Think Computer Corporation v. Gregg III
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. BS08375128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 28, 2017 at 9:26 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Gregg, Lucius Perry III, Defendant
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Claim of Plaintiff
Case Subtype Small Claims
Filing Location Berkeley Courthouse
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Lucius Perry Gregg III Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 2 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Small Claims Court Trial 04/18/2008 09:15 AM D- 202
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Claim of Plaintiff Filed (13 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 133 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?