District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit United States Supreme Court

English v. TRUMP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02534-TJK
District Judge Timothy J. Kelly, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated July 18, 2018 at 10:41 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEANDRA ENGLISH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD JOHN TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
Mulvaney, Mick Mulvaney, Mick, Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Berns +1 202 616 8016 +1 202 616 8470 matthew.j.berns@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/26/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-D
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        LREF
        Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of All Defendants (Berns, Matthew)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF DEEPAK GUPTA UNDER LOCAL RULE 65.1(B) by Leandra English. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re [2] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Leandra English by Leandra English. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's [2] Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order today, November 27, 2017, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11. If the parties wish to reschedule the hearing for a later date, they shall confer and jointly contact chambers today by 3:30 p.m. with a mutually agreed upon date and time. (lctjk1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Leandra English (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/26/2017, Entered: 11/26/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SOUGHT) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5219866) filed by Leandra English. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons Summons to Donald John Trump, # (3) Summons Summons to John M. Mulvaney)(Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 411 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?