United States v. Brincat
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00093

Tags

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 2:07 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward G. Kohler +1 312 353 5300 edward.kohler@usdoj.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
Space Joseph A. Stewart +1 312 469 6008 +1 312 886 3501 joseph.stewart@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brincat, John N., Sr., Defendant
Officially listed as "John Brincat, Sr."

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

John Brincat, Sr. (1)
Office Chicago
Filed 10/30/2006
County Cook
Terminated 5/23/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-12
Offense Level 4
FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION and 182 Aid and Abet
Count 13-14
Offense Level 4
LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY and 182 Aid and Abet
Count 15
Offense Level 4
CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 1s
Offense Level 4
FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION and 182 Aid and Abet
Count 2s
Offense Level 4
CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag NOLAN
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 SPECIAL Report 12A - No Court Action/Violation
SPECIAL Report 12A - No Court Action/Violation as to John Brincat, Sr (SEALED) (Sohl, David)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 judgment and commitment returned executed
    Judgment and Commitment Returned Executed as to John Brincat, Sr on 12/11/12. (emd, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Order
      ORDER CLARIFYING RESTITUTION as to John Brincat, Sr. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/18/11. Mailed notice (cdy, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Order on Motion for order
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat Sr. (1):Motion for entry of proposed order clarifying restitution [103] is granted. IT IS ORDERED that the Judgment in a criminal case for the above-named defendant be clarified to reflect the restitution order in the amount of $335,847,795 to be distributed as stated in the attached order. The government shall provide the Clerk of the Court with a list of the state disbursements to each victim. Enter Order Clarifying Restitution. (For further detail see separate order). Mailed notice (cdy, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 notice of motion
          NOTICE of Motion by Edward G. Kohler for presentment of motion for entry of proposed order clarifying restitution [103] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/21/2011 at 08:45 AM. (Kohler, Edward) Modified on 4/19/2011 (cdy, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011, Terminated: 4/18/2011 Motion for order
            MOTION by USA for entry of proposed order clarifying restitution as to John Brincat, Sr (Kohler, Edward) Modified on 4/19/2011 (cdy, ).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 return of service executed
              RETURN of Third Party Citation to Discover Assets executed on 11/29/10 as to Marilyn C. Brincat (Stewart, Joseph)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Order
                TURNOVER ORDER as to John Brincat, Sr (CNA Insurance). Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/6/10. (cdy, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Order
                  TURNOVER ORDER as to John Brincat, Sr. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/6/10 (Northwestern Mutual). (cdy, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr: Motion for turnover order [96] granted. Enter Turnover Orders. (For further detail see separate orders). Mailed notice (cdy, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Order on Motion for order
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat Sr. (1): (Defendant John Brincat, Sr. only). Motion hearing held on 12/2/2010. The Government's unopposed motion for turnover order [96] is granted. Mailed notice (cdy, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 notice of motion
                        NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Stewart for presentment of motion for order[96] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/2/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Stewart, Joseph)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010, Terminated: 12/2/2010 Motion for order
                          MOTION by USA for order as to John Brincat, Sr Motion For Turnover Order (Stewart, Joseph)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 citation issued
                            CITATION to Discover Assets issued, one original and one copy, as to Marilyn C. Brincat (Third Party) regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr (emd, ) Modified on 11/29/2010 (td, ).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 satisfaction (release) of judgment
                              Partial Release of Judgment Lien SATISFACTION (RELEASE) of Judgment in the amount of $355,847,794.73 by John Brincat, Sr (Stewart, Joseph)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 return of service executed
                                RETURN of Third Party Citation To Discover Assets executed on 9/24/10 as to CNA Insurance (Stewart, Joseph)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 citation issued
                                  CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to CNA Insurance regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr. (gmr, ) Modified on 9/29/2010 (td, ).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Order
                                    TURNOVER ORDER as to John Brincat, Sr Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/21/10.Mailed notice (meg, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Order on Motion for order
                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Motion hearing held. Motion for turnover order [88] is granted. It is hereby ordered that the respondent, US Bancorp, submit to the Clerk of the Court for the Northern District of Illinois, $16,153, which represents defendant's nonexempt interest in the funds in respondent's possession. Enter Turnover Order. (For Further Details See Separate Order). Mailed notice (meg, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 notice of motion
                                        NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Stewart for presentment of motion for order[88] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/21/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Stewart, Joseph)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010, Terminated: 4/21/2010 Motion for order
                                          MOTION by USA for order as to John Brincat, Sr for Turnover Order (Stewart, Joseph)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 3/10/2010. Government's oral motion for adjustment of distribution amounts granted. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Miscellaneous-Other
                                              ANSWER of the garnishee, American General Finance, as to John Brincat, Sr (emd, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 letter
                                                LETTER from David Cloutier dated 2/24/10. (emd, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing set for 2/24/2010 stricken and reset to 3/10/2010 at 900 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Certificate of service
                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service by Joseph A. Stewart on behalf of USA (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 1/28/2010. Status hearing set for 2/24/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Writ of Garnishment Issued
                                                        WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to American General Finance and Clerk's notice of continuing garnishment to U.S. Attorney's Office regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr (emd, ) Modified on 2/2/2010 (td, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Application for Writ
                                                          APPLICATION by USA for Writ of continuing wage garnishment (emd, ) Modified on 2/2/2010 (td, ).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 1/7/2010. Status hearing set for 1/28/2010 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  judgment and commitment issued
                                                              AMENDED JUDGMENT and Commitment as to John Brincat, Sr issued to U.S. Marshal (emd, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Amended Judgment
                                                                AMENDED JUDGMENT as to John Brincat, Sr. (1), Counts 1-12, 13-14, 15 are dismissed on motion of the United States. Count(s) 1s, The defendant shall make total restitution in the amount of $335,847,795. Order clarifying restitution. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/7/09.Mailed notice (emd, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 11/25/2009. Amended Judgment and Commitment to be entered. Status hearing set for 1/7/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Status Hearing
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr,: Status hearing held on 10/29/2009. Status hearing set for 11/25/2009 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 10/8/2009. Status hearing set for 10/29/2009 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 return of service executed
                                                                        RETURN of Third Party Citation to Discover Assets executed on 09/08/2009 as to Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 return of service executed
                                                                          RETURN of Third Party Citation to Discover Assets executed on 09/21/2009 as to US Bancorp (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                            ANSWER of third party citation respondent Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company as to John Brincat, Sr (emd, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 citation issued
                                                                              CITATION to Discover Assets issued, one original and one copy, as to U.S. Bancorp (Third Party) regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr (emd, ) Modified on 9/23/2009 (td, ).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Status Hearing
                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr.: Status hearing held on 9/10/2009. Status hearing set for 10/8/2009 at 9:00. (lcw, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 citation issued
                                                                                  CITATION to Discover Assets issued, one original and one copy, as to Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr (emd, ) Modified on 9/14/2009 (td, ).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Status Hearing
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing held on 8/10/2009. Status hearing set for 9/10/2009 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to John Brincat, Sr: Status hearing set for 8/10/2009 at 09:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 8/21/07; Before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr (1 Vol: 67-1) (Document Not Imaged) (meg, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Status hearing held on 8/21/2007. Defendant to pay restitution in the amount of $335,847,794.73. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Status hearing held on 8/15/2007. Status hearing set for 8/21/2007 at 1:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Certificate
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of publication by Chicago Tribune Company regarding John Brincat, Sr (meg, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Status hearing held on 8/9/2007. Status hearing set for 8/15/207 at 9:00. Draft list of claimants to be prepared by 8/15/2007. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Status hearing held on 7/25/2007. Status hearing set for 8/9/2007 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant John Brincat, Sr by Jodi Lyn Garvey as Additional Counsel (Garvey, Jodi)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 7/26/2007 is stricken and reset to 7/25/2007 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.:Status hearing held on 6/20/2007. Government has leave to issue trial subpoenas in connection with sentencing for purposes of determining the amount of Defendants restitution obligation. Status hearing set for 7/26/2007 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          AMENDED JUDGMENT as to John Brincat, Sr. Reason for amendment: Correction of Sentence for Clerical Mistatke (Fed. R. Crim. P. 36). Original judgment attached. Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/19/07. Redacted image. Mailed notice (las, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            JUDGMENT (Sentencing Order) as to John Brincat, Sr. (1): The defendant entered a plea of guilty to count(s) S1 and S2 of the superseding information, which was accepted by the court. Count(s) 1-12, 13-14, 15, Counts 1-12, 13-14 and 15 are dismissed on motion of the United States.; Count(s) 1s, It is the judgment of this court that: the defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total uninterrupted term of sixty (60) months on counts S1 and 60 months on Counts S2. Said term as to counts S1 and S2 are to run consecutive to each other. The defendant is sentenced on all count(s) of conviction, namely, count(s) S1 and S2 to a period of one (1) year of supervised release. Mandatory conditions of supervised release. Standard conditions of supervised release. Criminal monetary penalties. Schedule of payments. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: before 2:00 p.m. on 9/10/07. Count(s) 1-12, 13-14 and 15 are dismissed on motion of the United States. John Brincat, Sr terminated. Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/13/07.Mailed copy to counsel of record (yap, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 response
                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to sentencing memorandum[54] Government's Responses To Certain Sentencing Issues (Kohler, Edward)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 supplement
                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT by John Brincat, Sr to his sentencing memorandum [54] (RESTRICTED) (meg, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM as to John Brincat, Sr (Breen, Thomas)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: By agreement, sentencing set for 4/20/2007 is stricken and reset to 5/23/2007 at 10:30. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat: By agreement, sentencing set for 3/6/2007 is stricken and reset to 4/20/2007 at 10:30. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: By agreement, sentencing set for 1/26/2007 is stricken and reset to 3/6/2007 at 12:30. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 plea agreement
                                                                                                                          PLEA Agreement as to John Brincat, Sr (pmp, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: Arraignment held on superseding information. Change of plea hearing held. Defendant withdraws plea of not guilty and enters plea of guilty to count 1 and 2 of the superseding information. Defendant informed of rights. Judgment of guilty entered. Cause referred to the Probation Office for a presentence investigation. Sentencing set for 1/26/2007 at 11:00 AM. Order same bond to stand. Jury trial is stricken. Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 designation form
                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category III). (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 information - felony
                                                                                                                                INFORMATION as to John Brincat, Sr (1) count(s) 1s, 2s (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 terminate deadlines and hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : By agreement, change of plea hearing set for 10/25/2006 is stricken and reset to 10/31/2006 at 11:00. Jury trial set for 10/26/2006 stricken and reset to 11/1/2006 at 9:30. Order excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1))(I) for plea negotiations. Mailed notice (emd, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr. : By agreement, change of Plea Hearing set for 10/20/06 is stricken and reset to 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/23/06 is stricken and reset to Thursday, 10/26/2006 at 09:30 AM. Order excludale time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(I) for plea negotiations. Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: Status Hearing held on 10/12/06. Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/20/2006 at 02:30 PM. Order excludable time to begin pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(I) for plea negotiations. Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr. : Status hearing held on 10/4/2006. Status hearing set for 10/12/2006 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: Status Hearing held on 9/27/06. Status hearing set for 10/4/06 at 9:00 a.m. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat,Sr.: Status Hearing held. Status hearing set for 9/27/06 at 9:00 a.m. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:316(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat Sr.: Defendant's motion to continue trial (38) is granted. Jury trial set for 6/19/06 is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/12/06 at 9:00 a.m. Government to submit revised disclosure dates. Jury trial set for 10/23/06 at 9:30 a.m. Excludable time to continue through 10/23/06 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Todd S. Pugh for presentment of motion to continue[38] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/18/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Pugh, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2006, Entered: 5/13/2006, Terminated: 5/18/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by John Brincat, Sr to continue trial (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing)(Pugh, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: On the court's own motion, final pretrial conference set for 5/12/06 is stricken. Mailed notice (las, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr. : Status Hearing held on 3/23/06. Final pretrial conference set for 3/24/06 is stricken. Jury trial set for 4/17/06 stricken. Final pretrial conference set for 5/12/06 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial set for 6/19/06 at 9:30 a.m. Complete Santiago proffer due 28 days prior to trial date. Excludable time to continue to 6/19/06 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F) Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                        Santiago Proffer by USA as to John Brincat, Sr GOVERNMENT'S AMENDED PRELIMINARY PROFFER AS TO CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MORE DETAILED PROFFER (Attachments: # (1) Brincat Proffer Exhibit A# (2) Proffer Exhibit B# (3) Proffer Exhibit C)(Kohler, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Miscellaneous-Other
                                                                                                                                                          Santiago Proffer by USA as to John Brincat, Sr GOVERNMENT'S PRELIMINARY PROFFER AS TO CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MORE DETAILED PROFFER (Attachments: # (1) Proffer Exhibit A# (2) Proffer Exhibit B# (3) Proffer Exhibit C)(Kohler, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat : Status Hearing held on 3/10/06. Status hearing set for 3/23/2006 at 08:45 AM. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Motion to ProduceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat: Defendant Brincat's motions for production and pretrial disclosures (15,16,17,19,20,21,22) were granted on 1/11/06 and should be terminated. His motion for early return of trial subpoenas (23) is granted nunc pro tunc 1/11/06; both sides are required to produce any materials obtained by subpoena for opposing counsel's inspection and copying. Motion for leave to file additional pretrial motions (24) is granted. On or before 3/24/06 both sides will have leave to file additional motions concerning any matters not previously known to them. Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat: Status hearing set for 3/10/2006 at 09:00 AM. Telephone notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr. : Status Hearing held on 3/6/06. Date for Santiago Proffer disclosures extended to 3/17/06. Final pretrial conference set for 3/24/06 at 2:30 p.m. Jury trial set for 4/10/06 stricken and re-set to 4/17/06 at 9:30 a.m. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat : Status Hearing held on 01/11/06. Santiago proffer disclosures to be made by 03/10/06. Other disclosures, including production of 404(b) material to be made 14 days before the trial date. Status hearing set for 03/06/2006 at 09:00 AM. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 terminate deadlines and hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: Status hearing set for 12/15/05 is stricken. Status hearing set for 01/11/2006 at 09:00 AM. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to John Brincat, Sr.: Status Hearing held on 10/28/05. Status hearing set for 12/15/2005 at 09:00 AM. Excludable time to continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to John Brincat, Sr GOVERNMENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL MOTIONS (Kohler, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA as to John Brincat, Sr regarding MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for leave to[24] (Kohler, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Motion for Leave to
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for leave to file additional pre-trial motions at a later date as issues come to counsel's attention (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for early return of trial subpoenas (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for pretrial identification of trial exhibits at least 30 days prior to trial (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for production of a list of witnesses at least two weeks prior to trial (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for pretrial production of charts, summaries and calculations at least 30 days prior to trial (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by John Brincat, Sr to compel the government to file a Santiago Proffer at least 30 days prior to trial (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM of law by John Brincat, Sr in support of defendant John Brincat, Sr. motion for disclosure of impeaching and exculpatory material instanter [17] (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for disclosure of impeaching and exculpatory material instanter (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by John Brincat, Sr to compel the government to file a proffer regarding any proposed other crimes, wrongs or acts evidence within 60 days before trial (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by John Brincat, Sr for production regarding expert witnesses at least 60 days prior to trial; Notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status Hearing held on 6/29/05. Status hearing set for 10/28/05 at 9:00 a.m. Order excludable time to continue to 04/10/2006 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 set/reset deadlines/hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 3/24/05. Jury trial set for 04/10/2006 at 9:30 a.m. Pretrial motions to be filed by or on 09/01/05. Government's responses to be filed by or on 09/29/05. Reply to be filed by or on 10/13/05. Status hearing set for 06/29/05 at 9:00 a.m. and on 10/28/05 at 9:00 a.m. Order excludable time to begin and continue to 04/10/06 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status Hearing held on 3/4/2005. Thomas Breen and Todd Pugh granted leave to file their appearances on behalf of defendant. Defendant's bond to be secured within 7 days. Status hearing set for 3/24/2005 at 09:30 AM. Excludable time to begin pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEYS Appearance for defendant John Brincat, Sr by Gina T Marotta, Todd S. Pugh and Thomas Michael Breen (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Steven F Molo's agreed motion for leave to withdraw [10] is granted. Mailed notice (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED motion as to John Brincat, Sr for leave to withdraw attorney Steven F. Molo (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant John Brincat, Sr by Steven Francis Molo (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OWN RECOGNIZANCE Bond as to John Brincat, Sr in amount of $ 4,500.00, (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to John Brincat Sr. (1) $4,500.00 own recognizance. (For further details see order) Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/8/05. (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Notice of Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Arraignment as to John Brincat, Sr before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/8/2005 at 10:00 AM. in courtroom 2119.(pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 text entryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Michael T. Mason : To set preliminary bail at $100000.00 (Secured) (pmp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2005 (pmp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 designation form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category III). (pmp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT as to John Brincat, Sr (1) count(s) 1-12, 13-14, 15 (pmp, ) Modified on 9/15/2010 (Owens, A., ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Writ of Garnishment Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to American General Finance and Clerk's notice of continuing garnishment to U.S. Attorney's Office regarding defendant John Brincat, Sr (emd, ) Modified on 2/2/2010 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 260 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?