BNSF Railway Company v. Hall Hauling LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02732

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2019 at 4:47 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Property: Other
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's supplemental motion to dismiss or stay the proceedings Doc. # 19 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is stayed pending resolution of the parties claims in the Lincoln County action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file written notice in this case within fourteen days of the resolution of the state court proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court will administratively close this case pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to stay proceedings Doc. # 9 is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 3/27/18. (ARL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney/Firm
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Full Consent to a Magistrate
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Disclosure of Organizational Interests
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Process Server
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?