Di-az v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-06748-WHO
District Judge William H. Orrick, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 14, 2021 at 6:38 PM DT (1.4 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Demetric Di-az, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Navruz Avloni +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 navruz@civilrightsca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 201

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Anthony Organ +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 larry@civilrightsca.com
No Logo Lamar Patterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 201

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Navruz Avloni +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 navruz@civilrightsca.com
Space Lawrence Anthony Organ +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 larry@civilrightsca.com
No Logo Owen Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 201

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Navruz Avloni +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 navruz@civilrightsca.com
Space Lawrence Anthony Organ +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 larry@civilrightsca.com
v.
No Logo Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees - Glastonbury

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brittney R Dobbins +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 bdobbins@grsm.com
Space Megan Laleh Hayati +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 mhayati@grsm.com
Space Craig David Nickerson +1 619 230 7705 cnickerson@grsm.com
No Logo CitiStaff Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara I. Antonucci +1 415 918 3000 +1 415 918 3003 bantonucci@constangy.com
Space Aaron Mitchell Rutschman +1 310 909 7775 +1 424 465 6630 arutschman@constangy.com
Space Kenneth D Sulzer +1 310 597 4552 +1 424 276 7410 ksulzer@constangy.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara I. Antonucci +1 415 918 3000 +1 415 918 3003 bantonucci@constangy.com
Space L. Julius M. Turman +1 415 918 3002 +1 415 918 3001 jturman@constangy.com
Space Aaron Mitchell Rutschman +1 310 909 7775 +1 424 465 6630 arutschman@constangy.com
Space Philip James Smith +1 415 918 3004 +1 415 918 3005 psmith@constangy.com
No Logo West Valley Staffing Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pahl & McCay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fenn C. Horton, III +1 408 286 5100 +1 408 286 5722 fhorton@pahl-mccay.com
Space Helene Anastasia Simvoulakis +1 408 286 5100 +1 408 286 5722 hsimvoulakis@pahl-mccay.com
No Logo Mary Leichliter, Mediator
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/22/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case RG17878854[Alameda County Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,MEDIATION
  Entries (316) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/14/2021, Entered: None Proposed Abstract of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Transcript Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Jury Notes
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 291 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: 10/4/2021 Jury Verdict
          JURY VERDICT. (jmdS, COURT STAFF)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Jury Verdict
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: 10/5/2021 Jury Notes
              Jury Notes. (jmdS, COURT STAFF)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 289 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/4/2021 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial held on 10/1/2021. Total Time in Court: 4 hours, 34 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2021)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 288 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: 10/4/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER FOR JURY MEALS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/3/2021, Entered: 10/3/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [282] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) ) filed byOwen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiff's Opp to Tesla's Mtn for Judgment as a Matter of Law)(Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 10/3/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/3/2021, Entered: 10/3/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [281] MOTION to Strike Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Motion To Strike Testimony of Charles Mahla ) filed by Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Navruz Avloni ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Tesla's Motion to Strike)(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 10/3/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 285 Filed: 10/2/2021, Entered: 10/2/2021 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                  Plaintiff's OBJECTION To Proposed Verdict Form by Owen Diaz . (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 10/2/2021) Modified on 10/4/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 284 Filed: 10/2/2021, Entered: 10/2/2021 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                      Plaintiff's REPLY To Defendant Tesla , Inc.'s Objection To Proposed Verdict Form by Owen Diaz . (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 10/2/2021) Modified on 10/4/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/2/2021, Entered: 10/2/2021 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                          Proposed Form of Verdict by Tesla, Inc. Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Objection to Proposed Verdict Form. (Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 10/2/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 282 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/1/2021 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) filed by Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2021. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng ISO Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a))(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/1/2021 Motion to strike
                                                Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s MOTION To Strike Testimony of Charles Mahla filed by Tesla, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2021. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Susan Haines)(Haines, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2021) Modified on 10/4/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/1/2021 jury instructions
                                                  Final Jury Instructions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/1/2021 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                                    PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/1/2021, Entered: 10/1/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER EXPLAINING JURY INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/1/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                        Plaintiff's DESIGNATION of REBUTTAL Testimony of Demetric Di-az Relating to Defendant's Exhibit 379, Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 statement
                                                          STATEMENT Designation of Testimony Presented by Video of Erin Marconi by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 statement
                                                            STATEMENT Designation of Testimony Presented by Video of Demetric Di-Az by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                              Plaintiff's REVISED DESIGNATIONS of Annalisa Heisen Deposition Testimony with Defendant's Objections/Counterdesignations, Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 proposed jury instructions
                                                                Plaintiff's REPLY to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Objections to Draft Final Jury Instructions, Proposed Jury Instructions by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial held on 9/30/2021. Total Time in Court: 5 hours, 13 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2021)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                    Defendant Tesla, Inc.s OBJECTIONS and COUNTERS to Plaintiffs Designation of Annalisa Heisen Deposition Testimony, Proposed Findings of Fact by Tesla, Inc. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: 9/30/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                      Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s OBJECTIONS to Draft Final Jury Instructions, Proposed Findings of Fact by Tesla, Inc. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 9/30/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: 9/29/2021 proposed jury instructions
                                                                        Plaintiff's Objections to Draft Jury Instructions, Proposed Jury Instructions by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/29/2021) Modified on 9/30/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: 9/29/2021 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                                                          Proposed Verdict Form. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: 9/29/2021 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial held on 9/29/2021. Total Time in Court: 5 hours, 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2021)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: 9/29/2021 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial held on 9/28/2021. Total Time in Court: 5 hours, 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2021)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: 9/28/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                Plaintiff's DESIGNATION of DEPOSITION Testimony of Annalisa Heisen Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/28/2021) Modified on 9/29/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: 9/28/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER ON BATSON CHALLENGES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/28/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: 9/28/2021 jury instructions
                                                                                    Draft Final Jury Instructions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: 9/28/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                      PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS to Tesla's Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony of Erin Marconi Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/28/2021) Modified on 9/29/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/28/2021 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial held on 9/27/2021. Total Time in Court: 4 hours, 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2021)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                          Plaintiff's Corrected Response to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Objections and Counterdesignations to Plaintiff's Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Demetric Di-az; Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                            Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Objections and Counterdesignations to Plaintiff's Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Demetric Diaz; Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                              Defendant Tesla, Inc. dba Tesla Motors, Inc's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Designation of Erin Marconi Deposition Testimony; Proposed Findings of Fact by Tesla, Inc. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                Plaintiff's Designation of the Deposition Testimony of Erin Marconi; Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                  Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Demetric Di-az, Proposed Findings of Fact by Tesla, Inc. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/26/2021, Entered: 9/26/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                    CORRECTED TRIAL BRIEF Regarding the Admissibility of Kevin McGinn's Testimony by Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lawrence A. Organ ISO Brief re Kevin McGinn)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/26/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/26/2021, Entered: 9/26/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Admissibility of Kevin McGill's Testimony by Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lawrence A. Organ ISO Plaintiff's Brief re Kevin McGill's Testimony)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/26/2021)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/25/2021, Entered: 9/25/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Further Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Demetric Di-Az, Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/25/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: 9/27/2021 Jury Trial BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Jury Trial began on 9/24/2021. Jury selection completed. Total Time in Court: 4 hours, 47 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2021)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: 9/24/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Witness Admissibility of Nigel Jones's Testimoney by Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nigel Jones)(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 9/24/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: 9/24/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF Regarding the Admissibility of Demetric Di-az's Deposition Testimony by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                Plaintiff's SUPPLEMENTAL Pretrial BRIEF Re Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instruction No. 5 by Owen Diaz. Trial Brief (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 248 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms - Sequenced in Plaintiff's Proposed Order by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference calls with Plaintiff's Counsel and Defense Counsel held on 9/23/2021. Continued negotiations. FTR Time: Not recorded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2021)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Owen Diaz's Briefing Regarding Inadmissibility of Dismissed Entities' Discovery Responses at Trial. Pretrial Memorandum by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 245 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Briefing Regarding Inadmissibility of Dismissed Entities' Interrogatories Responses at Trial. Pretrial Memorandum by Tesla, Inc. (Haines, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 Objection
                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' OBJECTIONS to One Alleged Reference Demetric Di-az Reapplying to Tesla After He Was Terminated by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: 9/23/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Demetric Di-az. Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz . (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Owen Diaz)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: 9/22/2021 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                              Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Briefing Regarding Inadmissibility of Demetric Di-az's Deposition Testimony at Trial. Pretrial Memorandum by Tesla, Inc. (Haines, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: 9/22/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Designations of Demetric Di-az's Deposition Testimony. Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/22/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 240 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: 9/21/2021 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Pretrial Conference held on 9/21/2021. Total Time in Court: 1 hour. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: 9/21/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - Per Counsel's request the Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 will be held via Zoom webinar. The start time is also advanced to 02:30 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 238 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: 9/20/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Revised Designation of Deposition Testimony of Kevin McGinn with Defendant's Objections and/or Counterdesignations. Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 237 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: 9/20/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                        Parties' Joint Witness List by Owen Diaz . (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: 9/20/2021 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                          Joint Further Pretrial Conference Statement by Owen Diaz . (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: 9/20/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                            Joint Trial Exhibit List by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 234 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: 9/16/2021 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                              Draft Preliminary Jury Instructions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: 9/15/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                  Reset Hearing - Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 will begin with attorney conference at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: 9/14/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Tesla, Inc.. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 231 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: 9/9/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL NOTIFICATION - Witness List and joint statement in preparation for the final pretrial conference due 9/20/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 03:00 PM and Jury Selection set for 9/24/2021 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/09/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                        Additional Days of Jury Trial set for 9/28/2021, 9/29/2021, 9/30/2021,10/1/2021, 10/4/2021, 10/5/2021, 10/6/2021, 10/7/2021, and 10/8/2021, all at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: 9/7/2021 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: 9/3/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: 8/10/2021 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 8/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 8/7/2021, Entered: 8/7/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 6/15/2021. Parties to submit individual confidential settlement statements to rmisettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Bernard Alexander, Cimone Nunley and Larry Organ. Defendant Attorney: Patricia Jeng. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/3/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 3/2/2021. Status Conference set for 6/15/2021 01:00 PM in McKinleyville, Telephone Conference Only before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Appearance instructions will be provided to the parties in a separate communication from the court. FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Cimone Nunley. Defendant Attorney: Patty Jeng. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, PRETRIAL AND STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick granting [223] Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2021 02:00 PM (Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2021). Preliminary Jury Selection set for 9/23/2021 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021, Terminated: 3/2/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL (JOINTLY FILED) filed by Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 01:45 PM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 221 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:45 PM in McKinleyville, Telephone Conference Only before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Telephone participation instructions will be provided separately. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) Modified on 12/17/2020 (glmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing Status Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:45 PM in McKinleyville, Telephone Conference Only before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 220 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 01:45 PM. Preliminary Jury Selection (from questionnaires) set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 08:30 AM. Total Time in Court: 14 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorneys: Larry Organ, Bernard Alexander, and Cimone Nunley. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy and Susan Haines. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 12/15/2020. A status conference will be scheduled to occur one hour after the parties' next status with the presiding judge. FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorneys: Cimone Nunly, Larry Organ and Bernard Alexander. Defendant Attorney: Tracey Kennedy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Status Conference set for 12/15/2020 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Further settlement conference discussions held separately with counsel on 11/23/2020.Parties did not accept the mediator's proposal. Counsel was instructed to have further discussions with their clients regarding the proposal. Further Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2020 03:00 PM. Parties will be provided telephone instructions separately. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Larry Organ. Defendant Attorney: Tracey Kennedy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 11/13/2020. Mediator's proposal to remain open for one week, expiring 11/20/2020 at 5:00 p.m. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorneys: Larry Organ, Bernard Alexander, Cimone Nunley and Owen Diaz. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy and Jaime Bodiford. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          DISREGARD. SEE #216Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 11/13/2020. Offer to remain open for one week, expiring 11/20/2020 at 5:00 p.m. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorneys: Larry Organ, Bernard Alexander, Cimone Nunley and Owen Diaz. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy and Jaime Bodiford. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2020) Modified on 11/16/2020 (glmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
                                                                                                                                                                                            Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2020 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Settlement Conference Access: All counsel and parties may access the meeting information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rmi General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Conference to schedule further Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. The parties shall dial 888-684-8852 and enter access code 1868782 to make their appearances. Counsel shall meet and confer regarding potential available dates for November or early December with the understanding that the principals and decision makers must be available and participate in the Settlement Conference (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: 9/1/2020 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 9/1/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys: J. Bernard Alexander, Cimone Nunley and Larry Organ. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy and Susan Haines. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 is VACATED. A Case Management Conference is set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM to discuss trial scheduling. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference call held on 8/13/2020 with defense counsel.FTR Time: Not Recorded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 209 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Settlement Conference call set for 8/13/2020 02:00 PM with defense counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS (Alexander, John) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 207 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON [185],[187],[200] MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge William H. Orrick and denying [188] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 206 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VACATING JUNE 8, 2020 TRIAL DATE - Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 5/15/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 205 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference calls held on 5/14/2020. Parties to contact courtroom deputy to schedule phone calls early next week following rulings on motions in limine. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Lawrence Organ. Defendant Attorney: Tracey Kennedy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 204 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2020. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 19 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Orrick. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/87677175706?pwd=OTBLc1RlVHZnUS9zbnRSYkJHNURWUT09Meeting ID: 876 7717 5706Password: 993374Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. NOTE: Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Cimone Nunley in Support of [200] MOTION in Limine CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [187] CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [188] filed byOwen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit to the Supplemental Declaration of Cimone Nunley)(Related document(s)[200]) (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Cimone Nunley in Support of [200] MOTION in Limine CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [187] Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-6 filed byOwen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit to the Declaration of Cimone Nunley, # (2) Declaration of Sabrina Grislis ISO Plaintiff's MIL No. 2, # (3) Exhibit to the Declaration of Sabrina Grislis, # (4) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's MILs Nos. 1-6)(Related document(s)[200]) (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020, Terminated: 5/22/2020 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [187] filed by Owen Diaz. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/29/2020. Replies due by 5/6/2020. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [185] MOTION in Limine ) Nos. 1 through 4 filed byOwen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MILs, # (2) Exhibit to the Declaration of Cimone Nunley, # (3) Declaration of Melvin Berry ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MILs, # (4) Declaration of Nathan Fraim ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MILs, # (5) Declaration of Titus McCaleb ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MILs, # (6) Declaration of Nigel Jones ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MILs)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [187] MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 through 6 ) filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Susan Haines, # (2) Exhibit 1-13, # (3) Proposed Order)(Haines, Susan) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 to correct filing counsel's name (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 197 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Owen Diaz and Tesla, Inc.. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Local Rule 16-10(b)(1) Designation of Deposition Testimony, Interrogatory Answers, and Responses to Requests for Admission of Plaintiffs Owen Diaz and Demetric Di-az to be Offered at Trial. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz Plaintiffs' Revised Designations of Discovery. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact by Owen Diaz Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony with Defendant's Objections and/or Counterdesignations. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Owen Diaz and Tesla, Inc.. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Owen Diaz and Tesla, Inc. [Jury Questionnaire]. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by Owen Diaz and Tesla, Inc.. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List [Joint] by Owen Diaz.. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pretrial Conference Statement by Owen Diaz and Tesla, Inc.. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 188 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020, Terminated: 5/22/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ISO Plaintiffs' MILs Nos. 1 through 6 filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Admin Motion to File Under Deal ISO Plaintiffs' MILs, # (2) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiffs' Admin Motion to File Under Seal, # (3) Exhibit Supp Exhibits 1-18 to the Dec of Cimone Nunley, # (4) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Unredacted Motions in Limine Nos. 1-6, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020, Terminated: 5/22/2020 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 through 6 filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/4/2020. Replies due by 5/11/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' MILs nos. 1-6, # (2) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiffs' MILs Nos. 1-6, # (3) Exhibit Exhibits 1-14 to the Dec of Cimone Nunley, # (4) Declaration of Sabrina Grislis ISO Plaintiffs' MIL No. 2, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit to the Dec of Sabrina Grislis ISO Plaintiffs' MIL No. 2)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of SUSAN HAINES in Support of [185] MOTION in Limine filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-12)(Related document(s)[185]) (Haines, Susan) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020, Terminated: 5/22/2020 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/4/2020. Replies due by 5/11/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Haines, Susan) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick re: [182],[183] Stipulation. The Parties will file their respective Motions in Limine on April 20, 2020. The Parties will file any oppositions to Motions in Limine on April 29, 2020. The Parties may appear via Zoom at the Pre-Trial Conference on May 11, 2020 at 10 a.m. Details on Zoom access will be posted on the docket one or two days in advance ofthe hearing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020, Terminated: 4/17/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPUILATION REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND FOR TELEPHONIC OR ZOOM APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Tantula, Ruwani) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020, Terminated: 4/17/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND FOR TELEPHONIC OR ZOOM APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - PROPOSED ORDER filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Tantula, Ruwani) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reset Hearing - Pretrial Conference reset for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM to be conducted by Zoom videoconference. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Hearing - Pretrial Conference reset for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM to be conducted by Zoom videoconference. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 4/7/2020. Parties to confer and email the court regarding status by 4/20/2020. FTR Time: AT&T Recording. Plaintiff Attorneys: Larry Organ and Cimone Nunley both by phone. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy and Patricia Jeng. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [178] STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 4, 6 AND 7. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020, Terminated: 4/2/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiffs' Proposed Motions In Limine Nos. 4, 6, and 7 filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Kennedy, Tracey) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [174] Stipulation. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 176 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS by Judge William H. Orrick granting [175] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020, Terminated: 4/1/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020, Terminated: 4/1/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Tantula, Ruwani) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTION to [159] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Stipulation,,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant nextSource's Motion for Summary Judgment by Owen Diaz, Demetric Di-az. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Dec of LAO ISO Plaintiffs' Opp, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits to Dec of LAO)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 3/10/2020. Jury Selection set for 5/8/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: n/a. Plaintiff Attorney: Larry A. Organ. Defendant Attorneys: Tracy Kennedy and Patty Jeng. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 3/10/2020. Plaintiff's counsel did not appear. FTR Time: 10:05-10:09. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorneys: Tracey Kennedy, Patricia Jeng and Cheryl Stevens for CitiStaff, all by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Cimone Annmarie Nunley for Plaintiffs Demetric Di-az and Owen Diaz (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [168] Stipulation to dismiss Nextsource, Inc. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020, Terminated: 3/9/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal of Defendant NextSource, Inc. filed by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 167 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2020 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Trial counsel MUST participate in the call. Counsel should coordinate their telephonic appearances with CourtCall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [165] Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant CitiStaff Solutions, Inc. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020, Terminated: 3/4/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC. FROM ACTION filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson. (Nunley, Cimone) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ruwani Namal Munaweera Tantula (Tantula, Ruwani) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brett David Young (Young, Brett) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Reanne Swafford-Harris (Swafford-Harris, Reanne) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Q Haines (Haines, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 160 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Order on Motion for sanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING [146] MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, DENYING [147],[158] MOTIONS TO SEAL, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick re: [92],[116],[120], [124],[131],[135] Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020, Terminated: 2/14/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions, # (3) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (4) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Cimone Nunley, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [146] MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Plaintiffs' Reply, # (2) Exhibit to the Dec of Cimone Nunley, # (3) Declaration of Sabrina Grislis ISO Plainitffs' Reply, # (4) Exhibit to the Dec of Sabrina Grislis)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [146] MOTION for Sanctions ) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(B)(2)(A) filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng ISO Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/16/2020, before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, Telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2020. (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties may appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joinder re [149] Statement, Joinder in Defendants' Joint Request to Retain Confidentiality of Documents by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of L. Ledesma ISO Request to Retain the Confidential Designation of Documents Produced in This Matter (Redacted))(Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joinder re [149] Statement, Joinder in Defendants' Joint Request to Retain Confidentiality of Documents by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of L. Ledesma ISO Request to Retain the Confidential Designation of Documents Produced in This Matter)(Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/24/2020 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 1/16/2020. Case settled as to Defendant CitiStaff and terms were stated on the record. Counsel of record for Plaintiffs and Defendant CitiStaff have access to the transcript. FTR Time: 3:58 - 4:05 (SEALED). Plaintiff Attorneys: John Alexander, Lawrence Organ, and Cimone Nunley.Defendant CitiStaff Attorney: Gary Lafayette. Case settled as to Defendant NextSource. Parties executed settlement paperwork at the settlement conference. Plaintiff Attorneys: John Alexander, Lawrence Organ and Cimone Nunley. Defendant Attorneys: Jason Geller and Jaun Araneda. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement re [144] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,,,,,,,, Defendants' Joint Request to Retain Confidentiality of Documents by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Athina Martinez)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 1/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Case settled as to Defendant CitiStaff and terms were stated on the record. Counsel of record for Plaintiffs and Defendant CitiStaff have access to the transcript. FTR Time: 3:58 - 4:05 (SEALED) Plaintiff Attorneys: John Alexander, Lawrence Organ, and Cimone Nunley. Defendant CitiStaff Attorney: Gary Lafayette (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/17/2020: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 2/14/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit Unredacted Motion for Sanctions, # (3) Declaration of Cimone Nunley ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # (4) Exhibit Exhibits A-V, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 2/14/2020 Motion for sanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Sanctions filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Replies due by 2/3/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cimone A. Nunley ISO Motions for Sanctions, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-6, # (3) Declaration of Navruz Avloni ISO Motion for Sanctions)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/17/19, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court ReporterKatherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [140] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2020. (Related documents(s) [140]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part [85],[91],[117],[119] Motion for Summary Judgment and requiring more specific statements to be filed by 1/6/2020 re: [92],[116],[118],[120], [124],[125],[131],[135] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. re [139] Order on Stipulation re: Removal of Attorney (Nickerson, Craig) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/27/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 17, 2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [133] Joint Request for Dismissal as to Plaintiff Lamar Patterson. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order for Dismissal of Defendant West Valley Staffing Group by Judge William H. Orrick granting [115] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2019 re [119],[122] Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Trial continued to 5/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court: 23 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: J. Bernard Alexander, III. Defendant Attorneys: Juan C. Araneda and Jason A. Geller. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Documents filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Motion to Retain Confidentiality, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-46 to Declaration of Lawrence Organ, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service PoS re Unredacted Documents, # (4) Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (5) Exhibit Plaintiffs' UNREDACTED Opposition to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Documents)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [122] MOTION for Protective Order To Retain Confidentiality of Documents ) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.'S MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Tesla's Mtn to Retain Confidentiality, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Tesla's Mtn to Retain Confidentiality)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/18/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request for Dismissal as to Plaintiff Lamar Patterson ONLY; and [Proposed] Order filed by Lamar Patterson. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 132 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claims for Unruh Civil Rights Act and Punitive Damages ) filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng, # (2) Exhibit 18 - 25)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit 25, # (4) Exhibit 25)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [117] MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition filed bynextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Vincent J. Adams)(Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to [117],[119] Motions for Summary Judgment reset for 12/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [121] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claims for Unruh Civil Rights Act and Punitive Damages ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [126] filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Dec of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to Tesla MSJ, # (2) Exhibit Exhs 1-17 to Dec of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to Tesla MSJ)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Opposition/Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER [127] FOR CORRECTION OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claims for Unruh Civil Rights Act and Punitive Damages ) to Tesla's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Dec of Organ ISO Plaintiff's Opp to Tesla's MSJ, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 17 to Organ dec)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service POS, # (3) Exhibit Exh A-S Supplemental Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ, # (4) Exhibit Unredacted MSJ Opp, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit Unredacted MSJ Opp, # (4) Exhibit Exhibits to Supplemental Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service POS ISO Admin Motion to File Under Seal)(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [117] MOTION for Summary Judgment ) to Defendant nextSource, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 to Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to nextSource's MSJ)(Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019, Terminated: 12/17/2019 Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order To Retain Confidentiality of Documents filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/2/2019. Replies due by 12/9/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Reanne Swafford-Harris ISO Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Produced Documents, # (2) Exhibit A-G To Dec of Reanne Swafford-Harris, # (3) Declaration Brandon Ward ISO Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Produced Documents, # (4) Proposed Order Granting Defendant's ISO Motion to Retain Confidentiality of Produced Documents)(Swafford-Harris, Reanne) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019, Terminated: 11/20/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline to File Discovery Dispute Letter filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claims for Unruh Civil Rights Act and Punitive Damages filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Declaration of Jeremie Hansen, # (3) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng, # (4) Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit 9, # (13) Exhibit 10, # (14) Exhibit 11, # (15) Exhibit 12, # (16) Exhibit 13, # (17) Exhibit 14, # (18) Exhibit 15, # (19) Exhibit 16, # (20) Exhibit 17, # (21) Proposed Order)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patricia M. Jeng, # (2) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # (10) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, # (15) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, # (16) Proposed Order)(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Veronica Martinez, # (2) Declaration of Juan C. Araneda, # (3) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Adjudication, # (4) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Exhibits to Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # (4) Unredacted Portions of Exhibits to Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019, Terminated: 12/18/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION REGARDING ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY STAFFING GROUP AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; by West Valley Staffing Group (Horton, Fenn) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[115] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by West Valley Staffing Group The Correct Event is Stipulation & Proposed Order Not Notice. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/23/2019, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [111] Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2020. (Related documents(s) [111]) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/23/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2019 re [85],[91] Motions for Summary Judgment. Argument of counsel taken under submission. An order will be entered following the full briefing of additional anticipated motions for summary judgment. FTR Time: 2:02-2:21. Plaintiff Attorney: Lawrence Organ. Defendant Attorney: Susan Kumagai. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/24/2019: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/23/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge William H. Orrick re: [101] Discovery Letter Brief, [103] Discovery Letter Brief, [105] Discovery Letter Brief, and [106] Discovery Letter Brief. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d re Jimenez v. U.S. Continental Marketing Inc., et al., 2019 WL 5257938 filed byDemetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Jimenez v. U.S. Continental Marketing Inc., et al., 2019 WL 5257938)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Extend Deadline to File Discovery Dispute Letter by Judge William H. Orrick granting [104] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to Extend Deadline to File Discovery Dispute Letter by Judge William H. Orrick granting [102] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/19/2019, Entered: 10/19/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Discovery Letter Brief Re Additional Deposition filed by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Letter Brief Re Additional Deposition filed by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019, Terminated: 10/21/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Discovery Dispute filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief Re Demand for Site Inspection filed by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019, Terminated: 10/21/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Extension of Time to Meet & Confer filed by Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Tesla's Objections to Plaintiff's 30(B)(6) Topics filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE DEPOSITION OF ERIN MARCONI by Judge William H. Orrick granting [99] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: 10/14/2019, Terminated: 10/18/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DEPOSITION OF ERIN MARCONI filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of S. Kumagai in Support of CitiStaff's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues, # (2) CitiStaff's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication)(Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting substitution. Attorney Kenneth Dawson Sulzer terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/8/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation OF DISASSOCIATION OF AARON D. LANGBERG AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT NEXTSOURCE, INC. (Langberg, Aaron) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Joseph Adams for Defendant nextSource, Inc. (Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kenneth Dawson Sulzer and Withdrawal; [Proposed] Order (Sulzer, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge William H. Orrick Settling [86],[88] Discovery Letter BriefS. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (3) [Redacted] Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES, # (4) [Unredacted] Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES, # (5) Exhibit Exhibits A-V to Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (6) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service of Administrative Motion to Defendants)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/2/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to MSJ, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1-9 to of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to MSJ, # (3) Declaration Supplement to of Lawrence Organ ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to MSJ)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE The Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/8/2019 in this matter is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Settlement Conference set for 1/16/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. Parties should review Judge Illman's Settlement Conference Standing Order on the court's website. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 10/3/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Discovery Letter Brief RE PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA re [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Veronica Martinez)(Stevens, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019, Terminated: 10/3/2019 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Number of Depositions filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/2/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration S. Kumagai Declaration in support of, # (2) Declaration V. Ledesma Declaration in support of, # (3) Declaration V. Martinez Declaration in support of, # (4) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting MSJ, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting MSA)(Kumagai, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Telephonic appearance information has been provided to the parties separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/10/2019. Matter referred to Magistrate Judge (random) for Settlement Conference. Backup trial date set as a precaution for 5/11/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 19 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Navruz Avloni Plaintiffs' Notice of Association of Counsel (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE re [79] Letter Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 79 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed byTesla, Inc.. (Swafford-Harris, Reanne) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES by Judge William H. Orrick granting [76] Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019). Close of Fact Discovery: 10/11/2019. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 11/20/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019, Terminated: 6/18/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES filed by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NSG Venture Group, Inc. for nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [57] Amended Complaint; by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/3/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [60] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting substitution of counsel. Attorney Barbara I. Antonucci and Aaron Mitchell Rutschman terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/01/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE & [PROPOSED] ORDER of Substitution of Counsel; by Aaron Mitchell Rutschman for Defendant CitiStaff (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron David Langberg (Langberg, Aaron) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Araneda (Araneda, Juan) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation. (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alex Geller (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting [65] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CitiStaff's Answer to Plaintiff's FAC filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson of Summons (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [57] Amended Complaint byTesla, Inc.(Jeng, Patricia) (Filed on 1/14/2019) Modified on 1/16/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [57] Amended Complaint; by West Valley Staffing Group. (Horton, Fenn) (Filed on 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019, Terminated: 1/8/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER [60] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CHARTWELL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (RESUBMITTED) filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 1/8/2019) Modified on 1/9/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019, Terminated: 2/1/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CHARTWELL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[61] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CHARTWELL'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (RESUBMITTED) filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. Duplicate of Docket Number [60] (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION To Extend Defendant Citistaff Solutions, Inc.'s Time to Respond To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER allowing substitution of counsel per [55] Notice. Attorney Tracey Adano Kennedy for Tesla, Inc. added. Attorney Philip James Smith; Barbara I. Antonucci and Aaron Mitchell Rutschman terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/28/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; 1. Racial Discrimination, Harassment, Retaliation, Failure to prevent, Constructive and Wrongful Termination in Violation of 42 U.S.C. 1981; 2. Racial Discrimination in Violation of the Unruh Civil Rights Act; 3. Retaliation-Unruh Civil Rights Act; 4. Threats of Violence in Violation of the Ralph Civil Rights Act; 5. Threats of Violence-Bane Act; 6. Interference with Constitutional Rights in Violation of the Bane Act; 7. Whistleblower Retaliation; 8. Racial Harassment under FEHA; 9. Racial Discrimination under FEHA; 10. Retaliation under FEHA; 11. Failure to Prevent under FEHA; 12. Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress; 13. Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress; 14. Negligent Hiring Retention and Supervision; 15. Wrongful Termination; and 16. Constructive Discharge. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against All Defendants. Filed byDemetric Di-az, Lamar Patterson, Owen Diaz. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/26/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [54] Stipulation (as modified). Close of Fact Discovery: 6/28/2019. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 8/7/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL & [PROPOSED] ORDER; by Barbara I. Antonucci for Tesla, Inc. (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER allowing plaintiffs to file an amended complaint to add new party Nextsource, Inc. as a defendant; and to continue trial date from May 13, 2019 to October 28, 2019, and trial-related deadlines filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/4/2018. FTR Time: 2:05-2:13. Plaintiff Attorneys: Nabruz Avonli and Larry A. Organ. Defendant Attorneys: Barbara I. Antonucci and Fenn C. Horton. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Certification of ADR Session
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Mary Leichliter: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on 6/11/2018. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are expected by 7/30/20018. Mediation process is ongoing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting [49] Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 09:30 AM at the offices of Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP, located at 351 California Street, Suite 200, San Francisco,CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [47] Stipulation to Continue Mediation Deadline. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE filed by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc. of Unavailability of Barbara Antonucci (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Pre MED phone conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 3/28/2018 at 1:00 PM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mary Leichliter as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Referred to Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Mediation [43]. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2018). Close of Fact Discovery: 1/11/2019. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 2/14/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2019 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR Time: 2:05-2:13. Plaintiff Attorney: Lawrence A. Organ. Defendant Attorney: Julius Turman, Barbara I. Antonucci, and Fenn C. Horton III. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Demetric Di-az. (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Simvoulakis, Helene) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc. (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Owen Diaz (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Demetric Di-az (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF CLAIMS - The parties' [34] joint stipulation to Arbitrate and Stay the Case as to Patterson's claims is APPROVED and GRANTED. The [29] MOTION to Compel is found to be moot. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/08/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Demetric Di-az re [21] Case Management Scheduling Order, (Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/8/2018 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. Joint filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Order re Stipulation for Binding Arbitration and Stay of Claims, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [29] MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byLamar Patterson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Navruz Avloni, # (2) Declaration of Lamar Patterson)(Organ, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [30] Joinder by Tesla, Inc.. (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [30] Joinder filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[30]) (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joinder re [29] MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron M. Rutschman)(Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018, Terminated: 2/8/2018 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/7/2018. Replies due by 2/14/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Suport of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (2) Declaration Brittney Dobbins In Support of Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (3) Exhibit Exs A, B and D to Dobbins Declaration, # (4) Declaration Jannette Van Gorkum In Support of Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (5) Exhibit Ex C to Van Gorkum Decl, # (6) Request for Judicial Notice Ins Support of Chartwell Staffing Services Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (7) Attachment A to Request for Judicial Notice, # (8) Proposed Order, # (9) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dobbins, Brittney) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate CitiStaff Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate West Valley Staffing Group, Other Affiliate Demetric Di-az, Other Affiliate Owen Diaz, Other Affiliate Lamar Patterson, Other Affiliate Tesla, Inc., Other Affiliate nextSource, Inc. a New York Corporation for Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dobbins, Brittney) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mitchell Rutschman for Defendant Tesla, Inc. DBA Tesla Motors, Inc. (Rutschman, Aaron) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Laleh Hayati (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Further Extending The Time For Defendant Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER [26] FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hayati, Megan) (Filed on 1/2/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara I. Antonucci (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara I. Antonucci (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/07/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/6/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Brittney R Dobbins (Dobbins, Brittney) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Craig David Nickerson (Nickerson, Craig) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of service of Answer to Complaint byWest Valley Staffing Group. (Horton, Fenn) (Filed on 12/5/2017) Modified on 12/5/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/5/17. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION Extending the Time for Defendant Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dobbins, Brittney) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages filed by West Valley Staffing Group. (Horton, Fenn) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Demetric Di-az, Owen Diaz, Lamar Patterson.. (Avloni, Navruz) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 11/27/2017 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joinder in re [1] Notice of Removal of Action filed by West Valley Staffing Group. (Horton, Fenn) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc. of re [2] Joinder, re [4] Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Tesla, Inc. of re [6] Case Assigned by Intake, re [1] Notice of Removal, re [3] Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Pesons (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joinder in re [1] Notice of Removal filed by Chartwell Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Buddingh, Jan) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joinder in re [1] Notice of Removal filed by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc.. (Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG17878854, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-11899218). Filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Barbara I. Antonucci, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit N, # (16) Exhibit O, # (17) Civil Cover Sheet)(Antonucci, Barbara) (Filed on 11/22/2017) Modified on 11/22/2017 (tnS).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Answer to Removal Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint for Damages (Removal Complaint) submitted by CitiStaff Solutions, Inc. & Tesla, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,475 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?