Mercury Finance Co
Bankruptcy Case Illinois Northern Bankruptcy Court - Chicago, Case No. 98-20763

Tags

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Last Updated November 19, 2017 at 10:13 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mercury Finance Company, Debtor
Officially listed as "Mercury Finance Co"
Office Chicago
Filed
07/06/1998
County LAKE-IL
Terminated
06/01/2001
Fee Paid
Discharged
Origin 0
Reopened
Previous term
Converted
Dismissed
Joint
Confirmation hearing
341 Meeting
Current chapter 11
Nature of debt business
Related adversary proceedings 98-01580
Pending status Case Closed
Flags CLOSED
Trustee Dean C Harvalis
City Chicago Phone
Email USTPRegion11.es.ecf@usdoj.gov
Party 1 Mercury Finance Co   (Debtor 1) Tax ID / EIN
Atty None Specified
Represents party 1 Debtor 1
Location of case files  
    Volume   CS1 The case file may be available.  
  Entries (1030) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Generic Document
Final Numerical Claim Register . (Riddick, Debbie)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Generic Document
    Final Alphabetical Claim Register . (Riddick, Debbie)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Mapping Text
      ERRATA to notice of resignation. The correct effective date is 4/8/02 RE: Item# 1027 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 955
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Notice
        NOTICE of resignation Heins Mills & Olson, P.L.C. as trustee of the Class 7B Liquidating Truste, effective 2/22/02. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 954
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Notice
          NOTICE of Resignation of T Row Proce Associates Inc as a trustee of the Class 7B Liquidating Trust, effective 1/22/02 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 953
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Blank 1025 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Close Bankruptcy Case
            ORDER CLOSING CASE [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 952
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Final Decree
              FINAL Decree - the Chapter 11 case is closed. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 1021 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 951
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Notice of filing
                NOTICE of Filing by Daniel A Zazove re report pursuant to the Class 7B Liquidating Trust Agreement [PL] Original NIBS Entry Number: 950
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Mapping Text
                  Chapter 11 Final Report [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 949
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Generic Application
                    APPLICATION for Final Decree by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 05/30/2001 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 948
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Notice
                      NOTICE [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 947
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Order on Application for Compensation
                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - [Amended Order] Holper Welsh & Mitchell is allowed fees in the amount of $26068.75 and expenses in the amount of $2091.63. RE: Item# 1015 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 946
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Order on Application for Compensation
                          ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - the Barrington Consulting Group Inc is allowed fees in the amount of $10310.00 and expenses for $43.98. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 945
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Order on Application for Compensation
                            ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Field & Golan is allowed fees in the amount of $10118.50. RE: Item# 1013 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 944
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Order on Application for Compensation
                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Holper Welsh & Mitchell allowed fees in the amount of $15211.25 and expenses in the amount of $1454.89. RE: Item# 1015 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 943
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Application for Compensation
                                APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Fifth Interim] of Holper Welsh & Mitchell [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 942
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                  COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by the Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 941
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Application for Compensation
                                    APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Fifth Interim] of Daniel A Zazove [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 940
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Notice of filing
                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 939
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Notice of hearing
                                        NOTICE of Hearing on the application of Professionals Retained by Class 7b Liquidating Trust for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Expenses Reimbursement hearing on 03/19/2001 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 938
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Order District Court re: Appeal
                                          CERTIFIED Copy of Order Re: Notice of Appeal from USDC Dated: that both appeals are hereby dismissed with prejudice each party to bear its own costs 00C4699 RE: Item# 984 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 937
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Order District Court re: Appeal
                                            CERTIFIED Copy of Order Re: Notice of Appeal from USDC Dated: 12/29/00 that both appeals are hereby dismissed with prejudice each party to bear its own costs OOC4595 RE: Item# 982 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 936
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Order (GENERIC)
                                              ORDER GRANTED - paragraphs 8.04 and 8.06 of Article 8 of the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization dated 12/29/98 as technically modified by an Order entered by this Court on 3/10/99 is clarified to provide that upon the effective date, the Reorganized Mecury's paid-i n-capital is reduced from $186,144,464 to $85,000,000. Regoranized Mercury's paid-in-capital of $85,000,000 shall be used for purposes of calculating the amounts due under the form BCA 14.30 and the Annual Report. RE: Item# 1007 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 935
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                MOTION to Further Clarify Certain Plan Provisions of Mecury's Second Amended Plan of Reorganization as Modified by MFN Financial Corporation. hearing on 01/10/2001 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NI BS Entry Number: 934
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 notice of motion
                                                  NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 933
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Richard Holper is allowed fess in the amount of $15211.25 and expenses in the amount of1454.89 RE: Item# 958 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 932
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                      ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barrington Consulting Group Inc is allowed fees in the amount of $10310.00 and expenses in the amount of $43.98. RE: Item# 961 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 931
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Field & Golan is allowed fees in the amount of $11362.00 and expenses in the amount of $53.55 RE: Item# 964 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 930
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                          ORDER Third Amended Tolling and Standstill Agreement and Order. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 929
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Notice of hearing
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Presentation of Third Amended Tolling and Standstill Agreement and Order hearing on 11/27/2000 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 928
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Application for Compensation
                                                              APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Fourth Interim] of Daniel A Zazove hearing on 12/20/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 927
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Daniel A Zazove [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 926
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Notice
                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 925
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                    WITHDRAWAL of Proofs of Claims by The State of Michigan, Department of Treasury [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 924
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Proof of Service
                                                                      PROOF of Service [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 923
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                        ORDER GRANTED - paragraph 8.06 of the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization, as Modified of Mercury Finance dated 12/29/98, as technically modified by an Order entered by this Court on 3/10/99, is hereby clarified to provide that upon the cancellation of the Old Commo n Stock, the Reorganization Debtor is authorized and directed to reduce its paid in capital as of the effective date to zero. RE: Item# 994 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 922
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                          MOTION to Clarify Certain Plan Provisions of Mercury's Second Amended Plan of Reorganizations, As Modified by MFN Financial Corporation. hearing on 08/29/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS En try Number: 921
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 notice of motion
                                                                            NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 920
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 statement
                                                                              STATEMENT of Arbitratior Nicholas J Bua [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 919
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Transmittal of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSMITTED Notice of Appeal to USDC - Assigned Judge Holderman 00C 4699 RE: Item# 984 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 918
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Transmittal of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSMITTED Notice of Appeal to USDC - Assigned Judge Norgle 00C4595 RE: Item# 982 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 917
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Appellant Designation
                                                                                    DESIGNATION of Items to be included in the Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal by T Rowe Price RE: Item# 984 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 916
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 915
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Appellant Designation
                                                                                        DESIGNATION of Items to be included in the Record and Statement of Issues by MSBI RE: Item# 982 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 914
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 913
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Mapping TextCourt Filing
                                                                                            FORWARDED Copies of Cover Letter/Notice of Appeal to Bankruptcy Judge/Attorneys Indicated RE: Item# 984 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 912
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Notice of appeal
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appeal by T Rowe Price RE: Item# 980[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 911
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Mapping TextCourt Filing
                                                                                                FORWARDED Copies of Cover Letter/Notice of Appeal to Bankruptcy Judge/Attorneys Indicated RE: Item# 982 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 910
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appeal by Minnesota State Board of Investments [paid 10456] RE: Item# 980[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 909
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Mailing in re items 906 and 907 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 908
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Memorandum Opinion and Order
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order - For the foregoing reasons, the Award is affirmed. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 872 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 907
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                        ORDER that for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the award of Arbitrator Nicholas J Bua allocating the assets of the Class 7B Liquidating Trust is affirmed. The Holder Class Claimants' motion to dismiss Notices of Appeal of the Fede ral Class Claimants and T Rowe Price is dismissed as moot. RE: Item# 872 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 906
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                          ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barrington Consulting Group Inc allowed fees for $26082.50 and expenses for $35.60 RE: Item# 961 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 905
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                            ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Daniel A Zazove and Pamela M Williamson is allowed fees in the amount of $21810.50 and expenses for $166.40. RE: Item# 847 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 904
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Richard Holper is allowed fees for $34937.50 and expenses for $4363.61. RE: Item# 958 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 903
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                ORDER - Second Amended Tolling and Standstill Agrement and Order SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 902
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Presentation of Second Amended Tolling and Standstill Agreement and Order hearing on 05/17/2000 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 901
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of the Federal Class Claimants Addressing the Applicability of the Federal Arbitration Act the The Minnesota State Board of Investment [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 900
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 899
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 response
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to the Court's Inquiry Regarding the Federal Arbitration Act and the Baraviti Case [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 898
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 897
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 supplement
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Law of the T Rowe Proce Plaintiffs in Support of Their Appeal and Application to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 896
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 895
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 Brief
                                                                                                                                BRIEF on the Applicability of the Federal Arbitration Act to T Rowe Price's Appeal of the Allocation Award by Stat Class Claimaints [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 894
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/28/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 893
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of the Shriners Hospitals for Children with Respect to the Applicability of the Federal Arbitration Act to the Present Proceeding to Vacate in Arbitrator's Award. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 892
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Third Interim] by Daniel A Zazove [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 891
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                        COVER Sheet for Professional Compensation by Daniel A Zazove [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 890
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 889
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION of the Barrington Consulting Group Inc as Financial Consultant for the Clas 7B Liquidating Trust for an Allowance and Payment of Fees and Expenses Payable from the Trust under the confirmed plan of reorganization. [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Num ber: 888
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                              COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 887
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 886
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION [Third] of Holper, Welsh & Mitchell, as Co-Counsel for the Class 7B Liquidating Trust for an allowance and payment of attorneys fees and expenses payable from the Trustee Established pursuant tot he confirmed plan of reorganization. [Disposed] [DR] Orig inal NIBS Entry Number: 885
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                    COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Holper, Welsh & Mitchell. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 884
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 883
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on the Application of Professionals Retained by the Class 7B Liquidating Trust for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Exprnses Reimbursement hearing on 05/22/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 881
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 letter
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 4/17/00 by Suzanne McCarthy re Change of Address [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 882
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 Notice
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address and Telephone Number of Suzanne McCarthy, 60 E 42nd Street, Suite 1022, New York, NY 10165 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 880
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Mailing RE: Item# 951 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 879
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the parties submit briefs to the Court on the applicability of the Federal Arbitration Act. The briefs should be limited to five pages and should discuss both the applicabliity of the FAA to this proceeding and the standards for vacation or modifica tion of an arbitrator's award. the Courts directs the parties attention to the case of Baraviti v. Josephthal, Lyon & Ross, Inc. All such breifs must be filed no later than 5/1/00. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 878
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Mailing RE: Item# 949 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 877
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that pursuant to directions issued in open court on 4/5/00, the EARISA class Claimants sahll filed their statement of consent or non-consent to discrimination within Class 7B by 5/1/00 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 876
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Mailing RE: Item# 947 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 875
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that a hearing for the purpose of discussing the meaning of allocation and the result of teh Arbitration will be held at 11:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 5, 2000. Its is recommended that counsel bring with them copies of the Plan, the Trust Agreement, and any other documents they feel are relevant to the discussion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 874
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000 Order Approving
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Approving the claim of David Groppi is allowed in an amount of $5000.00 and that the settlement and Release Agreement is approved. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 873
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service in Reply Memorandum of Law of the T Rowe Price Plaintiffs in Support of Their Appeal and Application to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 872
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 reply
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY Memorandum in Support of Application by the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award to the Holder Class [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 871
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 818 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING Continued hearing on 03/14/2000 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 817 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 747C
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Motions of the Claimaints MSBI and T Rowe Price to Vacate the Arbitrator's Award. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 870
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/31/2000 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF of Arbitrator Nicholas J Bua in Response to the Notices of Appeal of The Federal Class Claimants and the T Rowe Price Plaintiff's and the Motion to Dismiss of the Federal Class Claimants. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 869
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/31/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITIONOPPOSITION to Appeal and Application of T Rowe Price Plaintiffs to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award by State Class Claimants. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 868
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/31/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 867
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX to Holder Class Claimant's Joint Response to the Application of the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award and to the Application of the T Rowe Price Plaintiffs to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award and in Further Support of the Holder's Motion to Dismiss the Notices of Appeal of the Federal Class Claimaints and T Row Price. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 866
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                            HOLDER Class Claimaints' Joint Response to the Application of the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award and to the Application of the T Rowe Price Plaintiff's to Vacate or Modify the Arbritrator's Award and in Further Support of the Holders' Motion to Dismiss the Notices of Appeal of the Federal Class Claimaints and T Rowe Price. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 865
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: 1/26/2000 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Proofs of Claim of Missouri Department of Revenue [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 864
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service on Orders Sustaining Debtor's Objection to Claims. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 862
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/25/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the objection of MEN Financial Corp to the claim of Deon Williams is withdrawn. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 863
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order and Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER - The Department shall have an allowed claim to be paid pursuant to the terms of the Plan to the extent liability is determined to exist by agreement of Mercury and the Department or by final order entered as part of any administrative hearing or appeal therefrom. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 861
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 865 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 860
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 863 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 859
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 861 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 858
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the claim of William Dearmon and Robin Dearmon designated as claim Nos. 4914 and 5150 is disallowed in its entirety. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 857
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the motion is denied. That the Federal Class shall promptly file its Memorandum of Law and Separate Appendix, not under seal and The Federal Class Memorandum of Law Separate Appendix shall be deemed to have been timely filed it filed promply upon th e entry of this order. RE: Item# 913 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 856
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the claim of Missouri Department of Revenue is disallowed in its entirety. RE: Item# 859 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 855
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX to Memorandum of Law in Support of Application by the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award to the Holder Class and in Response to Holders Motion to Dismiss [Volume 1 and 2] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 854
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Application by the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award to the Holder Class and in Response to the Holder's Motion to Dismiss. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 853
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 852
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 817 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        HEARING Continued hearing on 02/09/2000 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 816 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 747B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of Kathleen M Logan of Logan & Company Inc Certifying Receipt of Proof of Claim. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 851
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL Objection to Claim of David Groppi by MFN Financial Corporation. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 850
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITIONOPPOSITION of T Rowe Price Plaintiffs to Motion for an Order to File Documents under Seal [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 849
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 848
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CHANGE of Address of Law Firm of Daniel A Zazove, Barbara L Yong and Field & Golan to 3 First National Plaza, 70 W Nadison St., Ste 1500, Chicago, IL 60602 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 847
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 846
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing in re Amended Notice of Motion hearing on 01/18/2000 at 10:00 a.m. RE: Item# 913 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 845
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of David C Bohan for Minnesota State Board of Investment and the Federal Class [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 844
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Lowell E Sachnoff for Minnesota State Board of Investment and the Federal Class [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 843
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Order from USDC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFIED Copy of Order From the U.S. District Court Dated: 9/14/99 - The court's pending case erroneously shows that Case No. 98 C 5633, a bankruptcy related case, remains pending. Plaintiffs counsel withdrew its motion for withdrawal of reference to the bankruptcy court in open court on 2/22/99. Accordingly, th e court denied the motion as mmo in an order dated 2/22/99. The motion having been denied as moot. Case No. 98 C 5633 no longer was a live case. Futhermore, all litigation against Mercury Finance was settled in early 1999. for these reasons, the clerk sh all strike Case No. 98 C 5633 for the court's list of pending cases. RE: Item# 189 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 842
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 913 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Instanter and Under Seal Pursuant to Local Bankrutpcy Rule 401 and this Court's Order Dated 4/12/99, the Federal Class' Memorandum of Law and Supporting Appendix by Class Counsel. hearing on 01/17/2000 at 10:00 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 840
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 839
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of the Appeal and Application by the T Rowe Price Plaintiffs to Vacate or Modify the Arbitrator's Award and in Response to the Holder's Motion to Dismiss [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 838
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 837
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 908 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 836
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER and Notice that the parties are directed to retrieve the original documents from the Office of the BAnkruptcy Clerk. That the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept them as sealed without further order of Court [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 835
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Agreed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED ORDER of Scheduling for filing of Appellate Briefs and Responses - The Federal Class Claimants shall file their brief on appeal and their response to the Holder Claimants' motion to dismss on or before 1/7/00. T Rowe Price shall file its brief on appeal and it s response to the Holder Claimaints' motion to dismiss on or before 1/11/00. All appellees and the Arbitrator shall file their briefs on appeal and the Holder Claimaints shall file their reply support of their motion to dismiss on or before 1/28/00. T Ro we Price and the Federal Class Claimants shall file their reply briefs on or before 2/11/00. A status hearing on the appeals and the motion to dismiss is set on 2/16/00 at 10:30. Leave is granted to file briefs not to exceed twenty five pages. [DR] Orig inal NIBS Entry Number: 841
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Incamera/Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INCAMERA MATERIAL - Memorandum of Law in Support of Application by the Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitratior's Award to the Holder Class and in Response to the Holders' Motion to Dismiss [ 2 Volumes] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 834
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing in re Memorandum of Law in Support of Application by Federal Class to Set Aside the Arbitrator's Award to the Holder Class and In Response to Holder's Motion to Dismiss and Separate Appendix. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 833
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service on Order sustaining Debtor's Objection to Claims [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 807
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service on Order Approving Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Benefit Claims [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 806
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 905 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING Continued hearing on 02/16/2000 at 10:30 a.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 832
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 839 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 831
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 837 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 830
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 835 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 829
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 833 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 828
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 828 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 827
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 826 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 826
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 824 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 825
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 811 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 824
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 809 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 823
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 813 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 822
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 820 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 821
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 822 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 820
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 841 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 819
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 843 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 818
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 807 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 817
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 795 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 816
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 797 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 815
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Disallowing Claim - Nothing in this order shall prejudice the rights or real estate fund inc as a holder of a Class 7B claim RE: Item# 803 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 814
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 799 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 813
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 801 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 812
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 805 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 811
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Approving Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Benefit Claims - The benefit claims shall be barred disallowed as priority claims. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 810
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 793 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 809
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Disallowing Claim RE: Item# 791 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 808
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 878 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HEARING Continued hearing on 02/16/2000 at 10:30 a.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 805
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 873 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        HEARING Continued hearing on 02/16/2000 at 10:30 a.m. RE: Item# 872 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 800A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 831 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING Continued hearing on 01/19/2000 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 830 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 759A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 816 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 01/19/2000 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 815 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 747A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to Relief Request by David Groppi [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 804
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 1/3/2000 Service List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SERVICE List of Class 7B Liquidating Trust Arbitration [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 803
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 1/3/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 802
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 1/3/2000 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Charles D Knight for Nicholas J Bua, Arbitrator [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 801
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999, Terminated: 6/14/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Notices of Appeal of the Federal Class Claimants and T Rowe Price by The Holder Class Claimants hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:30 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 800
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 799
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/27/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Mailing RE: Item# 869 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 798
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/27/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER tha the Federal Claimaints' Notice of Appeal and Application to Vacate or Modify Arbitrator's Award to the Holder Class and the T. Rowe Proce Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal of Arbitrator's Award to the Holders, Etc are set for status on 1/5/00 at 10:30 a.m . The Court will set a briefing schedule at that time. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 797
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appeal of Arbitrator's Award to the Holders Etc by T Rowe Proce Plaintiffs [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 796
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appeal by Federal Class Claimants and Application to Vacate or Modify Arbitrator's Award to the Holders Class [paid #3039] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 795
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 794
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim oof The Coloradoo Department of Revenue by Debtor hearing on 01/19/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 793
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 792
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of the Commonwealth of KEntuky Revenue Cabinet by Debtor hearing on 01/19/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 791
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 790
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of The State of Florida Department of Revenue by Debtor hearing on 01/19/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 789
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 788
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of the Missouri Department of Revenue by Debtor hearing on 01/19/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 787
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 786
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - [Revised] Barrington Business & Engineering Systems is allowed fees in the amount of $18499.00 and expenses for $790.92 RE: Item# 849 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 785
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - [Revised] - Holper Welsch & Mitchell is allowed expenses in the amount of $21372.00 and expenses for 1810.72 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 784
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to the Omnibus Objection by Robert and Betty A Hughes [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 783
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to Claim of William Dearmon et al by MFC Financial Corp hearing on 01/19/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 782
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 781
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barrington Business & Engineering Systems is allowed fees in the amount of $21672.00 and expenses for $1810.72 RE: Item# 849 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 780
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Holper Welsch & Mitchell is allowed fees of $18499.00 and exprneses for $790.02 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 779
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barbakoff, Zazove & Glick is allowed fees for $10574.00 and expenses for $277.07 RE: Item# 847 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 778
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Benefit Claims by Debtor's [OMNIBUS] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 773
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 772
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Robert L Friedowitz by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 771
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 770
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Lawrence & Nora Scanlan by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 769
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 768
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of Thomas Conway by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 767
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 766
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of JJB Hiliard of W L Lyons Inc by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 765
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 764
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Paul James Gurdak, Jr by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 763
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 762
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Charles J Watson by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 761
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 760
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of Deon Williams by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 759
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 758
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of Franklin Lebrun of MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 757
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 756
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Randall Starks by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 755
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 754
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Richard Goodman by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 753
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 752
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of Michael Zummo by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 751
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 750
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of David J Peters by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 749
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 748
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of David Groppi by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 747
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 746
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Bryon Bettinardi by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 745
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 744
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of Fabio Baum by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 743
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 742
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of John Hopper by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 741
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 740
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Lee Allan Barkley by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 739
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 738
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Barbara Schwartz by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 737
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 736
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of Real Estate Fund Inc by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 735
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 734
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of Tanya Horning by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 733
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 732
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Robert Rogers by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 731
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 730
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Claim of Thomas F Godfrey by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 729
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 728
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to Claim of John C Wrobel by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 727
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 726
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of Stephen LI by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 725
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 724
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of American National Bank & Trust Co by MFN Financial Corp hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 723
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 01/05/2000 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 722
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Disallowing Claim of Christine Bigney and is hereby barred RE: Item# 781 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 721
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Disallowing Claim of Elaine Mclean and is hereby barred RE: Item# 779 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 720
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Disallowing Claim of Edward Gordon and is hereby barred RE: Item# 776 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 719
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Disallowing Claim of Arthur Bell and is hereby barred RE: Item# 774 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 718
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Order on Motion to Disallow Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Disallowing Claim of Michelle Harvey and is hereby barred RE: Item# 772 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 717
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense of the Barrington Consulting Group Inc Inc [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 777
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 776
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Second] of Daniel A Zazove and the Members Associates and Paraprofessionals of Barbakoff, Zazove & Glick Chtd [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 775
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Barbakoff, Zazove & Glick [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 774
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on the Application of Professionals Retained by the Class 7B Liquidating Trust for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Expense Reimbursement by Barbakoff Zazove & Glick Chartered, Barrington Business & Engineering Systems and Holper, Welsch & Mitch ell hearing on 12/13/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 716
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Interim Application of Holper, Welsh & Mitchell, as Co-Counsel for the Class 7B Liquidating Trust for an Allowance and Payment of Attorney's Fee and Expenses Payable from the Trust Established Pursuant to the Confirmed Plan of Reorganization [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 715
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 714
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Claim of Christine Bigney by MFN Financial Corp f/n/a Mercury Finance Co hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 713
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 712
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Claim of Elaine McLean by MfC Financial Corp f/n/a Mercury Finance Co hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 711
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 710
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Order District Court re: Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION Copy of Final Order from USDC Dated: 9/27/99 Enter memorandum and order. The decision of the bankruptcy court is affirmed. The clerk is directed to terminate this case RE: Item# 233 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 709
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to Claim of Edward Gordon by MFN Financial Corp f/n/a Mercury Finance Co hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 708
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 707
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to Claim of Arthur Bell by MFN Financial Corp f/n/a Mercury Finance Co hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 706
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 705
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Motion Objecting to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to Claim of Michelle Harvey by MFN Financial Corp f/n/a Mercury Finance Co hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 704
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing hearing on 11/17/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604 [VW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 703
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Amended Tolling and Standstill Agreement and Order SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 702
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER the application of DAniel A Zazove and the members associates and paraprofessionals of Barbakoff Zazove & Glick Chtd is hereby granted. BZ&G is allowed fees in the amount of $14,866.00. BZ&G is authorized reimbursement for expenses incurred by BZ&G in th e amount of $1,624.63. The Trustees of the Trust are authorized and instructed to disburse the amount of $16,490.63 to BZ&G RE: Item# 763 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 701
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the application shall be and hereby is granted. BCGI is allowed fees in the amount of $61,300.50. BCGI is authorized reimbursement for expenses incurred by BCGI in the amount of $4,279.,00. The Trustees if the Trust are authorized and instructed to disburse the amount approved to BCGI RE: Item# 553 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 700
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER the application shall be and hereby is granted. HWM is allowed attorney's fees in the amount of $40,011.50. HWM is authorized reimbursement for expenses incurred by HWM in the amount of $4,743.66. The Trust are authorized and instructed to disburse the a mount approved to HWM RE: Item# 679 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 699
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion re Amended Tolling and Standstill Agreement and Order [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 698
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 697
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 696
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 8/16/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [First Interim] by Daniel A Zazove hearing on 08/11/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 695
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COVER Sheet for Application for professional Compensation by Barbakoff Zazove & Glick [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 694
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 693
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Arthur Andersen LLP is awarded additional reimbursement of expenses of $34,939.08 RE: Item# 749 [PL] Original NIBS Entry Number: 692
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MONTHLY Operating Report formonth ending 3/31/99 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 691
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barrington is allowed final compensation in the amount of $160013.03 and expenses in the amount of $13932.03 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 682 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 686
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - final allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses of $340151.38 for the compensation period SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 714 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 690
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - final allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses of $398360.43 for compensation period RE: Item# 714 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 689
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - final application of compensation and reimbursement of expenses of $1825700.09 for the compensation period RE: Item# 707 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 688
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 755 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - for the Official Committee of unsecured creditors of Mercury Finance Company for Reimbursements of Actual and Necessary Expenses During the period 7/23/98 through 3/10/99 for $4028.39 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 687
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service on motion for order approving changes in arbitration deadline dates and communication [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 685
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 684
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Jonathan W Young for Arthur Andersen LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 683
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Patricia L McCarthy for Arthur Andersen LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 682
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Supplementation of Final Application of Arthur Andersen LLP for Allowance of Accountants' Fees for Services Rendeed and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred on Behalf of the Debtor by Arthur Andersen LLP hearing on 06/16/1999 at 10:30 a.m. at 219 Sout h Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 681
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 680
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MONTHLY Operating Report for period ending 2/28/99 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 678
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that Mark Leipold and the law firm of Gould & Ratner the attorneys for the petitioning creditors are awarded final compensation in the amount of $14,003.00 and reimbursement of expenses in the amount of $2,578.43. That Debtor is authorized and directed t oimmediately pay Gould & RAtner $7,001.50 representing the unpaid portion of the final compensation hereby allowed within 8 days after this order becomes final RE: Item# 709 [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 679
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Blake H Schuburt counsel for Shriners Hospital for Children is allowed final expense reimbursement in the amount of $479.06 RE: Item# 711 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 677
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Anthony Zaccaria counsel for T Row Price is allowed final expense reimbursement in the amount of $3045.92 RE: Item# 711 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 676
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Heins Mills & Olson counsel for the Minnesota Board Investment is allowed final expense reimbursement in the amount of $12504.08 RE: Item# 711 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 675
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Walton Bader counsel for Shriners Hospital for Children is allowed final expense reimbursement in the amount of $5287.77 RE: Item# 711 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 674
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Huburt M Stiles Jr the representative T Rowe Proces is allowed final expense in the amount of $914.66 RE: Item# 711 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 673
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Crowe, Chizek and Company LLp is awarded compensation in the amount of $12360.00 and expenses for $117.50 RE: Item# 646 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 671
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - that Goldberg, Kohn, Bell, Black, Rosenbloom & Moritz, Ltd fees and expenses in the amount of $141171.00 in fees and $3844.39 in expenses. Gordon Glickman & Flisch's fees and expenses are reasonable and are allowed in the amount of $85222.50 and fees and $1599.08 in expenses. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 672
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing in re Supplement to the Final Application for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Berlack, Isreals & Liberman LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 670
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Barbakoff Zazove & Glick Chartered allowed final compensation in the amount of $234205.00 and expenses for $7024.82 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 692 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 669
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Holper Welsh & Mitchell Ltd allowed fees in the amount of $399047.00 and expneses for $48544.38 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 679 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 668
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - the expenses of the Members of the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders ard allowed in the amount of $332.30 RE: Item# 540 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 667
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - [Revised Order] Berlack, Israels & Liberman LLP allowed compensation for $231729.00 for period 10/26/98 through 12/31/98; $31157.00 for period 1/1/99 through 3/10/99 and $15000.00 for period 3/11/99 through 5/26/99 and expenses in the amounts of $29667.0 2 for first period, $7047.26 for second period and $3000.00 for the third period SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 702 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 666
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Mcdermott, Will & Emery is authorized to apply its retainer in the amount of $1,000.00. Mercury is authorized to pay MW&E all amounts previously held back during the final application period for 7/15/98 through 3/10/99 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 697 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 665
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Arthur Andersen LLP is awarded final compensation in the amount of $912269.00 and expenses for $107819.47. This court shall conduct a further hearing on thise additional expenses on 6/16/99 at 10:30 a.m. Arthur Andersen LLP is authorized to apply the int erim payments received to date of $520529.00 against amounts allowed. Arthur Andersen LLP is authorized to apply the retainer of $160476.00 and the amounts allowed. The debtor is authorized to remit $339083.47 to Arthur Andersen LLP SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 695 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 664
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER In Regards to Professional Fees - Chanin's request for compensation in the amount of $500000.00 is allowed for the period 9/25/98 through 3/10/99; expenses allowed in the amount of $23736.01 for the final period. The debtor is authorized to render payment to Chanin the the amount of $375 ,000.00 representing fees generated during the final period less the sum previously paid by the Debtor and the debtor is authorized to render payment of expenses incurred during the final period in the amount of $2033.27 RE: Item# 689 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 663
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMEDMENT to Final Application of Arthur Andersen LLP for Allowance of Accountants' Fees for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred on Behalf of the Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 662
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 661
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Partial Settlements [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 660
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 659
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTED - Senior Debt Claim as set forth on Exhibit A is allowed and the distributions to holders of allowed Senior debt claims as set forth on Exhibit B are approved. RE: Item# 722 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 658
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to Spear, Leeds & Kellogg Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 657
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL Certificate of Service RE: Item# 722 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 656
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing in re items 624-646 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 655
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to allow senior debt claims and distribution by Debtor hearing on 05/10/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 654
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 653
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing on Notice of Reduction and Satisfaction of Administrative Claim [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 652
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing in re Certificate of Service for Final Application of the Members of the Official Committee of Securities Claimants for Reimbursement of Expenses [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 651
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as Advest Inc Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 650
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service on Final Application of Daniel A Zazove and the members of Barbakoff, Zazoff & Glick [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 649
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 648
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CHANGE of Address for for Keith J Shapiro, Nancy A Peterman and Greenburg Traurig to 227 West Monore Street, 35th floor, Chicago, IL 60606 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Final Joint] by Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue and Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 646
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COVER Sheet for Joint Application for Professional Compensation by Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue and Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamiliton [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 645
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 644
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Final] by The Members of the Official of Securities Claimant [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 643
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 642
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense During the period 7/23/98 through 3/10/99 by The Memers of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 641
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 640
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense of Houlihan Lokey Howard Zukin Capital [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 639
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COVER Sheet by Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 638
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 637
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense for the Period 7/15/98 through 3/10/99 The Official Committee of Equity Security Holders [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 636
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 635
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense of Berlack, Isreals & Liberman LLP [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 634
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COVER Sheet for Final Application for Professional Compensation by Berlack, Isreals & Liberman LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 633
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 632
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX to Final Fee Application of McDermott, Will and Emery Counsel to Debtor and Debtor Possession Volume II [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 631
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX to Final Fee Application of McDermott, Will & Emery Counsel to Debtor and Debtor and Possession volume 1 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 630
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense of McDermott, Will & Emery [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 629
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by McDermott, Will & Emery [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 628
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense by Arthur Andersen LLP hearing on 05/26/1999 at 2:00 p.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 627
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Fee Application [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 626
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Arthur Andersen LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 625
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense of Daniel A Zazove and the Members Associates and Paraprofessionals of Barbakoff Zazove & Glick [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 624
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compenation [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 623
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 622
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense by Chanin Kirkland and Messina LLC [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 621
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COVER Sheet for Final Application for professional Compensation by Chanin Kirkland Missina LLC [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 620
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 619
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COVER Sheet for Application for professional Compensation by Holper, Welsh [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 618
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 617
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/23/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to Kirpatrick Pettis Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 616
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/23/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to Wayne Hummer Investments LLC Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 615
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION [Second] of the Barrington Consulting Inc for Compensation [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 614
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COVER Sheet for Application for professional Compensation by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 613
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Stipulation re Allowance of Administrative Claim of John Broderick [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 612
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION [Final] of Holper, Welsh & Mitchell for Allowance and Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 611
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Order on Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING - Logan & Company Inc is soley responsible for acting as a depository fo the Requests for allowance is authorized to forward the orginal Requests for Allowance to the Barrington Group, the class 7B Claims administrator and thereafter shall have no furthe r responsibility for such requests RE: Item# 665 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 609
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to US Clearing Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to National Investors Services Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 607
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Class 7B Liquidating Trust Agreement [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 606
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to Ziegler Thrift Trading Inc Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 605
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action and Settlement Hearing as to Republic New York Securities Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 604
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to Lewco Securities Corp Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 603
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to Butler Wick & Co, Inc Clients [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 602
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMARY of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for month ending 1/31/99 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 600
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 599
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Approving Arbitration Procedures by the Minnesota State Board of Investment hearing on 04/12/1999 at 10:45 a.m.[Disposed] [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 597
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion [AMENDED] [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 596
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 641 [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 598
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificates of Publication regardin g the notices of entry of order confirming debtors second amended plan as modified and discharge of debts by Debtor [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 595
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 594
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/2/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD Report of McDermott, Will & Emery Regarding Status as Disinterested Person [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 593
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/2/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Order and Hearing RE: Item# 641 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 592
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to National Financial Services corp [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 591
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Patial Settlement of Class Action and Settlemtn Hearing as to Deltek Online Brokerage Services [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 590
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to Brown & Company [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 589
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Clas Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing as to Advanced Clearing Inc [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 588
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Mapping TextCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER - MINUTE ORDER -MINUTE ORDER - set before Judge Katz hearing on 04/12/1999 at 10:45 a.m. RE: Item# 653 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 587
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 586
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Order Arbitration Procedures by Minnesota State Board of Investment hearing on 03/30/1999 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 585
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 584
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Order Approving Arbitration Procedures hearing on 03/30/1999 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 583
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 582
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENIED that the motion of Josehp and Marie Siofele to modify stay is denied [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 581
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 648 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING Continued hearing on 05/26/1999 at 2:00 p.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 580
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing in re Certification of Richard A Chesley [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 579
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION [First and Final] of Crowe, Chizek and Company LLP for Allowance of Accountants Fees for Forensic Accounting Services rendered and Reimbursement of Related and Expenses Incurred on Behalf of the Debtor [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 578
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Crowe, Chizek and Company LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 577
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 576
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 643 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HEARING Continued hearing on 03/24/1999 at 11:00 a.m. [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 575
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 574
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER in accordance with the Debtor's Second Amended Plan of Reorganization, all final professional fee and expense applications shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court and served on counsel for the Debtor, the United States Trustee and counsel for each of the Committees on 4/26/99. All such final professional fee and expenses applications shall cover the period from 7/15/98 through 3/10/99, provided, however that any professional having filed an interim fee and expense application for the period 7/15/98 t hrough 12/31/98 may elect to have its interim application deemed final. A hearing on all final professional fee and expense applications shall be held at 2:00 p.m. on 5/26/99. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 573
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Order Approving
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Approving and Alloweing Modifications to the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization of Debtor SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 569
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that pursuant to Section 502 [c] and Rule 3018 [a], the Idemnification Claims of all those Scheduled Indemnity Claimants who timely filed proofs of claim asserting Indemnity Claims, a list of whom are attached hereto as Exhibit A and incorporated herein shall be temorarily allowed in the amount of $1.00 for the sole purpose of voting on the Plan; and it is further ordered that this order is premised shall not have any binding or preclusive effect with respect to any other matter or proceeding [DR] Orig inal NIBS Entry Number: 568
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER the Debtor's Omnibus Objection is sustained; and all dividend claims are disallowed [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 567
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Second Amended Plan of Reorganization of Debtor SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 566
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/9/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 632 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 565
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/9/1999 Order and Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER And Notice the Court will hold a hearing on the United States Trustee's objection to the Order confirmaing the Plan of Reorganization hearing on 03/10/1999 at 11:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 564
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Order Approving
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Approving Notice of Request for Allowance and Form of Request for Allowance, Approving Selection of Arbitrator and Arbitrator's Compensation Finding that Interests of Old and Cold Holders are Represented in Pending Class Actions. SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 601
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER motion is granted. Crowe Chizek shall have until 3/17/99 to file its final fee and expense application RE: Item# 624 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 563
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Mailing RE: Item# 629 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 562
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER and Notice this matter previously come before the Court for hearing on Confirmation of the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization on 2/22/99 and no order having been received to date; it is noted that the Court will prepare the Order if proposed Order is not submitted by 3/8/99 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 561
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service on Second Amended Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code with Respect to First Amended Plan of Reorganization of Mercury Finance Company Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 560
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Authorizing the $1,000,000 success bonus payable to Mr. Brandt in connection with confirmation of the plan is approved. The debtor is authorized to pay $1 million to Mr Brandt on tthe Effective date of the plan [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 559
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service on Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Proposed Partial Settlement of Class Action, and Settlement Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 557
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Fee and Expense Application of Crowe Chizek & Co LLP by Debtor hearing on 03/03/1999 at 11:00 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 556
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 555
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 554
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Reconsider by James D Terra hearing on 02/22/1999 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 572
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 9011 Certification Regarding Request for Emergency Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 571
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion [Emergency] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 570
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 553
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 552
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONFIRMATION Disclosure of Reorganized Mercury's Board of Directors by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 551
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 550
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL Modification to the Second Amended Plan of Reorganization of Mercury Finance Company [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 549
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 548
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONFIRMATION Disclosures by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 547
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 546
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of the Admissibility of Documents Authored by James A Doyle by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 545
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Transfer of Claim ofNOTICE of Transfer of Claim of of Goldman, Sachs & Co is transferred to Canpartners Investments IV LLC [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 544
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing in re McDermott, Will and Emery first application for interim approval and allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 543
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL Declaraton of Kathleen M Logan of Loan & Company Inc Certifying Distribution of Soliciation Materials and the Methodology for Tabulating Ballots and Master Ballots Accepting or Rejecting Second Amended Plan of Reorganization [DR] Original NIBS Entry Num ber: 542
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing in re exhibits to the Declaration of Paul R Schulman Certifying Procedures for Distribution of Solicitation Materials to Beneficial Owners of Mercury's Common Stock [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 541
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service RE: Item# 606 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 539
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Admissibility of Documents Purportedly Authored by James A Doyle by John N Brincat Sr [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE of Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee to objection of John Brincat, Sr., to confirmation of second amended plan of reorganization of Mercury Fiannce Company [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 531
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 530
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Kathleen M logan of Logan & Company Inc certifying distrubution of soliciation materials and the methodology for tabulating ballots and master ballots accepting or rejecting second amended plan or reorganization [CW] Original NIBS Entry N umber: 529
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of law in support of confirmation of Debtor's second amended plan of reorganization by Debtor [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 528
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Paul R. Schulman certifying procedures for distribution of solicitation materials to beneficial owners of Mercury's Common Stock [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 527
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Siofele's motion to lift automatic stay by Debtor [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 526
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to responses of certain holders of dividend claims to the omnibus objection to dividend claims by Debtor [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 525
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 524
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Dividend Claim bu Peter E Choporis [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 523
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM Concerning John Brincat Sr's Failire to Testify by Debtor [JA] Original NIBS Entry Number: 522
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Arthur Andersen LLP for Allowance of Accountants Fees for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred on Behalf of the Debtor [FIRST INTERIM] hearing on 03/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [JO ] Original NIBS Entry Number: 520
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Fee Application hearing on 03/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604 [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 519
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by Arthur Andersen LLP [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 518
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Approve Technical Modifications to the Second amended Plan of Reorganization by Debtor hearing on 02/22/1999 at 10:00 a.m. [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 517
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 516
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Filing [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 521
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Publication [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 515
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTED - the deadline for Arthur Andersen LLP to file its initial fee application for the period of 7/15/98 through 12/31/98 SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 556 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 540
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order and NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER And Notice on hearing regarding the question of the $1,000,000 success bonus payable to Mr. Brandt upon confirmation of the Debtor's Second Amended Plan of Reorganization is reassigned to Judge Barliant hearing on 03/02/1999 at 10:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Co urtroom 742, Chicago, IL 60604 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 538
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order on Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Authorizing the motion is granted. The Debtor is authorized to undertake the necessary actions to effectuate the Settlement and Release Agreement. RE: Item# 570 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 537
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Oral Motion is granted. Houlihan Lokey is granted an extension of time until 3/10/99 to file its Application [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 536
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTED RE: Item# 572 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 535
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that Janet S McIntosh's Proof of Claim filed with the Court on 1/19/99 is deemed timely filed. RE: Item# 550 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 534
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Order on Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING the Private Sale of Mercury Finance Company's Credit Card Receivables Portfolio and Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executury Contracts SEE DRAFT ORDER FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS RE: Item# 515 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 533
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Scheduling Hearing on temporarily estimating and allowing certain claimsfor purposes of voting on Debtor's second amended plan of reorganization [CW] Original NIBS Entry Number: 532
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to Debtor's Motion for Estimation by John N Brincat, Jr. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 514
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 513 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Entered and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING Continued hearing on 02/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. RE: Item# 511 [ST] Original NIBS Entry Number: 445D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to Claim of John N. Brincat Sr by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 513
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 512
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL to Debtor's Motion for an Order Temporarily Estimating and Allowing Certain Claims for Purposes of Voting on Debtor's Second Amended Plan of Reorganization by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 511
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 510
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMARY of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for month ending 12/31/98 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 509
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION Under Penalty of Perjury [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 508
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MONTHLY Operating Report [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 507
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Approve form of Notice of Request for Allowance to be sent to Parties Holding Class 7B Claims, to Approve Selection of the Honorable Nicholas BUA as Class 7B Arbitrator, and to Approve Arbitrator's Compensation and Expenses Reimbursement Arrangements by The Official Committee of Security Claimants hearing on 02/22/1999 at 10:00 a.m. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 506
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 505
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION [Emergency] Requesting Status Conference by John N Brincat, Sr hearing on 02/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m.[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 504
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 503
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Motion for Entry of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Order Seeking Authority to Disburse Funds on Behalf of Non-Debtor Subsidiary Pursuant to Sections 105[a] and 363[b] by Debtor. hearing on 02/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS En try Number: 502
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION of John N Brincat, Sr to Confirmation of Second Amenended Plan of Reorganization of Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Exchange Agent by Debtor [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 499
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 498
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that John Brincat shall appear for deposition on or before 2/16/99 and the deposition shall extend for a period not in excess of 7 hours not including breaks RE: Item# 564 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 497
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel [Emergency] John Brincat's Deposition by Debtor hearing on 02/12/1999 at 4:00 p.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 496
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 495
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing in re supplemental expenses reimbursement report for Robert S Gans to the First Interim Application of Daniel A Zazove and the Members, Associates and Paraprofessionals of Barbakoff, Zazoff & Glick, Chtd. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 494
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing in re affidavit certifying publication of summary notice for Crain Communications, Inc, Chicago Tribune, The Wall Street Journal and The New York Times [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 493
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [Joint] of Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue and Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 492
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COVER Sheet for Joint Application for Professional Compensation of Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 491
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 490
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE by Jonathan W Young for Arthur Andersen LLP [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 489
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999, Terminated: 2/23/1999 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Interim Application for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Arthur Anderson LLP hearing on 02/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 613, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 488
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 487
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to the omnibus objection to dividend claims by Angela & Kyle Morris [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 486
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of The Barrington Consulting Group Inc for Compensation [FIRST] [Disposed] [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 485
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation by The Barrington Consulting Group Inc [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 484
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service [JO] Original NIBS Entry Number: 483
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Have Proof of Claim Deemed Timely Filed by Janet S McIntosh hearing on 02/17/1999 at 11:00 a.m. at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, IL 60604[Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 482
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 481
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX to First Interim Fee Application of McDermott, Will & Emery, Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession [Vol III] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 480
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX to First Interim Fee Application of McDermott, Will & Emery, Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession [Vol. II] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 479
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX To First Interim Fee Application of McDermott, Will & Emery Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession. [Vol I] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 478
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [First] of McDermott, Will & Emery [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 477
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation of McDermott, Will & Emery [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 476
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Allowance of Compensation and Expense [First Interim] by Berlack, Isreals & Liberman LLP [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 475
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COVER Sheet for Application for Professional Compensation [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 474
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 473
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Generic Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION [First] of the Members of the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders for Reimbursement of Acutal and Necessary Expenses Incurred During the Period July 15, 1998 through 12/31/98 [Disposed] [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 472
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 471
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Mapping Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT E [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 470
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 469
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the oral motion is Granted. Jones Day and Cleary Gottlieb are granted an extension of time until 2/12/99 to file their Joint Application. [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 468
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Order (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTED = The members are granted an extension of time until 3/10/99 on or before which they must file their applications for reimbursements of expenses RE: Item# 521 [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 467
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of R Scott Alsterda for Janet S Mctintosh [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 466
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Kenneth J Ottaviano for Janet S McIntosh [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 465
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing [DR] Original NIBS Entry Number: 464
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?