMINATED: 03/14/2016, TERMINATED: 03/14/2016 Sarah Maloney +1 202 616 1436 sarah.maloney2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 878

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Robins +1 202 616 1246 +1 202 233 0397 jeffrey.robins@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U. S. Attorney Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John J Stark +1 614 469 5715 john.stark@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Geoffrey Forney +1 202 532 4329 +1 202 305 7000 geoff.forney@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jane Rund +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 jane.rund@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Angela Givens Williams +1 601 973 2822 Angela.Williams3@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jean-David Barnea +1 212 637 2679 +1 212 637 2717 jean-david.barnea@usdoj.gov
, , Owen C.J. Foster, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Owen.C.J.Foster@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , James R. Cho +1 718 254 6519 +1 718 254 7489 james.cho@usdoj.gov
, , , Rebecca Grace Church +1 619 546 7721 rebecca.church@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Bibb Davis +1 415 436 7066 +1 415 436 7169 Julie.Davis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brock Darren Dupre +1 504 680 3005 brock.dupre@usdoj.gov
, John J. Boscia, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 John.J.Boscia@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Ameet B. Kabrawala +1 718 254 6001 +1 718 254 7489 ameet.kabrawala@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Aaron Kollitz +1 213 894 2083 +1 213 894 7819 aaron.kollitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Nikolas.Kerest@usdoj.gov
, , , Rukhsanah L. Singh +1 718 254 6498 +1 718 254 6081 rukhsanah.singh@usdoj.gov
, , , Neill Tai Tseng +1 415 436 7155 +1 415 436 6927 neill.tseng@usdoj.gov
, , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy Bart Jafek +1 303 454 0104 +1 303 454 0407 timothy.jafek@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Sean P. Greene +1 718 254 6484 +1 718 254 7483 sean.greene@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
, Nicholas P. Llewellyn +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 nicholas.llewellyn@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jacob Max Bergman +1 212 637 2776 jacob.bergman@usdoj.gov
, Michael J. Byars +1 212 225 2524 +1 212 225 3999 michael.byars@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury +1 212 637 2633 +1 212 637 2750 arastu.chaudhury@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Samuel Hilliard Dolinger +1 212 637 2677 samuel.dolinger@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Nancy Kuehler +1 212 637 0378 +1 212 637 2750 natalie.kuehler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Lana L. Vahab +1 202 532 4067 +1 202 305 7000 lana.vahab@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brandon Matthew Waterman +1 212 637 2741 brandon.waterman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Theodore William Atkinson +1 202 532 4135 +1 202 305 7000 theodore.atkinson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Michael Bauer +1 202 532 4786 +1 202 616 8962 jeffrey.bauer@usdoj.gov
, , , Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Lauren Crowell Bingham +1 202 616 4458 +1 202 305 7000 lauren.c.bingham@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen J. Buckingham +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.buckingham@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Linda Y. Cheng +1 202 514 0500 +1 202 616 4314 linda.cheng@usdoj.gov
, Patil Adinath Chetan +1 202 305 4968 chetan.patil@usdoj.gov
, , , , Varudhini Chilakamarri +1 202 616 8489 varudhini.chilakamarri@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C Dugan +1 202 514 3259 joseph.dugan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Siegmund Fred Fuchs +1 202 616 4322 siegmund.f.fuchs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
, , , Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Aaron S Goldsmith +1 202 532 4107 +1 202 616 8962 aaron.goldsmith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017, TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 John Inkeles +1 202 532 4309 john.inkeles@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anita Johnson +1 617 748 3100 anita.johnson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Patrick George Nemeroff +1 202 305 8727 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.g.nemeroff@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Emily Sue Newton +1 202 305 8356 emily.s.newton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Elianis N. Perez +1 202 616 9124 elianis.perez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Daniel Riess +1 202 353 3098 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.riess@usdoj.gov
, , , , Stuart Justin Robinson +1 202 514 9239 stuart.j.robinson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Galen Nicholas Thorp +1 202 514 4781 +1 202 616 8460 galen.thorp@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
, , , Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , SARAH L VUONG +1 202 532 4281 sarah.l.vuong@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/29/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Muhammad Akhtar Shiekh (Vafaie, Elica) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Summons Issued as to Defendants Elaine C. Duke, James McCament, Donald Neufeld, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security & Richard Valeika. (tnS) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Proposed Summons. (Vafaie, Elica) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                Procedural Order for Immigration Mandamus Cases. (tnS) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Immigration Case) and Complaint Under Administrative Procedure Act (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-11886085). Filed by Muhammad Akhtar Shiekh. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Vafaie, Elica) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 161 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?