NJOKU v. PERFECT PRIVACY LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-12163

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 3:20 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Report and Recommendations as the conclusions of law of this Court. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/25/2018. (ld, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Magistrate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Response (NOT Motion)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration - Magistrate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?