Sastin 2 LLC v. Hemingway Association Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-01252

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 2:12 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
    ORDER: Plaintiff has not made an adequate showing that the Court has jurisdiction over this matter. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice to their refiling. Plaintiff's 16 Second Motion to Compel Discovery is rendered moot by this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/19/2018. (ml)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay Case
      ORDER granting 29 Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Order. Deadlines are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/6/2018. (mb)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Brief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit a brief on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction no later than 7/10/2018. Defendant shall respond no later than 7/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/28/2018. (mb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/3/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Address Change
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Address Change
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Address Change
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Docket
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/16/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Certificate
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2017, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?