King v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-06709

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 8, 2019 at 12:24 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LeBaron King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 466

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LeBaron King +1 510 207 5276
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela T Johann +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 pamela.johann@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on January 8, 2018. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2018.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on December 20, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2017: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LeBaron King. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2017. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2017: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 9 Declaration in Support, 7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 10 Proposed Order Proof of Service (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Proposed Order re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Declaration of John F. Schorn in Support of 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUnited States of America. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 12/12/2017. Replies due by 12/19/2017. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Notice (Other), 1 Notice of Removal (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE by United States of America re 1 Notice of Removal Certification pursuant to 28 USC 2679d (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Francisco (no process). Their case number is CSM 856490. (). Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/21/2017) Modified on 11/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?