SWEIGERT v. MCCABE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02461

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:04 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANDREW MCCABE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo ELAINE DUKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES COMEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN ROTH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo LISA PAGE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL ROGERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo PETER STRZOK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Rosenstein, Rod J. Rosenstein, Rod J., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROD ROSENSTEIN"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEVEN PETTYJOHN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT +1 503 919 0748 georg.webb@gmail.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, MICHAEL ROGERS, ROD ROSENSTEIN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK (Sroka, Scott)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LISA PAGE served on 12/19/2017; JOHN ROTH served on 12/22/2017; PETER STRZOK served on 12/19/2017 (jf) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES COMEY served on 11/22/2017; MICHAEL HAYDEN served on 11/25/2017; ANDREW MCCABE served on 11/22/2017 (jf) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Correct Clerical Error by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT (jf) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, PETER STRZOK, LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, JOHN ROTH, MICHAEL ROGERS with Jury Demand filed by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT.(jf)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELAINE DUKE served on 11/20/2017; ROBERT S. MUELLER, III served on 11/20/2017; ROD ROSENSTEIN served on 11/20/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/20/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/20/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2018.) (jf) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616088098) with Jury Demand filed by GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 6/14/2018.(mac)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendants' consent motion for an extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than June 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 31, 2018. (lcegs2)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/17/2018. (mac)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendants' consent motion for an extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than May 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 3, 2018. (lcegs2)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 5/3/2018. (mac)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendants' consent motion for an enlargement of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than May 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 25, 2018. (lcegs2)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 4/19/2018. (mac)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 8 defendants' consent motion for extension of time to file answer to plaintiff's amended complaint. The defendants shall therefore answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's amended complaint by April 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2018. (lcegs3)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 3/19/2018. (mac)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 7 defendants' consent motion for an extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than March 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 22, 2018. (lcegs2)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting 4 plaintiff's motion to correct a clerical error. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the classification of the nature of the suit on the docket to reflect that plaintiff is not a prisoner. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 13, 2017. (lcegs2)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Summons (4) Issued as to LISA PAGE, STEVEN PETTYJOHN, JOHN ROTH, PETER STRZOK. (jf)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS (8) Issued as to JAMES COMEY, ELAINE DUKE, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ANDREW MCCABE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?